Kenneth Morris v. Charter Communications, LLC
Defendant / Appellee: CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: KENNETH MORRIS
Case Number: 21-5259
Filed: March 18, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2021 Filing 11 RULING LETTER SENT granting Appellant's 1st motion to extend time (30 days) to file brief [ # 10 ] filed by Mr. David B. Mour., resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 06/09/2021. appellee brief now due 07/09/2021. (VLP) [Entered: 05/03/2021 03:05 PM]
May 3, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION filed by Mr. David B. Mour for Kenneth Morris to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 05/03/2021. [21-5259] (DBM) [Entered: 05/03/2021 02:08 PM]
April 30, 2021 Filing 9 The case manager for this case is now: Virginia Padgett (JEC) [Entered: 04/30/2021 10:54 AM]
April 1, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Adam Clay Reeves for Appellee Charter Communications, LLC Certificate of Service: 04/01/2021. [21-5259] (ACR) [Entered: 04/01/2021 04:13 PM]
April 1, 2021 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Charter Communications, LLC by Adam C. Reeves. Certificate of Service: 04/01/2021. [21-5259] (ACR) [Entered: 04/01/2021 03:42 PM]
March 29, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. David B. Mour for Appellant Kenneth Morris.. Certificate of Service: 03/29/2021. [21-5259] (DBM) [Entered: 03/29/2021 01:17 PM]
March 29, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. David B. Mour for Appellant Kenneth Morris Certificate of Service: 03/29/2021. [21-5259] (DBM) [Entered: 03/29/2021 01:15 PM]
March 29, 2021 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Kenneth Morris by David B. Mour. Certificate of Service: 03/29/2021. [21-5259] (DBM) [Entered: 03/29/2021 01:13 PM]
March 29, 2021 Filing 3 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 05/10/2021;. appellee brief due 06/07/2021; (BSM) [Entered: 03/29/2021 12:01 PM]
March 18, 2021 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is now: Briston S. Mitchell (GSA) [Entered: 03/18/2021 04:34 PM]
March 18, 2021 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Kenneth Morris. Transcript needed: n. (GSA) [Entered: 03/18/2021 04:30 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kenneth Morris v. Charter Communications, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, LLC
Represented By: Culver V. Halliday
Represented By: Adam Clay Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KENNETH MORRIS
Represented By: David B. Mour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?