Erica Bojicic, et al v. Richard DeWine, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: ERICA BOJICIC, dba Evolve Dance Company, LLC, KENNETH EDWARD ICAN, dba Rock City Dance, Inc., DAVID A. ROSS, II, DA Ross Holdings, LLC, dba Crystal Ballroom, EMILY MERTENS, dba Ballroom Dance Experience, dba Movement Enterprises, LLC, JEFFREY GOLTIAO, dba Dance Edge, RANDY CLINGER, dba UA Fitness LLC, JERRY SATAVA, dba Hudson Ballroom Company, dba In-Flight Ballroom Company, dba Mambo Kings Inc., LISA FERRARA, dba Your Next Move, LLC, SERGI BAKALOV, dba Columbus Dance Sport, LLC, JOSHUA L. TILFORD, DARCY SINES, dba Miss Darcys Academy of Dance and Art, LLC, MICHAEL SCOGGINS, dba Ohio Ballroom and AMANDA SHANE, dba Count Me In, LLC
Defendant / Appellee: RICHARD MICHAEL DEWINE, individually and in his official capacity as the Governor of the State of Ohio, STEPHANIE B. MCCLOUD, individually and in her official capacity as the Director of the Ohio Department of Health, LANCE HIMES, individually and in his official capacity as the former Interim Director of the Ohio Department of Health, AMY ACTON, individually and in her official capacity as the former Director of the Ohio Department of Health and now Governor Chief Health Advisor, SOVEREIGN STATE OF OHIO, JOSEPH MAZZOLA, individually and in his official capacity as Health Commissioner, Director of Franklin County Public Health, PETER SCHADE, individually and in his official capacity as Health Commissioner, Director of Erie County Health, DAVID P. COVELL, individually and in his official capacity as Health Commissioner, Director of Lorain County Health, TERRY ALLAN, Director, individually and in his official capacity as Health Commissioner, Director Cuyahoga County Board of Health, MELBA R. MOORE, individually and in her official capacity as Health Commissioner, Director of the Cincinnati Health Department offices, MYSHEIKA ROBERTS, individually and in her official capacity as Health Commissioner, Director of the Columbus Public Health, ERIC ZGODZINSKI, individually and in his official capacity as Health Commissioner, Director of the Toledo-Lucas County General Health Department, KIRKLAND NORRIS, individually and in his official capacity as Health Commissioner, Director of the Stark County Public Health with offices, DONNA SKODA, individually and in her official capacity as Health Commissioner, Director of the Summit County Public Health, BRUCE VANDERHOFF, individually and in his official capacity as the Chief Medical Officer and Medical Director of the Ohio Department of Health, MARY KATE FRANCIS, individually and in her official capacity as the Assistant Medical Director of the Ohio Department of Health and RON GRAHAM, individually and in his official capacity as Health Commissioner, Director of Lake County General Health District
Case Number: 21-4123
Filed: November 24, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Filing 27 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Amy Acton, Richard Michael DeWine, Mary Kate Francis, Lance Himes, Ms. Stephanie B. McCloud, Sovereign State of Ohio and Bruce Vanderhoff by Katherine J. Bockbrader. Certificate of Service: 01/14/2022. [21-4123] (KJB) [Entered: 01/14/2022 04:39 PM]
January 12, 2022 Filing 26 REPLY filed by Mr. Robert J. Gargasz for Sergi Bakalov, Erica Bojicic, Randy Clinger, Lisa Ferrara, Jeffrey Goltiao, Kenneth Edward Ican, Emily Mertens, David A. Ross, II, Jerry Satava, Michael Scoggins, Amanda Shane, Darcy Sines and Joshua L. Tilford regarding Plaintiff - Appellants' Consolidated Reply Brief to The Responses to Their Motion to Take Judicial Notice Pursuant to Evidence Rule 201. Certificate of Service: 01/12/2022. [21-4123] (RJG) [Entered: 01/12/2022 09:05 PM]
January 12, 2022 Filing 25 RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion to take judicial notice, [ # 18 ]; previously filed by Mr. Robert J. Gargasz for Erica Bojicic, Kenneth Edward Ican, David A. Ross, II, Emily Mertens, Jeffrey Goltiao, Randy Clinger, Jerry Satava, Lisa Ferrara, Sergi Bakalov, Joshua L. Tilford, Darcy Sines, Michael Scoggins and Amanda Shane. Response from Attorney Mr. Frank H. Scialdone for Appellees David P. Covell, Joseph Mazzola, Kirkland Norris, Peter Schade and Donna Skoda. Certificate of Service: 01/12/2022. [21-4123] (FHS) [Entered: 01/12/2022 09:01 AM]
January 11, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION filed by Mr. Kevin A. Pituch for Eric Zgodzinski to take judicial notice. Certificate of Service: 01/11/2021. [21-4123] (KAP) [Entered: 01/11/2022 01:18 PM]
January 7, 2022 Filing 23 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Sergi Bakalov, Erica Bojicic, Randy Clinger, Lisa Ferrara, Jeffrey Goltiao, Kenneth Edward Ican, Emily Mertens, Joshua L. Tilford, Darcy Sines, Michael Scoggins, Amanda Shane, David A. Ross, II and Jerry Satava by Thomas B. Renz. Certificate of Service: 01/07/2022. [21-4123] (TR) [Entered: 01/07/2022 01:00 PM]
January 7, 2022 Filing 22 CORRECTED APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Robert J. Gargasz for Sergi Bakalov, Erica Bojicic, Randy Clinger, Lisa Ferrara, Jeffrey Goltiao, Kenneth Edward Ican, Emily Mertens, David A. Ross, II, Jerry Satava, Michael Scoggins, Amanda Shane, Darcy Sines and Joshua L. Tilford.. Certificate of Service: 01/07/2022. Argument Request: requested. [21-4123] (RJG) [Entered: 01/07/2022 11:50 AM]
January 6, 2022 Filing 21 ***LOCKED - COUNSEL IS ADVISED TO REFILE AS A NON-MODIFIABLE PDF*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Amy Acton, Richard Michael DeWine, Mary Kate Francis, Lance Himes, Ms. Stephanie B. McCloud, Sovereign State of Ohio and Bruce Vanderhoff by Katherine Bockbrader. Certificate of Service: 01/06/2022. [21-4123]--[Edited 01/07/2022 by MMP] (KJB) [Entered: 01/06/2022 02:37 PM]
January 4, 2022 Filing 20 BRIEFING LETTER SENT requesting brief corrections from Mr. Robert J. Gargasz for Erica Bojicic, Kenneth Edward Ican, David A. Ross, II, Emily Mertens, Jeffrey Goltiao, Randy Clinger, Jerry Satava, Lisa Ferrara, Sergi Bakalov, Joshua L. Tilford, Darcy Sines, Michael Scoggins and Amanda Shane. See letter for a list of the necessary corrections. Corrected brief due: 01/07/2022. (MMP) [Entered: 01/04/2022 05:43 PM]
January 3, 2022 Filing 19 ***LOCKED - Brief is not in compliance with the rules.*** Corrected Brief due 1/7/2022. APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Robert J. Gargasz for Sergi Bakalov, Erica Bojicic, Randy Clinger, Lisa Ferrara, Jeffrey Goltiao, Kenneth Edward Ican, Emily Mertens, David A. Ross, II, Jerry Satava, Michael Scoggins, Amanda Shane, Darcy Sines and Joshua L. Tilford. Certificate of Service: 01/03/2022. Argument Request: requested. [21-4123]--[Edited 01/04/2022 by MMP] (RJG) [Entered: 01/03/2022 11:53 PM]
January 3, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION filed by Mr. Robert J. Gargasz for Sergi Bakalov, Erica Bojicic, Randy Clinger, Lisa Ferrara, Jeffrey Goltiao, Kenneth Edward Ican, Emily Mertens, David A. Ross, II, Jerry Satava, Michael Scoggins, Amanda Shane, Darcy Sines and Joshua L. Tilford to take judicial notice. Certificate of Service: 01/03/2022. [21-4123] (RJG) [Entered: 01/03/2022 09:50 PM]
December 17, 2021 Filing 17 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form, [ # 16 ], filed by Mr. John A. Borell, Sr. for Eric Zgodzinski is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. (MMP) [Entered: 12/17/2021 09:18 AM]
December 16, 2021 Filing 16 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Eric Zgodzinski by John A. Borell. Certificate of Service: 12/16/2021. [21-4123] (JAB) [Entered: 12/16/2021 12:11 PM]
December 16, 2021 Filing 15 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Eric Zgodzinski by Kevin A. Pituch. Certificate of Service: 12/16/2021. [21-4123] (KAP) [Entered: 12/16/2021 09:07 AM]
December 16, 2021 Filing 14 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Eric Zgodzinski by Evy M. Jarrett. Certificate of Service: 12/16/2021. [21-4123] (EMJ) [Entered: 12/16/2021 09:00 AM]
December 14, 2021 Filing 13 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Robert J. Gargasz for Appellants Sergi Bakalov, Erica Bojicic, Randy Clinger, Lisa Ferrara, Jeffrey Goltiao, Kenneth Edward Ican, Emily Mertens, David A. Ross, II, Jerry Satava, Michael Scoggins, Amanda Shane, Darcy Sines and Joshua L. Tilford.. Certificate of Service: 12/14/2021. [21-4123] (RJG) [Entered: 12/14/2021 11:48 AM]
December 10, 2021 Filing 12 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Terry Allan by Jake Elliott. Certificate of Service: 12/10/2021. [21-4123] (JAE) [Entered: 12/10/2021 10:05 AM]
December 8, 2021 Filing 11 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Robert J. Gargasz for Appellants Sergi Bakalov, Erica Bojicic, Randy Clinger, Lisa Ferrara, Jeffrey Goltiao, Kenneth Edward Ican, Emily Mertens, David A. Ross, II, Jerry Satava, Michael Scoggins, Amanda Shane, Darcy Sines and Joshua L. Tilford.. Certificate of Service: 12/08/2021. [21-4123] (RJG) [Entered: 12/08/2021 10:15 AM]
December 8, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Robert J. Gargasz for Appellants Sergi Bakalov, Erica Bojicic, Randy Clinger, Lisa Ferrara, Jeffrey Goltiao, Kenneth Edward Ican, Emily Mertens, David A. Ross, II, Jerry Satava, Michael Scoggins, Amanda Shane, Darcy Sines and Joshua L. Tilford Certificate of Service: 12/08/2021. [21-4123] (RJG) [Entered: 12/08/2021 09:46 AM]
December 8, 2021 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Erica Bojicic, Randy Clinger, Lisa Ferrara, Jeffrey Goltiao, Kenneth Edward Ican, Emily Mertens, David A. Ross, II, Jerry Satava, Michael Scoggins, Amanda Shane, Darcy Sines and Joshua L. Tilford by Robert J. Gargasz. Certificate of Service: 12/08/2021. [21-4123] (RJG) [Entered: 12/08/2021 09:41 AM]
December 1, 2021 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Melba R. Moore by Jacklyn Gonzales Martin. Certificate of Service: 12/01/2021. [21-4123] (JGM) [Entered: 12/01/2021 04:29 PM]
December 1, 2021 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Melba R. Moore by Erica Faaborg. Certificate of Service: 12/01/2021. [21-4123] (EF) [Entered: 12/01/2021 04:27 PM]
November 30, 2021 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Mysheika Roberts by Adam S. Friedman. Certificate of Service: 11/30/2021. [21-4123] (ASF) [Entered: 11/30/2021 01:24 PM]
November 30, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Frank H. Scialdone for Appellees David P. Covell, Joseph Mazzola, Kirkland Norris, Peter Schade and Donna Skoda Certificate of Service: 11/30/2021. [21-4123] (FHS) [Entered: 11/30/2021 11:49 AM]
November 30, 2021 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Donna Skoda, David P. Covell, Joseph Mazzola, Peter Schade and Kirkland Norris by Frank H. Scialdone. Certificate of Service: 11/30/2021. [21-4123] (FHS) [Entered: 11/30/2021 11:48 AM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 3 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 01/03/2022; appellee brief due 02/02/2022. (MMP) [Entered: 11/24/2021 11:40 AM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Monica Page (MMP) [Entered: 11/24/2021 11:35 AM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Sergi Bakalov, Erica Bojicic, Randy Clinger, Lisa Ferrara, Jeffrey Goltiao, Kenneth Edward Ican, Emily Mertens, David A. Ross, II, Jerry Satava, Michael Scoggins, Amanda Shane, Darcy Sines and Joshua L. Tilford. Transcript needed: n. (MMP) [Entered: 11/24/2021 11:26 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Erica Bojicic, et al v. Richard DeWine, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ERICA BOJICIC, dba Evolve Dance Company, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KENNETH EDWARD ICAN, dba Rock City Dance, Inc.
Represented By: Robert J. Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID A. ROSS, II, DA Ross Holdings, LLC, dba Crystal Ballroom
Represented By: Robert J. Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EMILY MERTENS, dba Ballroom Dance Experience, dba Movement Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEFFREY GOLTIAO, dba Dance Edge
Represented By: Robert J. Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RANDY CLINGER, dba UA Fitness LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JERRY SATAVA, dba Hudson Ballroom Company, dba In-Flight Ballroom Company, dba Mambo Kings Inc.
Represented By: Robert J. Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LISA FERRARA, dba Your Next Move, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SERGI BAKALOV, dba Columbus Dance Sport, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSHUA L. TILFORD
Represented By: Robert J. Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DARCY SINES, dba Miss Darcys Academy of Dance and Art, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL SCOGGINS, dba Ohio Ballroom
Represented By: Robert J. Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AMANDA SHANE, dba Count Me In, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD MICHAEL DEWINE, individually and in his official capacity as the Governor of the State of Ohio
Represented By: Melissa Z. Kelly
Represented By: Katherine Joseph Bockbrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHANIE B. MCCLOUD, individually and in her official capacity as the Director of the Ohio Department of Health
Represented By: Melissa Z. Kelly
Represented By: Katherine Joseph Bockbrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LANCE HIMES, individually and in his official capacity as the former Interim Director of the Ohio Department of Health
Represented By: Melissa Z. Kelly
Represented By: Katherine Joseph Bockbrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMY ACTON, individually and in her official capacity as the former Director of the Ohio Department of Health and now Governor Chief Health Advisor
Represented By: Melissa Z. Kelly
Represented By: Katherine Joseph Bockbrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SOVEREIGN STATE OF OHIO
Represented By: Katherine Joseph Bockbrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSEPH MAZZOLA, individually and in his official capacity as Health Commissioner, Director of Franklin County Public Health
Represented By: Frank H. Scialdone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PETER SCHADE, individually and in his official capacity as Health Commissioner, Director of Erie County Health
Represented By: Frank H. Scialdone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID P. COVELL, individually and in his official capacity as Health Commissioner, Director of Lorain County Health
Represented By: Frank H. Scialdone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TERRY ALLAN, Director, individually and in his official capacity as Health Commissioner, Director Cuyahoga County Board of Health
Represented By: Jake A. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MELBA R. MOORE, individually and in her official capacity as Health Commissioner, Director of the Cincinnati Health Department offices
Represented By: Jacklyn Gonzales Martin
Represented By: Erica Faaborg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MYSHEIKA ROBERTS, individually and in her official capacity as Health Commissioner, Director of the Columbus Public Health
Represented By: Richard N. Coglianese
Represented By: Adam Scott Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ERIC ZGODZINSKI, individually and in his official capacity as Health Commissioner, Director of the Toledo-Lucas County General Health Department
Represented By: John A. Borell Sr.
Represented By: Kevin A. Pituch
Represented By: Evy M. Jarrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KIRKLAND NORRIS, individually and in his official capacity as Health Commissioner, Director of the Stark County Public Health with offices
Represented By: Frank H. Scialdone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DONNA SKODA, individually and in her official capacity as Health Commissioner, Director of the Summit County Public Health
Represented By: Frank H. Scialdone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRUCE VANDERHOFF, individually and in his official capacity as the Chief Medical Officer and Medical Director of the Ohio Department of Health
Represented By: Katherine Joseph Bockbrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARY KATE FRANCIS, individually and in her official capacity as the Assistant Medical Director of the Ohio Department of Health
Represented By: Katherine Joseph Bockbrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RON GRAHAM, individually and in his official capacity as Health Commissioner, Director of Lake County General Health District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?