MCP No.165, OSHA Covid Rule
Petitioner: MASSACHUSETTS BUILDING TRADES COUNCIL, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ, aka 32BJ SEIU, AFT PENNSYLVANIA, UNITED ASSOCIATION OF JOURNEYMEN AND APPRENTICES OF THE PLUMBING AND PIPE FITTING INDUSTRY OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA, AFL-CIO, ASSOCIATED GENERAL CONTRACTORS OF AMERICA, INC., AMERICAN ROAD AND TRANSPORTATION BUILDERS ASSOCIATION, SIGNATORY WALL AND CEILING CONTRACTORS ALLIANCE, BST HOLDINGS, LLC, RV TROSCLAIR, LLC, TROSCLAIR AIRLINE, LLC, TROSCLAIR ALMONASTER, LLC, TROSCLAIR AND SONS, LLC, TROSCLAIR & TROSCLAIR, INC., TROSCLAIR CARROLLTON, LLC, TROSCLAIR CLAIBORNE, LLC, TROSCLAIR DONALDSONVILLE, LLC, TROSCLAIR HOUMA, LLC, TROSCLAIR JUDGE PEREZ, LLC, TROSCLAIR LAKE FOREST, LLC, TROSCLAIR MORRISON, LLC, TROSCLAIR PARIS, LLC, TROSCLAIR TERRY, LLC, TROSCLAIR WILLIAMS, LLC, RYAN DAILEY, JASAND GAMBLE, CHRISTOPHER L. JONES, DAVID JOHN LOSCHEN, SAMUEL ALBERT REYNA, KIP STOVALL, ANSWERS IN GENESIS, INC., AMERICAN FAMILY ASSOCIATION, INC., BURNETT SPECIALISTS, CHOICE STAFFING, LLC, STAFF FORCE, INC., LEADINGEDGE PERSONNEL SERVICES, LTD., STATE OF TEXAS, HT STAFFING, LTD., STATE OF LOUISIANA, COX OPERATING, LLC, DIS-TRAN STEEL, LLC, DIS-TRAN PACKAGED SUBSTATIONS, LLC, BETA ENGINEERING, LLC, OPTIMAL FIELD SERVICES, LLC, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, GULF COAST RESTAURANT GROUP, INC., STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF UTAH, WORD OF GOD FELLOWSHIP, INC., dba Daystar Television Network, TEXAS TRUCKING ASSOCIATION, MISSISSIPPI TRUCKING ASSOCIATION, LOUISIANA MOTOR TRANSPORT ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN TRUCKING ASSOCIATIONS, INC., NATIONAL FEDERATION OF INDEPENDENT BUSINESS, NATIONAL RETAIL FEDERATION, FMI - THE FOOD INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CONVENIENCE STORES, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF WHOLESALER-DISTRIBUTORS, INTERNATIONAL WAREHOUSE & LOGISTICS ASSOCIATION, INTERNATIONAL FOODSERVICE DISTRIBUTORS ASSOCIATION, GREG ABBOTT, Governor of Texas, BENTKEY SERVICES, LLC, dba Daily Wire, PHILLIPS MANUFACTURING & TOWER COMPANY, SIXARP, LLC, COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, STATE OF IDAHO, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA, SOUTHERN BAPTIST THEOLOGICAL SEMINARY, ASBURY THEOLOGICAL SEMINARY, TANKCRAFT CORPORATION, PLASTICRAFT CORPORATION, STATE OF INDIANA, JOB CREATORS NETWORK, INDEPENDENT BAKERS ASSOCIATION, LAWRENCE TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, GUY CHEMICAL COMPANY, LLC, RABINE GROUP OF COMPANIES, PAN-O-GOLD BAKING COMPANY, TERRI MITCHELL, WATERBLASTING, LLC, STATE OF MISSOURI, STATE OF ARIZONA, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA, STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA, STATE OF ALASKA, STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, STATE OF WYOMING, AAI, INC., DOOLITTLE TRAILER MANUFACTURING, INC., CHRISTIAN EMPLOYERS ALLIANCE, SIOUX FALLS CATHOLIC SCHOOLS, dba Bishop O'Gorman Catholic Schools, HOME SCHOOL LEGAL DEFENSE ASSOCIATION, INC., DTN STAFFING, INC., JAMIE FLECK, SADIE HAWS, SHERIFF SHARMA, WENDI JOHNSTON, MILLER INSULATION COMPANY, INC., BRAD MILLER, COREY HAGER, JULIO HERNANDEZ ORTIZ, AARON JANZ, MFA, INC., MFA ENTERPRISES, INC., MISSOURI FARM BUREAU SERVICES, INC., MISSOURI FARM BUREAU INSURANCE BROKERAGE, INC., MFA OIL COMPANY, DOYLE EQUIPMENT MANUFACTURING COMPANY, RIVERVIEW MANUFACTURING, INC., NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF BROADCAST EMPLOYEES & TECHNICIANS, THE BROADCASTING AND CABLE TELEVISION WORKERS SECTOR OF THE COMMUNICATIONS WORKERS OF AMERICA, LOCAL 51, AFL-CIO, MEDIA GUILD OF THE WEST, THE NEWS GUILD-COMMUNICATIONS WORKERS OF AMERICA, AFL-CIO, LOCAL 39213, UNION OF AMERICAN PHYSICIANS AND DENTISTS, DENVER NEWSPAPER GUILD, COMMUNICATIONS WORKERS OF AMERICA, LOCAL 37074, AFL-CIO, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF GEORGIA, GEORGIA HIGHWAY CONTRACTORS ASSOCIATION, GEORGIA MOTOR TRUCKING ASSOCIATION, ROBINSON PAVING CO., SCOTCH PLYWOOD COMPANY, INC., KING'S ACADEMY, CAMBRIDGE CHRISTIAN SCHOOL, INC., FABARC STEEL SUPPLY, INC., TONY PUGH, ASSOCIATED BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS, INC., ASSOCIATED BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS OF ALABAMA, INC., REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFL/CIO-CLC, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF LABOR-CONGRESS OF INDUSTRIAL ORGANIZATIONS, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS, NATURAL PRODUCTS ASSOCIATION, OBERG INDUSTRIES, LLC, BETTEN CHEVROLET, INC., TORE SAYS LLC, KENTUCKY PETROLEUM MARKETERS ASSOCIATION, KENTUCKY TRUCKING ASSOCIATION, MICHIGAN ASSOCIATION OF CONVENIENCE STORES, MICHIGAN PETROLEUM ASSOCIATION, MICHIGAN RETAILERS ASSOCIATION, MICHIGAN TRUCKING ASSOCIATION, OHIO TRUCKING ASSOCIATION, TENNESSEE CHAMBER OF COMMERCE AND INDUSTRY, TENNESSEE GROCERS AND CONVENIENCE STORE ASSOCIATION, TENNESSEE MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION, TENNESSEE TRUCKING ASSOCIATION, NATIONAL PROPANE GAS ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN BAKERS ASSOCIATION, BRICK INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, AARON ABADI, INDEPENDENT ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS - FWCC, INC., HERITAGE FOUNDATION, NORTH AMERICA'S BUILDING TRADES UNIONS, SCOTT BEDKE, in his official capacity as Speaker of the Idaho House of Representatives and CHUCK WINDER, in his official capacity as President Pro Tempore of the Idaho Senate
Respondent: OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY & HEALTH ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, DOUGLAS L. PARKER, in his Official Capacity as Assistant Secretary of Labor for Occupational Safety and Health Administration, JAMES FREDERICK, Deputy Assistant Secretary of Labor for Occupational Safety and Health Administration, MARTIN J. WALSH, Secretary, U.S. Department of Labor, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, President of the United States of America and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Not Classified By Court: In re: MCP NO. 165., OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY AND HEALTH ADMINISTRATION RULE ON COVID-19 VACCINATION AND TESTING, 86 FED. REG. 61402 and In re: MCP NO. 165, OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY AND HEALTH ADMINISTRATION RULE ON COVID-19 VACCINATION AND TESTING, 86 FED. REG. 61402
Amicus Curiae: OHIO GROCERS ASSOCIATION, NEW CIVIL LIBERTIES ALLIANCE, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, GAVEL PROJECT, MICHIGAN HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, MICHIGAN SENATE, WISCONSIN MANUFACTURERS & COMMERCE, SMALL BUSINESS ASSOCIATION OF MICHIGAN, CHARLES N. JEFFRESS, DAVID MICHAELS, GERARD SCANNELL, NATIONAL EMPLOYMENT LAWYERS ASSOCIATION, JOBS WITH JUSTICE EDUCATION FUND, CONSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNTABILITY CENTER, AMERICAN PUBLIC HEALTH ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATION OF SCHOOLS AND PROGRAMS OF PUBLIC HEALTH, ACADEMY OF MANAGED CARE PHARMACY, ALLIANCE OF COMMUNITY HEALTH PLANS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OSTEOPATHIC EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PREVENTATIVE MEDICINE, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES, COLLEGE OF AMERICAN PATHOLOGISTS, COUNCIL OF STATE AND TERRITORIAL EPIDEMIOLOGISTS, NATIONAL HISPANIC MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, NATIONAL MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, NATIONAL SAFETY COUNCIL, ASSOCIATION OF PERIOPERATIVE REGISTERED NURSES, NATIONAL LEAGUE FOR NURSING, 30 DEANS OF LEADING ACADEMIC PROGRAMS, 104 LEADING PUBLIC HEALTH AND HEALTH POLICY SCHOLARS, OHIO CHAMBER OF COMMERCE, OHIO AUTOMOBILE DEALERS ASSOCIATION, OHIO WHOLESALE BEER AND WINE ASSOCIATION, OHIO HOTEL AND LODGING ASSOCIATION, OHIO BANKERS LEAGUE, SMALL BUSINESS MAJORITY, AMERICAN INDEPENDENT BUSINESS ALLIANCE, CIUDAD LA, LLC, BORDER GRILL TRUCK AND CATERING, LLC, BG SM20, FEEDFOLKS, LLC, BORDER GRILL LAS VEGAS, LLC, MUNDO MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC, TEXANS FOR RESPONSIBLE GOVERNMENT and DADE PHELAN, Texas Speaker of the House
Intervenor: CHUCK WINDER, in his official capacity as President Pro Tempore of the Idaho State Senate, SCOTT BEDKE, in his offical capacity as Speaker of the House of Representatives of the State of Idaho, SIXTY-SIXTH IDAHO LEGISLATURE, JOSE A. PEREZ and NANCY C. PEREZ
Case Number: 21-7000
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 407 REPLY filed by Mr. Aaron Abadi in 21-7000, 21-4133 regarding emergency motion to stay, [6726695]. [21-7000, 21-4133] (LTK) [Entered: 12/28/2021 08:30 AM]
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 406 RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion to stay agency judgment, [ # 404 ]; previously filed by Mr. Aaron Abadi in 21-7000, 21-4133. Response from Attorney Mr. Brian James Springer for Respondents Joseph R. Biden, James Frederick, OSHA, Douglas L. Parker, USA and Martin J. Walsh in 21-7000, Attorney Mr. Brian James Springer for Respondent OSHA in 21-4133. Certificate of Service: 12/27/2021. [21-7000, 21-4133] (BJS) [Entered: 12/27/2021 09:10 PM]
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 405 NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. Matthew James Clark for Fabarc Steel Supply, Inc. and Tony Pugh in 21-7000, 21-4102 regarding Emergency application for administrative stay and stay pending judicial review or, alternatively, petition for writ of certiorari before judgment and request for stay filed with U.S. Supreme Court. Certificate of Service: 12/21/2021. [21-7000, 21-4102] (MJC) [Entered: 12/21/2021 09:32 PM]
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 404 Emergency Petitioner MOTION filed by Mr. Aaron Abadi in 21-7000, 21-4133 for stay pending review. Certificate of Service:12/20/2021. [21-7000, 21-4133] (LTK) [Entered: 12/21/2021 01:44 PM]
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 403 APPEARANCE filed for Respondents Joseph R. Biden, OSHA, Douglas L. Parker, USA and Martin J. Walsh in 21-7000, Respondents OSHA, Douglas L. Parker and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4149, Respondent OSHA in 21-4152, 21-4157 by Adam C. Jed. Certificate of Service: 12/20/2021. [21-7000, 21-4149, 21-4152, 21-4157] (ACJ) [Entered: 12/20/2021 11:42 PM]
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 402 NOTIFICATION filed by Ms. Harmeet Dhillon for Bentkey Services, LLC in 21-7000, 21-4027 regarding Notification of Filing of Emergency Application in Supreme Court of the United States. Certificate of Service: 12/20/2021. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117, 21-4133, 21-4149, 21-4152, 21-4157] (HD) [Entered: 12/20/2021 09:57 PM]
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 401 LETTER filed by Mr. Michael Eugene Toner for RNC in 21-7000, 21-4082 regarding Notice of Emergency Application for Stay filed with United States Supreme Court Certificate of Service: 12/20/2021. [21-7000, 21-4082] (MET) [Entered: 12/20/2021 04:01 PM]
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 400 NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. William G. Myers, III for Scott Bedke, Sixty-Sixth Idaho Legislature and Chuck Winder in 21-7000, 21-4157 regarding Notification of Emergency Application filed in U.S. Supreme Court. Certificate of Service: 12/20/2021. [21-7000, 21-4157]--[Edited 12/20/2021 by LTK] (WGM) [Entered: 12/20/2021 03:39 PM]
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 399 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner SD in 21-7000, 21-4088 by David M. McVey. Certificate of Service: 12/20/2021. [21-7000, 21-4088] (DMM) [Entered: 12/20/2021 03:26 PM]
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 398 NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. James Larry Stine for Associated Builders and Contractors of Alabama, Inc., Associated Builders and Contractors, Inc. and Independent Electrical Contractors - FWCC, Inc. in 21-7000, 21-4083 regarding Notification of Filing Emergency Application for Immediate Stay of Agency Action Pending Disposition of Petition. Certificate of Service: 12/20/2021. [21-7000, 21-4083]--[Edited 12/20/2021 by LTK] (JLS) [Entered: 12/20/2021 12:19 PM]
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ****LOCKED - INCOMPLETE FILING. SEE [ # 398 ]**** NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. James Larry Stine for Associated Builders and Contractors of Alabama, Inc., Associated Builders and Contractors, Inc. and Independent Electrical Contractors - FWCC, Inc. in 21-7000, 21-4083 regarding Notification of Filing of Emergency Application for Immediate Stay of Agency Action Pending Dispositon of Petition. Certificate of Service: 12/20/2021. [21-7000, 21-4083]--[Edited 12/20/2021 by LTK] (JLS) [Entered: 12/20/2021 12:13 PM]
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 396 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner Scotch Plywood Company, Inc. in 21-7000, 21-4097 by Edward Tatum Turner. Certificate of Service: 12/20/2021. [21-7000, 21-4097] (ETT) [Entered: 12/20/2021 11:04 AM]
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ****LOCKED - INCORRECT CASE # ON PLEADING AND CASE ASSOCITION. FILER NOTIFIED TO REFILE**** APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner SD in 21-7000, 21-4088 by David M. McVey. Certificate of Service: 12/20/2021. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117, 21-4133, 21-4149, 21-4152, 21-4157]--[Edited 12/20/2021 by LTK] (DMM) [Entered: 12/20/2021 11:03 AM]
December 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 394 NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. Jeffrey Carl Mateer for American Family Association, Inc., Answers in Genesis, Inc. and Word of God Fellowship, Inc. in 21-7000, Mr. Jeffrey Carl Mateer for Answers in Genesis, Inc. in 21-4032, Mr. Jeffrey Carl Mateer for American Family Association, Inc. and Word of God Fellowship, Inc. in 21-4080 regarding Emergency Application for Stay of Agency Standard Pending Disposition of Petition for Review and, in the alternative, Petition for Writ of Certiorari Before Judgment and Stay Pending Review. Certificate of Service: 12/18/2021. [21-7000, 21-4032, 21-4080] (JCM) [Entered: 12/19/2021 12:51 AM]
December 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 393 NOTIFICATION filed by Ms. Abigail Ann Southerland for Heritage Foundation in 21-7000, 21-4149 regarding Emergency Application for Stay and Petition for Writ of Certiorari Before Judgment. Certificate of Service: 12/18/2021. [21-7000, 21-4149] (AAS) [Entered: 12/18/2021 11:34 PM]
December 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 392 NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. Daniel Robert Suhr for BST Holdings, LLC, Ryan Dailey, Jasand Gamble, Christopher L. Jones, David John Loschen, Samuel Albert Reyna, RV Trosclair, LLC, Kip Stovall, Trosclair & Trosclair, Inc., Trosclair Airline, LLC, Trosclair Almonaster, LLC, Trosclair and Sons, LLC, Trosclair Carrollton, LLC, Trosclair Claiborne, LLC, Trosclair Donaldsonville, LLC, Trosclair Houma, LLC, Trosclair Judge Perez, LLC, Trosclair Lake Forest, LLC, Trosclair Morrison, LLC, Trosclair Paris, LLC, Trosclair Terry, LLC and Trosclair Williams, LLC in 21-7000, 21-4080, regarding Emergency Application for Stay filed with Supreme Court. Certificate of Service: 12/18/2021. [21-7000, 21-4080]--[Edited 12/18/2021 by LTK] (DRS) [Entered: 12/18/2021 04:27 AM]
December 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 391 NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. Benjamin Michael Flowers for all state petitioners in 21-7000 regarding Emergency Stay Application and Petition for a Writ of Certiorari before judgment. Certificate of Service: 12/18/2021. [21-7000, 21-4031]--[Edited 12/18/2021 by LTK] (BMF) [Entered: 12/18/2021 01:00 AM]
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 390 LETTER filed by Mr. John J. Bursch for Southern Baptist Theological Seminary and Asbury Theological Seminary in 21-4033, Mr. John J. Bursch for King's Academy and Cambridge Christian School, Inc. in 21-4097, Mr. John J. Bursch for Christian Employers Alliance, Sioux Falls Catholic Schools and Home School Legal Defense Association, Inc. in 21-4088 regarding application for stay and petition for a writ of cert before judgment filed with the Supreme Court of the United States Certificate of Service: 12/17/2021. [21-7000, 21-4033, 21-4097, 21-4088] (JJB) [Entered: 12/17/2021 11:26 PM]
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 389 LETTER filed by Mr. Patrick Strawbridge for Oberg Industries, LLC, Phillips Manufacturing & Tower Company and Sixarp, LLC in 21-7000, Mr. Patrick Strawbridge for Phillips Manufacturing & Tower Company and Sixarp, LLC in 21-4028 regarding notice of application for stay filed with Supreme Court of the United States Certificate of Service: 12/17/2021. [21-7000, 21-4028] (PS) [Entered: 12/17/2021 09:08 PM]
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 388 NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. Steven Paul Lehotsky for Texas Trucking Association, Mississippi Trucking Association, Louisiana Motor Transport Association, American Trucking Associations, Inc., National Federation of Independent Business, National Retail Federation, FMI - The Food Industry Association, National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Wholesaler-Distributors, International Warehouse & Logistics Association and International Foodservice Distributors Association in 21-7000, 21-4080, Mr. Steven Paul Lehotsky for Kentucky Petroleum Marketers Association, Kentucky Trucking Association, Michigan Association of Convenience Stores, Michigan Petroleum Association, MRA, Michigan Trucking Association, Ohio Grocers Association, Ohio Trucking Association, Tennessee Chamber of Commerce and Industry, Tennessee Grocers and Convenience Store Association, Tennessee Manufacturers Association, Tennessee Trucking Association, National Propane Gas Association, American Bakers Association and Brick Industry Association in 21-7000, 21-4117 regarding Twenty-Six Business Association Petitioners Notification of Filing of Emergency Application to the Supreme Court of the United States for Immediate Stay of Agency Action Pending Disposition of Petition for Review. Certificate of Service: 12/17/2021. ***Entry modified by Clerks Office to remove erroneous case associations by filer. Entry removed from case numbers 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4133, 21-4149, 21-4152, 21-4157.*** [21-7000, 21-4080, 21-4117]--[Edited 12/18/2021 by LTK] (SPL) [Entered: 12/17/2021 08:52 PM]
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 387 LETTER filed by Mr. R. Trent McCotter for Guy Chemical Company, LLC, Independent Bakers Association, Job Creators Network, Lawrence Transportation Company, Terri Mitchell, Pan-O-Gold Baking Company, Rabine Group of Companies and Waterblasting, LLC in 21-7000, 21-4093 regarding NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR STAY FILED WITH SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES Certificate of Service: 12/17/2021. [21-7000, 21-4093]--[Edited 12/18/2021 by LTK] (RTM) [Entered: 12/17/2021 08:13 PM]
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 386 NON-DISPOSITIVE, PUBLISHED OPINION filed: The government's motion to dissolve the administrative stay [ # 69 ] is GRANTED. Decision for publication. Julia Smith Gibbons (CONCURRING), Jane Branstetter Stranch (AUTHORING), and Joan L. Larsen (DISSENTING), Circuit Judges. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117, 21-4133, 21-4149, 21-4152, 21-4157] (CL) [Entered: 12/17/2021 06:50 PM]
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 385 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner MS in 21-7000 by Scott G. Stewart. Certificate of Service: 12/17/2021. [21-7000, 21-4080] (SGS) [Entered: 12/17/2021 03:29 PM]
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 384 REPLY filed by Mr. Benjamin Michael Flowers for OH in 21-7000, 21-4031 regarding motion to compel production of a complete administrative record Certificate of Service: 12/17/2021. [21-7000, 21-4031] (BMF) [Entered: 12/17/2021 09:50 AM]
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 383 APPEARANCE filed for Respondents Joseph R. Biden, James Frederick, OSHA, Douglas L. Parker, USA and Martin J. Walsh in 21-7000, Respondents OSHA, Douglas L. Parker and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4149, Respondent OSHA in 21-4152, Respondents James Frederick, OSHA, Douglas L. Parker and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4157 by Martin Totaro. Certificate of Service: 12/16/2021. [21-7000, 21-4149, 21-4152, 21-4157] (MT) [Entered: 12/16/2021 03:39 PM]
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 382 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Matthew W. Murphy for Petitioner Doolittle Trailer Manufacturing, Inc. in 21-7000, 21-4088 Certificate of Service: 12/16/2021. [21-7000, 21-4088] (MWM) [Entered: 12/16/2021 02:49 PM]
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 381 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner Doolittle Trailer Manufacturing, Inc. in 21-7000, 21-4088 by Matthew W. Murphy. Certificate of Service: 12/16/2021. [21-7000, 21-4088] (MWM) [Entered: 12/16/2021 02:44 PM]
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 380 PUBLISHED, EN BANC ORDER filed DENYING the petitions for initial en banc hearing [ # 14 ] [ # 26 ] [ # 129 ] [ # 136 ] [ # 139 ] [ # 142 ]. Decision for publication. Jeffrey S. Sutton, Chief Judge (DISSENTING); Karen Nelson Moore (CONCURRING), R. Guy Cole, Jr., Eric L. Clay, Julia Smith Gibbons, Richard Allen Griffin, Raymond M. Kethledge, Helene N. White, Jane Branstetter Stranch, Bernice Bouie Donald, Amul R. Thapar, John K. Bush (DISSENTING), Joan L. Larsen, John B. Nalbandian,Chad A. Readler, and Eric E. Murphy, Circuit Judges. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117, 21-4133, 21-4149, 21-4152, 21-4157]--[Edited 12/15/2021 by CL]--[Edited 12/15/2021 by LTK] (CL) [Entered: 12/15/2021 12:31 PM]
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER filed granting motions to file amicus brief [ # 315 ] [ # 341 ] [ # 343 ]. . Entered by order of the court. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117, 21-4133, 21-4149, 21-4152, 21-4157] (JEC) [Entered: 12/14/2021 06:03 PM]
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 376 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner Tore Says LLC in 21-7000, 21-4115 by Russell A. Newman. Certificate of Service: 12/14/2021. [21-7000, 21-4115] (RAN) [Entered: 12/14/2021 03:34 PM]
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 375 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner Heritage Foundation in 21-7000, 21-4149 by Christina A. Stierhoff. Certificate of Service: 12/14/2021. [21-7000, 21-4149] (CS) [Entered: 12/14/2021 11:32 AM]
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 374 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioners BST Holdings, LLC, Trosclair & Trosclair, Inc., Trosclair Airline, LLC, Trosclair Almonaster, LLC, Trosclair and Sons, LLC, Trosclair Carrollton, LLC, Trosclair Claiborne, LLC, Trosclair Donaldsonville, LLC, Trosclair Houma, LLC, Trosclair Judge Perez, LLC, Trosclair Lake Forest, LLC, Trosclair Morrison, LLC, Trosclair Paris, LLC, Trosclair Terry, LLC, Trosclair Williams, LLC, RV Trosclair, LLC, Ryan Dailey, Jasand Gamble, Christopher L. Jones, David John Loschen, Samuel Albert Reyna and Kip Stovall in 21-7000, 21-4080 by Sarah Harbison. Certificate of Service: 12/14/2021. ***Entry modified by Clerks Office to remove erroneous case associations by filer. Entry removed from case numbers 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, , 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117, 21-4133, 21-4149, 21-4152, 21-4157.*** [21-7000, 21-4080] (SH) [Entered: 12/14/2021 11:27 AM]
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 373 REPLY filed by Mr. Brian James Springer for Joseph R. Biden, James Frederick, OSHA, Douglas L. Parker, USA and Martin J. Walsh in 21-7000 and all member cases, regarding emergency motion to dissolve stay Certificate of Service: 12/10/2021. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117, 21-4133, 21-4149, 21-4152, 21-4157]--[Edited 12/13/2021 by LTK] (BJS) [Entered: 12/10/2021 11:07 PM]
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 372 RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion to compel production, [ # 225 ]; previously filed by Mr. Benjamin Michael Flowers, regarding a motion for production, [ # 247 ]; previously filed by Mr. Robert Alt for Phillips Manufacturing & Tower Company and Sixarp, LLC. Response from Attorney Mr. Brian James Springer for Respondents Joseph R. Biden, James Frederick, OSHA, Douglas L. Parker, USA and Martin J. Walsh in 21-7000, et al. Certificate of Service: 12/10/2021. [21-7000, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4080, 21-4090, 21-4088, 21-4097]--[Edited 12/13/2021 by LTK] (BJS) [Entered: 12/10/2021 08:23 PM]
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 371 REPLY filed by Ms. Randy Sue Rabinowitz for American Federation of Labor-Congress of Industrial Organizations and United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, AFL/CIO-CLC in 21-7000, 21-4094, regarding Opposition to Respondents' Emergency Motion to Dissolve Stay Certificate of Service: 12/10/2021. [21-7000, 21-4084, 21-4089, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4099, 21-4103, 21-4152, 21-4087, 21-4085]--[Edited 12/13/2021 by LTK] (RSR) [Entered: 12/10/2021 03:23 PM]
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 370 APPEARANCE filed for Respondents Joseph R. Biden, James Frederick, OSHA, Douglas L. Parker, USA and Martin J. Walsh in 21-7000, Respondent OSHA in 21-4133, Respondents OSHA, Douglas L. Parker and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4149, 21-4152, Respondents James Frederick, OSHA, Douglas L. Parker and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4157 by Brian J. Springer. Certificate of Service: 12/10/2021. [21-7000, 21-4133, 21-4149, 21-4152, 21-4157] (BJS) [Entered: 12/10/2021 12:45 PM]
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 369 PETITIONER BRIEF filed by Mr. William G. Myers, III for Scott Bedke, Sixty-Sixth Idaho Legislature and Chuck Winder in 21-7000, Mr. William G. Myers, III for Scott Bedke, Chuck Winder and Sixty-Sixth Idaho Legislature in 21-4157.. Certificate of Service: 12/09/2021. Argument Request: not requested. [21-7000, 21-4157] (WGM) [Entered: 12/09/2021 07:29 PM]
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 368 MOTION filed by Mr. William G. Myers, III for Scott Bedke, Sixty-Sixth Idaho Legislature and Chuck Winder in 21-7000, Mr. William G. Myers, III for Scott Bedke, Chuck Winder and Sixty-Sixth Idaho Legislature in 21-4157 to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 12/09/2021. [21-7000, 21-4157] (WGM) [Entered: 12/09/2021 07:19 PM]
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 367 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for Amici Curiae Texans for Responsible Government and Dade Phelan in 21-7000, 21-4080 by David J. Beck. Certificate of Service: 12/09/2021. [21-7000, 21-4080] (DJB) [Entered: 12/09/2021 04:56 PM]
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 366 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner KS in 21-7000, 21-4031 by Shannon Grammel. Certificate of Service: 12/09/2021. [21-7000, 21-4031] (SMG) [Entered: 12/09/2021 02:58 PM]
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 365 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner OH by Sylvia May Davis. Certificate of Service: 12/09/2021. [21-7000] (SMD) [Entered: 12/09/2021 02:08 PM]
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 364 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner KY in 21-7000, 21-4031 by Christopher L. Thacker. Certificate of Service: 12/09/2021. **Entry has been modified to remove all case numbers to which the filing was erroneously applied.** [21-7000, 21-4031] (CLT) [Entered: 12/09/2021 01:58 PM]
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 363 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. William G. Myers, III for Petitioners Scott Bedke, Sixty-Sixth Idaho Legislature and Chuck Winder in 21-4157, Attorney Mr. William G. Myers, III for Petitioners Scott Bedke, Chuck Winder and Sixty-Sixth Idaho Legislature in 21-7000 Certificate of Service: 12/08/2021. [21-4157, 21-7000] (WGM) [Entered: 12/08/2021 06:00 PM]
November 26, 2021 Filing 146 CERTIFIED LIST filed. Certificate of Service: 11/26/2021. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117] (BJS) [Entered: 11/26/2021 08:17 PM]
November 26, 2021 Filing 145 RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion for miscellaneous relief, [ # 131 ]; previously filed by Mr. Brian James Springer for OSHA, Martin J. Walsh, Douglas L. Parker, James Frederick, Joseph R. Biden and USA in 21-7000. Response from Attorney Mr. Steven Paul Lehotsky for Petitioners American Trucking Associations, Inc., FMI - The Food Industry Association, International Foodservice Distributors Association, International Warehouse & Logistics Association, Louisiana Motor Transport Association, Mississippi Trucking Association, National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Wholesaler-Distributors, National Federation of Independent Business, National Retail Federation and Texas Trucking Association in 21-4080, Attorney Mr. Steven Paul Lehotsky for Petitioners Texas Trucking Association, Mississippi Trucking Association, Louisiana Motor Transport Association, American Trucking Associations, Inc., National Federation of Independent Business, National Retail Federation, FMI - The Food Industry Association, National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Wholesaler-Distributors, International Warehouse & Logistics Association, International Foodservice Distributors Association, Kentucky Petroleum Marketers Association, Kentucky Trucking Association, Michigan Association of Convenience Stores, Michigan Petroleum Association, MRA, Michigan Trucking Association, Ohio Grocers Association, Ohio Trucking Association, Tennessee Chamber of Commerce and Industry, Tennessee Grocers and Convenience Store Association, Tennessee Manufacturers Association, Tennessee Trucking Association, National Propane Gas Association, American Bakers Association and Brick Industry Association in 21-7000, Attorney Mr. Steven Paul Lehotsky for Petitioners Kentucky Petroleum Marketers Association, Kentucky Trucking Association, Michigan Association of Convenience Stores, Michigan Petroleum Association, MRA, Michigan Trucking Association, Ohio Grocers Association, Ohio Trucking Association, Tennessee Chamber of Commerce and Industry, Tennessee Grocers and Convenience Store Association, Tennessee Manufacturers Association, Tennessee Trucking Association, National Propane Gas Association, American Bakers Association and Brick Industry Association in 21-4117. Certificate of Service: 11/26/2021. [21-4080, 21-7000, 21-4117] (SPL) [Entered: 11/26/2021 03:57 PM]
November 26, 2021 Filing 144 RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion for miscellaneous relief, [ # 131 ]; previously filed by Mr. Brian James Springer for OSHA, James Frederick, Douglas L. Parker, Martin J. Walsh, Joseph R. Biden and USA in 21-7000, Mr. Brian James Springer for OSHA, Douglas L. Parker, James Frederick and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4031. Response from Attorney Mr. Benjamin Michael Flowers for Petitioner OH in 21-7000, 21-4031. Certificate of Service: 11/26/2021. [21-7000, 21-4031] (BMF) [Entered: 11/26/2021 03:54 PM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 143 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioners DTN Staffing, Inc., Jamie Fleck, Sadie Haws, Corey Hager, Aaron Janz, Wendi Johnston, Miller Insulation Company, Inc., Brad Miller, Julio Hernandez Ortiz and Sheriff Sharma in 21-7000 by Kris W. Kobach. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117] (KWK) [Entered: 11/24/2021 09:37 PM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 142 PETITION for initial en banc hearing filed by Mr. James Patrick Sullivan for Greg Abbott in 21-7000, 21-4080. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4080] (JPS) [Entered: 11/24/2021 06:27 PM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 140 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner Greg Abbott in 21-7000, 21-4080 by James Patrick Sullivan. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4080] (JPS) [Entered: 11/24/2021 06:22 PM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 139 PETITION for initial en banc hearing filed by Mr. Christopher David Wiest for Betten Chevrolet, Inc. in 21-4114, 21-7000. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-4114, 21-7000] (CDW) [Entered: 11/24/2021 06:15 PM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 138 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner IA in 21-7000, 21-4088 by Samuel P. Langholz. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4088] (SPL) [Entered: 11/24/2021 05:49 PM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 137 STANDING ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION filed: The November 21, 2021 Initial Case Management Order consolidates specifically stated cases into this lead case, designated as Case No. 21-7000, and with each other. Any additional original petition this Court receives or any additional transferred petition from another circuit in this litigation is hereby ORDERED to be consolidated with the existing actions immediately upon opening by the Clerks Office. This order is issued nunc pro tunc to November 21, 2021. Entered by order of the court. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117] (LTK) [Entered: 11/24/2021 04:56 PM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 136 PETITION for initial en banc hearing filed by Mr. Russell A. Newman for Tore Says LLC in 21-7000, 21-4115. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4115] (RAN) [Entered: 11/24/2021 04:50 PM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 135 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner ND in 21-7000, 21-4088 by Matthew Sagsveen. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4088] (MAS) [Entered: 11/24/2021 04:26 PM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 134 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Ryan Bangert for Petitioners Asbury Theological Seminary, Bentkey Services, LLC, Christian Employers Alliance, Home School Legal Defense Association, Inc., Sioux Falls Catholic Schools and Southern Baptist Theological Seminary in 21-7000, Attorney Mr. Ryan Bangert for Petitioners Southern Baptist Theological Seminary and Asbury Theological Seminary in 21-4033, Attorney Mr. Ryan Bangert for Petitioners Christian Employers Alliance, Sioux Falls Catholic Schools and Home School Legal Defense Association, Inc. in 21-4088 Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4033, 21-4088, 21-4097] (RB) [Entered: 11/24/2021 04:19 PM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 133 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner AK in 21-4088, 21-7000 by Charles Edmond Brasington. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-4088, 21-7000] (CEB) [Entered: 11/24/2021 04:16 PM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 132 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioners American Federation of Labor-Congress of Industrial Organizations and United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, AFL/CIO-CLC in 21-7000, 21-4094 by Randy Rabinowitz. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4094] (RSR) [Entered: 11/24/2021 04:12 PM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 131 MOTION filed by Mr. Brian James Springer for Joseph R. Biden, James Frederick, OSHA, Douglas L. Parker, USA and Martin J. Walsh in 21-7000, Mr. Brian James Springer for OSHA in 21-4027, Mr. Brian James Springer for OSHA, Martin J. Walsh and Douglas L. Parker in 21-4028, Mr. Brian James Springer for OSHA, Douglas L. Parker, James Frederick and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4031, 21-4032, Mr. Brian James Springer for OSHA, Douglas L. Parker and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4033, Mr. Brian James Springer for Joseph R. Biden, USA, Douglas L. Parker, OSHA and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4088 for to amend schedule for stay briefing and to set schedule for merits briefing Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117] (BJS) [Entered: 11/24/2021 04:05 PM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 130 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Steven Paul Lehotsky for Petitioners American Bakers Association, Brick Industry Association, Kentucky Petroleum Marketers Association, Kentucky Trucking Association, Michigan Association of Convenience Stores, Michigan Petroleum Association, MRA, Michigan Trucking Association, National Propane Gas Association, Ohio Grocers Association, Ohio Trucking Association, Tennessee Chamber of Commerce and Industry, Tennessee Grocers and Convenience Store Association, Tennessee Manufacturers Association and Tennessee Trucking Association in 21-4117, Attorney Mr. Steven Paul Lehotsky for Petitioners Texas Trucking Association, Mississippi Trucking Association, Louisiana Motor Transport Association, American Trucking Associations, Inc., National Federation of Independent Business, National Retail Federation, FMI - The Food Industry Association, National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Wholesaler-Distributors, International Warehouse & Logistics Association, International Foodservice Distributors Association, Kentucky Petroleum Marketers Association, Kentucky Trucking Association, Michigan Association of Convenience Stores, Michigan Petroleum Association, MRA, Michigan Trucking Association, Ohio Grocers Association, Ohio Trucking Association, Tennessee Chamber of Commerce and Industry, Tennessee Grocers and Convenience Store Association, Tennessee Manufacturers Association, Tennessee Trucking Association, National Propane Gas Association, American Bakers Association and Brick Industry Association in 21-7000 Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-4117, 21-7000] (SPL) [Entered: 11/24/2021 03:33 PM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 129 PETITION for initial en banc hearing filed by Mr. Richard J. Oparil for Natural Products Association in 21-7000, 21-4108. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4108] (RJO) [Entered: 11/24/2021 03:24 PM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 128 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner NE in 21-7000, 21-4088 by James A. Campbell. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4088] (JAC) [Entered: 11/24/2021 02:45 PM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 127 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner FL in 21-7000, 21-4097 by Henry C. Whitaker. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4097] (HCW) [Entered: 11/24/2021 01:05 PM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 126 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. James Larry Stine for Petitioners Associated Builders and Contractors of Alabama, Inc. and Associated Builders and Contractors, Inc. in 21-7000, Attorney Mr. James Larry Stine for Petitioners Associated Builders and Contractors, Inc. and Associated Builders and Contractors of Alabama, Inc. in 21-4083 Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4083] (JLS) [Entered: 11/24/2021 12:50 PM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 125 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Richard J. Oparil for Petitioner Natural Products Association in 21-7000, 21-4108 Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4108] (RJO) [Entered: 11/24/2021 12:41 PM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 124 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner Natural Products Association in 21-7000, 21-4108 by Richard J. Oparil. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4108] (RJO) [Entered: 11/24/2021 12:37 PM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 123 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner OK in 21-7000, 21-4031 by Mithun Mansinghani. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4031] (MM) [Entered: 11/24/2021 12:37 PM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 122 FILED: Joinder in petitions for initial hearing en banc by Mr. Ryan Bangert for Asbury Theological Seminary, Bentkey Services, LLC, Christian Employers Alliance, Home School Legal Defense Association, Inc., Sioux Falls Catholic Schools and Southern Baptist Theological Seminary in 21-7000, Mr. Ryan Bangert for Christian Employers Alliance, Sioux Falls Catholic Schools and Home School Legal Defense Association, Inc. in 21-4088. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4088, 21-4097] (RB) [Entered: 11/24/2021 12:00 PM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 121 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner MS in 21-7000, 21-4080 by John V. Coghlan. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4080] (JVC) [Entered: 11/24/2021 11:52 AM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 120 FILED: Joinder in Petitions for Initial Hearing En Banc by Mr. Matthew James Clark for Fabarc Steel Supply, Inc. and Tony Pugh in 21-7000, 21-4102. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4102] (MJC) [Entered: 11/24/2021 11:49 AM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 119 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Matthew James Clark for Petitioners Fabarc Steel Supply, Inc. and Tony Pugh in 21-7000, 21-4102 Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4102] (MJC) [Entered: 11/24/2021 11:43 AM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 118 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioners Fabarc Steel Supply, Inc. and Tony Pugh in 21-7000, 21-4102 by Matthew J. Clark. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4102] (MJC) [Entered: 11/24/2021 11:40 AM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 117 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioners Texas Trucking Association, Louisiana Motor Transport Association, Mississippi Trucking Association, American Trucking Associations, Inc., National Federation of Independent Business, National Association of Wholesaler-Distributors, International Warehouse & Logistics Association, International Foodservice Distributors Association, FMI - The Food Industry Association, National Association of Convenience Stores and National Retail Federation in 21-4080, 21-7000 by Scott A. Keller. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-4080, 21-7000] (SAK) [Entered: 11/24/2021 11:39 AM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 116 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioners Kentucky Petroleum Marketers Association, Kentucky Trucking Association, Michigan Association of Convenience Stores, Michigan Petroleum Association, Michigan Trucking Association, Ohio Grocers Association, Ohio Trucking Association, Tennessee Chamber of Commerce and Industry, Tennessee Grocers and Convenience Store Association, Tennessee Manufacturers Association, Tennessee Trucking Association, National Propane Gas Association, American Bakers Association and Brick Industry Association in 21-4117, 21-7000 by Scott A. Keller. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-4117, 21-7000] (SAK) [Entered: 11/24/2021 11:31 AM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 115 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner FL in 21-7000, 21-4097 by Jason H. Hilborn. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4097] (JHH) [Entered: 11/24/2021 11:13 AM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 114 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner OH in 21-7000, 21-4031 by Benjamin M. Flowers. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4031] (BMF) [Entered: 11/24/2021 11:11 AM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 113 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner Service Employees International Union Local 32BJ in 21-7000, 21-4095 by Nicole Berner. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117] (NGB) [Entered: 11/24/2021 10:27 AM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 112 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner AZ in 21-7000, 21-4088 by Drew C. Ensign. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117] (DCE) [Entered: 11/24/2021 10:21 AM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 111 FILED: Joinder in Petitions for Initial Hearing En Banc by Mr. Robert Henneke for Burnett Specialists, Choice Staffing, LLC, HT Staffing, Ltd., LeadingEdge Personnel Services, Ltd. and Staff Force, Inc. in 21-7000. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117] (RH) [Entered: 11/24/2021 10:20 AM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 110 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner IN in 21-7000, 21-4090 by Thomas M. Fisher. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4090] (TMF) [Entered: 11/24/2021 10:14 AM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 109 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Steven Paul Lehotsky for Petitioners American Bakers Association, American Trucking Associations, Inc., Brick Industry Association, FMI - The Food Industry Association, International Foodservice Distributors Association, International Warehouse & Logistics Association, Kentucky Petroleum Marketers Association, Kentucky Trucking Association, Louisiana Motor Transport Association, Michigan Association of Convenience Stores, Michigan Petroleum Association, MRA, Michigan Trucking Association, Mississippi Trucking Association, National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Wholesaler-Distributors, National Federation of Independent Business, National Propane Gas Association, National Retail Federation, Ohio Grocers Association, Ohio Trucking Association, Tennessee Chamber of Commerce and Industry, Tennessee Grocers and Convenience Store Association, Tennessee Manufacturers Association, Tennessee Trucking Association and Texas Trucking Association in 21-7000, Attorney Mr. Steven Paul Lehotsky for Petitioners Texas Trucking Association, Mississippi Trucking Association, Louisiana Motor Transport Association, American Trucking Associations, Inc., National Federation of Independent Business, National Retail Federation, FMI - The Food Industry Association, National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Wholesaler-Distributors, International Warehouse & Logistics Association and International Foodservice Distributors Association in 21-4080 Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4080] (SPL) [Entered: 11/24/2021 09:56 AM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 108 APPEARANCE filed for Respondents Joseph R. Biden, OSHA, Douglas L. Parker, USA, Martin J. Walsh and James Frederick in 21-7000, Respondent OSHA in 21-4108, Respondents OSHA, Douglas L. Parker and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4112, Respondents OSHA and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117 by Brian J. Springer. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117] (BJS) [Entered: 11/24/2021 09:51 AM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 107 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner IN in 21-7000, 21-4090 by Thomas M. Fisher. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4090] (TMF) [Entered: 11/24/2021 09:28 AM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 106 APPEARANCE filed for Respondents Joseph R. Biden, James Frederick, OSHA, Douglas L. Parker, USA and Martin J. Walsh in 21-7000, Respondent OSHA in 21-4108, Respondents OSHA, Douglas L. Parker and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4112, Respondents OSHA and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117 by Martin Totaro. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117] (MT) [Entered: 11/24/2021 08:53 AM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 105 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for Small Business Association of Michigan by Steven R. Eatherly. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-7000] (SRE) [Entered: 11/24/2021 08:46 AM]
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 SCHEDULING ORDER refiled: As of the filing of this Order, OSHA has filed in this consolidated proceeding, No. 21-7000, an Emergency Motion To Dissolve Stay, which stay was granted by the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals and consolidated herein. Any party wishing to join in this motion or to file, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2112(a)(4), a motion to modify, revoke, or extend the stay may do so no later than Tuesday, November 30, 2021, by the method prescribed in the Initial Case Management Order. Any responses thereto may be filed no later than Tuesday, December 7, 2021, and any replies may be filed no later than Friday, December 10, 2021. Entered by order of the court. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117] (LTK) [Entered: 11/24/2021 06:23 PM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 103 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for Constitutional Accountability Center by Brianne J. Gorod. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117] (BJG) [Entered: 11/23/2021 06:51 PM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 102 AMICUS BRIEF filed by AMA in 21-7000, 21-4031, 21-4080, 21-4090 , without parties' consent. Certificate of Service:11/23/2021. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103] (RF) [Entered: 11/23/2021 06:45 PM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 101 MOTION to file AMICUS BRIEF filed by Rachel L. Fried for American Medical Association. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103] (RF) [Entered: 11/23/2021 06:43 PM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 100 MOTION to file AMICUS BRIEF filed by Brianne J. Gorod for Constitutional Accountability Center. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117] (BJG) [Entered: 11/23/2021 06:25 PM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 99 MOTION to hold in abeyance the Government's emergency motion to dissolve stay filed by Mr. Ryan Bangert for Asbury Theological Seminary, Bentkey Services, LLC, Christian Employers Alliance, Home School Legal Defense Association, Inc., Sioux Falls Catholic Schools and Southern Baptist Theological Seminary in 21-7000, Mr. Ryan Bangert for Bentkey Services, LLC in 21-4027, Mr. Ryan Bangert for Southern Baptist Theological Seminary and Asbury Theological Seminary in 21-4033, Mr. Ryan Bangert for Christian Employers Alliance, Sioux Falls Catholic Schools and Home School Legal Defense Association, Inc. in 21-4088. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4088, 21-4097]--[Edited 11/24/2021 by ACB] (RB) [Entered: 11/23/2021 06:17 PM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 98 RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding Governments' emergency motion to dissolve stay, [ # 69 ]; previously filed by Mr. Brian James Springer for OSHA, James Frederick, Douglas L. Parker, Martin J. Walsh, Joseph R. Biden and USA in 21-7000. Response from Attorney Mr. R. Trent McCotter for Petitioners Guy Chemical Company, LLC, Independent Bakers Association, Job Creators Network, Lawrence Transportation Company, Terri Mitchell, Pan-O-Gold Baking Company, Rabine Group of Companies, Waterblasting, LLC and Waterblasting, LLC in 21-7000, Attorney Mr. R. Trent McCotter for Petitioners Job Creators Network, Independent Bakers Association, Lawrence Transportation Company, Guy Chemical Company, LLC, Rabine Group of Companies, Pan-O-Gold Baking Company, Terri Mitchell and Waterblasting, LLC in 21-4093. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-7000, 21-4093] --[Edited 11/24/2021 by AEG] (RTM) [Entered: 11/23/2021 06:09 PM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 97 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioners Cambridge Christian School, Inc. and King's Academy in 21-7000, 21-4097 by Ryan Bangert. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-7000, 21-4097] (RB) [Entered: 11/23/2021 04:44 PM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 96 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioners BST Holdings, LLC, RV Trosclair, LLC, Trosclair & Trosclair, Inc., Trosclair Airline, LLC, Trosclair Almonaster, LLC, Trosclair and Sons, LLC, Trosclair Carrollton, LLC, Trosclair Claiborne, LLC, Trosclair Donaldsonville, LLC, Trosclair Houma, LLC, Trosclair Judge Perez, LLC, Trosclair Lake Forest, LLC, Trosclair Morrison, LLC, Trosclair Paris, LLC, Trosclair Terry, LLC, Trosclair Williams, LLC, Ryan Dailey, Jasand Gamble, Christopher L. Jones, David John Loschen, Samuel Albert Reyna and Kip Stovall in 21-7000, 21-4080 by M.E. Buck Dougherty III. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-7000, 21-4080] (BD) [Entered: 11/23/2021 03:55 PM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 95 MOTION filed by Mr. Robert Henneke for Burnett Specialists, Choice Staffing, LLC, HT Staffing, Ltd., LeadingEdge Personnel Services, Ltd. and Staff Force, Inc. in 21-7000 to transfer proceedings to Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117] (RH) [Entered: 11/23/2021 03:37 PM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 94 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner SC in 21-7000 by Thomas T. Hydrick. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-4080, 21-7000] (TTH) [Entered: 11/23/2021 03:21 PM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 93 ****LOCKED - DUPLICATE FILING: SEE [ # 89 ]****AMICUS BRIEF filed by Small Business Association of Michigan Case: 21-7000 Document: 89 Filed: 11/23/2021 Page: 1 , with parties' consent. Certificate of Service:11/23/2021. [21-4031, 21-7000]--[Edited 11/25/2021 by LTK] (KTW) [Entered: 11/23/2021 03:19 PM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 92 ****LOCKED - DUPLICATE FILING: SEE [ # 88 ]****MOTION to file oversize amicus brief in support of emergency motion to stay emergency temporary standard filed by Kurtis T. Wilder for Small Business Association of Michigan. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-4031, 21-7000]--[Edited 11/24/2021 by LTK] (KTW) [Entered: 11/23/2021 03:17 PM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 91 ****LOCKED - DUPLICATE FILING: SEE [ # 87 ]****MOTION to file amicus brief in support of emergency motion to stay emergency temporary standard filed by Kurtis T. Wilder for Small Business Association of Michigan. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-4031, 21-7000]--[Edited 11/24/2021 by LTK] (KTW) [Entered: 11/23/2021 03:16 PM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 90 FILED: Joinder in Petitions for Initial Hearing En Banc by Ms. Cathleen A. Martin for Doyle Equipment Manufacturing Company, MFA Enterprises, Inc., MFA Oil Company, MFA, Inc., Missouri Farm Bureau Insurance Brokerage, Inc., Missouri Farm Bureau Services, Inc. and Riverview Manufacturing, Inc. in 21-7000, Ms. Cathleen A. Martin for MFA, Inc., MFA Enterprises, Inc., Missouri Farm Bureau Services, Inc., Missouri Farm Bureau Insurance Brokerage, Inc., MFA Oil Company, Doyle Equipment Manufacturing Company and Riverview Manufacturing, Inc. in 21-4096. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-7000, 21-4096] (CAM) [Entered: 11/23/2021 03:16 PM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 89 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Small Business Association of Michigan , with parties' consent. Certificate of Service:11/23/2021. [21-7000, 21-4031] (KTW) [Entered: 11/23/2021 02:52 PM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 88 MOTION to file oversize amicus brief in support of emergency motion to stay emergency temporary standard filed by Kurtis T. Wilder for Small Business Association of Michigan. . Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-7000, 21-4031]--[Edited 11/24/2021 by LTK] (KTW) [Entered: 11/23/2021 02:50 PM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 87 MOTION to file amicus brief in support of emergency motion to stay emergency temporary standard filed by Kurtis T. Wilder for Small Business Association of Michigan. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-7000, 21-4031]--[Edited 11/24/2021 by LTK] (KTW) [Entered: 11/23/2021 02:49 PM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 86 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Josh Belinfante for Petitioners Georgia Highway Contractors Association, Georgia Motor Trucking Association and Robinson Paving Co. in 21-7000, Attorney Mr. Josh Belinfante for Petitioners Georgia Highway Contractors Association and Georgia Motor Trucking Association in 21-4097 Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117] (JB) [Entered: 11/23/2021 02:42 PM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 85 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioners Georgia Highway Contractors Association, Georgia Motor Trucking Association and Robinson Paving Co. in 21-7000 by Josh Belinfante. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117] (JB) [Entered: 11/23/2021 02:40 PM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 84 ****LOCKED: PLEADING NOT ACCEPTED - INCORRECT CASE ASSOCIATION. FILER NOTIFIED TO REFILE ON LEAD AND ASSOCIATED MEMBER CASE ONLY****APPEARANCE filed for Petitioners Georgia Highway Contractors Association, Georgia Motor Trucking Association and Robinson Paving Co. in 21-7000 by Javier Pico Prats. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117]--[Edited 11/26/2021 by LTK] (JP) [Entered: 11/23/2021 02:36 PM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 83 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Robert Henneke for Petitioner Staff Force, Inc. in 21-4080, 21-7000. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. ****Modified by Clerk's office to remove erroneous case association by filer: Entry removed from case #s 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103**** [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117]--[Edited 11/26/2021 by LTK] (RH) [Entered: 11/23/2021 01:43 PM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 82 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Robert Henneke for Petitioner LeadingEdge Personnel Services, Ltd in 21-4080, 21-7000. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. ****Modified by Clerk's office to remove erroneous case association by filer: Entry removed from case #s 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103**** [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117]--[Edited 11/26/2021 by LTK] (RH) [Entered: 11/23/2021 01:41 PM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 81 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Robert Henneke for Petitioner HT Staffing, Ltd, in 21-4080, 21-7000. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. ****Modified by Clerk's office to remove erroneous case association by filer: Entry removed from case #s 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103**** [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117]--[Edited 11/26/2021 by LTK] (RH) [Entered: 11/23/2021 01:40 PM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 80 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Robert Henneke for Petitioner Choice Staffing, LLC in 21-4080, 21-7000 Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. ****Modified by Clerk's office to remove erroneous case association by filer: Entry removed from case #s 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103**** [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117, 21-4031]--[Edited 11/26/2021 by LTK] (RH) [Entered: 11/23/2021 01:39 PM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 79 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Robert Henneke for Petitioner Burnett Specialists, 21-7000, 21-4080. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. ****Modified by Clerk's office to remove erroneous case association by filer: Entry removed from case #s 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103**** [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117]--[Edited 11/26/2021 by LTK] (RH) [Entered: 11/23/2021 01:38 PM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 78 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for Small Business Association of Michigan by Kurtis T. Wilder. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117] (KTW) [Entered: 11/23/2021 01:13 PM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 77 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioners Cambridge Christian School, Inc. and King's Academy in 21-7000, 21-4097 by Matthew S. Bowman. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-7000, 21-4097] (MSB) [Entered: 11/23/2021 01:01 PM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 76 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Harmeet Dhillon for Petitioner Bentkey Services, LLC in 21-7000, 21-4027. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. ****Modified by Clerk's office to remove erroneous case association by filer: Entry removed from case #s 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103****[21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115, 21-4117]--[Edited 11/26/2021 by LTK] (HD) [Entered: 11/23/2021 12:59 PM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 75 APPEARANCE filed for Respondents Joseph R. Biden, James Frederick, OSHA, Douglas L. Parker, USA and Martin J. Walsh in 21-7000, Respondent OSHA in 21-4027, Respondents OSHA, Douglas L. Parker and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4028, Respondents James Frederick, OSHA, Douglas L. Parker and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, Respondents Joseph R. Biden, OSHA, Douglas L. Parker, USA and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, Respondents OSHA and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4114, 21-4115 by Adam C. Jed. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115] (ACJ) [Entered: 11/23/2021 11:00 AM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 74 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner Betten Chevrolet, Inc in 21-4114, 21-7000 by Christopher D Wiest. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-4114, 21-7000] (CDW) [Entered: 11/23/2021 10:54 AM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 73 ****LOCKED: PLEADING NOT ACCEPTED - INCORRECT CASE ASSOCIATION. FILER NOTIFIED TO REFILE ON LEAD AND ASSOCIATED MEMBER CASE ONLY****APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner WV by Lindsay S. See. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-7000]--[Edited 11/26/2021 by LTK] (LSS) [Entered: 11/23/2021 10:50 AM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 72 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for Small Business Association of Michigan by Joseph E. Richotte. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-7000, 21-4031] (JER) [Entered: 11/23/2021 10:43 AM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 71 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner GA in 21-7000, 21-4097 by Ross W. Bergethon. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021.****Modified by Clerk's office to remove erroneous case association by filer: Entry removed from case #s 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103**** [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112, 21-4114, 21-4115]--[Edited 11/25/2021 by LTK] (RWB) [Entered: 11/23/2021 10:40 AM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 70 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for Small Business Association of Michigan by Joseph E. Richotte. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-4031, 21-7000] (JER) [Entered: 11/23/2021 10:38 AM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 69 EMERGENCY MOTION filed by Mr. Brian James Springer for Joseph R. Biden, James Frederick, OSHA, Douglas L. Parker, USA and Martin J. Walsh in 21-7000, Mr. Brian James Springer for OSHA in 21-4027, Mr. Brian James Springer for OSHA, Martin J. Walsh and Douglas L. Parker in 21-4028, Mr. Brian James Springer for OSHA, Douglas L. Parker, James Frederick and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4031, 21-4032, Mr. Brian James Springer for OSHA, Douglas L. Parker and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4033, Mr. Brian James Springer for Joseph R. Biden, USA, Douglas L. Parker, OSHA and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4088 for emergency motion to dissolve stay Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112] (BJS) [Entered: 11/23/2021 09:51 AM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 68 MOTION filed by Mr. Brian James Springer for Joseph R. Biden, James Frederick, OSHA, Douglas L. Parker, USA and Martin J. Walsh in 21-7000, Mr. Brian James Springer for OSHA in 21-4027, Mr. Brian James Springer for OSHA, Martin J. Walsh and Douglas L. Parker in 21-4028, Mr. Brian James Springer for OSHA, Douglas L. Parker, James Frederick and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4031, 21-4032, Mr. Brian James Springer for OSHA, Douglas L. Parker and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4033, Mr. Brian James Springer for Joseph R. Biden, USA, Douglas L. Parker, OSHA and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4088 to file an overlength motion. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108, 21-4112] (BJS) [Entered: 11/23/2021 09:29 AM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 67 NOTICE OF DOCKETING ERROR, RE [65] - ENTRY LOCKED. Counsel kindly instructed to refile as two separate motions. Name of Document: Motion to file overlength motion and Emergency Motion to dissolve stay.. Type of Error: Wrong entry. Action taken: Attorney instructed to redocket entry correctly. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-4108]--[Edited 11/23/2021 by ACB] (ACB) [Entered: 11/23/2021 08:59 AM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 66 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioners Associated Builders and Contractors of Alabama, Inc. and Associated Builders and Contractors, Inc. in 21-7000, 21-4083 by Appearance of Counsel of J. Larry Stine for Associated Builders and Contractors, Inc., Associated Builders and Contractors of Alabama, Inc., Independent Electrical Contractors, Inc. and Independent Electrical Contractors-FWCC, Inc.. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-7000, 21-4083] (JLS) [Entered: 11/23/2021 08:27 AM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 65 ***DEFECTIVE ENTRY - LOCKED****MOTION filed by Mr. Brian James Springer for Joseph R. Biden, James Frederick, OSHA, Douglas L. Parker, USA and Martin J. Walsh in 21-7000, Mr. Brian James Springer for OSHA in 21-4027, Mr. Brian James Springer for OSHA, Martin J. Walsh and Douglas L. Parker in 21-4028, Mr. Brian James Springer for OSHA, Douglas L. Parker, James Frederick and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4031, 21-4032, Mr. Brian James Springer for OSHA, Douglas L. Parker and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4033, Mr. Brian James Springer for Joseph R. Biden, USA, Douglas L. Parker, OSHA and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4088 for leave to file an overlength emergency motion to dissolve stay Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103]--[Edited 11/23/2021 by ACB] (BJS) [Entered: 11/23/2021 02:28 AM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 64 FILED: Response in Opposition to Motion for Stay Pending Review Filed by Petitioners DTN Staffing et al. by Mr. Brian James Springer for Joseph R. Biden, James Frederick, OSHA, Douglas L. Parker, USA and Martin J. Walsh in 21-7000. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4101] (BJS) [Entered: 11/22/2021 11:34 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 63 APPEARANCE filed for Respondents Joseph R. Biden, James Frederick, OSHA, Douglas L. Parker, USA and Martin J. Walsh in 21-7000, Respondent OSHA in 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, Respondents Joseph R. Biden, OSHA, Douglas L. Parker, USA and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, Respondents OSHA, Douglas L. Parker and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4082 by Martin Totaro. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4082] (MT) [Entered: 11/22/2021 08:46 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 62 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner National Association of Home Builders in 21-7000, 21-4092 by Thomas J. Ward. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4092] (TJW) [Entered: 11/22/2021 07:17 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 61 APPEARANCE filed for Proposed Intervenors Scott Bedke, Sixty-Sixth Idaho Legislature and Chuck Winder in 21-7000, Intervenors Scott Bedke, Sixty-Sixth Idaho Legislature and Chuck Winder in 21-4031 by William G. Myers III. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4031] (WGM) [Entered: 11/22/2021 06:15 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 60 FILED: Joinder in the Petitions for Initial Hearing En Banc by Mr. Jeffrey Carl Mateer for American Family Association, Inc., Answers in Genesis, Inc. and Word of God Fellowship, Inc. in 21-7000, Mr. Jeffrey Carl Mateer for Answers in Genesis, Inc. in 21-4032, Mr. Jeffrey Carl Mateer for Answers in Genesis, Inc., American Family Association, Inc. and Word of God Fellowship, Inc. in 21-4080. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4032, 21-4080] (JCM) [Entered: 11/22/2021 06:00 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 59 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioners MFA Enterprises, Inc., MFA Oil Company, MFA, Inc., Missouri Farm Bureau Insurance Brokerage, Inc., Missouri Farm Bureau Services, Inc., Doyle Equipment Manufacturing Company and Riverview Manufacturing, Inc. in 21-7000, 21-4096 by John A. Ruth. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4096] (JAR) [Entered: 11/22/2021 05:52 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 58 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Cathleen A. Martin for Petitioners Doyle Equipment Manufacturing Company, MFA Enterprises, Inc., MFA Oil Company, MFA, Inc., Missouri Farm Bureau Insurance Brokerage, Inc., Missouri Farm Bureau Services, Inc. and Riverview Manufacturing, Inc. in 21-7000, Attorney Ms. Cathleen A. Martin for Petitioners MFA, Inc., MFA Enterprises, Inc., Missouri Farm Bureau Services, Inc., Missouri Farm Bureau Insurance Brokerage, Inc., MFA Oil Company, Doyle Equipment Manufacturing Company and Riverview Manufacturing, Inc. in 21-4096 Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4096] (CAM) [Entered: 11/22/2021 05:47 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 57 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioners MFA Enterprises, Inc., MFA Oil Company, MFA, Inc., Missouri Farm Bureau Services, Inc., Missouri Farm Bureau Insurance Brokerage, Inc., Doyle Equipment Manufacturing Company and Riverview Manufacturing, Inc. in 21-7000, 21-4096 by Cathleen A. Martin. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4096] (CAM) [Entered: 11/22/2021 05:33 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 56 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. David J Hacker for Petitioners American Family Association, Inc., Answers in Genesis, Inc. and Word of God Fellowship, Inc. in 21-7000 Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4080] (DJH) [Entered: 11/22/2021 05:27 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 55 ****LOCKED - INCORRECT PARTY ASSOCIATION: Refiled - see [ # 56 ]****CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Jeffrey Carl Mateer for Petitioners American Family Association, Inc., Answers in Genesis, Inc. and Word of God Fellowship, Inc. in 21-7000, 21-4080. [21-7000, 21-4080]--[Edited 11/23/2021 by LTK] (JCM) [Entered: 11/22/2021 05:17 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 54 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioners Christian Employers Alliance, Home School Legal Defense Association, Inc. and Sioux Falls Catholic Schools in 21-7000, 21-4088 by Ryan J. Tucker. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4088] (RJT) [Entered: 11/22/2021 05:11 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 53 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioners Home School Legal Defense Association, Inc., Sioux Falls Catholic Schools and Christian Employers Alliance in 21-7000, 21-4088 by Frank H. Chang. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4088] (FHC) [Entered: 11/22/2021 05:01 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 52 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioners American Family Association, Inc. and Word of God Fellowship, Inc. in 21-7000, 21-4080 by Keisha T. Russell. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4080] (KR) [Entered: 11/22/2021 04:45 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 51 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioners American Family Association, Inc. and Word of God Fellowship, Inc. in 21-7000, 21-4080 by Lea E. Patterson. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4080] (LP) [Entered: 11/22/2021 04:42 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 50 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioners American Family Association, Inc. and Word of God Fellowship, Inc. in 21-7000, 21-4080 by Jeremiah G. Dys. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4080] (JD) [Entered: 11/22/2021 04:37 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 49 NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. Benjamin Michael Flowers for OH in 21-7000, 21-4031 regarding signature permission. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4031] (BMF) [Entered: 11/22/2021 04:36 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 48 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioners American Family Association, Inc. and Word of God Fellowship, Inc. in 21-7000, 21-4080 by Hiram S. Sasser, III. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4080] (HSS) [Entered: 11/22/2021 04:28 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 47 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioners American Family Association, Inc. and Word of God Fellowship, Inc. in 21-7000, 21-4080 by DAVID J. HACKER. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4080] (DJH) [Entered: 11/22/2021 04:24 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 46 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioners American Family Association, Inc. and Word of God Fellowship, Inc. in 21-7000, 21-4080 by Jeffrey C. Mateer. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4080] (JCM) [Entered: 11/22/2021 04:20 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 45 APPEARANCE filed for Respondents Joseph R. Biden, James Frederick, OSHA, USA, Martin J. Walsh and Douglas L. Parker in 21-7000, Respondent OSHA in 21-4027, Respondents OSHA, Martin J. Walsh and Douglas L. Parker in 21-4028, Respondents James Frederick, OSHA, Martin J. Walsh and Douglas L. Parker in 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, Respondents Joseph R. Biden, OSHA, USA, Martin J. Walsh and Douglas L. Parker in 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103 by Sarah E. Harrington. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103] (SEH) [Entered: 11/22/2021 04:14 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 44 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner TN in 21-7000, 21-4031 by Brandon J. Smith. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4031] (BJS) [Entered: 11/22/2021 03:52 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 43 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Victoria Louise Bor for Petitioner Massachusetts Building Trades Council in 21-7000 Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4084] (VLB) [Entered: 11/22/2021 03:25 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 42 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner TN in 21-7000, 21-4031 by Brandon J. Smith. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4031] (CLH) [Entered: 11/22/2021 03:24 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 41 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner Massachusetts Building Trades Council in 21-7000, 21-4084 by Victoria L. Bor. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4084] (VLB) [Entered: 11/22/2021 03:23 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 40 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner TN in 21-7000, 21-4031 by Clark L. Hildabrand. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4031] (CLH) [Entered: 11/22/2021 03:02 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 39 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioners LeadingEdge Personnel Services, Ltd., Burnett Specialists, Choice Staffing, LLC, HT Staffing, Ltd. and Staff Force, Inc. in 21-7000, 21-4080 by Robert Henneke. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. ****Modified by Clerk's office to remove erroneous case association by filer: Entry removed from case #s 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103**** [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103]--[Edited 11/25/2021 by LTK] (RH) [Entered: 11/22/2021 02:45 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 38 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner UT in 21-7000, 21-4080 by Melissa A. Holyoak. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4080] (MAH) [Entered: 11/22/2021 02:02 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 37 APPEARANCE filed for Amicus Curiae AMA by JoAnn Kintz. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000] (JK) [Entered: 11/22/2021 01:49 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 36 APPEARANCE filed for Amicus Curiae AMA by Jessica Anne Morton. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000] (JAM) [Entered: 11/22/2021 01:48 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 35 The case manager for this case is now: Leon Korotko [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103] (KN) [Entered: 11/22/2021 01:48 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Keith R. Bolek for Petitioner United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipe Fitting Industry of the United States and Canada, AFL-CIO in 21-7000, 21-4089 Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4089] (KRB) [Entered: 11/22/2021 01:45 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 33 APPEARANCE filed for Amicus Curiae AMA by Jeffrey B. Dubner. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000] (JBD) [Entered: 11/22/2021 01:44 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Amy L. Rosenberger for Petitioner AFT Pennsylvania in 21-7000, 21-4099 Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4099] (ALR) [Entered: 11/22/2021 01:40 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 31 APPEARANCE filed for Amicus Curiae AMA by Rachel L. Fried. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000] (RF) [Entered: 11/22/2021 01:39 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 30 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner AFT Pennsylvania in 21-7000, 21-4099 by Amy L. Rosenberger. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4099] (ALR) [Entered: 11/22/2021 01:31 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Michael Eugene Toner for Petitioner RNC in 21-7000, 21-4082 Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4082] (MET) [Entered: 11/22/2021 01:14 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Daniel P. Lennington for Petitioners Plasticraft Corporation and Tankcraft Corporation in 21-7000 Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4091] (DPL) [Entered: 11/22/2021 01:03 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 27 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioners Plasticraft Corporation and Tankcraft Corporation in 21-7000, 21-4091 by Daniel P. Lennington. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4091] (DPL) [Entered: 11/22/2021 01:00 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 26 PETITION for initial en banc hearing filed by Mr. Michael Eugene Toner for RNC in 21-7000, 21-4082. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4082] (MET) [Entered: 11/22/2021 12:55 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 25 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner Bentkey Services, LLC in 21-7000, 21-4027 by Harmeet K. Dhillon. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. ****Modified by Clerk's office to remove erroneous case association by filer: Entry removed from case #s 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103**** [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103]--[Edited 11/25/2021 by LTK] (HD) [Entered: 11/22/2021 12:42 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 24 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner RNC in 21-7000, 21-4082 by Jeremy J. Broggi. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4082] (JJB) [Entered: 11/22/2021 12:40 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 23 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner Bentkey Services, LLC in 21-7000, 21-4027 by Mark P. Meuser. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. ****Modified by Clerk's office to remove erroneous case association by filer: Entry removed from case #s 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103**** [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103]--[Edited 11/25/2021 by LTK] (MPM) [Entered: 11/22/2021 12:39 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Felicia K. Watson for Petitioner National Association of Home Builders in 21-7000, 21-4092 Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4092] (FKW) [Entered: 11/22/2021 12:34 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 21 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner Bentkey Services, LLC in 21-7000, 21-4027 by Ronald D. Coleman. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. ****Modified by Clerk's office to remove erroneous case association by filer: Entry removed from case #s 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103**** [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103]--[Edited 11/25/2021 by LTK] (RDC) [Entered: 11/22/2021 12:32 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 20 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner RNC in 21-7000, 21-4082 by Krystal B. Swendsboe. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4082] (KBS) [Entered: 11/22/2021 12:28 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 19 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner National Association of Home Builders in 21-7000, 21-4092 by Felicia K. Watson. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4092] (FKW) [Entered: 11/22/2021 12:23 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 18 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioners American Trucking Associations, Inc., International Foodservice Distributors Association, International Warehouse & Logistics Association, Louisiana Motor Transport Association, Mississippi Trucking Association, National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Wholesaler-Distributors, National Retail Federation, National Federation of Independent Business, Texas Trucking Association and FMI - The Food Industry Association in 21-7000, 21-4080 by Michael B. Schon. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-4080, 21-7000]--[Edited 11/23/2021 by LTK] (MBS) [Entered: 11/22/2021 12:22 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 17 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner RNC in 21-7000, 21-4082 by Stephen J. Obermeier. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4082] (SJO) [Entered: 11/22/2021 12:13 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 16 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner RNC in 21-7000, 21-4082 by Thomas M. Johnson, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4082] (TMJ) [Entered: 11/22/2021 12:08 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 15 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner RNC in 21-7000, 21-4082 by Michael E. Toner. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4082] (MET) [Entered: 11/22/2021 12:02 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 14 PETITION for initial en banc hearing filed by Mr. Benjamin Michael Flowers for AL, AK, AZ, AR, FL, GA, ID, IN, IA, KS, KY, LA, MS, MO, MT, NE, NH, ND, OH, OK, SC, SD, TN, TX, UT, WV, and WY. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4031]--[Edited 11/22/2021 by BLH] (BMF) [Entered: 11/22/2021 12:00 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 13 AMICUS BRIEF filed by AMA in 21-4031 , with parties' consent. Certificate of Service:11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4031] (RF) [Entered: 11/22/2021 09:52 AM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 12 The case manager for this case is: Leon Korotko. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103] (LTK) [Entered: 11/22/2021 08:11 AM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 11 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipe Fitting Industry of the United States and Canada, AFL-CIO in 21-7000, 21-4089 by Keith R. Bolek. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2021. [21-7000, 21-4089] (KRB) [Entered: 11/22/2021 08:02 AM]
November 21, 2021 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioner TX by Judd E. Stone II. Certificate of Service: 11/21/2021. [21-7000] (JES) [Entered: 11/21/2021 02:51 PM]
November 21, 2021 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Respondents Martin J. Walsh, USA, Douglas L. Parker, Joseph R. Biden and James Frederick in 21-7000, Respondents Martin J. Walsh and Douglas L. Parker in 21-4028, Respondents Martin J. Walsh, Douglas L. Parker and James Frederick in 21-4031, 21-4033, 21-4080, Respondents Martin J. Walsh, United States Department of Labor, USA, Douglas L. Parker and Joseph R. Biden in 21-4088, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4102 by Michael S. Raab. Certificate of Service: 11/21/2021. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103] (MSR) [Entered: 11/21/2021 02:29 PM]
November 21, 2021 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Order for MCP No. 165; OSHA RULE ON COVID-19 VACCINATION AND TESTING, 86 FED. REG. 61402. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103] (LTK) [Entered: 11/21/2021 12:19 PM]
November 20, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. R. Trent McCotter for Petitioners Guy Chemical Company LLC, Independent Bakers Association, Job Creators Network, Lawrence Transportation Company, Terri Mitchell, Pan-O-Gold Baking Company, Rabine Group of Companies and Waterblasting, LLC in 21-7000, Attorney Mr. R. Trent McCotter for Petitioners Job Creators Network, Independent Bakers Association, Lawrence Transportation Company, Guy Chemical Company LLC, Rabine Group of Companies, Pan-O-Gold Baking Company and Terri Mitchell in 21-4093 Certificate of Service: 11/20/2021. [21-7000, 21-4093] (RTM) [Entered: 11/20/2021 09:50 AM]
November 20, 2021 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioners Guy Chemical Company LLC, Independent Bakers Association, Job Creators Network, Lawrence Transportation Company, Terri Mitchell, Pan-O-Gold Baking Company, Rabine Group of Companies and Waterblasting, LLC in 21-7000, Petitioners Guy Chemical Company LLC, Independent Bakers Association, Job Creators Network, Lawrence Transportation Company, Terri Mitchell, Pan-O-Gold Baking Company and Rabine Group of Companies in 21-4093 by R. Trent McCotter. Certificate of Service: 11/20/2021. [21-7000, 21-4093] (RTM) [Entered: 11/20/2021 09:47 AM]
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Petitioners American Trucking Associations, Inc., FMI - The Food Industry Association, International Foodservice Distributors Association, International Warehouse & Logistics Association, Louisiana Motor Transport Association, Mississippi Trucking Association, National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Wholesaler-Distributors, National Federation of Independent Business, National Retail Federation and Texas Trucking Association in 21-4080, 21-7000 by Steven P. Lehotsky. Certificate of Service: 11/19/2021. [21-4080, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103, 21-7000] (SPL) [Entered: 11/19/2021 08:42 PM]
November 19, 2021 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Respondents Joseph R. Biden, OSHA, Douglas L. Parker, Martin J. Walsh, USA and James Frederick in 21-7000, Respondent OSHA in 21-4027, Respondents OSHA, Douglas L. Parker and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4028, Respondents OSHA, Douglas L. Parker, Martin J. Walsh and James Frederick in 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, Respondents Joseph R. Biden, OSHA, Douglas L. Parker, Martin J. Walsh, United States Department of Labor and USA in 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, Respondents OSHA and Douglas L. Parker in 21-4102, 21-4103 by Brian J. Springer. Certificate of Service: 11/19/2021. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4088, 21-4089, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4092, 21-4093, 21-4094, 21-4095, 21-4096, 21-4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102, 21-4103] (BJS) [Entered: 11/19/2021 08:41 PM]
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Respondents Joseph R. Biden, James Frederick, OSHA, Douglas L. Parker, USA and Martin J. Walsh in 21-7000, Respondent OSHA in 21-4027, Respondents OSHA, Douglas L. Parker and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4028, Respondents James Frederick, OSHA, Douglas L. Parker and Martin J. Walsh in 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, Respondents OSHA, Douglas L. Parker and SOL in 21-4102, 21-4103 by Martin Totaro. Certificate of Service: 11/19/2021. [21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4102, 21-4103] (MT) [Entered: 11/19/2021 06:59 PM]
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 LETTER to the Clerk of the Court filed by Mr. R. Trent McCotter for Guy Chemical Company LLC, Independent Bakers Association, Job Creators Network, Lawrence Transportation Company, Terri Mitchell, Pan-O-Gold Baking Company, Rabine Group of Companies and Waterblasting, LLC regarding the White House Statement. Certificate of Service: 11/19/2021. [21-7000]--[Edited 11/25/2021 by LTK] (RTM) [Entered: 11/19/2021 01:50 PM]
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER. The United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Consolidation Order regarding Case MCP No. 165 of November 16, 2021. (LTK) [Entered: 11/19/2021 02:37 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: MCP No.165, OSHA Covid Rule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: In re: MCP NO. 165., OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY AND HEALTH ADMINISTRATION RULE ON COVID-19 VACCINATION AND TESTING, 86 FED. REG. 61402
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: In re: MCP NO. 165, OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY AND HEALTH ADMINISTRATION RULE ON COVID-19 VACCINATION AND TESTING, 86 FED. REG. 61402
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MASSACHUSETTS BUILDING TRADES COUNCIL
Represented By: Esmeralda Aguilar
Represented By: Victoria Louise Bor
Represented By: Nicole H. Decter
Represented By: Jonathan D. Newman
Represented By: Donald J. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ, aka 32BJ SEIU
Represented By: Allyson L. Belovin
Represented By: Nicole G. Berner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AFT PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Amy L. Rosenberger
Represented By: Irwin W. Aronson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED ASSOCIATION OF JOURNEYMEN AND APPRENTICES OF THE PLUMBING AND PIPE FITTING INDUSTRY OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Ellen O. Boardman
Represented By: Keith R. Bolek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ASSOCIATED GENERAL CONTRACTORS OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Thomas P. Gies
Represented By: Daniel William Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AMERICAN ROAD AND TRANSPORTATION BUILDERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Thomas P. Gies
Represented By: Daniel William Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SIGNATORY WALL AND CEILING CONTRACTORS ALLIANCE
Represented By: Thomas P. Gies
Represented By: Daniel William Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BST HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Harbison
Represented By: Jeffrey Jennings
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Represented By: Buck Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RV TROSCLAIR, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Harbison
Represented By: Jeffrey Jennings
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Represented By: Buck Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TROSCLAIR AIRLINE, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Harbison
Represented By: Jeffrey Jennings
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Represented By: Buck Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TROSCLAIR ALMONASTER, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Harbison
Represented By: Jeffrey Jennings
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Represented By: Buck Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TROSCLAIR AND SONS, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Harbison
Represented By: Jeffrey Jennings
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Represented By: Buck Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TROSCLAIR & TROSCLAIR, INC.
Represented By: Sarah Harbison
Represented By: Jeffrey Jennings
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Represented By: Buck Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TROSCLAIR CARROLLTON, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Harbison
Represented By: Jeffrey Jennings
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Represented By: Buck Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TROSCLAIR CLAIBORNE, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Harbison
Represented By: Jeffrey Jennings
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Represented By: Buck Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TROSCLAIR DONALDSONVILLE, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Harbison
Represented By: Jeffrey Jennings
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Represented By: Buck Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TROSCLAIR HOUMA, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Harbison
Represented By: Jeffrey Jennings
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Represented By: Buck Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TROSCLAIR JUDGE PEREZ, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Harbison
Represented By: Jeffrey Jennings
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Represented By: Buck Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TROSCLAIR LAKE FOREST, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Harbison
Represented By: Jeffrey Jennings
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Represented By: Buck Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TROSCLAIR MORRISON, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Harbison
Represented By: Jeffrey Jennings
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Represented By: Buck Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TROSCLAIR PARIS, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Harbison
Represented By: Jeffrey Jennings
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Represented By: Buck Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TROSCLAIR TERRY, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Harbison
Represented By: Jeffrey Jennings
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Represented By: Buck Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TROSCLAIR WILLIAMS, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Harbison
Represented By: Jeffrey Jennings
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Represented By: Buck Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RYAN DAILEY
Represented By: Sarah Harbison
Represented By: Jeffrey Jennings
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Represented By: Buck Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JASAND GAMBLE
Represented By: Sarah Harbison
Represented By: Jeffrey Jennings
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Represented By: Buck Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CHRISTOPHER L. JONES
Represented By: Sarah Harbison
Represented By: Jeffrey Jennings
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Represented By: Buck Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DAVID JOHN LOSCHEN
Represented By: Sarah Harbison
Represented By: Jeffrey Jennings
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Represented By: Buck Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SAMUEL ALBERT REYNA
Represented By: Sarah Harbison
Represented By: Jeffrey Jennings
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Represented By: Buck Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KIP STOVALL
Represented By: Sarah Harbison
Represented By: Jeffrey Jennings
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Represented By: Buck Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ANSWERS IN GENESIS, INC.
Represented By: Jeremy Dys
Represented By: David J. Hacker
Represented By: Jeffrey Carl Mateer
Represented By: Lea Patterson
Represented By: Keisha Russell
Represented By: Hiram S. Sasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AMERICAN FAMILY ASSOCIATION, INC.
Represented By: Jeffrey Carl Mateer
Represented By: David J. Hacker
Represented By: Lea Patterson
Represented By: Keisha Russell
Represented By: Hiram S. Sasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BURNETT SPECIALISTS
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Represented By: Matthew R. Miller
Represented By: Nate Curtisi
Represented By: Chance Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CHOICE STAFFING, LLC
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Represented By: Matthew R. Miller
Represented By: Nate Curtisi
Represented By: Chance Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STAFF FORCE, INC.
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Represented By: Matthew R. Miller
Represented By: Nate Curtisi
Represented By: Chance Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LEADINGEDGE PERSONNEL SERVICES, LTD.
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Represented By: Matthew R. Miller
Represented By: Nate Curtisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STATE OF TEXAS
Represented By: Judd Edward Stone II
Represented By: Ryan Baasch
Represented By: William Francis Cole
Represented By: Leif Olson
Represented By: Lanora Christine Pettit
Represented By: Benjamin D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HT STAFFING, LTD.
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Represented By: Matthew R. Miller
Represented By: Nate Curtisi
Represented By: Chance Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STATE OF LOUISIANA
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Murrill
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: COX OPERATING, LLC
Represented By: John Stone Campbell III
Represented By: John Parham Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DIS-TRAN STEEL, LLC
Represented By: John Stone Campbell III
Represented By: John Parham Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DIS-TRAN PACKAGED SUBSTATIONS, LLC
Represented By: John Stone Campbell III
Represented By: John Parham Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BETA ENGINEERING, LLC
Represented By: John Stone Campbell III
Represented By: John Parham Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: OPTIMAL FIELD SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: John Stone Campbell III
Represented By: John Parham Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STATE OF MISSISSIPPI
Represented By: Justin Lee Matheny
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: John V. Coghlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GULF COAST RESTAURANT GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Aaron Randall Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Represented By: Thomas T. Hydrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STATE OF UTAH
Represented By: Melissa Ann Holyoak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WORD OF GOD FELLOWSHIP, INC., dba Daystar Television Network
Represented By: Jeffrey Carl Mateer
Represented By: David J. Hacker
Represented By: Lea Patterson
Represented By: Keisha Russell
Represented By: Hiram S. Sasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TEXAS TRUCKING ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Steven Paul Lehotsky
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Represented By: Michael B. Schon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MISSISSIPPI TRUCKING ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Steven Paul Lehotsky
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Represented By: Michael B. Schon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LOUISIANA MOTOR TRANSPORT ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Steven Paul Lehotsky
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Represented By: Michael B. Schon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AMERICAN TRUCKING ASSOCIATIONS, INC.
Represented By: Steven Paul Lehotsky
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Represented By: Michael B. Schon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATIONAL FEDERATION OF INDEPENDENT BUSINESS
Represented By: Steven Paul Lehotsky
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Represented By: Michael B. Schon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATIONAL RETAIL FEDERATION
Represented By: Steven Paul Lehotsky
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Represented By: Michael B. Schon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FMI - THE FOOD INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Steven Paul Lehotsky
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Represented By: Michael B. Schon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CONVENIENCE STORES
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Represented By: Michael B. Schon
Represented By: Steven Paul Lehotsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF WHOLESALER-DISTRIBUTORS
Represented By: Steven Paul Lehotsky
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Represented By: Michael B. Schon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: INTERNATIONAL WAREHOUSE & LOGISTICS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Steven Paul Lehotsky
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Represented By: Michael B. Schon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: INTERNATIONAL FOODSERVICE DISTRIBUTORS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Steven Paul Lehotsky
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Represented By: Michael B. Schon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GREG ABBOTT, Governor of Texas
Represented By: James Patrick Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BENTKEY SERVICES, LLC, dba Daily Wire
Represented By: John J. Bursch
Represented By: Matthew Scott Bowman
Represented By: Ronald D. Coleman
Represented By: Michael A. Columbo
Represented By: Ryan Bangert
Represented By: Frank Hyok Chang
Represented By: David Andrew Cortman
Represented By: Harmeet Dhillon
Represented By: Mark P. Meuser
Represented By: Ryan J. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PHILLIPS MANUFACTURING & TOWER COMPANY
Represented By: Robert Alt
Represented By: Patrick Strawbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SIXARP, LLC
Represented By: Robert Alt
Represented By: Patrick Strawbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY
Represented By: Christopher L. Thacker
Represented By: Lindsey Keiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STATE OF IDAHO
Represented By: Christopher L. Thacker
Represented By: Leslie Hayes
Represented By: Brian Patrick Kane
Represented By: Megan Ann Larrondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STATE OF KANSAS
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Chanay
Represented By: Christopher L. Thacker
Represented By: Shannon Marie Grammel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STATE OF OHIO
Represented By: Sylvia May Davis
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Represented By: Christopher L. Thacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STATE OF OKLAHOMA
Represented By: Mithun Mansinghani
Represented By: Christopher L. Thacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STATE OF TENNESSEE
Represented By: Clark Lassiter Hildabrand
Represented By: Brandon James Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA
Represented By: Christopher L. Thacker
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SOUTHERN BAPTIST THEOLOGICAL SEMINARY
Represented By: Ryan Bangert
Represented By: Matthew Scott Bowman
Represented By: John J. Bursch
Represented By: Frank Hyok Chang
Represented By: David Andrew Cortman
Represented By: Ryan J. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ASBURY THEOLOGICAL SEMINARY
Represented By: Ryan Bangert
Represented By: Matthew Scott Bowman
Represented By: John J. Bursch
Represented By: Frank Hyok Chang
Represented By: David Andrew Cortman
Represented By: Ryan J. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TANKCRAFT CORPORATION
Represented By: Daniel P. Lennington
Represented By: Rick Esenberg
Represented By: Katherine D. Spitz
Represented By: Lucas Vebber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PLASTICRAFT CORPORATION
Represented By: Daniel P. Lennington
Represented By: Rick Esenberg
Represented By: Katherine D. Spitz
Represented By: Lucas Vebber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STATE OF INDIANA
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOB CREATORS NETWORK
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Berry
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: INDEPENDENT BAKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LAWRENCE TRANSPORTATION COMPANY
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GUY CHEMICAL COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RABINE GROUP OF COMPANIES
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PAN-O-GOLD BAKING COMPANY
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TERRI MITCHELL
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WATERBLASTING, LLC
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STATE OF MISSOURI
Represented By: Jesus Armando Osete
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STATE OF ARIZONA
Represented By: Drew Curtis Ensign
Represented By: Jesus Armando Osete
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STATE OF NEBRASKA
Represented By: James A. Campbell
Represented By: Jesus Armando Osete
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STATE OF MONTANA
Represented By: Christian Brian Corrigan
Represented By: David M.S. Dewhirst
Represented By: Jesus Armando Osete
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STATE OF ARKANSAS
Represented By: Nicholas Bronni
Represented By: Jesus Armando Osete
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Represented By: Vincent M. Wagner
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STATE OF IOWA
Represented By: Samuel Paul Langholz
Represented By: Jesus Armando Osete
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA
Represented By: Jesus Armando Osete
Represented By: Matthew A. Sagsveen
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA
Represented By: David M. McVey
Represented By: Jesus Armando Osete
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STATE OF ALASKA
Represented By: Charles Edmond Brasington
Represented By: Jesus Armando Osete
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE
Represented By: Anthony J. Galdieri
Represented By: Jesus Armando Osete
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STATE OF WYOMING
Represented By: Jesus Armando Osete
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Ryan T. Schelhaas
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AAI, INC.
Represented By: Jefferson Downing
Represented By: Jesus Armando Osete
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DOOLITTLE TRAILER MANUFACTURING, INC.
Represented By: Matthew W. Murphy
Represented By: Jesus Armando Osete
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CHRISTIAN EMPLOYERS ALLIANCE
Represented By: Ryan Bangert
Represented By: Matthew Scott Bowman
Represented By: John J. Bursch
Represented By: Frank Hyok Chang
Represented By: David Andrew Cortman
Represented By: Jesus Armando Osete
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Represented By: Ryan J. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SIOUX FALLS CATHOLIC SCHOOLS, dba Bishop O'Gorman Catholic Schools
Represented By: Ryan Bangert
Represented By: Matthew Scott Bowman
Represented By: John J. Bursch
Represented By: Frank Hyok Chang
Represented By: David Andrew Cortman
Represented By: Jesus Armando Osete
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Represented By: Ryan J. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HOME SCHOOL LEGAL DEFENSE ASSOCIATION, INC.
Represented By: Ryan Bangert
Represented By: Matthew Scott Bowman
Represented By: John J. Bursch
Represented By: Frank Hyok Chang
Represented By: David Andrew Cortman
Represented By: Jesus Armando Osete
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Represented By: Ryan J. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DTN STAFFING, INC.
Represented By: Joshua Joseph Campbell
Represented By: Rachel Louise Jag
Represented By: Kris W. Kobach
Represented By: Jessica Elizabeth Hart Steinmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JAMIE FLECK
Represented By: Joshua Joseph Campbell
Represented By: Rachel Louise Jag
Represented By: Kris W. Kobach
Represented By: Jessica Elizabeth Hart Steinmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SADIE HAWS
Represented By: Joshua Joseph Campbell
Represented By: Rachel Louise Jag
Represented By: Kris W. Kobach
Represented By: Jessica Elizabeth Hart Steinmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SHERIFF SHARMA
Represented By: Joshua Joseph Campbell
Represented By: Rachel Louise Jag
Represented By: Kris W. Kobach
Represented By: Jessica Elizabeth Hart Steinmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WENDI JOHNSTON
Represented By: Joshua Joseph Campbell
Represented By: Rachel Louise Jag
Represented By: Kris W. Kobach
Represented By: Jessica Elizabeth Hart Steinmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MILLER INSULATION COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Joshua Joseph Campbell
Represented By: Rachel Louise Jag
Represented By: Kris W. Kobach
Represented By: Jessica Elizabeth Hart Steinmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BRAD MILLER
Represented By: Joshua Joseph Campbell
Represented By: Rachel Louise Jag
Represented By: Kris W. Kobach
Represented By: Jessica Elizabeth Hart Steinmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: COREY HAGER
Represented By: Joshua Joseph Campbell
Represented By: Rachel Louise Jag
Represented By: Kris W. Kobach
Represented By: Jessica Elizabeth Hart Steinmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JULIO HERNANDEZ ORTIZ
Represented By: Joshua Joseph Campbell
Represented By: Rachel Louise Jag
Represented By: Kris W. Kobach
Represented By: Jessica Elizabeth Hart Steinmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AARON JANZ
Represented By: Joshua Joseph Campbell
Represented By: Rachel Louise Jag
Represented By: Kris W. Kobach
Represented By: Jessica Elizabeth Hart Steinmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MFA, INC.
Represented By: Cathleen A. Martin
Represented By: Ryan J. McDaniels
Represented By: John A. Ruth
Represented By: Alicia Embley Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MFA ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: Cathleen A. Martin
Represented By: Ryan J. McDaniels
Represented By: John A. Ruth
Represented By: Alicia Embley Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MISSOURI FARM BUREAU SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Cathleen A. Martin
Represented By: Ryan J. McDaniels
Represented By: John A. Ruth
Represented By: Alicia Embley Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MISSOURI FARM BUREAU INSURANCE BROKERAGE, INC.
Represented By: Cathleen A. Martin
Represented By: Ryan J. McDaniels
Represented By: John A. Ruth
Represented By: Alicia Embley Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MFA OIL COMPANY
Represented By: Cathleen A. Martin
Represented By: Ryan J. McDaniels
Represented By: John A. Ruth
Represented By: Alicia Embley Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DOYLE EQUIPMENT MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Represented By: Cathleen A. Martin
Represented By: Ryan J. McDaniels
Represented By: John A. Ruth
Represented By: Alicia Embley Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RIVERVIEW MANUFACTURING, INC.
Represented By: Cathleen A. Martin
Represented By: Ryan J. McDaniels
Represented By: John A. Ruth
Represented By: Alicia Embley Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF BROADCAST EMPLOYEES & TECHNICIANS, THE BROADCASTING AND CABLE TELEVISION WORKERS SECTOR OF THE COMMUNICATIONS WORKERS OF AMERICA, LOCAL 51, AFL-CIO
Represented By: David A. Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MEDIA GUILD OF THE WEST, THE NEWS GUILD-COMMUNICATIONS WORKERS OF AMERICA, AFL-CIO, LOCAL 39213
Represented By: David A. Rosenfeld
Represented By: Lisl R. Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNION OF AMERICAN PHYSICIANS AND DENTISTS
Represented By: David A. Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DENVER NEWSPAPER GUILD, COMMUNICATIONS WORKERS OF AMERICA, LOCAL 37074, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Stanley M. Gosch
Represented By: Wiliam R. Reinken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STATE OF FLORIDA
Represented By: Daniel William Bell
Represented By: Natalie Christmas
Represented By: Evan Matthew Ezray
Represented By: Jason H. Hilborn
Represented By: James Hamilton Percival II
Represented By: Henry Charles Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STATE OF ALABAMA
Represented By: Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
Represented By: Steven Marshall
Represented By: Thomas Alexander Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STATE OF GEORGIA
Represented By: Ross Warren Bergethon
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Drew Waldbeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GEORGIA HIGHWAY CONTRACTORS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Josh Belinfante
Represented By: Javier Pico-Prats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GEORGIA MOTOR TRUCKING ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Josh Belinfante
Represented By: Javier Pico-Prats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ROBINSON PAVING CO.
Represented By: Josh Belinfante
Represented By: Javier Pico-Prats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SCOTCH PLYWOOD COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Edward Tatum Turner
Represented By: Halron Waites Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KING'S ACADEMY
Represented By: Matthew Scott Bowman
Represented By: John J. Bursch
Represented By: Frank Hyok Chang
Represented By: David Andrew Cortman
Represented By: Ryan J. Tucker
Represented By: Ryan Bangert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CAMBRIDGE CHRISTIAN SCHOOL, INC.
Represented By: Matthew Scott Bowman
Represented By: John J. Bursch
Represented By: Frank Hyok Chang
Represented By: David Andrew Cortman
Represented By: Ryan J. Tucker
Represented By: Ryan Bangert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FABARC STEEL SUPPLY, INC.
Represented By: Matthew James Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TONY PUGH
Represented By: Matthew James Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ASSOCIATED BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS, INC.
Represented By: James Larry Stine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ASSOCIATED BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS OF ALABAMA, INC.
Represented By: James Larry Stine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE
Represented By: Michael Eugene Toner
Represented By: Jeremy Joseph Broggi
Represented By: Thomas M. Johnson Jr.
Represented By: Stephen Joseph Obermeier
Represented By: Krystal Brunner Swendsboe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFL/CIO-CLC
Represented By: Peter J. Ford I
Represented By: Peter Ford
Represented By: Randy Sue Rabinowitz
Represented By: Andrew Dean Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF LABOR-CONGRESS OF INDUSTRIAL ORGANIZATIONS
Represented By: Craig Becker
Represented By: Randy Sue Rabinowitz
Represented By: Andrew Dean Roth
Represented By: Harold Craig Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS
Represented By: Felicia K. Watson
Represented By: Thomas J. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATURAL PRODUCTS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Richard J. Oparil
Represented By: Ashley Steiner Kelly
Represented By: Henry M. Perlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: OBERG INDUSTRIES, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Represented By: Patrick Strawbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BETTEN CHEVROLET, INC.
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TORE SAYS LLC
Represented By: Russell A. Newman
Represented By: Grant Joseph Guillot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KENTUCKY PETROLEUM MARKETERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Steven Paul Lehotsky
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KENTUCKY TRUCKING ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Steven Paul Lehotsky
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MICHIGAN ASSOCIATION OF CONVENIENCE STORES
Represented By: Steven Paul Lehotsky
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MICHIGAN PETROLEUM ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Steven Paul Lehotsky
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MICHIGAN RETAILERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Steven Paul Lehotsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MICHIGAN TRUCKING ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Steven Paul Lehotsky
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: OHIO TRUCKING ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Steven Paul Lehotsky
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TENNESSEE CHAMBER OF COMMERCE AND INDUSTRY
Represented By: Steven Paul Lehotsky
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TENNESSEE GROCERS AND CONVENIENCE STORE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Steven Paul Lehotsky
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TENNESSEE MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Steven Paul Lehotsky
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TENNESSEE TRUCKING ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Steven Paul Lehotsky
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATIONAL PROPANE GAS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Steven Paul Lehotsky
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AMERICAN BAKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Steven Paul Lehotsky
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BRICK INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Steven Paul Lehotsky
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AARON ABADI
Represented By: Aaron Abadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: INDEPENDENT ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS - FWCC, INC.
Represented By: James Larry Stine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HERITAGE FOUNDATION
Represented By: Abigail Ann Southerland
Represented By: Jordan A. Sekulow
Represented By: Christina Stierhoff
Represented By: Miles Landon Terry
Represented By: Edward Lawrence White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NORTH AMERICA'S BUILDING TRADES UNIONS
Represented By: Victoria Louise Bor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SCOTT BEDKE, in his official capacity as Speaker of the Idaho House of Representatives
Represented By: William G. Myers III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CHUCK WINDER, in his official capacity as President Pro Tempore of the Idaho Senate
Represented By: William G. Myers III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: OHIO GROCERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Catherine L. Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NEW CIVIL LIBERTIES ALLIANCE
Represented By: Sheng Tao Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: Rachel Fried
Represented By: JoAnn Kintz
Represented By: Jessica Anne Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GAVEL PROJECT
Represented By: Ryan Lawrence Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICHIGAN HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Represented By: David Andrew Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICHIGAN SENATE
Represented By: David Andrew Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WISCONSIN MANUFACTURERS & COMMERCE
Represented By: Scott E. Rosenow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SMALL BUSINESS ASSOCIATION OF MICHIGAN
Represented By: Steven R. Eatherly
Represented By: Joseph E. Richotte
Represented By: Kurtis T. Wilder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHARLES N. JEFFRESS
Represented By: Scott Lawrence Nelson
Represented By: Allison M. Zieve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DAVID MICHAELS
Represented By: Scott Lawrence Nelson
Represented By: Allison M. Zieve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GERARD SCANNELL
Represented By: Scott Lawrence Nelson
Represented By: Allison M. Zieve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL EMPLOYMENT LAWYERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Michael Timothy Anderson
Represented By: Adam C. Breihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JOBS WITH JUSTICE EDUCATION FUND
Represented By: Michael Timothy Anderson
Represented By: Adam C. Breihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CONSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNTABILITY CENTER
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN PUBLIC HEALTH ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASSOCIATION OF SCHOOLS AND PROGRAMS OF PUBLIC HEALTH
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ACADEMY OF MANAGED CARE PHARMACY
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ALLIANCE OF COMMUNITY HEALTH PLANS
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OSTEOPATHIC EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PREVENTATIVE MEDICINE
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COLLEGE OF AMERICAN PATHOLOGISTS
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COUNCIL OF STATE AND TERRITORIAL EPIDEMIOLOGISTS
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL HISPANIC MEDICAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL MEDICAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL SAFETY COUNCIL
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASSOCIATION OF PERIOPERATIVE REGISTERED NURSES
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL LEAGUE FOR NURSING
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: 30 DEANS OF LEADING ACADEMIC PROGRAMS
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: 104 LEADING PUBLIC HEALTH AND HEALTH POLICY SCHOLARS
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: OHIO CHAMBER OF COMMERCE
Represented By: Catherine L. Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: OHIO AUTOMOBILE DEALERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Catherine L. Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: OHIO WHOLESALE BEER AND WINE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Catherine L. Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: OHIO HOTEL AND LODGING ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Catherine L. Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: OHIO BANKERS LEAGUE
Represented By: Catherine L. Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SMALL BUSINESS MAJORITY
Represented By: Emmy L. Levens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN INDEPENDENT BUSINESS ALLIANCE
Represented By: Emmy L. Levens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CIUDAD LA, LLC
Represented By: Emmy L. Levens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BORDER GRILL TRUCK AND CATERING, LLC
Represented By: Emmy L. Levens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo |