Terry Larson v. LaShann Eppinger, et al
Defendant: LASHANN EPPINGER
Plaintiff / Appellant: TERRY LARSON
Defendant / Appellee: KEITH J. FOLEY, JANICE DOUGLAS, ANDREW D. EDDY, ROGER WILSON, KAREN STANFORTH, JENNIFER BARRY, Mental Health Administrator 3, M. O'CALLAHAN and KAI ADAMS
Case Number: 22-4029
Filed: December 12, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2023 Filing 8 RULING LETTER SENT granting appellant's motion to extend time to file brief by 30 days [ # 7 ], resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 02/27/2023, appellee brief now due 03/29/2023. (ASM) [Entered: 01/25/2023 03:04 PM]
January 25, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION filed by Mr. Samuel Weiss for Terry Larson to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 01/25/2023. [22-4029] (SW) [Entered: 01/25/2023 02:55 PM]
January 2, 2023 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Terry Larson by Samuel Weiss. Certificate of Service: 01/02/2023. [22-4029] (SW) [Entered: 01/02/2023 04:06 PM]
December 19, 2022 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Keith J. Foley, Janice Douglas, Andrew D. Eddy, Roger Wilson, Karen Stanforth and Jennifer Barry by Mindy A. Worly. Certificate of Service: 12/19/2022. [22-4029] (MAW) [Entered: 12/19/2022 12:36 PM]
December 15, 2022 Filing 4 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 01/27/2023, appellee brief due 03/01/2023. (ASM) [Entered: 12/15/2022 01:40 PM]
December 15, 2022 Filing 3 Update fee status change to paid. 12/14/2022 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 200001415 (ASM) [Entered: 12/15/2022 01:33 PM]
December 12, 2022 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Antoinette Macon (ASM) [Entered: 12/12/2022 09:42 AM]
December 12, 2022 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Terry Larson. Transcript needed: n. (ASM) [Entered: 12/12/2022 09:33 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Terry Larson v. LaShann Eppinger, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TERRY LARSON
Represented By: Terry Larson
Represented By: Samuel Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LASHANN EPPINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEITH J. FOLEY
Represented By: Mindy Ann Worly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JANICE DOUGLAS
Represented By: Mindy Ann Worly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANDREW D. EDDY
Represented By: Mindy Ann Worly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROGER WILSON
Represented By: Mindy Ann Worly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAREN STANFORTH
Represented By: Mindy Ann Worly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JENNIFER BARRY, Mental Health Administrator 3
Represented By: Mindy Ann Worly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M. O'CALLAHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAI ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?