In re: Walker County, TX v. OptumRx, Inc., et al
Not Classified By Court: In re: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION
Plaintiff / Appellant: WALKER COUNTY, TX
Defendant / Appellee: OPTUMRX, INC., OPTUMRX ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC, UNITED HEALTHCARE OF TEXAS, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY, UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC., OPTUM, INC., PERRIGO COMPANY, PLC, PADDOCK LABORATORIES, INC., ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC., PURDUE PHARMA, INC., PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC., nka Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., nka Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., NESHER PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS, (USA), INC., ADVANCED PHARMA, INC., ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN, INC., MILAN SPECIALTY, LP, MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN TECHNOLOGIES, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., MALLINCKRODT, LLC, MALLINCKRODT PHARMACEUTICALS, ICU MEDICAL SALES, INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., PURDUE PHARMACEUTICALS L.P., PRIME THERAPEUTICS, LLC, NAVITUS HEALTH SOLUTIONS, LLC, NAVITUS HOLDINGS, LLC, CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, ALPHARMA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ALPHARMA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, MISSION PHARMACAL COMPANY, NEXGEN, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MCKESSON MEDICAL-SURGICAL, INC., CEPHALON, ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., J M SMITH CORPORATION, NOVEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FRESENIUS KABI USA, INSYS MANUFACTURING LLC, CAREMARK RX, LLC, CAREMARK PCS HEALTH PLLC, CAREMARK LLC, CAREMARK PCS, LLC, CVS PHARMACY, INC., MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS OF TEXAS LLC, CURASCRIPT, INC., NEOS THERAPEUTICS, INC., KING PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PFIZER, INC., MALLINCKRODT, PLC, AVEVA DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEMS, INC., ZOGENIX, INC., AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, PURDUE PHARMA LP, MALLINCKRODT PHARMACEUTICALS, PLC and CEPHALON, INC.
Appellee: PLAINTIFF'S EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE and PLAINTIFFS' EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE
Case Number: 22-3491
Filed: May 26, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Torts
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2022 Filing 13 ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (AEG) [Entered: 12/13/2022 09:36 AM]
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER filed to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction. No mandate to issue. Jeffrey S. Sutton Chief Circuit Judge, Ralph B. Guy, Jr., and R. Guy Cole, Jr., Circuit Judges. (AEG) [Entered: 12/13/2022 09:33 AM]
July 13, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed to the show cause for jurisdiction - non-appealable order, [ # 7 ]. Response filed by Attorney Mr. Peter H. Weinberger for Appellee Plaintiff's Executive Committee. [22-3491] (PHW) [Entered: 07/13/2022 03:03 PM]
July 13, 2022 Filing 10 *LOCKED* REPLY filed by Mr. Peter H. Weinberger for Plaintiff's Executive Committee regarding Response of Real Party in Interest Plaintiffs' Executive Committee to Show Cause Order on Dismissal for Lack of Jurisdiction Certificate of Service: 07/13/2022. [22-3491] ***COUNSEL: Incorrect event selected. Please re-file as a showcause response.*** --[Edited 07/13/2022 by AEG] (PHW) [Entered: 07/13/2022 02:24 PM]
July 13, 2022 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Plaintiff's Executive Committee by Peter H. Weinberger. Certificate of Service: 07/13/2022. [22-3491] (PHW) [Entered: 07/13/2022 11:09 AM]
July 6, 2022 Filing 8 RESPONSE filed to the show cause for jurisdiction - non-appealable order, [ # 7 ]. Response filed by Attorney Ms. Sherri Ann Saucer for Appellant Walker County, TX. Certificate of Service: 07/06/2022. [22-3491] (SAS) [Entered: 07/06/2022 03:37 PM]
June 15, 2022 Filing 7 SHOW CAUSE order: It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff SHOW CAUSE, within twenty-one (21) days of the file date of this order, why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Following receipt of a response from Plaintiff or expiration of the 21-day response period, whichever occurs first, Defendants, if they so choose, shall have ten (10) days in which to file a reply. Thereafter, the issue of appellate jurisdiction will be referred to the court for disposition.. Response due by 07/06/2022 for Sherri Ann Saucer. (AEG) [Entered: 06/15/2022 11:23 AM]
June 9, 2022 Filing 6 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Sherri Ann Saucer for Appellant Walker County, TX.. Certificate of Service: 06/09/2022. [22-3491] (SAS) [Entered: 06/09/2022 05:12 PM]
June 9, 2022 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Neos Therapeutics, Inc. by C. Scott Jones. Certificate of Service: 06/09/2022. [22-3491] (SJ) [Entered: 06/09/2022 01:52 PM]
May 27, 2022 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Walker County, TX by Sherri Ann Saucer. Certificate of Service: 05/27/2022. [22-3491] (SAS) [Entered: 05/27/2022 02:46 PM]
May 26, 2022 Filing 3 Update fee status change to paid. (AEG) [Entered: 05/26/2022 06:18 PM]
May 26, 2022 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Amy Gigliotti (513) 564-7012 (AEG) [Entered: 05/26/2022 06:18 PM]
May 26, 2022 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Walker County, TX. Transcript needed: n. (AEG) [Entered: 05/26/2022 06:15 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In re: Walker County, TX v. OptumRx, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: In re: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WALKER COUNTY, TX
Represented By: Sherri Ann Saucer
Represented By: Mark A. Correro
Represented By: John Raggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OPTUMRX, INC.
Represented By: Kimberly Chemerinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OPTUMRX ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Kimberly Chemerinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED HEALTHCARE OF TEXAS, INC.
Represented By: Kimberly Chemerinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC.
Represented By: Douglas Stuart Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY
Represented By: Douglas Stuart Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Kimberly Chemerinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OPTUM, INC.
Represented By: Kimberly Chemerinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PERRIGO COMPANY, PLC
Represented By: Raffi Melkonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PADDOCK LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: Raffi Melkonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Hannah De Marco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PURDUE PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: Noelle M. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY
Represented By: Noelle M. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Hannah De Marco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC
Represented By: Hannah De Marco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC., nka Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., nka Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NESHER PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), LLC
Represented By: Bruce Davidson Oakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS, (USA), INC.
Represented By: Bruce Davidson Oakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ADVANCED PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: Corey S. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ABBOTT LABORATORIES
Represented By: Alper T. Ertas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: Alper T. Ertas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MYLAN, INC.
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MILAN SPECIALTY, LP
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MYLAN TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MALLINCKRODT, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Roger Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MALLINCKRODT PHARMACEUTICALS
Represented By: Jeffrey Roger Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ICU MEDICAL SALES, INC.
Represented By: Brandon Egan Caire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Heather Coghlan Barger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARDINAL HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: Michael W. Mengis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PURDUE PHARMACEUTICALS L.P.
Represented By: Noelle M. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PRIME THERAPEUTICS, LLC
Represented By: Kristen W. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NAVITUS HEALTH SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By: Timothy E. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NAVITUS HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Timothy E. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Mark E. Torian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALPHARMA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALPHARMA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Represented By: Edward Donald Burbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MISSION PHARMACAL COMPANY
Represented By: Ryan James Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEXGEN
Represented By: Ryan James Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MCKESSON MEDICAL-SURGICAL, INC.
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CEPHALON
Represented By: Nancy L. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ACTAVIS LLC
Represented By: Nancy L. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC
Represented By: Nancy L. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: Nancy L. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J M SMITH CORPORATION
Represented By: Kenneth Patrick Babb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NOVEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Jeffrey Francis Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRESENIUS KABI USA
Represented By: Charles Bedford Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INSYS MANUFACTURING LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Alex Sarokhanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAREMARK RX, LLC
Represented By: Mark E. Torian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAREMARK PCS HEALTH PLLC
Represented By: Mark E. Torian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAREMARK LLC
Represented By: Mark E. Torian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAREMARK PCS, LLC
Represented By: Mark E. Torian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CVS PHARMACY, INC.
Represented By: Mark E. Torian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS OF TEXAS LLC
Represented By: Douglas Stuart Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CURASCRIPT, INC.
Represented By: Douglas Stuart Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEOS THERAPEUTICS, INC.
Represented By: Christopher Scott Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KING PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Edward Donald Burbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PFIZER, INC.
Represented By: Edward Donald Burbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MALLINCKRODT, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AVEVA DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Michael R. Rahmn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ZOGENIX, INC.
Represented By: Herman Heng Yue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION
Represented By: Charles Stanton Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PURDUE PHARMA LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MALLINCKRODT PHARMACEUTICALS, PLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Roger Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CEPHALON, INC.
Represented By: Nancy L. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PLAINTIFF'S EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE
Represented By: Peter H. Weinberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PLAINTIFFS' EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE
Represented By: Peter H. Weinberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?