Andrew Bazemore, et al v. Papa John's U.S.A., Inc., et al
Plaintiff: COLIN SHARP
Plaintiff / Appellant: ANDREW BAZEMORE, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Defendant / Appellee: PAPA JOHN'S U.S.A., INC. and PAPA JOHN'S INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Case Number: 22-6133
Filed: December 30, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2023 Filing 15 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Joshua Art Frank for Andrew Bazemore. Certificate of Service: 02/22/2023. Argument Request: requested. [22-6133] (JAF) [Entered: 02/22/2023 08:07 PM]
February 1, 2023 Filing 14 Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 02/01/2023 04:10 PM]
January 27, 2023 Filing 13 Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: The Mediation Conference scheduled for 01/27/2023 is hereby canceled. (LMR) [Entered: 01/27/2023 07:46 AM]
January 13, 2023 Filing 12 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 02/22/2023;. appellee brief due 03/24/2023; (JAS) [Entered: 01/13/2023 12:48 PM]
January 13, 2023 Filing 11 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. Joshua Art Frank for Andrew Bazemore. Certificate of Service: 01/13/2023. [22-6133] (JAF) [Entered: 01/13/2023 12:45 PM]
January 13, 2023 Filing 10 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Joshua Art Frank for Appellant Andrew Bazemore.. Certificate of Service: 01/13/2023. [22-6133] (JAF) [Entered: 01/13/2023 12:42 PM]
January 13, 2023 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Joshua Art Frank for Appellant Andrew Bazemore Certificate of Service: 01/13/2023. [22-6133] (JAF) [Entered: 01/13/2023 12:39 PM]
January 13, 2023 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Andrew Bazemore by Joshua A. Frank. Certificate of Service: 01/13/2023. [22-6133] (JAF) [Entered: 01/13/2023 12:19 PM]
January 13, 2023 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Andrew Bazemore by David W. Garrison. Certificate of Service: 01/13/2023. [22-6133] (DWG) [Entered: 01/13/2023 12:08 PM]
January 11, 2023 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Gerald Leonard Maatman, Jr. for Appellees Papa John's International, Inc. and Papa John's U.S.A., Inc. Certificate of Service: 01/11/2023. [22-6133] (GLM) [Entered: 01/11/2023 04:17 PM]
January 11, 2023 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Papa John's International, Inc. and Papa John's U.S.A., Inc. by Michael L. DeMarino. Certificate of Service: 01/11/2023. [22-6133] (MLD) [Entered: 01/11/2023 03:39 PM]
January 11, 2023 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Papa John's International, Inc. and Papa John's U.S.A., Inc. by Gerald L. Maatman, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 01/11/2023. [22-6133] (GLM) [Entered: 01/11/2023 03:14 PM]
January 3, 2023 Filing 3 MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 01/27/2023 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Catherine Geyer. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 01/03/2023 02:50 PM]
December 30, 2022 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Jennifer Strobel (JAS) [Entered: 12/30/2022 03:00 PM]
December 30, 2022 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Andrew Bazemore. Transcript needed: n. (JAS) [Entered: 12/30/2022 02:58 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Andrew Bazemore, et al v. Papa John's U.S.A., Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANDREW BAZEMORE, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: David W. Garrison
Represented By: Joshua Art Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLIN SHARP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAPA JOHN'S U.S.A., INC.
Represented By: Donald Lee Miller II
Represented By: Gerald Leonard Maatman Jr.
Represented By: Michael L. DeMarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAPA JOHN'S INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Donald Lee Miller II
Represented By: Gerald Leonard Maatman Jr.
Represented By: Michael L. DeMarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?