Romero Thomas v. Douglas Smith, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: ROMERO MONTE THOMAS
Defendant / Appellee: DOUGLAS SMITH, Deputy Warden, JEREMY HOWARD, Assistant Deputy Warden, SHAWN BREWER, Warden, MICHELLE L. PARSONS, Assistant Resident Unit Supervisor, ANTHONY STEWART, Warden, CHRISTINE MCCUMBER-HEMRY, Grievance Coordinator, RICHARD D. RUSSELL, Grievance Manager, SCOTT BAILEY, Inspector, KIMBERLY NAPIER, Warden's Administrative Assistant, ROBIN GILBERT, CFA Deputy Director, V. MCCABE, Assistant Resident Unit Manager, JOHN DOE, CFA Deputy Director, LLOYD RAPELJE, Regional Prison Administrator and KENNETH T. MCKEE
Case Number: 23-1304
Filed: April 3, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2023 Filing 9 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Mr. Romero Monte Thomas. (SSS) [Entered: 05/10/2023 12:22 PM]
May 3, 2023 Filing 8 TENDERED Appellant brief. Received from Party Mr. Romero Monte Thomas. (SSS) [Entered: 05/03/2023 10:37 AM]
May 1, 2023 Filing 7 CORRESPONDENCE: Cover letters and proof of service included with brief and copy. by Mr. Romero Monte Thomas. (SSS) [Entered: 05/03/2023 10:36 AM]
April 17, 2023 Filing 6 CORRESPONDENCE: Copy of certificate of no transcript filed in district court as RE #236. by Mr. Romero Monte Thomas. (SSS) [Entered: 04/19/2023 10:26 AM]
April 17, 2023 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. Romero Monte Thomas regarding Representation statement with certificate of service.. Certificate of Service: 04/13/2023. (SSS) [Entered: 04/19/2023 10:22 AM]
April 17, 2023 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Douglas Smith, Jeremy Howard, Michelle L. Parsons and Ms. Robin Gilbert by Scott R. Rothermel (P70711). Certificate of Service: 04/17/2023. [23-1304] (SRR) [Entered: 04/17/2023 02:53 PM]
April 4, 2023 Filing 3 LETTER SENT to all parties, regarding amended case caption to terminate parties Shawn Brewer, Kenneth T. McKee, Kimberly Napier and Anthony Stewart as appellees. (SSS) [Entered: 04/04/2023 11:31 AM]
April 3, 2023 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Sharday Swain (SSS) [Entered: 04/03/2023 02:48 PM]
April 3, 2023 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Romero Monte Thomas. Transcript needed: n. (SSS) [Entered: 04/03/2023 02:37 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Romero Thomas v. Douglas Smith, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROMERO MONTE THOMAS
Represented By: Romero Monte Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOUGLAS SMITH, Deputy Warden
Represented By: Scott R. Rothermel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEREMY HOWARD, Assistant Deputy Warden
Represented By: Scott R. Rothermel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHAWN BREWER, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHELLE L. PARSONS, Assistant Resident Unit Supervisor
Represented By: Scott R. Rothermel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANTHONY STEWART, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTINE MCCUMBER-HEMRY, Grievance Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD D. RUSSELL, Grievance Manager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT BAILEY, Inspector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KIMBERLY NAPIER, Warden's Administrative Assistant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBIN GILBERT, CFA Deputy Director
Represented By: Scott R. Rothermel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: V. MCCABE, Assistant Resident Unit Manager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOE, CFA Deputy Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LLOYD RAPELJE, Regional Prison Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KENNETH T. MCKEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?