Ive Cahio, et al v. Drexel Chemical Company
Plaintiff / Appellant: REMI BASIE, GERALDO DAVID, LUIS SENTELIS, SHILO FILME, YAN CASEIS, MESIYE YEDY, HURGNOT JEAN, AZON ANTOINE, MICHAEL VENELIS, CRISILES PORFIRIO, DELOR GREGORI, IVE CAHIO, SONDER YOUNG, MICHELET CYPRIEN, SARFAITE THEODORE, ELIAS FRANZUA, ETIENNE OGUIS, ENEC SILIE, ALEXANDRE REYMONDIS, EMILIO FLERINTIN, JUAN CELESTEN, DOMINIC VALERIO, ISON JEANIS, BONEL SELUA, JOVIAN MAZO, ANISON DOMERIS, OBESON YAN, CLODI PILIS, MARIE JEROMEIS, VILAIRE TRELY, ALBERTO CUEBA, BENA DELIS, ELIE CISERON, MAZO JOSE, JEAN LIMO, VENEL PIERRE, MIGUEL BONNET, REVENU BRUNO, MICOANE LEONALDO, VICTOR MANUEL NAVARRO and BIENVENIDO ROSARIO
Defendant / Appellee: DREXEL CHEMICAL COMPANY
Case Number: 21-5036
Filed: January 13, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Filing 26 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Drexel Chemical Company by Leigh Ann Schell. Certificate of Service: 03/11/2021. [21-5036] (LTS) [Entered: 03/11/2021 12:55 PM]
March 9, 2021 Filing 25 NOTIFICATION: Setting transcript deadline, relating to transcript order, [18] Transcript to be filed in district court by Ira Lynn Dudley by 04/08/2021. (ASM) [Entered: 03/09/2021 05:56 AM]
March 4, 2021 Filing 24 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Drexel Chemical Company by Patrick H. Morris. Certificate of Service: 03/04/2021. [21-5036] (PHM) [Entered: 03/04/2021 12:37 PM]
February 25, 2021 Filing 23 NOTIFICATION: Setting transcript deadline, relating to transcript order, [17] Transcript to be filed in district court by Mark S. Dodson by 03/29/2021. (ASM) [Entered: 02/25/2021 12:21 PM]
February 24, 2021 Filing 22 Court Reporter Acknowledgement filed by Mr. Mark S. Dodson, for transcript [17] ; Arrangements for payment were made on 02/22/2021 ; Estimated completion date: 03/22/2021 ; Estimated number of pages: 55 . [21-5036] (MSD) [Entered: 02/24/2021 04:09 PM]
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER filed: Appellees motion to dismiss this case for want of prosecution is hereby DENIED AS MOOT [ # 14 ]. (RLJ) [Entered: 02/12/2021 07:24 AM]
February 11, 2021 Filing 20 NOTIFICATION: Setting acknowledgement deadline, relating to transcript order, [18]. Ira Lynn Dudley's acknowledgement is due 02/25/2021. (ASM) [Entered: 02/11/2021 04:17 AM]
February 11, 2021 Filing 19 NOTIFICATION: Setting acknowledgement deadline, relating to transcript order, [17]. Mark S. Dodson's acknowledgement is due 02/25/2021. (ASM) [Entered: 02/11/2021 04:15 AM]
February 10, 2021 Filing 18 TRANSCRIPT ordered from Ira Lynn Dudley, filed by Mr. Robert T. Vance, Jr. for Ive Cahio, et al.. [18] ; ----- This is to order a transcript of the following proceedings and to certify that satisfactory financial arrangements have been completed ----- Transcript ordered on: 02/10/2021 ; District Court Judge/Magistrate: John Fowlkes ; Hearing Dates: 11/8/2018 Oral argument on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint ; Method of Payment: Private Funds ; Court reporter acknowledgement is due in 14 days. Certificate of Service: 02/10/2021. [21-5036]--[Edited 02/11/2021 by ASM] (RTV) [Entered: 02/10/2021 06:24 PM]
February 10, 2021 Filing 17 TRANSCRIPT ordered from Mr. Mark S. Dodson, filed by Mr. Robert T. Vance, Jr. for Ive Cahio, et al. [17] ; ----- This is to order a transcript of the following proceedings and to certify that satisfactory financial arrangements have been completed ----- Transcript ordered on: 02/10/2021 ; District Court Judge/Magistrate: John Fowlkes ; Hearing Dates: 10/22/2020 Oral argument on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint ; Method of Payment: Private Funds ; Court reporter acknowledgement is due in 14 days. Certificate of Service: 02/10/2021. [21-5036]--[Edited 02/11/2021 by ASM] (RTV) [Entered: 02/10/2021 06:22 PM]
February 9, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE: The initial transcript order has not been completed. If not completed by 02/10/2021 further action will be taken. (ASM) [Entered: 02/09/2021 02:08 PM]
February 9, 2021 Filing 15 Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 02/09/2021 10:55 AM]
February 5, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION filed by Mr. Cannon F. Allen, II for Drexel Chemical Company to dismiss Drexel Chemical Company's Motion to Dismiss Appeal Under FRAP 27 For Failure To Comply With FRAP 10 And 6th Circuit Rule 10 Certificate of Service: 02/05/2021. [21-5036] (CFA) [Entered: 02/05/2021 05:12 PM]
February 2, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. William E. Routt, III for Appellants Azon Antoine, Remi Basie, Miguel Bonnet, Revenu Bruno, Ive Cahio, Yan Caseis, Juan Celesten, Elie Ciseron, Alberto Cueba, Michelet Cyprien, Geraldo David, Bena Delis, Anison Domeris, Shilo Filme, Emilio Flerintin, Elias Franzua, Delor Gregori, Hurgnot Jean, Ison Jeanis, Marie Jeromeis, Mazo Jose, Micoane Leonaldo, Jean Limo, Jovian Mazo, Victor Manuel Navarro, Etienne Oguis, Venel Pierre, Clodi Pilis, Crisiles Porfirio, Alexandre Reymondis, Bienvenido Rosario, Bonel Selua, Luis Sentelis, Enec Silie, Sarfaite Theodore, Vilaire Trely, Dominic Valerio, Michael Venelis, Obeson Yan, Mesiye Yedy and Sonder Young Certificate of Service: 02/02/2021. [21-5036] (WER) [Entered: 02/02/2021 12:06 PM]
February 2, 2021 Filing 12 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. William E. Routt, III for Appellants Azon Antoine, Remi Basie, Miguel Bonnet, Revenu Bruno, Ive Cahio, Yan Caseis, Juan Celesten, Elie Ciseron, Alberto Cueba, Michelet Cyprien, Geraldo David, Bena Delis, Anison Domeris, Shilo Filme, Emilio Flerintin, Elias Franzua, Delor Gregori, Hurgnot Jean, Ison Jeanis, Marie Jeromeis, Mazo Jose, Micoane Leonaldo, Jean Limo, Jovian Mazo, Victor Manuel Navarro, Etienne Oguis, Venel Pierre, Clodi Pilis, Crisiles Porfirio, Alexandre Reymondis, Bienvenido Rosario, Bonel Selua, Luis Sentelis, Enec Silie, Sarfaite Theodore, Vilaire Trely, Dominic Valerio, Michael Venelis, Obeson Yan, Mesiye Yedy and Sonder Young.. Certificate of Service: 02/02/2021. [21-5036] (WER) [Entered: 02/02/2021 12:05 PM]
February 1, 2021 Filing 11 NOTIFICATION of PACER docket error for corporate disclosure, [ # 7 ], civil appeal statement of parties and issues, [ 6544332 -2], filed by Mr. William E. Routt, III for Ive Cahio, et al. Attorneys must use their personal PACER account to file any document and are not permitted to use their account to file on behalf of another attorney. Please refile using your own account within 24 hours. (ASM) [Entered: 02/01/2021 03:58 PM]
January 29, 2021 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Azon Antoine, Remi Basie, Miguel Bonnet, Revenu Bruno, Ive Cahio, Yan Caseis, Juan Celesten, Elie Ciseron, Alberto Cueba, Michelet Cyprien, Geraldo David, Bena Delis, Anison Domeris, Shilo Filme, Emilio Flerintin, Elias Franzua, Delor Gregori, Hurgnot Jean, Ison Jeanis, Marie Jeromeis, Mazo Jose, Micoane Leonaldo, Jean Limo, Jovian Mazo, Victor Manuel Navarro, Etienne Oguis, Venel Pierre, Clodi Pilis, Crisiles Porfirio, Alexandre Reymondis, Bienvenido Rosario, Bonel Selua, Luis Sentelis, Enec Silie, Sarfaite Theodore, Vilaire Trely, Dominic Valerio, Michael Venelis, Obeson Yan, Mesiye Yedy and Sonder Young by Robert T Vance Jr. Certificate of Service: 01/29/2021. [21-5036] (RTV) [Entered: 01/29/2021 04:06 PM]
January 27, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Cannon F. Allen, II for Appellee Drexel Chemical Company Certificate of Service: 01/27/2021. [21-5036] (CFA) [Entered: 01/27/2021 05:08 PM]
January 27, 2021 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Drexel Chemical Company by Cannon F. Allen, Sr.. Certificate of Service: 01/27/2021. [21-5036] (CFA) [Entered: 01/27/2021 05:01 PM]
January 27, 2021 Filing 7 **LOCKED**CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. William E. Routt, III for Appellants Ive Cahio, et al Certificate of Service: 01/26/2021. [21-5036] (WER) [Entered: 01/27/2021 04:06 PM]
January 27, 2021 Filing 6 **LOCKED** CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. William E. Routt, III for Appellants Ive Cahio, et al. Certificate of Service: 01/26/2021. [21-5036] (WER) [Entered: 01/27/2021 04:05 PM]
January 27, 2021 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Azon Antoine, Remi Basie, Miguel Bonnet, Revenu Bruno, Ive Cahio, Yan Caseis, Juan Celesten, Elie Ciseron, Alberto Cueba, Michelet Cyprien, Geraldo David, Bena Delis, Anison Domeris, Shilo Filme, Emilio Flerintin, Elias Franzua, Delor Gregori, Hurgnot Jean, Ison Jeanis, Marie Jeromeis, Mazo Jose, Micoane Leonaldo, Jean Limo, Jovian Mazo, Victor Manuel Navarro, Etienne Oguis, Venel Pierre, Clodi Pilis, Crisiles Porfirio, Alexandre Reymondis, Bienvenido Rosario, Bonel Selua, Luis Sentelis, Enec Silie, Sarfaite Theodore, Vilaire Trely, Dominic Valerio, Michael Venelis, Obeson Yan, Mesiye Yedy and Sonder Young by William E. Routt, III. [21-5036] (WER) [Entered: 01/27/2021 01:46 PM]
January 14, 2021 Filing 4 MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 02/08/2021 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 01/14/2021 10:35 AM]
January 14, 2021 Filing 3 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 01/14/2021 10:32 AM]
January 13, 2021 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Antoinette Macon (ASM) [Entered: 01/13/2021 01:37 PM]
January 13, 2021 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Azon Antoine, Remi Basie, Miguel Bonnet, Revenu Bruno, Ive Cahio, Yan Caseis, Juan Celesten, Elie Ciseron, Alberto Cueba, Michelet Cyprien, Geraldo David, Bena Delis, Anison Domeris, Shilo Filme, Emilio Flerintin, Elias Franzua, Delor Gregori, Hurgnot Jean, Ison Jeanis, Marie Jeromeis, Mazo Jose, Micoane Leonaldo, Jean Limo, Jovian Mazo, Victor Manuel Navarro, Etienne Oguis, Venel Pierre, Clodi Pilis, Crisiles Porfirio, Alexandre Reymondis, Bienvenido Rosario, Bonel Selua, Luis Sentelis, Enec Silie, Sarfaite Theodore, Vilaire Trely, Dominic Valerio, Michael Venelis, Obeson Yan, Mesiye Yedy and Sonder Young. Transcript needed: y. (ASM) [Entered: 01/13/2021 01:32 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ive Cahio, et al v. Drexel Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: REMI BASIE
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GERALDO DAVID
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LUIS SENTELIS
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHILO FILME
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: YAN CASEIS
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MESIYE YEDY
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HURGNOT JEAN
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AZON ANTOINE
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL VENELIS
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CRISILES PORFIRIO
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DELOR GREGORI
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: IVE CAHIO
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SONDER YOUNG
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHELET CYPRIEN
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SARFAITE THEODORE
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ELIAS FRANZUA
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ETIENNE OGUIS
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ENEC SILIE
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALEXANDRE REYMONDIS
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EMILIO FLERINTIN
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JUAN CELESTEN
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DOMINIC VALERIO
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ISON JEANIS
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BONEL SELUA
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOVIAN MAZO
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANISON DOMERIS
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: OBESON YAN
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CLODI PILIS
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARIE JEROMEIS
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VILAIRE TRELY
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALBERTO CUEBA
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BENA DELIS
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ELIE CISERON
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MAZO JOSE
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEAN LIMO
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VENEL PIERRE
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MIGUEL BONNET
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: REVENU BRUNO
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICOANE LEONALDO
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VICTOR MANUEL NAVARRO
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BIENVENIDO ROSARIO
Represented By: Robert T. Vance Jr.
Represented By: William E. Routt
Represented By: William E. Routt III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DREXEL CHEMICAL COMPANY
Represented By: Cannon F. Allen II
Represented By: Leigh Ann Tschirn Schell
Represented By: Patrick Herman Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?