Kevin Darago, et al v. Live Nation Worldwide, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: OHIO BUREAU OF WORKERS' COMPENSATION
Defendant: JAMES GRANT GROUP LTD, nka YM&U Group, DECKSTAR, fka James Grant Group LTD, oka Deckster, oka AM LV PR, LLC, JOHN DOES 1-10, JANE DOES 1-10, DOE PARTNERSHIPS 1-10, DOE CORPORATIONS 1-10, DOE GOVERNMENTAL AGENCIES 1-10, DOE ENTITIES 1-10, JAMES GRANT GROUP, LTD, nka YM&U Group and DECKSTAR, fka James Grant Group, LTD, oka Deckster, oka AM LV PR, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: KEVIN DARAGO
Defendant / Appellee: LIVE NATION WORLDWIDE, INCORPORATED, oka Live Nation Entertainment, Incorporated, BRING THE AWESOME, INCORPORATED, oka Viking Wizard Eyes, LLC, MARK HOPPUS, TRAVIS BARKER, MATT SKIBA, LIVE NATION WORLDWIDE, INC., oka Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. and BRING THE AWESOME, INC., oka Viking Wizard Eyes, LLC
Case Number: 21-3822
Filed: September 14, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 22 Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 11/05/2021 12:35 PM]
November 5, 2021 Filing 21 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Kevin Darago by Ben T. Manayan, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 11/05/2021. [21-3822] (BTM) [Entered: 11/05/2021 09:33 AM]
November 5, 2021 Filing 20 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Kevin Darago by Robert C. Meeker. Certificate of Service: 11/05/2021. [21-3822] (RM) [Entered: 11/05/2021 09:31 AM]
November 4, 2021 Filing 19 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 16 ],, appearance form , [ # 17 ],, appearance form , [ # 11 ], filed by Mr. Ben Timbol Manayan, Jr. for Kevin Darago, Mr. Colin George Meeker for Kevin Darago and Mr. Robert C. Meeker for Kevin Darago is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. Deficiency to be corrected by 11/12/2021. (RGF) [Entered: 11/04/2021 05:31 PM]
November 1, 2021 Filing 18 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Ben Timbol Manayan, Jr. for Kevin Darago. Certificate of Service: 11/01/2021. Argument Request: requested. [21-3822] (BTM) [Entered: 11/01/2021 04:09 PM]
October 30, 2021 Filing 17 LOCKED -- The appearance form is in an editable format. This is an indication that the document was not printed to PDF before uploading. After completing the form, select print and print to PDF. This will format the document into a non-modifiable pdf. APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Kevin Darago by BEN T. MANAYAN, JR.. Certificate of Service: 10/30/2021. [21-3822]--[Edited 11/01/2021 by RGF] (BTM) [Entered: 10/30/2021 03:46 PM]
October 30, 2021 Filing 16 LOCKED -- The appearance form is in an editable format. This is an indication that the document was not printed to PDF before uploading. After completing the form, select print and print to PDF. This will format the document into a non-modifiable pdf. APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Kevin Darago by ROBERT C. MEEKER. Certificate of Service: 10/30/2021. [21-3822]--[Edited 11/01/2021 by RGF] (RM) [Entered: 10/30/2021 03:42 PM]
October 5, 2021 Filing 15 Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: The Mediation Conference scheduled for 10/06/2021 is hereby canceled. (LMR) [Entered: 10/05/2021 03:52 PM]
October 4, 2021 Filing 14 MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: The Mediation conference has been rescheduled for 10/06/2021 at 3:00 PM (ET) with Kathryn Wollenburg. Only the time of the conference has changed. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 10/04/2021 10:39 AM]
September 30, 2021 Filing 13 LOCKED -- The appearance form is in an editable format. This is an indication that the document was not printed to PDF before uploading. After completing the form, select print and print to PDF. This will format the document into a non-modifiable pdf.***********APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Kevin Darago by Colin G. Meeker. Certificate of Service: 09/30/2021. [21-3822]--[Edited 10/01/2021 by RGF] (CGM) [Entered: 09/30/2021 02:59 PM]
September 30, 2021 Filing 12 LOCKED - COUNSEL KINDLY ADVISED EACH ATTORNEY MUST FILE OWN APPEARANCE FORM UNDER OWN PACER ACCOUNT**************APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Kevin Darago by Colin G. Meeker, Robert C. Meeker, and Ben T. Manayan, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 09/30/2021. [21-3822]--[Edited 10/01/2021 by RGF] (CGM) [Entered: 09/30/2021 02:38 PM]
September 30, 2021 Filing 11 LOCKED - COUNSEL ADVISED TO USE COURT'S FORM********APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Kevin Darago by Colin G. Meeker. Certificate of Service: 09/30/2021. [21-3822]--[Edited 10/01/2021 by RGF] (CGM) [Entered: 09/30/2021 11:03 AM]
September 29, 2021 Filing 10 MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: The Mediation conference has been rescheduled for 10/06/2021 at 1:00 PM (ET) with Kathryn Wollenburg. Only the time of the conference has changed. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 09/29/2021 01:06 PM]
September 28, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Nicholas P. Resetar for Appellee Live Nation Worldwide, Inc. Certificate of Service: 09/28/2021. [21-3822]--[Edited 09/28/2021 by RGF] (NPR) [Entered: 09/28/2021 02:22 PM]
September 28, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Nicholas P. Resetar for Appellee Bring The Awesome, Inc. Certificate of Service: 09/28/2021. [21-3822]--[Edited 09/28/2021 by RGF] (NPR) [Entered: 09/28/2021 02:21 PM]
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 11/01/2021;. appellee brief due 11/29/2021; (RGF) [Entered: 09/20/2021 12:23 PM]
September 20, 2021 Filing 6 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. Colin George Meeker for Kevin Darago. Certificate of Service: 09/20/2021. [21-3822] (CGM) [Entered: 09/20/2021 12:19 PM]
September 16, 2021 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Travis Barker, Bring The Awesome, Inc., Mark Hoppus, Live Nation Worldwide, Inc. and Matt Skiba by Nicholas P. Resetar. Certificate of Service: 09/16/2021. [21-3822] (NPR) [Entered: 09/16/2021 02:59 PM]
September 15, 2021 Filing 4 MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 10/06/2021 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Kathryn Wollenburg. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 09/15/2021 02:45 PM]
September 15, 2021 Filing 3 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 09/15/2021 02:43 PM]
September 14, 2021 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Mr. Roy G. Ford (513) 564-7016 (RGF) [Entered: 09/14/2021 05:08 PM]
September 14, 2021 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Kevin Darago. Transcript needed: y. (RGF) [Entered: 09/14/2021 05:06 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kevin Darago, et al v. Live Nation Worldwide, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KEVIN DARAGO
Represented By: Colin George Meeker
Represented By: Robert Meeker
Represented By: Ben Timbol Manayan Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OHIO BUREAU OF WORKERS' COMPENSATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LIVE NATION WORLDWIDE, INCORPORATED, oka Live Nation Entertainment, Incorporated
Represented By: Nicholas P. Resetar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRING THE AWESOME, INCORPORATED, oka Viking Wizard Eyes, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas P. Resetar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK HOPPUS
Represented By: Nicholas P. Resetar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRAVIS BARKER
Represented By: Nicholas P. Resetar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MATT SKIBA
Represented By: Nicholas P. Resetar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LIVE NATION WORLDWIDE, INC., oka Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas P. Resetar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRING THE AWESOME, INC., oka Viking Wizard Eyes, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas P. Resetar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES GRANT GROUP LTD, nka YM&U Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DECKSTAR, fka James Grant Group LTD, oka Deckster, oka AM LV PR, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE PARTNERSHIPS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE CORPORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE GOVERNMENTAL AGENCIES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE ENTITIES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES GRANT GROUP, LTD, nka YM&U Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DECKSTAR, fka James Grant Group, LTD, oka Deckster, oka AM LV PR, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?