Hunter Doster, et al v. Frank Kendall, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: HUNTER DOSTER, JASON ANDERSON, MCKENNA COLANTANIO, PAUL CLEMENT, JOE DILLS, BENJAMIN LEIBY, BRETT MARTIN, CONNOR MCCORMICK, HEIDI MOSHER, PETER NORRIS, PATRICK POTTINGER, ALEX RAMSPERGER, BENJAMIN RINALDI, DOUGLAS RUYLE, CHRISTOPHER SCHULDES, EDWARD STAPANON, III, ADAM THERIAULT and DANIEL REINEKE, On behalf of themselves and others similarly situated
Defendant / Appellant: HON. FRANK KENDALL, In his official capacity as Secretary of the Air Force, LT. GENERAL ROBERT I. MILLER, In his official capacity as Surgeon General of the Air Force, LT. GENERAL MARSHALL B. WEBB, In his official capacity as Commander, Air Education and Training Command, LT. GENERAL RICHARD W. SCOBEE, In his official capacity as Commander, Air Force Reserve Command, LT. GENERAL JAMES C. SLIFE, In his official capacity as Commander, Air Force Special Operations Command and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 22-3497
Filed: May 31, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
November 29, 2022 Summary Hunter Doster v. Frank Kendall

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2022 Filing 15 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Casen Ross for Honorable Frank Kendall, Robert I. Miller, Richard W. Scobee, James C. Slife, USA and Marshall B. Webb. Certificate of Service: 07/25/2022. Argument Request: requested. [22-3497] (CR) [Entered: 07/25/2022 10:48 PM]
July 19, 2022 Filing 14 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Jason Anderson, Paul Clement, McKenna Colantanio, Joe Dills, Hunter Doster, Benjamin Leiby, Brett Martin, Connor McCormick, Heidi Mosher, Peter Norris, Patrick Pottinger, Alex Ramsperger, Daniel Reineke, Benjamin Rinaldi, Douglas Ruyle, Christopher Schuldes, Edward Stapanon, III and Adam Theriault by Wendy Cox. Certificate of Service: 07/19/2022. [22-3497] (WNC) [Entered: 07/19/2022 05:50 PM]
July 18, 2022 Filing 13 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Honorable Frank Kendall, Robert I. Miller, Richard W. Scobee, USA, Marshall B. Webb and James C. Slife by Lowell V. Sturgill Jr.. Certificate of Service: 07/18/2022. [22-3497] (LVS) [Entered: 07/18/2022 01:39 PM]
June 14, 2022 Filing 12 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 07/25/2022;. appellee brief due 08/23/2022; (VLP) [Entered: 06/14/2022 10:51 AM]
June 14, 2022 Filing 11 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Ms. Sarah Jane Clark for Honorable Frank Kendall, Robert I. Miller, Richard W. Scobee, James C. Slife, USA and Marshall B. Webb. fCertificate of Service: 06/14/2022. [22-3497] (SJC) [Entered: 06/14/2022 10:45 AM]
June 14, 2022 Filing 10 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Sarah Jane Clark for Appellants Honorable Frank Kendall, Robert I. Miller, Richard W. Scobee, James C. Slife, USA and Marshall B. Webb.. Certificate of Service: 06/14/2022. [22-3497] (SJC) [Entered: 06/14/2022 10:41 AM]
June 13, 2022 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Christopher David Wiest for Appellees Jason Anderson, Paul Clement, McKenna Colantanio, Joe Dills, Hunter Doster, Benjamin Leiby, Brett Martin, Connor McCormick, Heidi Mosher, Peter Norris, Patrick Pottinger, Alex Ramsperger, Daniel Reineke, Benjamin Rinaldi, Douglas Ruyle, Christopher Schuldes, Edward Stapanon, III and Adam Theriault Certificate of Service: 06/13/2022. [22-3497] (CDW) [Entered: 06/13/2022 12:54 PM]
June 6, 2022 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Honorable Frank Kendall, Robert I. Miller, Richard W. Scobee, James C. Slife, USA and Marshall B. Webb by Casen B. Ross. Certificate of Service: 06/06/2022. [22-3497] (CR) [Entered: 06/06/2022 10:27 AM]
June 1, 2022 Filing 7 LETTER SENT Ms. Sarah Jane Clark, Mr. Thomas Bernard Bruns, Mr. Aaron Siri, Mr. Christopher David Wiest regarding amended caption. (VLP) [Entered: 06/01/2022 02:56 PM]
May 31, 2022 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Jason Anderson, Paul Clement, McKenna Colantanio, Joe Dills, Hunter Doster, Benjamin Leiby, Brett Martin, Connor McCormick, Heidi Mosher, Peter Norris, Patrick Pottinger, Alex Ramsperger, Daniel Reineke, Benjamin Rinaldi, Douglas Ruyle, Christopher Schuldes, Edward Stapanon, III and Adam Theriault by Christopher D Wiest. Certificate of Service: 05/31/2022. [22-3497] (CDW) [Entered: 05/31/2022 04:01 PM]
May 31, 2022 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Jason Anderson, Paul Clement, McKenna Colantanio, Joe Dills, Hunter Doster, Benjamin Leiby, Brett Martin, Connor McCormick, Heidi Mosher, Peter Norris, Patrick Pottinger, Alex Ramsperger, Daniel Reineke, Benjamin Rinaldi, Douglas Ruyle, Christopher Schuldes, Edward Stapanon, III and Adam Theriault by Thomas B. Bruns. Certificate of Service: 05/31/2022. [22-3497] (TBB) [Entered: 05/31/2022 03:54 PM]
May 31, 2022 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Commander, Air Education and Training Command, Commander, Air Force Reserve Command, Commander, Air Force Special Operations Command, Secretary of the U.S. Department of the Air Force, Surgeon General of the Airforce and USA by Sarah J. Clark. Certificate of Service: 05/31/2022. [22-3497] (SJC) [Entered: 05/31/2022 02:28 PM]
May 31, 2022 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Virginia Padgett (VLP) [Entered: 05/31/2022 01:22 PM]
May 31, 2022 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Commander, Air Education and Training Command, Commander, Air Force Reserve Command, Commander, Air Force Special Operations Command, Secretary of the U.S. Department of the Air Force, Surgeon General of the Airforce and USA. Transcript needed: y. (VLP) [Entered: 05/31/2022 01:19 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Hunter Doster, et al v. Frank Kendall, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HUNTER DOSTER
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Thomas Bernard Bruns
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Wendy Noel Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JASON ANDERSON
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Thomas Bernard Bruns
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Wendy Noel Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MCKENNA COLANTANIO
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Thomas Bernard Bruns
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Wendy Noel Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PAUL CLEMENT
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Thomas Bernard Bruns
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Wendy Noel Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOE DILLS
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Thomas Bernard Bruns
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Wendy Noel Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BENJAMIN LEIBY
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Thomas Bernard Bruns
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Wendy Noel Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BRETT MARTIN
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Thomas Bernard Bruns
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Wendy Noel Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CONNOR MCCORMICK
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Thomas Bernard Bruns
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Wendy Noel Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HEIDI MOSHER
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Thomas Bernard Bruns
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Wendy Noel Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PETER NORRIS
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Thomas Bernard Bruns
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Wendy Noel Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PATRICK POTTINGER
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Thomas Bernard Bruns
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Wendy Noel Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALEX RAMSPERGER
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Thomas Bernard Bruns
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Wendy Noel Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BENJAMIN RINALDI
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Thomas Bernard Bruns
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Wendy Noel Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DOUGLAS RUYLE
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Thomas Bernard Bruns
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Wendy Noel Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHRISTOPHER SCHULDES
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Thomas Bernard Bruns
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Wendy Noel Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EDWARD STAPANON, III
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Thomas Bernard Bruns
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Wendy Noel Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ADAM THERIAULT
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Thomas Bernard Bruns
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Wendy Noel Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DANIEL REINEKE, On behalf of themselves and others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Thomas Bernard Bruns
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Wendy Noel Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: HON. FRANK KENDALL, In his official capacity as Secretary of the Air Force
Represented By: Sarah Jane Clark
Represented By: Casen Ross
Represented By: Lowell V. Sturgill Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LT. GENERAL ROBERT I. MILLER, In his official capacity as Surgeon General of the Air Force
Represented By: Sarah Jane Clark
Represented By: Casen Ross
Represented By: Lowell V. Sturgill Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LT. GENERAL MARSHALL B. WEBB, In his official capacity as Commander, Air Education and Training Command
Represented By: Sarah Jane Clark
Represented By: Casen Ross
Represented By: Lowell V. Sturgill Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LT. GENERAL RICHARD W. SCOBEE, In his official capacity as Commander, Air Force Reserve Command
Represented By: Sarah Jane Clark
Represented By: Casen Ross
Represented By: Lowell V. Sturgill Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LT. GENERAL JAMES C. SLIFE, In his official capacity as Commander, Air Force Special Operations Command
Represented By: Sarah Jane Clark
Represented By: Casen Ross
Represented By: Lowell V. Sturgill Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Sarah Jane Clark
Represented By: Casen Ross
Represented By: Lowell V. Sturgill Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?