Nissan North America, Inc. v. Continental Automotive Systems, Inc., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Defendant / Appellee: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS, INC., successor to Continental Teves, Inc., CONTITECH NORTH AMERICA, INC. and CONTINENTAL TIRE THE AMERICAS, LLC
Case Number: 22-5469
Filed: June 1, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Contract: Product Liability
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2022 Filing 23 AMENDED RULING LETTER SENT resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 08/26/2022. appellee brief now due 10/25/2022. (JAC) [Entered: 07/18/2022 03:31 PM]
July 18, 2022 Filing 22 *** VACATED - SEE AMENDED RULING LETTER AT #23 *** RULING LETTER SENT granting appellant's unopposed motion to extend time to file brief by 30 days [ # 21 ] filed by Mr. Paul J. Krog., resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 08/26/2022. appellee brief now due 09/26/2022.--[Edited 07/18/2022 by JAC] (JAC) [Entered: 07/18/2022 11:33 AM]
July 18, 2022 Filing 21 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Mr. Paul J. Krog for Nissan North America, Inc. to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 07/18/2022. [22-5469]--[Edited 07/18/2022 by JAC] (PJK) [Entered: 07/18/2022 11:08 AM]
July 13, 2022 Filing 20 Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 07/13/2022 12:54 PM]
July 12, 2022 Filing 19 Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: The Mediation Conference scheduled for 07/13/2022 is hereby canceled. (LMR) [Entered: 07/12/2022 03:47 PM]
June 21, 2022 Filing 18 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Continental Automotive Systems, Inc. by Andrew B. Fromm. Certificate of Service: 06/21/2022. [22-5469] (ABF) [Entered: 06/21/2022 02:47 PM]
June 21, 2022 Filing 17 *** DOCUMENT LOCKED - COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE AS A NON-MODIFIABLE PDF DOCUMENT *** APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Continental Automotive Systems, Inc. by Andrew B. Fromm. Certificate of Service: 06/21/2022. [22-5469]--[Edited 06/21/2022 by JAC] (ABF) [Entered: 06/21/2022 12:54 PM]
June 17, 2022 Filing 16 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 07/27/2022; appellee brief due 08/26/2022. (JAC) [Entered: 06/17/2022 08:53 AM]
June 16, 2022 Filing 15 LETTER SENT to all counsel, regarding amended caption. (JAC) [Entered: 06/16/2022 03:54 PM]
June 16, 2022 Filing 14 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Nissan North America, Inc. by Eugene N. Bulso, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 06/16/2022. [22-5469] (ENB) [Entered: 06/16/2022 12:18 PM]
June 16, 2022 Filing 13 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Paul J. Krog for Appellant Nissan North America, Inc... Certificate of Service: 06/16/2022. [22-5469] (PJK) [Entered: 06/16/2022 12:17 PM]
June 16, 2022 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Paul J. Krog for Appellant Nissan North America, Inc. Certificate of Service: 06/16/2022. [22-5469] (PJK) [Entered: 06/16/2022 12:12 PM]
June 15, 2022 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Jason D. Killips for Appellee ContiTech North America, Inc. Certificate of Service: 06/15/2022. [22-5469]--[Edited 06/15/2022 by JAC] (JDK) [Entered: 06/15/2022 02:14 PM]
June 15, 2022 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Jason D. Killips for Appellee Continental Tire the Americas, LLC. Certificate of Service: 06/15/2022. [22-5469]--[Edited 06/15/2022 by JAC] (JDK) [Entered: 06/15/2022 02:13 PM]
June 15, 2022 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Jason D. Killips for Appellee Continental Automotive Systems, Inc. Certificate of Service: 06/15/2022. [22-5469]--[Edited 06/15/2022 by JAC] (JDK) [Entered: 06/15/2022 02:12 PM]
June 3, 2022 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Continental Automotive Systems, Inc., Continental Tire the Americas, LLC and ContiTech North America, Inc. by Herbert C. Donovan. Certificate of Service: 06/03/2022. [22-5469] (HCD) [Entered: 06/03/2022 01:05 PM]
June 3, 2022 Filing 7 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 6 ], filed by Mr. Herbert C. Donovan for Continental Automotive Systems, Inc., ContiTech North America, Inc. and Continental Tire the Americas, LLC is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. (JAC) [Entered: 06/03/2022 11:55 AM]
June 3, 2022 Filing 6 *** LOCKED - SEE APPEARANCE FORM FILED AT #8 *** APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Continental Automotive Systems, Inc., Continental Tire the Americas, LLC and ContiTech North America, Inc. by Herbert C. Donovan. Certificate of Service: 06/03/2022. [22-5469]--[Edited 06/03/2022 by JAC] (HCD) [Entered: 06/03/2022 11:40 AM]
June 2, 2022 Filing 5 MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 07/13/2022 at 9:30 am EASTERN TIME with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 06/02/2022 10:44 AM]
June 2, 2022 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Continental Automotive Systems, Inc., Continental Tire the Americas, LLC and ContiTech North America, Inc. by Jason D. Killips. Certificate of Service: 06/02/2022. [22-5469] (JDK) [Entered: 06/02/2022 09:12 AM]
June 1, 2022 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Nissan North America, Inc. by Paul J. Krog. Certificate of Service: 06/01/2022. [22-5469] (PJK) [Entered: 06/01/2022 04:35 PM]
June 1, 2022 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Julie Connor (JAC) [Entered: 06/01/2022 03:47 PM]
June 1, 2022 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Nissan North America, Inc.. Transcript needed: y. (JAC) [Entered: 06/01/2022 03:46 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Nissan North America, Inc. v. Continental Automotive Systems, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Eugene Nicholas Bulso Jr.
Represented By: Paul J. Krog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS, INC., successor to Continental Teves, Inc.
Represented By: Jason D. Killips
Represented By: Herbert C. Donovan
Represented By: Robert A. Peal
Represented By: Andrew Blair Fromm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CONTITECH NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Jason D. Killips
Represented By: Herbert C. Donovan
Represented By: Robert A. Peal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CONTINENTAL TIRE THE AMERICAS, LLC
Represented By: Jason D. Killips
Represented By: Herbert C. Donovan
Represented By: Robert A. Peal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?