Brian Adams, et al v. 3M Company
Defendant: MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES, et al.
Plaintiff / Appellee: BRIAN ADAMS, ALICE ADAMS, EDWARD ADAMS, ANDREA ADAMS, JAMES ADAMS, JAMES R. ADAMS, SUSIE ADAMS, PHYLLIS ADAMS, Executrix of the Estate of Rick Adams, GREGORY ADDINGTON, STEPHANIE ADDINGTON, JAMES ADKINS, EDWARD AKERS, BRENDA AKERS, JAMES ALLEN, SUSAN ALLEN, GARY ANDERSON, DINAH ANDERSON, LUTHER ANDERSON, KATHY ANDERSON, DAVID ASHLEY, VICKEY ASHLEY, GARY BAKER, RODNEY BAKER, ALICE BAKER, TIM BALTHIS, FRANCIS BALTHIS, CHRIS BANKS, ROBERT BANKS, PEGGY BANKS, BILLY BARTLEY, RITA BARTLEY, GARY BENNETT, NICKEY BENTLEY, JACKLYN BENTLEY, JAMES BENTLY, TERESA LYNN BENTLY, ROY BILITER, ROBIN BILITER, BRANDON BLACKBURN, JENNIFER BLACKBURN, ROGER BLAIR, PATRICIA BLAIR, JOEY BOYD, PATTY BOYD, RAYMOND BRANHAM, TRACEY BRANHAM, RICHARD BRASHEAR, TOMEKA BRASHEAR, CHARLES BRYANT, CAROL BRYANT, ARTEMUS CAMPBELL, SANDRA CAMPBELL, THOMAS CANTRELL, CHEYENNE CANTRELL, ELMER CASTLE, STELLA CASTLE, RANDY CAUDILL, RETHO CAUDILL, WILLIAM CHAFIN, WANDA CHAFIN, CLEO CHAPMAN, GARY CHAPMAN, MARGARET CHAPMAN, RODNEY CHAPMAN, TERESA CHAPMAN, DAVID CHARLES, BARRY COLEMAN, PAULA MARIE COLEMAN, ERVIN COLEMAN, LOLA ANN COLEMAN, BILLY COLLINS, MARY COLLINS, BRIAN COLLINS, TONYA COLLINS, OSCAR COLLINS, CHRISTY COLLINS, GABRIEL CONN, FAYE CONN, JAMES CONN, VIRGIL CONN, AMARINE CONN, COLIN COOK, JAMIE COOK, ANTHONY CORNETT, SHEILA CORNETT, BRENDA PHILLIPS, Executrix of the Estate of Woodrow Crum, KEVIN DANIELS, RITA DANIELS, DONALD DAVIS, TERESA DAVIS, MICHAEL DINGUS, BRIAN DOTSON, NIKKI DOTSON, KEVIN DOTSON, JAMES ESTEP, VELVET ESTEP, DIANE FIFE, Executrix of the Estate of Zack Fife, BRANDON FLEMING, JOSHUA FLEMING, REBECCA FLEMING, BURNIS FOUTS, GOMER FOUTS, SARA FOUTS, RANDY FOUTS, PATRICIA FOUTS, JIMMY GIBSON, HENRIETTA GIBSON, CARLOS GILLEY, NORMA GILLEY, OLEN GOOD, CAROL GOOD, KEVIN GRIFFEY, CLARA GRIFFEY, DONNIE HALL, PATRICIA HALL, RONNIE HALL, DOROTHY HALL, Executrix of the Estate of Wayne Hall, JAMES HAMILTON, JEANENE HAMILTON, TOMMY HAMPTON, ELLEN HAMPTON, DAVID HARDIN, ANGELA HARDIN, GREGORY HATFIELD, DEBRA HATFIELD, JOHN HAYES, KENNETH HILTON, DANA HILTON, DONNY HOWARD, FRANKLIN HOWELL, KEVIN HUTCHINSON, DANNY ISAAC, SHIRLEY ISAAC, ROBERT JONES, AMANDA JONES, CLAUDE JUDE, JENNIFER JUDE, GARY KEENE, SHIRLEY KEENE, HAROLD KIDD, LISA KIDD, FARRIS LAWSON, SARA ELIZABETH LAWSON, NORVAL LAWSON, JUANITA LAWSON, HERMAN LITTLE, ANONA LITTLE, JERRY LITTLE, SHARON LITTLE, KENNETH LITTLE, KEVIN LITTLE, MISSY LITTLE, JOSHUA MAHON, CLINNON MARTIN, DOUGLAS MARTIN, VAN MAYHORN, CLIFFORD MAYNARD, SARAH MAYNARD, TIMOTHY MAYNARD, KAYLA MAYNARD, DAVID MCGUIRE, JULIE MCGUIRE, DANNY MEADE, ANDREA MEADE, KENNETH MEADE, LISA MEADE, QUILLIA MILLER, Executrix of the Estate of Ricky Miller, RONALD MILLER, TERESA MILLER, FOSTER MITCHELL, GLADYS MITCHELL, TROY MOON, SYLENA MOON, EDWARD MOORE, ELVIE MOORE, ERNIE MOORE, RITA MOORE, CHARLES MULLINS, ALLARD NEWSOME, DALE NEWSOME, ANITA NEWSOME, DONALD NEWSOME, DARLENE NEWSOME, JAMES NEWSOME, TABITHA NEWSOME, JIMMY NEWSOME, LEROY NEWSOME, TERRY NORMAN, CYNTHIA PATTON, Executrix of the Estate of John Patton, JOHNNY PITTMAN, PEGGY PITTMAN, JEFFREY POTTER, CHARLENE POTTER, RANSOM PRATER, DENNIE PUGH, MARY PUGH, ROBERT PUGH, CELESTE PUGH, JIMMY RAY, GLENDA RAY, LARRY RAY, DAVID REED, SUSAN REED, SHERRELL REID, STELFON REYNOLDS, EUGENA REYNOLDS, JAMES RICH, VALERIE RICH, MARKUS RICHARDSON, CHENDLA RICHARDSON, FREDRICK ROBERTS, CONNIE ROBERTS, RODNEY ROSE, STEPHANIE ROSE, WILLIAM RUNYON, KATHY RUNYON, DENNY SEXTON, ELLEN SEXTON, HERSHEL SHEPHERD, JAMES SIMMONS, GINGER SIMMONS, HARVEY SMITH, VERLIN SMITH, WILLIAM SMITH, SARA SMITH, EARL SPURLOCK, GERMAN STUMBO, ELLIS STURGILL, DARLA STURGILL, PAUL STURGILL, RANDY STURGILL, MADGE STURGILL, RICHARD STURGILL, MELONY STURGILL, DOUGLAS TACKETT, JAMES TACKETT, MARY TACKETT, GARRETT TAYLOR, MELANA TAYLOR, RONALD THACKER, LORA THACKER, ROY THACKER, ANNA THACKER, A. J. THORNSBERRY, MYRA THORNSBERRY, THOMAS TYREE, MARY TYREE, STEVE WARD, ANNETTE WARD, KEITHAL WHITE, CONNIE JOYCE WHITE, DONALD WILLIAMS, MARY ANN WILLIAMS, MASON WILLIAMS, LORETTA WILLIAMS, Executrix of the Estate of Randall Williams, RICKY WILLIAMS, EUGENIA WILLIAMS, TOMMY WRIGHT, VERDIE WRIGHT, CHARLES MOUNTS, LARRY EPLING, MABEL EPLING, STEPHAN CASE, CRYSTAL CASE, LARRY NEWSOME, RICKEY WRIGHT, REBECCA WRIGHT, STEPHEN JUSTICE, LANGLEY SMITH, JOHN PHILLIPS, AMY PHILLIPS, DONNIE REYNOLDS, LINDA REYNOLDS, CALVIN GREGORY, MARSHA GREGORY, JUANITA TACKETT, LORETTA HORNE, Executrix of hte Estate of Jack Horne, ROBERT DAMRON, JAMES MARTIN, CHRISTOPHER SMITH, REBECCA SMITH, ELLIS AKERS, LASHERI AKERS, STEVEN BAKER, ESTILL JARVIS, ARLINDA JARVIS, JEFF RATLIFF, SR., MELINDA RATLIFF, BRIAN THACKER, LEANN THACKER, RANDOLPH HARDIN, RANDY WOLFORD, KAREN WOLFORD, SHELBY DAYLONG, JAMES GIBSON, JUDY GIBSON, WILLIAM STANLEY, JACKIE STANLEY, RAYMOND MILLER, THERESA MILLER, FREDDIE BOWLING, BRENDA BOWLING, GREG COLEY, DAWN COLEY, BRIAN HARRIS, ANITA HARRIS, HAROLD BALTHIS, ROSE BALTHIS, WILLIAM MCFARLAND, JR., AVA MCFARLAND, KEVIN BEVINS, RIKKA BEVINS, RICHARD FULLER, KAREN FULLER, KURT SANDLIN, ERICA SANDLIN, VENT MEADOWS, JAMIE HAMILTON, EMILY HAMILTON, RICHARD BROWNING, JENNIFER BROWNING, NORMAN PAGE, KIMBERLY PAGE, JULIAN ADKINS, PHEOBE ADKINS, JEFFREY PINSON, STACIE PINSON, WINDELL AUSTIN, DARCUS AUSTIN, PAUL STANLEY, JEFFREY MARTIN, MICHAEL SEXTON, PEGGY SEXTON, BOBBY MULLINS, DAVID MAGGARD, REGINA MAGGARD, RICHARD HENSON, PHILLIP THACKER, TAMMY THACKER, CHARLES MCCLANAHAN, ROBERT LITTLE, KAMELA LITTLE, JEFF MILLER, KATHRYN MILLER, JOHN BARKER, MOSES SANDERS, JEFFREY KINDER, ANTHONY HALL, TONYA HALL, EUGENE COLEMAN, BALINDA COLEMAM, ALVIN SPANGLER, JUANITA SPANGLER, CARL NORMAN, RONALD LESTER, HATTIE LESTER, JONATHAN CRISP, JAMES WHITT, TONY STEWART, DONNA STEWART, ROBERT GOFF, KERMIT SWINEY, KEVIN BENTLEY, PALMER SLONE, JEAN SLONE, TIM TOTTEN, JENNIFER TOTTN, RODIE VARNEY, INEZ VARNEY, ROY JOHNSON, DEBRA JOHNSON, GREG SMITH, AUDIE MURPHY, CHRISTINE MURPHY, DANIEL COOTS, HEATHER COOTS, LEON EPLING, RHONDA EPLING, JAMES THACKER, ROBERT SEXTON, CONNIE SEXTON, SASHA MCKINNEY, Administrator of the Estate of Stevie McKinney, STEPHANIE MCKINNEY, Administrator of the Estate of Stevie McKinney, SAMMY MULLINS, LORA BLANKENSHIP, MAGGIE BLANKENSHIP, ANGELA LITTLE, LARRY LEE MOUNTS, JENNIFER MOUNTS, VALERIE HORN, Executrix of the Estate of James Horn, DARRIUS COLEMAN, RICKY SWINEY, RHONDA SWINEY, LLOYD CARROLL, ANGELA CARROLL, JAMES CLINE, MELISSA CLINE, CHARLES SCOTT, AMANDA HAMILTON, Executrix of the Estate of Gary Hamilton, DANIEL MEADE, DANYEL MEADE, TEDDY NEWSOME, SIDNEY WOLFORD, HERMAN WALLEN, TRAVIS JOHNSON, MICHAEL BLACKBURN, TIMMY PRICE, EADIE PRICE, DAVID COLLINS, NILA COLLINS, DONALD RATLIFF, DELORES RATLIFF, RICHARD MULLINS, MELISSA MULLINS, THOMAS DAMRON, TERRY CASEY, ANGELA CASEY, ROY COLLINS, JODI COLLINS, NICKIE SIFERS, DARLENA SIFERS, ROGER MATNEY, RUBY MATNEY, IRENE KISER, Executrix of the Estate of Larry Kiser, CARROL DERRY, Executrix of the Estate of Scotty Derry, JACKIE FRANCIS, JOANN FRANCIS, GARY ADKINS, JASON BLANKENSHIP, MELISSA BLANKENSHIP, CHRISTOPHER GOOD, BRANDY GOOD, BURBON KENDRICK, HELENA KENDRICK, EDGAR SCOTT NEWMAN, RHONDA NEWMAN, BARRY NEWSOME, TERRY ANDERSON, BETTY ANDERSON, CRAIG DAMRON, MELINDA DAMRON, ARCHIE HALL, TERRY NEWSOME, RONNIE MULLINS, JODY HALL, BELINDA HALL, JEFFERY TACKETT, DONNA TACKETT, WAYNE NEWSOME, GLORIA NEWSOME, DONNIE MULLINS, WILMA MULLINS, JOSEPH MULLINS, HOPE MULLINS, RONNIE WRIGHT, BRENDA WRIGHT, DUSTIN JUSTICE, COURTNEY JUSTICE, THOMAS WRIGHT, SHERRY WRIGHT, JAMES YONTS, BETSY YONTS, BRIAN JOHNSON, JESSICA JOHNSON, KEVIN THACKER, BRIDGET THACKER, EDDIE HALL, KIM HALL, CARMELLA VARNEY, Executrix of the Estate of Greg Varney, LONNIE BAKER, DARLENE BAKER, ROYAL JOHNSON, INARD ANDERSON, MAGGIE ANDERSON, ANDY THACKER, IRIS THACKER, TERRY RILEY, MARY RILEY, LLOYD NEWSOM, JOHN CURE, JR., KIM CURE, JAMES LAYNE, JACQUELINE LAYNE, JORDAN TACKETT, JERRY NEWSOME, ALBERT MATNEY, DARLENE MATNEY, JOEY JUDE, CLARK AKERS, STEVIE HAMILTON, KENNETH ALLEN, SHANNA ALLEN, KENNETH CAUDILL, TINA CAUDILL, MITCHELL SALYERS, RUBY SALYERS, JACKIE WRIGHT, BETTY WRIGHT, MICHALE ARNETT, FRANKIE MYERS, DORIS OSBOURNE, DONNA OSBOURNE, NEIL CHAPMAN, SABRINA CHAPMAN, WILLIAM NEWSOME, JR., KAREN NEWSOME, EDDIE BACK, MARLENE BACK, GENE DANIELS, JERRY MOORE, STACEY MOORE, CHARLES BLANKENSHIP, STELLA BLANKENSHIP, RODNEY MCINTOSH, DEBBIE MCINTOSH, CARL ANDERSON, MARVIN JERVIS, BOBBY KINCER, JACQUELINE KINCER, ROGER KENDRICK, ANDRA KENDRICK, TEDDY HUNT, PAMELA HUNT, TODD DYES, WILLIAM BACK, TERA BACK, MICHAEL ELSWICK, DREMA ELSWICK, CHRISTOPHER MAYNARD, ANGELA MAYNARD, STEVEN BENTLEY, PATRICIA BENTLEY, CHARLES PEASE, IMOGENE PEASE, WILLIE MCCOY, BRENDA MCCOY, LOIS SPRADLIN, JAMES SPRADLIN, DANNY COMPTON, RHONDA COMPTON, RONNIE BOWLING, TAMMY BOWLING, RICKY RUNYON, DEBORAH RUNYON, KENNETIH RAY DAMRON, BRETT GAYHEART, BRENDA GAYHEART, RONNIE ADKINS, PAUL CASTLE, ROGER BARNETT, PAULINE BARNETT, JOHNNY SPEARS, GRETA SPEARS, THOMAS THACKER, KRISTY THACKER, BENJAMIN ADAMS, ROSETTA ADAMS, JEFFERY FULLER, RUTH FULLER, SONNY DALES, MICHELLE DALES, STELLA MUSIC, Executrix of the Estate of Billy Music, JUSTINE HAMILTON, Executrix of the Estate of Jan Hamilton, JOHNNY TACKETT, TRACY TACKETT, RICK MOORE, DAREN SEXTON, MARTIN MINIX, LINDA MINIX, DUSTIN HALL, HILLARY HALL, RAYMOND SANDERS and DONNA SANDERS
Defendant / Appellant: 3M COMPANY, fka Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company
Amicus Curiae: U.S. CHAMBER OF COMMERCE
Case Number: 23-5232
Filed: March 23, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Product Liability

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
April 19, 2023 Summary Adams v. 3M Co.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MANDATE ISSUED with no costs taxed. (RLB) [Entered: 05/11/2023 02:01 PM]
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 OPINION and JUDGMENT filed : REVERSED and REMANDED. Mandate to issue. Decision for publication. Jeffrey S. Sutton, Chief Judge (AUTHORING); Alan E. Norris and David W. McKeague, Circuit Judges. (CL) [Entered: 04/19/2023 01:26 PM]
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CAUSE ARGUED, (via video), by Mr. Michael A. Scodro for Appellant and Mr. Michael Martin for Appellees before Judges: Sutton, Norris and McKeague. (LAG) [Entered: 04/18/2023 10:40 AM]
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REPLY BRIEF filed by Attorney Mr. Evan Mark Tager for Appellant 3M Company. Certificate of Service: 04/17/2023. [23-5232] (EMT) [Entered: 04/17/2023 11:15 AM]
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTIFICATION regarding conference details for the video argument at 10:00 a.m. (Eastern Time) on Tuesday, April 18, 2023. ** This is a restricted document. If you are unable to open the attachment, contact PACER at 1-800-676-6856 and verify that your account has its "Searching Privileges" activated. ** (LAG) [Entered: 04/17/2023 09:30 AM]
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CORRECTED APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Michael Martin Brian Adams, et al. and Charles Mounts, et al. and Johnny Givens for Brian Adams, et al. Certificate of Service: 04/12/2023. Argument Request: requested. [23-5232]--[Edited 04/13/2023 by RLB - to shorten docket entry] (MM) [Entered: 04/12/2023 05:31 PM]
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 BRIEFING LETTER SENT requesting brief corrections from Mr. Johnny Givens for Brian Adams, et al. and Mark Miller for Brian Adams, et al. and Charles Mounts, et al. because brief exceeds the 13,000 word limit. Corrected brief due: 04/12/2023. (RLB) [Entered: 04/11/2023 08:26 AM]
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ***DOCUMENT LOCKED - EXCEEDS WORD LIMIT - SEE BRIEFING CORRECTION LETTER SENT 4/11/23*** APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Michael Martin for Alice Adams, Andrea Adams, Benjamin Adams, Brian Adams, Edward Adams, James Adams, James R. Adams, Phyllis Adams, Rosetta Adams, Susie Adams, Gregory Addington, Stephanie Addington, Gary Adkins, James Adkins, James Adkins, Julian Adkins, Pheobe Adkins, Ronnie Adkins, Brenda Akers, Clark Akers, Edward Akers, Ellis Akers, Lasheri Akers, James Allen, Kenneth Allen, Shanna Allen, Susan Allen, Betty Anderson, Carl Anderson, Dinah Anderson, Gary Anderson, Inard Anderson, Kathy Anderson, Luther Anderson, Maggie Anderson, Terry Anderson, Michale Arnett, David Ashley, Vickey Ashley, Darcus Austin, Windell Austin, Eddie Back, Marlene Back, Tera Back, William Back, Alice Baker, Darlene Baker, Gary Baker, Lonnie Baker, Rodney Baker, Steven Baker, Francis Balthis, Harold Balthis, Rose Balthis, Tim Balthis, Chris Banks, Peggy Banks, Robert Banks, John Barker, Pauline Barnett, Roger Barnett, Billy Bartley, Rita Bartley, Gary Bennett, Jacklyn Bentley, Kevin Bentley, Nickey Bentley, Patricia Bentley, Steven Bentley, James Bently, Teresa Lynn Bently, Kevin Bevins, Rikka Bevins, Robin Biliter, Roy Biliter, Brandon Blackburn, Jennifer Blackburn, Michael Blackburn, Patricia Blair, Roger Blair, Charles Blankenship, Jason Blankenship, Lora Blankenship, Maggie Blankenship, Melissa Blankenship, Stella Blankenship, Brenda Bowling, Freddie Bowling, Ronnie Bowling, Tammy Bowling, Joey Boyd, Patty Boyd, Raymond Branham, Tracey Branham, Richard Brashear, Tomeka Brashear, Jennifer Browning, Richard Browning, Carol Bryant, Charles Bryant, Artemus Campbell, Sandra Campbell, Cheyenne Cantrell, Thomas Cantrell, Angela Carroll, Lloyd Carroll, Crystal Case, Stephan Case, Angela Casey, Terry Casey, Elmer Castle, Paul Castle, Stella Castle, Kenneth Caudill, Randy Caudill, Retho Caudill, Tina Caudill, Wanda Chafin, William Chafin, Cleo Chapman, Gary Chapman, Margaret Chapman, Neil Chapman, Rodney Chapman, Sabrina Chapman, Teresa Chapman, David Charles, James Cline, Melissa Cline, Balinda Colemam, Barry Coleman, Darrius Coleman, Ervin Coleman, Eugene Coleman, Lola Ann Coleman, Paula Marie Coleman, Dawn Coley, Greg Coley, Billy Collins, Brian Collins, Christy Collins, David Collins, Jodi Collins, Mary Collins, Nila Collins, Oscar Collins, Roy Collins, Tonya Collins, Danny Compton, Rhonda Compton, Amarine Conn, Faye Conn, Gabriel Conn, James Conn, Virgil Conn, Colin Cook, Jamie Cook, Daniel Coots, Heather Coots, Anthony Cornett, Sheila Cornett, Jonathan Crisp, John Cure, Jr., Kim Cure, Michelle Dales, Sonny Dales, Craig Damron, Kennetih Ray Damron, Melinda Damron, Robert Damron, Thomas Damron, Gene Daniels, Kevin Daniels, Rita Daniels, Donald Davis, Teresa Davis, Shelby Daylong, Carrol Derry, Michael Dingus, Brian Dotson, Kevin Dotson, Nikki Dotson, Todd Dyes, Drema Elswick, Michael Elswick, Larry Epling, Larry Epling, Leon Epling, Mabel Epling, Rhonda Epling, James Estep, Velvet Estep, Diane Fife, Brandon Fleming, Joshua Fleming, Rebecca Fleming, Burnis Fouts, Gomer Fouts, Patricia Fouts, Randy Fouts, Sara Fouts, Jackie Francis, Joann Francis, Jeffery Fuller, Karen Fuller, Richard Fuller, Ruth Fuller, Brenda Gayheart, Brett Gayheart, Henrietta Gibson, James Gibson, Jimmy Gibson, Judy Gibson, Carlos Gilley, Norma Gilley, Robert Goff, Brandy Good, Carol Good, Christopher Good, Olen Good, Calvin Gregory, Marsha Gregory, Clara Griffey, Kevin Griffey, Anthony Hall, Archie Hall, Belinda Hall, Donnie Hall, Dorothy Hall, Dustin Hall, Eddie Hall, Hillary Hall, Jody Hall, Kim Hall, Patricia Hall, Ronnie Hall, Tonya Hall, Amanda Hamilton, Emily Hamilton, James Hamilton, Jamie Hamilton, Jeanene Hamilton, Justine Hamilton, Stevie Hamilton, Ellen Hampton, Tommy Hampton, Angela Hardin, David Hardin, Randolph Hardin, Anita Harris, Brian Harris, Debra Hatfield, Gregory Hatfield, John Hayes, Richard Henson, Dana Hilton, Kenneth Hilton, Valerie Horn, Loretta Horne, Donny Howard, Franklin Howell, Pamela Hunt, Teddy Hunt, Kevin Hutchinson, Danny Isaac, Shirley Isaac, Arlinda Jarvis, Estill Jarvis, Marvin Jervis, Brian Johnson, Debra Johnson, Jessica Johnson, Roy Johnson, Royal Johnson, Travis Johnson, Amanda Jones, Robert Jones, Claude Jude, Jennifer Jude, Joey Jude, Courtney Justice, Dustin Justice, Stephen Justice, Gary Keene, Shirley Keene, Andra Kendrick, Burbon Kendrick, Helena Kendrick, Roger Kendrick, Harold Kidd, Lisa Kidd, Bobby Kincer, Jacqueline Kincer, Jeffrey Kinder, Irene Kiser, Farris Lawson, Juanita Lawson, Norval Lawson, Sara Elizabeth Lawson, Jacqueline Layne, James Layne, Hattie Lester, Ronald Lester, Angela Little, Anona Little, Herman Little, Herman Little, Jerry Little, Kamela Little, Kenneth Little, Kevin Little, Missy Little, Robert Little, Sharon Little, David Maggard, Regina Maggard, Joshua Mahon, Clinnon Martin, Douglas Martin, James Martin, Jeffrey Martin, Albert Matney, Darlene Matney, Roger Matney, Ruby Matney, Van Mayhorn, Angela Maynard, Christopher Maynard, Clifford Maynard, Kayla Maynard, Sarah Maynard, Timothy Maynard, Charles McClanahan, Brenda McCoy, Willie McCoy, Ava McFarland, William McFarland, Jr., David McGuire, Julie McGuire, Debbie McIntosh, Rodney McIntosh, Sasha McKinney, Stephanie McKinney, Andrea Meade, Daniel Meade, Danny Meade, Danyel Meade, Kenneth Meade, Lisa Meade, Vent Meadows, Jeff Miller, Kathryn Miller, Quillia Miller, Raymond Miller, Ronald Miller, Teresa Miller, Theresa Miller, Linda Minix, Martin Minix, Foster Mitchell, Gladys Mitchell, Sylena Moon, Troy Moon, Edward Moore, Elvie Moore, Ernie Moore, Jerry Moore, Rick Moore, Rita Moore, Stacey Moore, Charles Mounts, Jennifer Mounts, Larry Lee Mounts, Bobby Mullins, Charles Mullins, Donnie Mullins, Hope Mullins, Joseph Mullins, Melissa Mullins, Richard Mullins, Ronnie Mullins, Sammy Mullins, Wilma Mullins, Audie Murphy, Christine Murphy, Stella Music, Frankie Myers, Edgar Scott Newman, Rhonda Newman, Lloyd Newsom, Allard Newsome, Anita Newsome, Barry Newsome, Dale Newsome, Darlene Newsome, Donald Newsome, Gloria Newsome, James Newsome, Jerry Newsome, Jimmy Newsome, Karen Newsome, Larry Newsome, Leroy Newsome, Tabitha Newsome, Teddy Newsome, Terry Newsome, Wayne Newsome, William Newsome, Jr., Carl Norman, Terry Norman, Donna Osbourne, Doris Osbourne, Kimberly Page, Norman Page, Cynthia Patton, Charles Pease, Imogene Pease, Amy Phillips, Brenda Phillips, John Phillips, Jeffrey Pinson, Stacie Pinson, Johnny Pittman, Peggy Pittman, Charlene Potter, Jeffrey Potter, Ransom Prater, Eadie Price, Timmy Price, Celeste Pugh, Dennie Pugh, Mary Pugh, Robert Pugh, Delores Ratliff, Donald Ratliff, Jeff Ratliff, Sr., Melinda Ratliff, Glenda Ray, Jimmy Ray, Larry Ray, David Reed, Susan Reed, Sherrell Reid, Donnie Reynolds, Eugena Reynolds, Linda Reynolds, Stelfon Reynolds, James Rich, Valerie Rich, Chendla Richardson, Markus Richardson, Mary Riley, Terry Riley, Connie Roberts, Fredrick Roberts, Rodney Rose, Stephanie Rose, Deborah Runyon, Kathy Runyon, RIcky Runyon, William Runyon, Mitchell Salyers, Ruby Salyers, Donna Sanders, Moses Sanders, Raymond Sanders, Erica Sandlin, Kurt Sandlin, Charles Scott, Connie Sexton, Daren Sexton, Denny Sexton, Ellen Sexton, Michael Sexton, Peggy Sexton, Robert Sexton, Hershel Shepherd, Darlena Sifers, Nickie Sifers, Ginger Simmons, James Simmons, Jean Slone, Palmer Slone, Christopher Smith, Greg Smith, Harvey Smith, Langley Smith, Rebecca Smith, Sara Smith, Verlin Smith, William Smith, Alvin Spangler, Juanita Spangler, Greta Spears, Johnny Spears, James Spradlin, Lois Spradlin, Earl Spurlock, Jackie Stanley, Paul Stanley, William Stanley, Donna Stewart, Tony Stewart, German Stumbo, Darla Sturgill, Ellis Sturgill, Madge Sturgill, Melony Sturgill, Paul Sturgill, Randy Sturgill, Richard Sturgill, Kermit Swiney, Rhonda Swiney, Ricky Swiney, Donna Tackett, Douglas Tackett, James Tackett, James Tackett, Jeffery Tackett, Johnny Tackett, Jordan Tackett, Juanita Tackett, Mary Tackett, Tracy Tackett, Garrett Taylor, Melana Taylor, Andy Thacker, Anna Thacker, Brian Thacker, Bridget Thacker, Iris Thacker, James Thacker, Kevin Thacker, Kristy Thacker, Leann Thacker, Lora Thacker, Phillip Thacker, Ronald Thacker, Roy Thacker, Tammy Thacker, Thomas Thacker, A. J. Thornsberry, Myra Thornsberry, Tim Totten, Jennifer Tottn, Mary Tyree, Thomas Tyree, Carmella Varney, Inez Varney, Rodie Varney, Herman Wallen, Annette Ward, Steve Ward, Connie Joyce White, Keithal White, James Whitt, Donald Williams, Eugenia Williams, Loretta Williams, Mary Ann Williams, Mason Williams, Ricky Williams, Karen Wolford, Randy Wolford, Sidney Wolford, Betty Wright, Brenda Wright, Jackie Wright, Rebecca Wright, Rickey Wright, Ronnie Wright, Sherry Wright, Thomas Wright, Tommy Wright, Verdie Wright, Betsy Yonts and James Yonts. Certificate of Service: 04/10/2023. Argument Request: requested. [23-5232]--[Edited 04/11/2023 by RLB] (MM) [Entered: 04/10/2023 07:17 PM]
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER filed the motion for leave to file and amicus brief [ # 29 ] for the Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America is GRANTED. Entered by order of the court. (RLB) [Entered: 04/10/2023 12:23 PM]
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AMICUS BRIEF filed by U.S. Chamber of Commerce , without parties' consent. Certificate of Service:04/07/2023. [23-5232] (JB) [Entered: 04/07/2023 05:26 PM]
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to file AMICUS BRIEF filed by John H. Beiser for Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. Certificate of Service: 04/07/2023. [23-5232] (JB) [Entered: 04/07/2023 05:17 PM]
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ***DOCUMENT LOCKED - INCORRECT ATTACHMENT - COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE THE MOTION TO FILE AN AMICUS BRIEF AND THE AMICUS BRIEF AS SEPARATE ELECTRONIC ENTRIES*** MOTION to file AMICUS BRIEF filed by John H. Beisner for Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. Certificate of Service: 04/07/2023. [23-5232]--[Edited 04/07/2023 by RLB] (JB) [Entered: 04/07/2023 04:53 PM]
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America by John H. Beisner. Certificate of Service: 04/07/2023. [23-5232] (JB) [Entered: 04/07/2023 10:54 AM]
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Alice Adams, Andrea Adams, Benjamin Adams, Brian Adams, Edward Adams, James Adams, James R. Adams, Phyllis Adams, Rosetta Adams, Susie Adams, Gregory Addington, Stephanie Addington, Gary Adkins, James Adkins, Julian Adkins, Pheobe Adkins, Ronnie Adkins, Brenda Akers, Clark Akers, Edward Akers, Ellis Akers, Lasheri Akers, James Allen, Kenneth Allen, Shanna Allen, Susan Allen, Betty Anderson, Carl Anderson, Dinah Anderson, Gary Anderson, Inard Anderson, Kathy Anderson, Luther Anderson, Maggie Anderson, Terry Anderson, Michale Arnett, David Ashley, Vickey Ashley, Darcus Austin, Windell Austin, Eddie Back, Marlene Back, Tera Back, William Back, Alice Baker, Darlene Baker, Gary Baker, Lonnie Baker, Rodney Baker, Steven Baker, Francis Balthis, Harold Balthis, Rose Balthis, Tim Balthis, Chris Banks, Peggy Banks, Robert Banks, John Barker, Pauline Barnett, Roger Barnett, Billy Bartley, Rita Bartley, Gary Bennett, Jacklyn Bentley, Kevin Bentley, Nickey Bentley, Patricia Bentley, Steven Bentley, James Bently, Teresa Lynn Bently, Kevin Bevins, Rikka Bevins, Robin Biliter, Roy Biliter, Brandon Blackburn, Jennifer Blackburn, Michael Blackburn, Patricia Blair, Roger Blair, Charles Blankenship, Jason Blankenship, Lora Blankenship, Maggie Blankenship, Melissa Blankenship, Stella Blankenship, Brenda Bowling, Freddie Bowling, Ronnie Bowling, Tammy Bowling, Joey Boyd, Patty Boyd, Raymond Branham, Tracey Branham, Richard Brashear, Tomeka Brashear, Jennifer Browning, Richard Browning, Carol Bryant, Charles Bryant, Artemus Campbell, Sandra Campbell, Cheyenne Cantrell, Thomas Cantrell, Angela Carroll, Lloyd Carroll, Crystal Case, Stephan Case, Angela Casey, Terry Casey, Elmer Castle, Paul Castle, Stella Castle, Kenneth Caudill, Randy Caudill, Retho Caudill, Tina Caudill, Wanda Chafin, William Chafin, Cleo Chapman, Gary Chapman, Margaret Chapman, Neil Chapman, Rodney Chapman, Sabrina Chapman, Teresa Chapman, David Charles, James Cline, Melissa Cline, Balinda Colemam, Barry Coleman, Darrius Coleman, Ervin Coleman, Eugene Coleman, Lola Ann Coleman, Paula Marie Coleman, Dawn Coley, Greg Coley, Billy Collins, Brian Collins, Christy Collins, David Collins, Jodi Collins, Mary Collins, Nila Collins, Oscar Collins, Roy Collins, Tonya Collins, Danny Compton, Rhonda Compton, Amarine Conn, Faye Conn, Gabriel Conn, James Conn, Virgil Conn, Colin Cook, Jamie Cook, Daniel Coots, Heather Coots, Anthony Cornett, Sheila Cornett, Jonathan Crisp, John Cure, Jr., Kim Cure, Michelle Dales, Sonny Dales, Craig Damron, Kennetih Ray Damron, Melinda Damron, Robert Damron, Thomas Damron, Gene Daniels, Kevin Daniels, Rita Daniels, Donald Davis, Teresa Davis, Shelby Daylong, Carrol Derry, Michael Dingus, Brian Dotson, Kevin Dotson, Nikki Dotson, Todd Dyes, Drema Elswick, Michael Elswick, Larry Epling, Larry Epling, Leon Epling, Mabel Epling, Rhonda Epling, James Estep, Velvet Estep, Diane Fife, Brandon Fleming, Joshua Fleming, Rebecca Fleming, Burnis Fouts, Gomer Fouts, Patricia Fouts, Randy Fouts, Sara Fouts, Jackie Francis, Joann Francis, Jeffery Fuller, Karen Fuller, Richard Fuller, Ruth Fuller, Brenda Gayheart, Brett Gayheart, Henrietta Gibson, James Gibson, Jimmy Gibson, Judy Gibson, Carlos Gilley, Norma Gilley, Robert Goff, Brandy Good, Carol Good, Christopher Good, Olen Good, Calvin Gregory, Marsha Gregory, Clara Griffey, Kevin Griffey, Anthony Hall, Archie Hall, Belinda Hall, Donnie Hall, Dorothy Hall, Dustin Hall, Eddie Hall, Hillary Hall, Jody Hall, Kim Hall, Patricia Hall, Ronnie Hall, Tonya Hall, Amanda Hamilton, Emily Hamilton, James Hamilton, Jamie Hamilton, Jeanene Hamilton, Justine Hamilton, Stevie Hamilton, Ellen Hampton, Tommy Hampton, Angela Hardin, David Hardin, Randolph Hardin, Anita Harris, Brian Harris, Debra Hatfield, Gregory Hatfield, John Hayes, Richard Henson, Dana Hilton, Kenneth Hilton, Valerie Horn, Loretta Horne, Donny Howard, Franklin Howell, Pamela Hunt, Teddy Hunt, Kevin Hutchinson, Danny Isaac, Shirley Isaac, Arlinda Jarvis, Estill Jarvis, Marvin Jervis, Brian Johnson, Debra Johnson, Jessica Johnson, Roy Johnson, Royal Johnson, Travis Johnson, Amanda Jones, Robert Jones, Claude Jude, Jennifer Jude, Joey Jude, Courtney Justice, Dustin Justice, Stephen Justice, Gary Keene, Shirley Keene, Andra Kendrick, Burbon Kendrick, Helena Kendrick, Roger Kendrick, Harold Kidd, Lisa Kidd, Bobby Kincer, Jacqueline Kincer, Jeffrey Kinder, Irene Kiser, Farris Lawson, Juanita Lawson, Norval Lawson, Sara Elizabeth Lawson, Jacqueline Layne, James Layne, Hattie Lester, Ronald Lester, Angela Little, Anona Little, Herman Little, Herman Little, Jerry Little, Kamela Little, Kenneth Little, Kevin Little, Missy Little, Robert Little, Sharon Little, David Maggard, Regina Maggard, Joshua Mahon, Clinnon Martin, Douglas Martin, James Martin, Jeffrey Martin, Albert Matney, Darlene Matney, Roger Matney, Ruby Matney, Van Mayhorn, Angela Maynard, Christopher Maynard, Clifford Maynard, Kayla Maynard, Sarah Maynard, Timothy Maynard, Charles McClanahan, Brenda McCoy, Willie McCoy, Ava McFarland, William McFarland, Jr., David McGuire, Julie McGuire, Debbie McIntosh, Rodney McIntosh, Sasha McKinney, Stephanie McKinney, Andrea Meade, Daniel Meade, Danny Meade, Danyel Meade, Kenneth Meade, Lisa Meade, Vent Meadows, Jeff Miller, Kathryn Miller, Quillia Miller, Raymond Miller, Ronald Miller, Teresa Miller, Theresa Miller, Linda Minix, Martin Minix, Foster Mitchell, Gladys Mitchell, Sylena Moon, Troy Moon, Edward Moore, Elvie Moore, Ernie Moore, Jerry Moore, Rick Moore, Rita Moore, Stacey Moore, Charles Mounts, Jennifer Mounts, Larry Lee Mounts, Bobby Mullins, Charles Mullins, Donnie Mullins, Hope Mullins, Joseph Mullins, Melissa Mullins, Richard Mullins, Ronnie Mullins, Sammy Mullins, Wilma Mullins, Audie Murphy, Christine Murphy, Stella Music, Frankie Myers, Edgar Scott Newman, Rhonda Newman, Lloyd Newsom, Allard Newsome, Anita Newsome, Barry Newsome, Dale Newsome, Darlene Newsome, Donald Newsome, Gloria Newsome, James Newsome, Jerry Newsome, Jimmy Newsome, Karen Newsome, Larry Newsome, Leroy Newsome, Tabitha Newsome, Teddy Newsome, Terry Newsome, Wayne Newsome, William Newsome, Jr., Carl Norman, Terry Norman, Donna Osbourne, Doris Osbourne, Kimberly Page, Norman Page, Cynthia Patton, Charles Pease, Imogene Pease, Amy Phillips, Brenda Phillips, John Phillips, Jeffrey Pinson, Stacie Pinson, Johnny Pittman, Peggy Pittman, Charlene Potter, Jeffrey Potter, Ransom Prater, Eadie Price, Timmy Price, Celeste Pugh, Dennie Pugh, Mary Pugh, Robert Pugh, Delores Ratliff, Donald Ratliff, Jeff Ratliff, Sr., Melinda Ratliff, Glenda Ray, Jimmy Ray, Larry Ray, David Reed, Susan Reed, Sherrell Reid, Donnie Reynolds, Eugena Reynolds, Linda Reynolds, Stelfon Reynolds, James Rich, Valerie Rich, Chendla Richardson, Markus Richardson, Mary Riley, Terry Riley, Connie Roberts, Fredrick Roberts, Rodney Rose, Stephanie Rose, Deborah Runyon, Kathy Runyon, RIcky Runyon, William Runyon, Mitchell Salyers, Ruby Salyers, Donna Sanders, Moses Sanders, Raymond Sanders, Erica Sandlin, Kurt Sandlin, Charles Scott, Connie Sexton, Daren Sexton, Denny Sexton, Ellen Sexton, Michael Sexton, Peggy Sexton, Robert Sexton, Hershel Shepherd, Darlena Sifers, Nickie Sifers, Ginger Simmons, James Simmons, Jean Slone, Palmer Slone, Christopher Smith, Greg Smith, Harvey Smith, Langley Smith, Rebecca Smith, Sara Smith, Verlin Smith, William Smith, Alvin Spangler, Juanita Spangler, Greta Spears, Johnny Spears, James Spradlin, Lois Spradlin, Earl Spurlock, Jackie Stanley, Paul Stanley, William Stanley, Donna Stewart, Tony Stewart, German Stumbo, Darla Sturgill, Ellis Sturgill, Madge Sturgill, Melony Sturgill, Paul Sturgill, Randy Sturgill, Richard Sturgill, Kermit Swiney, Rhonda Swiney, Ricky Swiney, Donna Tackett, Douglas Tackett, James Tackett, Jeffery Tackett, Johnny Tackett, Jordan Tackett, Juanita Tackett, Mary Tackett, Tracy Tackett, Garrett Taylor, Melana Taylor, Andy Thacker, Anna Thacker, Brian Thacker, Bridget Thacker, Iris Thacker, James Thacker, Kevin Thacker, Kristy Thacker, Leann Thacker, Lora Thacker, Phillip Thacker, Ronald Thacker, Roy Thacker, Tammy Thacker, Thomas Thacker, A. J. Thornsberry, Myra Thornsberry, Tim Totten, Jennifer Tottn, Mary Tyree, Thomas Tyree, Carmella Varney, Inez Varney, Rodie Varney, Herman Wallen, Annette Ward, Steve Ward, Connie Joyce White, Keithal White, James Whitt, Donald Williams, Eugenia Williams, Loretta Williams, Mary Ann Williams, Mason Williams, Ricky Williams, Karen Wolford, Randy Wolford, Sidney Wolford, Betty Wright, Brenda Wright, Jackie Wright, Rebecca Wright, Rickey Wright, Ronnie Wright, Sherry Wright, Thomas Wright, Tommy Wright, Verdie Wright, Betsy Yonts and James Yonts by Johnny Givens. Certificate of Service: 04/05/2023. [23-5232] (JG) [Entered: 04/05/2023 04:54 PM]
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 22 ], filed by Mr. Johnny Givens for Brian Adams, et al. is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. Deficiency to be corrected by 04/12/2023. (RLB) [Entered: 04/05/2023 07:52 AM]
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Argument acknowledgment filed by Attorney Mr. Michael A. Scodro for Appellant 3M Company. Certificate of Service: 04/04/2023. [23-5232] (MAS) [Entered: 04/04/2023 06:34 PM]
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Argument acknowledgment filed by Attorney Mr. Michael Martin for Appellees Alice Adams, Andrea Adams, Benjamin Adams, Brian Adams, Edward Adams, James Adams, James R. Adams, Phyllis Adams, Rosetta Adams, Susie Adams, Gregory Addington, Stephanie Addington, Gary Adkins, James Adkins, James Adkins, Julian Adkins, Pheobe Adkins, Ronnie Adkins, Brenda Akers, Clark Akers, Edward Akers, Ellis Akers, Lasheri Akers, James Allen, Kenneth Allen, Shanna Allen, Susan Allen, Betty Anderson, Carl Anderson, Dinah Anderson, Gary Anderson, Inard Anderson, Kathy Anderson, Luther Anderson, Maggie Anderson, Terry Anderson, Michale Arnett, David Ashley, Vickey Ashley, Darcus Austin, Windell Austin, Eddie Back, Marlene Back, Tera Back, William Back, Alice Baker, Darlene Baker, Gary Baker, Lonnie Baker, Rodney Baker, Steven Baker, Francis Balthis, Harold Balthis, Rose Balthis, Tim Balthis, Chris Banks, Peggy Banks, Robert Banks, John Barker, Pauline Barnett, Roger Barnett, Billy Bartley, Rita Bartley, Gary Bennett, Jacklyn Bentley, Kevin Bentley, Nickey Bentley, Patricia Bentley, Steven Bentley, James Bently, Teresa Lynn Bently, Kevin Bevins, Rikka Bevins, Robin Biliter, Roy Biliter, Brandon Blackburn, Jennifer Blackburn, Michael Blackburn, Patricia Blair, Roger Blair, Charles Blankenship, Jason Blankenship, Lora Blankenship, Maggie Blankenship, Melissa Blankenship, Stella Blankenship, Brenda Bowling, Freddie Bowling, Ronnie Bowling, Tammy Bowling, Joey Boyd, Patty Boyd, Raymond Branham, Tracey Branham, Richard Brashear, Tomeka Brashear, Jennifer Browning, Richard Browning, Carol Bryant, Charles Bryant, Artemus Campbell, Sandra Campbell, Cheyenne Cantrell, Thomas Cantrell, Angela Carroll, Lloyd Carroll, Crystal Case, Stephan Case, Angela Casey, Terry Casey, Elmer Castle, Paul Castle, Stella Castle, Kenneth Caudill, Randy Caudill, Retho Caudill, Tina Caudill, Wanda Chafin, William Chafin, Cleo Chapman, Gary Chapman, Margaret Chapman, Neil Chapman, Rodney Chapman, Sabrina Chapman, Teresa Chapman, David Charles, James Cline, Melissa Cline, Balinda Colemam, Barry Coleman, Darrius Coleman, Ervin Coleman, Eugene Coleman, Lola Ann Coleman, Paula Marie Coleman, Dawn Coley, Greg Coley, Billy Collins, Brian Collins, Christy Collins, David Collins, Jodi Collins, Mary Collins, Nila Collins, Oscar Collins, Roy Collins, Tonya Collins, Danny Compton, Rhonda Compton, Amarine Conn, Faye Conn, Gabriel Conn, James Conn, Virgil Conn, Colin Cook, Jamie Cook, Daniel Coots, Heather Coots, Anthony Cornett, Sheila Cornett, Jonathan Crisp, John Cure, Jr., Kim Cure, Michelle Dales, Sonny Dales, Craig Damron, Kennetih Ray Damron, Melinda Damron, Robert Damron, Thomas Damron, Gene Daniels, Kevin Daniels, Rita Daniels, Donald Davis, Teresa Davis, Shelby Daylong, Carrol Derry, Michael Dingus, Brian Dotson, Kevin Dotson, Nikki Dotson, Todd Dyes, Drema Elswick, Michael Elswick, Larry Epling, Larry Epling, Leon Epling, Mabel Epling, Rhonda Epling, James Estep, Velvet Estep, Diane Fife, Brandon Fleming, Joshua Fleming, Rebecca Fleming, Burnis Fouts, Gomer Fouts, Patricia Fouts, Randy Fouts, Sara Fouts, Jackie Francis, Joann Francis, Jeffery Fuller, Karen Fuller, Richard Fuller, Ruth Fuller, Brenda Gayheart, Brett Gayheart, Henrietta Gibson, James Gibson, Jimmy Gibson, Judy Gibson, Carlos Gilley, Norma Gilley, Robert Goff, Brandy Good, Carol Good, Christopher Good, Olen Good, Calvin Gregory, Marsha Gregory, Clara Griffey, Kevin Griffey, Anthony Hall, Archie Hall, Belinda Hall, Donnie Hall, Dorothy Hall, Dustin Hall, Eddie Hall, Hillary Hall, Jody Hall, Kim Hall, Patricia Hall, Ronnie Hall, Tonya Hall, Amanda Hamilton, Emily Hamilton, James Hamilton, Jamie Hamilton, Jeanene Hamilton, Justine Hamilton, Stevie Hamilton, Ellen Hampton, Tommy Hampton, Angela Hardin, David Hardin, Randolph Hardin, Anita Harris, Brian Harris, Debra Hatfield, Gregory Hatfield, John Hayes, Richard Henson, Dana Hilton, Kenneth Hilton, Valerie Horn, Loretta Horne, Donny Howard, Franklin Howell, Pamela Hunt, Teddy Hunt, Kevin Hutchinson, Danny Isaac, Shirley Isaac, Arlinda Jarvis, Estill Jarvis, Marvin Jervis, Brian Johnson, Debra Johnson, Jessica Johnson, Roy Johnson, Royal Johnson, Travis Johnson, Amanda Jones, Robert Jones, Claude Jude, Jennifer Jude, Joey Jude, Courtney Justice, Dustin Justice, Stephen Justice, Gary Keene, Shirley Keene, Andra Kendrick, Burbon Kendrick, Helena Kendrick, Roger Kendrick, Harold Kidd, Lisa Kidd, Bobby Kincer, Jacqueline Kincer, Jeffrey Kinder, Irene Kiser, Farris Lawson, Juanita Lawson, Norval Lawson, Sara Elizabeth Lawson, Jacqueline Layne, James Layne, Hattie Lester, Ronald Lester, Angela Little, Anona Little, Herman Little, Herman Little, Jerry Little, Kamela Little, Kenneth Little, Kevin Little, Missy Little, Robert Little, Sharon Little, David Maggard, Regina Maggard, Joshua Mahon, Clinnon Martin, Douglas Martin, James Martin, Jeffrey Martin, Albert Matney, Darlene Matney, Roger Matney, Ruby Matney, Van Mayhorn, Angela Maynard, Christopher Maynard, Clifford Maynard, Kayla Maynard, Sarah Maynard, Timothy Maynard, Charles McClanahan, Brenda McCoy, Willie McCoy, Ava McFarland, William McFarland, Jr., David McGuire, Julie McGuire, Debbie McIntosh, Rodney McIntosh, Sasha McKinney, Stephanie McKinney, Andrea Meade, Daniel Meade, Danny Meade, Danyel Meade, Kenneth Meade, Lisa Meade, Vent Meadows, Jeff Miller, Kathryn Miller, Quillia Miller, Raymond Miller, Ronald Miller, Teresa Miller, Theresa Miller, Linda Minix, Martin Minix, Foster Mitchell, Gladys Mitchell, Sylena Moon, Troy Moon, Edward Moore, Elvie Moore, Ernie Moore, Jerry Moore, Rick Moore, Rita Moore, Stacey Moore, Charles Mounts, Jennifer Mounts, Larry Lee Mounts, Bobby Mullins, Charles Mullins, Donnie Mullins, Hope Mullins, Joseph Mullins, Melissa Mullins, Richard Mullins, Ronnie Mullins, Sammy Mullins, Wilma Mullins, Audie Murphy, Christine Murphy, Stella Music, Frankie Myers, Edgar Scott Newman, Rhonda Newman, Lloyd Newsom, Allard Newsome, Anita Newsome, Barry Newsome, Dale Newsome, Darlene Newsome, Donald Newsome, Gloria Newsome, James Newsome, Jerry Newsome, Jimmy Newsome, Karen Newsome, Larry Newsome, Leroy Newsome, Tabitha Newsome, Teddy Newsome, Terry Newsome, Wayne Newsome, William Newsome, Jr., Carl Norman, Terry Norman, Donna Osbourne, Doris Osbourne, Kimberly Page, Norman Page, Cynthia Patton, Charles Pease, Imogene Pease, Amy Phillips, Brenda Phillips, John Phillips, Jeffrey Pinson, Stacie Pinson, Johnny Pittman, Peggy Pittman, Charlene Potter, Jeffrey Potter, Ransom Prater, Eadie Price, Timmy Price, Celeste Pugh, Dennie Pugh, Mary Pugh, Robert Pugh, Delores Ratliff, Donald Ratliff, Jeff Ratliff, Sr., Melinda Ratliff, Glenda Ray, Jimmy Ray, Larry Ray, David Reed, Susan Reed, Sherrell Reid, Donnie Reynolds, Eugena Reynolds, Linda Reynolds, Stelfon Reynolds, James Rich, Valerie Rich, Chendla Richardson, Markus Richardson, Mary Riley, Terry Riley, Connie Roberts, Fredrick Roberts, Rodney Rose, Stephanie Rose, Deborah Runyon, Kathy Runyon, RIcky Runyon, William Runyon, Mitchell Salyers, Ruby Salyers, Donna Sanders, Moses Sanders, Raymond Sanders, Erica Sandlin, Kurt Sandlin, Charles Scott, Connie Sexton, Daren Sexton, Denny Sexton, Ellen Sexton, Michael Sexton, Peggy Sexton, Robert Sexton, Hershel Shepherd, Darlena Sifers, Nickie Sifers, Ginger Simmons, James Simmons, Jean Slone, Palmer Slone, Christopher Smith, Greg Smith, Harvey Smith, Langley Smith, Rebecca Smith, Sara Smith, Verlin Smith, William Smith, Alvin Spangler, Juanita Spangler, Greta Spears, Johnny Spears, James Spradlin, Lois Spradlin, Earl Spurlock, Jackie Stanley, Paul Stanley, William Stanley, Donna Stewart, Tony Stewart, German Stumbo, Darla Sturgill, Ellis Sturgill, Madge Sturgill, Melony Sturgill, Paul Sturgill, Randy Sturgill, Richard Sturgill, Kermit Swiney, Rhonda Swiney, Ricky Swiney, Donna Tackett, Douglas Tackett, James Tackett, James Tackett, Jeffery Tackett, Johnny Tackett, Jordan Tackett, Juanita Tackett, Mary Tackett, Tracy Tackett, Garrett Taylor, Melana Taylor, Andy Thacker, Anna Thacker, Brian Thacker, Bridget Thacker, Iris Thacker, James Thacker, Kevin Thacker, Kristy Thacker, Leann Thacker, Lora Thacker, Phillip Thacker, Ronald Thacker, Roy Thacker, Tammy Thacker, Thomas Thacker, A. J. Thornsberry, Myra Thornsberry, Tim Totten, Jennifer Tottn, Mary Tyree, Thomas Tyree, Carmella Varney, Inez Varney, Rodie Varney, Herman Wallen, Annette Ward, Steve Ward, Connie Joyce White, Keithal White, James Whitt, Donald Williams, Eugenia Williams, Loretta Williams, Mary Ann Williams, Mason Williams, Ricky Williams, Karen Wolford, Randy Wolford, Sidney Wolford, Betty Wright, Brenda Wright, Jackie Wright, Rebecca Wright, Rickey Wright, Ronnie Wright, Sherry Wright, Thomas Wright, Tommy Wright, Verdie Wright, Betsy Yonts and James Yonts. Certificate of Service: 04/04/2023. [23-5232] (MM) [Entered: 04/04/2023 12:05 PM]
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ***FORM LOCKED - INCORRECT FORMAT - COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE AS NON-MODIFIABLE .pdf DOCUMENT*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Alice Adams, Andrea Adams, Benjamin Adams, Brian Adams, Edward Adams, James Adams, James R. Adams, Phyllis Adams, Rosetta Adams, Susie Adams, Gregory Addington, Stephanie Addington, Gary Adkins, James Adkins, Julian Adkins, Pheobe Adkins, Ronnie Adkins, Brenda Akers, Clark Akers, Edward Akers, Ellis Akers, Lasheri Akers, James Allen, Kenneth Allen, Shanna Allen, Susan Allen, Betty Anderson, Carl Anderson, Dinah Anderson, Gary Anderson, Inard Anderson, Kathy Anderson, Luther Anderson, Maggie Anderson, Terry Anderson, Michale Arnett, David Ashley, Vickey Ashley, Darcus Austin, Windell Austin, Eddie Back, Marlene Back, Tera Back, William Back, Alice Baker, Darlene Baker, Gary Baker, Lonnie Baker, Rodney Baker, Steven Baker, Francis Balthis, Harold Balthis, Rose Balthis, Tim Balthis, Chris Banks, Peggy Banks, Robert Banks, John Barker, Pauline Barnett, Roger Barnett, Billy Bartley, Rita Bartley, Gary Bennett, Jacklyn Bentley, Kevin Bentley, Nickey Bentley, Patricia Bentley, Steven Bentley, James Bently, Teresa Lynn Bently, Kevin Bevins, Rikka Bevins, Robin Biliter, Roy Biliter, Brandon Blackburn, Jennifer Blackburn, Michael Blackburn, Patricia Blair, Roger Blair, Charles Blankenship, Jason Blankenship, Lora Blankenship, Maggie Blankenship, Melissa Blankenship, Stella Blankenship, Brenda Bowling, Freddie Bowling, Ronnie Bowling, Tammy Bowling, Joey Boyd, Patty Boyd, Raymond Branham, Tracey Branham, Richard Brashear, Tomeka Brashear, Jennifer Browning, Richard Browning, Carol Bryant, Charles Bryant, Artemus Campbell, Sandra Campbell, Cheyenne Cantrell, Thomas Cantrell, Angela Carroll, Lloyd Carroll, Crystal Case, Stephan Case, Angela Casey, Terry Casey, Elmer Castle, Paul Castle, Stella Castle, Kenneth Caudill, Randy Caudill, Retho Caudill, Tina Caudill, Wanda Chafin, William Chafin, Cleo Chapman, Gary Chapman, Margaret Chapman, Neil Chapman, Rodney Chapman, Sabrina Chapman, Teresa Chapman, David Charles, James Cline, Melissa Cline, Balinda Colemam, Barry Coleman, Darrius Coleman, Ervin Coleman, Eugene Coleman, Lola Ann Coleman, Paula Marie Coleman, Dawn Coley, Greg Coley, Billy Collins, Brian Collins, Christy Collins, David Collins, Jodi Collins, Mary Collins, Nila Collins, Oscar Collins, Roy Collins, Tonya Collins, Danny Compton, Rhonda Compton, Amarine Conn, Faye Conn, Gabriel Conn, James Conn, Virgil Conn, Colin Cook, Jamie Cook, Daniel Coots, Heather Coots, Anthony Cornett, Sheila Cornett, Jonathan Crisp, John Cure, Jr., Kim Cure, Michelle Dales, Sonny Dales, Craig Damron, Kennetih Ray Damron, Melinda Damron, Robert Damron, Thomas Damron, Gene Daniels, Kevin Daniels, Rita Daniels, Donald Davis, Teresa Davis, Shelby Daylong, Carrol Derry, Michael Dingus, Brian Dotson, Kevin Dotson, Nikki Dotson, Todd Dyes, Drema Elswick, Michael Elswick, Larry Epling, Larry Epling, Leon Epling, Mabel Epling, Rhonda Epling, James Estep, Velvet Estep, Diane Fife, Brandon Fleming, Joshua Fleming, Rebecca Fleming, Burnis Fouts, Gomer Fouts, Patricia Fouts, Randy Fouts, Sara Fouts, Jackie Francis, Joann Francis, Jeffery Fuller, Karen Fuller, Richard Fuller, Ruth Fuller, Brenda Gayheart, Brett Gayheart, Henrietta Gibson, James Gibson, Jimmy Gibson, Judy Gibson, Carlos Gilley, Norma Gilley, Robert Goff, Brandy Good, Carol Good, Christopher Good, Olen Good, Calvin Gregory, Marsha Gregory, Clara Griffey, Kevin Griffey, Anthony Hall, Archie Hall, Belinda Hall, Donnie Hall, Dorothy Hall, Dustin Hall, Eddie Hall, Hillary Hall, Jody Hall, Kim Hall, Patricia Hall, Ronnie Hall, Tonya Hall, Amanda Hamilton, Emily Hamilton, James Hamilton, Jamie Hamilton, Jeanene Hamilton, Justine Hamilton, Stevie Hamilton, Ellen Hampton, Tommy Hampton, Angela Hardin, David Hardin, Randolph Hardin, Anita Harris, Brian Harris, Debra Hatfield, Gregory Hatfield, John Hayes, Richard Henson, Dana Hilton, Kenneth Hilton, Valerie Horn, Loretta Horne, Donny Howard, Franklin Howell, Pamela Hunt, Teddy Hunt, Kevin Hutchinson, Danny Isaac, Shirley Isaac, Arlinda Jarvis, Estill Jarvis, Marvin Jervis, Brian Johnson, Debra Johnson, Jessica Johnson, Roy Johnson, Royal Johnson, Travis Johnson, Amanda Jones, Robert Jones, Claude Jude, Jennifer Jude, Joey Jude, Courtney Justice, Dustin Justice, Stephen Justice, Gary Keene, Shirley Keene, Andra Kendrick, Burbon Kendrick, Helena Kendrick, Roger Kendrick, Harold Kidd, Lisa Kidd, Bobby Kincer, Jacqueline Kincer, Jeffrey Kinder, Irene Kiser, Farris Lawson, Juanita Lawson, Norval Lawson, Sara Elizabeth Lawson, Jacqueline Layne, James Layne, Hattie Lester, Ronald Lester, Angela Little, Anona Little, Herman Little, Herman Little, Jerry Little, Kamela Little, Kenneth Little, Kevin Little, Missy Little, Robert Little, Sharon Little, David Maggard, Regina Maggard, Joshua Mahon, Clinnon Martin, Douglas Martin, James Martin, Jeffrey Martin, Albert Matney, Darlene Matney, Roger Matney, Ruby Matney, Van Mayhorn, Angela Maynard, Christopher Maynard, Clifford Maynard, Kayla Maynard, Sarah Maynard, Timothy Maynard, Charles McClanahan, Brenda McCoy, Willie McCoy, Ava McFarland, William McFarland, Jr., David McGuire, Julie McGuire, Debbie McIntosh, Rodney McIntosh, Sasha McKinney, Stephanie McKinney, Andrea Meade, Daniel Meade, Danny Meade, Danyel Meade, Kenneth Meade, Lisa Meade, Vent Meadows, Jeff Miller, Kathryn Miller, Quillia Miller, Raymond Miller, Ronald Miller, Teresa Miller, Theresa Miller, Martin Minix, Foster Mitchell, Gladys Mitchell, Sylena Moon, Troy Moon, Edward Moore, Elvie Moore, Ernie Moore, Jerry Moore, Rick Moore, Rita Moore, Stacey Moore, Charles Mounts, Jennifer Mounts, Larry Lee Mounts, Bobby Mullins, Charles Mullins, Donnie Mullins, Hope Mullins, Joseph Mullins, Melissa Mullins, Richard Mullins, Ronnie Mullins, Sammy Mullins, Wilma Mullins, Audie Murphy, Christine Murphy, Stella Music, Frankie Myers, Edgar Scott Newman, Rhonda Newman, Lloyd Newsom, Allard Newsome, Anita Newsome, Barry Newsome, Dale Newsome, Darlene Newsome, Donald Newsome, Gloria Newsome, James Newsome, Jerry Newsome, Jimmy Newsome, Karen Newsome, Larry Newsome, Leroy Newsome, Tabitha Newsome, Teddy Newsome, Terry Newsome, Wayne Newsome, William Newsome, Jr., Carl Norman, Terry Norman, Donna Osbourne, Doris Osbourne, Kimberly Page, Norman Page, Cynthia Patton, Charles Pease, Imogene Pease, Amy Phillips, Brenda Phillips, John Phillips, Jeffrey Pinson, Stacie Pinson, Johnny Pittman, Peggy Pittman, Charlene Potter, Jeffrey Potter, Ransom Prater, Eadie Price, Timmy Price, Celeste Pugh, Dennie Pugh, Mary Pugh, Robert Pugh, Delores Ratliff, Donald Ratliff, Jeff Ratliff, Sr., Melinda Ratliff, Glenda Ray, Jimmy Ray, Larry Ray, David Reed, Susan Reed, Sherrell Reid, Donnie Reynolds, Eugena Reynolds, Linda Reynolds, Stelfon Reynolds, James Rich, Valerie Rich, Chendla Richardson, Markus Richardson, Mary Riley, Terry Riley, Connie Roberts, Fredrick Roberts, Rodney Rose, Stephanie Rose, Deborah Runyon, Kathy Runyon, RIcky Runyon, William Runyon, Mitchell Salyers, Ruby Salyers, Donna Sanders, Moses Sanders, Raymond Sanders, Erica Sandlin, Kurt Sandlin, Charles Scott, Connie Sexton, Daren Sexton, Denny Sexton, Ellen Sexton, Michael Sexton, Peggy Sexton, Robert Sexton, Hershel Shepherd, Darlena Sifers, Nickie Sifers, Ginger Simmons, James Simmons, Jean Slone, Palmer Slone, Christopher Smith, Greg Smith, Harvey Smith, Langley Smith, Rebecca Smith, Sara Smith, Verlin Smith, William Smith, Alvin Spangler, Juanita Spangler, Greta Spears, Johnny Spears, James Spradlin, Lois Spradlin, Earl Spurlock, Jackie Stanley, Paul Stanley, William Stanley, Donna Stewart, Tony Stewart, German Stumbo, Darla Sturgill, Ellis Sturgill, Madge Sturgill, Melony Sturgill, Paul Sturgill, Randy Sturgill, Richard Sturgill, Kermit Swiney, Rhonda Swiney, Ricky Swiney, Donna Tackett, Douglas Tackett, James Tackett, Jeffery Tackett, Johnny Tackett, Jordan Tackett, Juanita Tackett, Mary Tackett, Tracy Tackett, Garrett Taylor, Melana Taylor, Andy Thacker, Anna Thacker, Brian Thacker, Bridget Thacker, Iris Thacker, James Thacker, Kevin Thacker, Kristy Thacker, Leann Thacker, Lora Thacker, Phillip Thacker, Ronald Thacker, Roy Thacker, Tammy Thacker, Thomas Thacker, A. J. Thornsberry, Myra Thornsberry, Tim Totten, Jennifer Tottn, Mary Tyree, Thomas Tyree, Carmella Varney, Inez Varney, Rodie Varney, Herman Wallen, Annette Ward, Steve Ward, Connie Joyce White, Keithal White, James Whitt, Donald Williams, Eugenia Williams, Loretta Williams, Mary Ann Williams, Mason Williams, Ricky Williams, Karen Wolford, Randy Wolford, Sidney Wolford, Betty Wright, Brenda Wright, Jackie Wright, Rebecca Wright, Rickey Wright, Ronnie Wright, Sherry Wright, Thomas Wright, Tommy Wright, Verdie Wright, Betsy Yonts and James Yonts by Johnny Givens. Certificate of Service: 04/04/2023. [23-5232]--[Edited 04/05/2023 by RLB] (JG) [Entered: 04/04/2023 10:20 AM]
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Evan Mark Tager for 3M Company. Certificate of Service: 03/31/2023. Argument Request: requested. [23-5232] (EMT) [Entered: 03/31/2023 07:53 PM]
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant 3M Company by Michael A. Scodro. Certificate of Service: 03/30/2023. [23-5232] (MAS) [Entered: 03/31/2023 12:18 AM]
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. Michael Martin for Alice Adams, Andrea Adams, Benjamin Adams, Brian Adams, Edward Adams, James Adams, James R. Adams, Phyllis Adams, Rosetta Adams, Susie Adams, Gregory Addington, Stephanie Addington, Gary Adkins, James Adkins, James Adkins, Julian Adkins, Pheobe Adkins, Ronnie Adkins, Brenda Akers, Clark Akers, Edward Akers, Ellis Akers, Lasheri Akers, James Allen, Kenneth Allen, Shanna Allen, Susan Allen, Betty Anderson, Carl Anderson, Dinah Anderson, Gary Anderson, Inard Anderson, Kathy Anderson, Luther Anderson, Maggie Anderson, Terry Anderson, Michale Arnett, David Ashley, Vickey Ashley, Darcus Austin, Windell Austin, Eddie Back, Marlene Back, Tera Back, William Back, Alice Baker, Darlene Baker, Gary Baker, Lonnie Baker, Rodney Baker, Steven Baker, Francis Balthis, Harold Balthis, Rose Balthis, Tim Balthis, Chris Banks, Peggy Banks, Robert Banks, John Barker, Pauline Barnett, Roger Barnett, Billy Bartley, Rita Bartley, Gary Bennett, Jacklyn Bentley, Kevin Bentley, Nickey Bentley, Patricia Bentley, Steven Bentley, James Bently, Teresa Lynn Bently, Kevin Bevins, Rikka Bevins, Robin Biliter, Roy Biliter, Brandon Blackburn, Jennifer Blackburn, Michael Blackburn, Patricia Blair, Roger Blair, Charles Blankenship, Jason Blankenship, Lora Blankenship, Maggie Blankenship, Melissa Blankenship, Stella Blankenship, Brenda Bowling, Freddie Bowling, Ronnie Bowling, Tammy Bowling, Joey Boyd, Patty Boyd, Raymond Branham, Tracey Branham, Richard Brashear, Tomeka Brashear, Jennifer Browning, Richard Browning, Carol Bryant, Charles Bryant, Artemus Campbell, Sandra Campbell, Cheyenne Cantrell, Thomas Cantrell, Angela Carroll, Lloyd Carroll, Crystal Case, Stephan Case, Angela Casey, Terry Casey, Elmer Castle, Paul Castle, Stella Castle, Kenneth Caudill, Randy Caudill, Retho Caudill, Tina Caudill, Wanda Chafin, William Chafin, Cleo Chapman, Gary Chapman, Margaret Chapman, Neil Chapman, Rodney Chapman, Sabrina Chapman, Teresa Chapman, David Charles, James Cline, Melissa Cline, Balinda Colemam, Barry Coleman, Darrius Coleman, Ervin Coleman, Eugene Coleman, Lola Ann Coleman, Paula Marie Coleman, Dawn Coley, Greg Coley, Billy Collins, Brian Collins, Christy Collins, David Collins, Jodi Collins, Mary Collins, Nila Collins, Oscar Collins, Roy Collins, Tonya Collins, Danny Compton, Rhonda Compton, Amarine Conn, Faye Conn, Gabriel Conn, James Conn, Virgil Conn, Colin Cook, Jamie Cook, Daniel Coots, Heather Coots, Anthony Cornett, Sheila Cornett, Jonathan Crisp, John Cure, Jr., Kim Cure, Michelle Dales, Sonny Dales, Craig Damron, Kennetih Ray Damron, Melinda Damron, Robert Damron, Thomas Damron, Gene Daniels, Kevin Daniels, Rita Daniels, Donald Davis, Teresa Davis, Shelby Daylong, Carrol Derry, Michael Dingus, Brian Dotson, Kevin Dotson, Nikki Dotson, Todd Dyes, Drema Elswick, Michael Elswick, Larry Epling, Larry Epling, Leon Epling, Mabel Epling, Rhonda Epling, James Estep, Velvet Estep, Diane Fife, Brandon Fleming, Joshua Fleming, Rebecca Fleming, Burnis Fouts, Gomer Fouts, Patricia Fouts, Randy Fouts, Sara Fouts, Jackie Francis, Joann Francis, Jeffery Fuller, Karen Fuller, Richard Fuller, Ruth Fuller, Brenda Gayheart, Brett Gayheart, Henrietta Gibson, James Gibson, Jimmy Gibson, Judy Gibson, Carlos Gilley, Norma Gilley, Robert Goff, Brandy Good, Carol Good, Christopher Good, Olen Good, Calvin Gregory, Marsha Gregory, Clara Griffey, Kevin Griffey, Anthony Hall, Archie Hall, Belinda Hall, Donnie Hall, Dorothy Hall, Dustin Hall, Eddie Hall, Hillary Hall, Jody Hall, Kim Hall, Patricia Hall, Ronnie Hall, Tonya Hall, Amanda Hamilton, Emily Hamilton, James Hamilton, Jamie Hamilton, Jeanene Hamilton, Justine Hamilton, Stevie Hamilton, Ellen Hampton, Tommy Hampton, Angela Hardin, David Hardin, Randolph Hardin, Anita Harris, Brian Harris, Debra Hatfield, Gregory Hatfield, John Hayes, Richard Henson, Dana Hilton, Kenneth Hilton, Valerie Horn, Loretta Horne, Donny Howard, Franklin Howell, Pamela Hunt, Teddy Hunt, Kevin Hutchinson, Danny Isaac, Shirley Isaac, Arlinda Jarvis, Estill Jarvis, Marvin Jervis, Brian Johnson, Debra Johnson, Jessica Johnson, Roy Johnson, Royal Johnson, Travis Johnson, Amanda Jones, Robert Jones, Claude Jude, Jennifer Jude, Joey Jude, Courtney Justice, Dustin Justice, Stephen Justice, Gary Keene, Shirley Keene, Andra Kendrick, Burbon Kendrick, Helena Kendrick, Roger Kendrick, Harold Kidd, Lisa Kidd, Bobby Kincer, Jacqueline Kincer, Jeffrey Kinder, Irene Kiser, Farris Lawson, Juanita Lawson, Norval Lawson, Sara Elizabeth Lawson, Jacqueline Layne, James Layne, Hattie Lester, Ronald Lester, Angela Little, Anona Little, Herman Little, Herman Little, Jerry Little, Kamela Little, Kenneth Little, Kevin Little, Missy Little, Robert Little, Sharon Little, David Maggard, Regina Maggard, Joshua Mahon, Clinnon Martin, Douglas Martin, James Martin, Jeffrey Martin, Albert Matney, Darlene Matney, Roger Matney, Ruby Matney, Van Mayhorn, Angela Maynard, Christopher Maynard, Clifford Maynard, Kayla Maynard, Sarah Maynard, Timothy Maynard, Charles McClanahan, Brenda McCoy, Willie McCoy, Ava McFarland, William McFarland, Jr., David McGuire, Julie McGuire, Debbie McIntosh, Rodney McIntosh, Sasha McKinney, Stephanie McKinney, Andrea Meade, Daniel Meade, Danny Meade, Danyel Meade, Kenneth Meade, Lisa Meade, Vent Meadows, Jeff Miller, Kathryn Miller, Quillia Miller, Raymond Miller, Ronald Miller, Teresa Miller, Theresa Miller, Linda Minix, Martin Minix, Foster Mitchell, Gladys Mitchell, Sylena Moon, Troy Moon, Edward Moore, Elvie Moore, Ernie Moore, Jerry Moore, Rick Moore, Rita Moore, Stacey Moore, Charles Mounts, Jennifer Mounts, Larry Lee Mounts, Bobby Mullins, Charles Mullins, Donnie Mullins, Hope Mullins, Joseph Mullins, Melissa Mullins, Richard Mullins, Ronnie Mullins, Sammy Mullins, Wilma Mullins, Audie Murphy, Christine Murphy, Stella Music, Frankie Myers, Edgar Scott Newman, Rhonda Newman, Lloyd Newsom, Allard Newsome, Anita Newsome, Barry Newsome, Dale Newsome, Darlene Newsome, Donald Newsome, Gloria Newsome, James Newsome, Jerry Newsome, Jimmy Newsome, Karen Newsome, Larry Newsome, Leroy Newsome, Tabitha Newsome, Teddy Newsome, Terry Newsome, Wayne Newsome, William Newsome, Jr., Carl Norman, Terry Norman, Donna Osbourne, Doris Osbourne, Kimberly Page, Norman Page, Cynthia Patton, Charles Pease, Imogene Pease, Amy Phillips, Brenda Phillips, John Phillips, Jeffrey Pinson, Stacie Pinson, Johnny Pittman, Peggy Pittman, Charlene Potter, Jeffrey Potter, Ransom Prater, Eadie Price, Timmy Price, Celeste Pugh, Dennie Pugh, Mary Pugh, Robert Pugh, Delores Ratliff, Donald Ratliff, Jeff Ratliff, Sr., Melinda Ratliff, Glenda Ray, Jimmy Ray, Larry Ray, David Reed, Susan Reed, Sherrell Reid, Donnie Reynolds, Eugena Reynolds, Linda Reynolds, Stelfon Reynolds, James Rich, Valerie Rich, Chendla Richardson, Markus Richardson, Mary Riley, Terry Riley, Connie Roberts, Fredrick Roberts, Rodney Rose, Stephanie Rose, Deborah Runyon, Kathy Runyon, RIcky Runyon, William Runyon, Mitchell Salyers, Ruby Salyers, Donna Sanders, Moses Sanders, Raymond Sanders, Erica Sandlin, Kurt Sandlin, Charles Scott, Connie Sexton, Daren Sexton, Denny Sexton, Ellen Sexton, Michael Sexton, Peggy Sexton, Robert Sexton, Hershel Shepherd, Darlena Sifers, Nickie Sifers, Ginger Simmons, James Simmons, Jean Slone, Palmer Slone, Christopher Smith, Greg Smith, Harvey Smith, Langley Smith, Rebecca Smith, Sara Smith, Verlin Smith, William Smith, Alvin Spangler, Juanita Spangler, Greta Spears, Johnny Spears, James Spradlin, Lois Spradlin, Earl Spurlock, Jackie Stanley, Paul Stanley, William Stanley, Donna Stewart, Tony Stewart, German Stumbo, Darla Sturgill, Ellis Sturgill, Madge Sturgill, Melony Sturgill, Paul Sturgill, Randy Sturgill, Richard Sturgill, Kermit Swiney, Rhonda Swiney, Ricky Swiney, Donna Tackett, Douglas Tackett, James Tackett, James Tackett, Jeffery Tackett, Johnny Tackett, Jordan Tackett, Juanita Tackett, Mary Tackett, Tracy Tackett, Garrett Taylor, Melana Taylor, Andy Thacker, Anna Thacker, Brian Thacker, Bridget Thacker, Iris Thacker, James Thacker, Kevin Thacker, Kristy Thacker, Leann Thacker, Lora Thacker, Phillip Thacker, Ronald Thacker, Roy Thacker, Tammy Thacker, Thomas Thacker, A. J. Thornsberry, Myra Thornsberry, Tim Totten, Jennifer Tottn, Mary Tyree, Thomas Tyree, Carmella Varney, Inez Varney, Rodie Varney, Herman Wallen, Annette Ward, Steve Ward, Connie Joyce White, Keithal White, James Whitt, Donald Williams, Eugenia Williams, Loretta Williams, Mary Ann Williams, Mason Williams, Ricky Williams, Karen Wolford, Randy Wolford, Sidney Wolford, Betty Wright, Brenda Wright, Jackie Wright, Rebecca Wright, Rickey Wright, Ronnie Wright, Sherry Wright, Thomas Wright, Tommy Wright, Verdie Wright, Betsy Yonts and James Yonts regarding Plaintiffs/Appellees Parties. Certificate of Service: 03/30/2023. [23-5232] (MM) [Entered: 03/30/2023 05:40 PM]
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant 3M Company by Evan M. Tager. Certificate of Service: 03/30/2023. [23-5232] (EMT) [Entered: 03/30/2023 01:28 PM]
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Margaret Oertling Cupples for Appellant 3M Company.. Certificate of Service: 03/29/2023. [23-5232] (MOC) [Entered: 03/29/2023 04:45 PM]
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant 3M Company by Byron N. Miller. Certificate of Service: 03/29/2023. [23-5232] (BNM) [Entered: 03/29/2023 03:55 PM]
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant 3M Company by Bryant J. Spann. Certificate of Service: 03/29/2023. [23-5232] (BJS) [Entered: 03/29/2023 12:24 PM]
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Michael Martin for Appellees Alice Adams, Andrea Adams, Benjamin Adams, Brian Adams, Edward Adams, James Adams, James R. Adams, Phyllis Adams, Rosetta Adams, Susie Adams, Gregory Addington, Stephanie Addington, Gary Adkins, James Adkins, James Adkins, Julian Adkins, Pheobe Adkins, Ronnie Adkins, Brenda Akers, Clark Akers, Edward Akers, Ellis Akers, Lasheri Akers, James Allen, Kenneth Allen, Shanna Allen, Susan Allen, Betty Anderson, Carl Anderson, Dinah Anderson, Gary Anderson, Inard Anderson, Kathy Anderson, Luther Anderson, Maggie Anderson, Terry Anderson, Michale Arnett, David Ashley, Vickey Ashley, Darcus Austin, Windell Austin, Eddie Back, Marlene Back, Tera Back, William Back, Alice Baker, Darlene Baker, Gary Baker, Lonnie Baker, Rodney Baker, Steven Baker, Francis Balthis, Harold Balthis, Rose Balthis, Tim Balthis, Chris Banks, Peggy Banks, Robert Banks, John Barker, Pauline Barnett, Roger Barnett, Billy Bartley, Rita Bartley, Gary Bennett, Jacklyn Bentley, Kevin Bentley, Nickey Bentley, Patricia Bentley, Steven Bentley, James Bently, Teresa Lynn Bently, Kevin Bevins, Rikka Bevins, Robin Biliter, Roy Biliter, Brandon Blackburn, Jennifer Blackburn, Michael Blackburn, Patricia Blair, Roger Blair, Charles Blankenship, Jason Blankenship, Lora Blankenship, Maggie Blankenship, Melissa Blankenship, Stella Blankenship, Brenda Bowling, Freddie Bowling, Ronnie Bowling, Tammy Bowling, Joey Boyd, Patty Boyd, Raymond Branham, Tracey Branham, Richard Brashear, Tomeka Brashear, Jennifer Browning, Richard Browning, Carol Bryant, Charles Bryant, Artemus Campbell, Sandra Campbell, Cheyenne Cantrell, Thomas Cantrell, Angela Carroll, Lloyd Carroll, Crystal Case, Stephan Case, Angela Casey, Terry Casey, Elmer Castle, Paul Castle, Stella Castle, Kenneth Caudill, Randy Caudill, Retho Caudill, Tina Caudill, Wanda Chafin, William Chafin, Cleo Chapman, Gary Chapman, Margaret Chapman, Neil Chapman, Rodney Chapman, Sabrina Chapman, Teresa Chapman, David Charles, James Cline, Melissa Cline, Balinda Colemam, Barry Coleman, Darrius Coleman, Ervin Coleman, Eugene Coleman, Lola Ann Coleman, Paula Marie Coleman, Dawn Coley, Greg Coley, Billy Collins, Brian Collins, Christy Collins, David Collins, Jodi Collins, Mary Collins, Nila Collins, Oscar Collins, Roy Collins, Tonya Collins, Danny Compton, Rhonda Compton, Amarine Conn, Faye Conn, Gabriel Conn, James Conn, Virgil Conn, Colin Cook, Jamie Cook, Daniel Coots, Heather Coots, Anthony Cornett, Sheila Cornett, Jonathan Crisp, John Cure, Jr., Kim Cure, Michelle Dales, Sonny Dales, Craig Damron, Kennetih Ray Damron, Melinda Damron, Robert Damron, Thomas Damron, Gene Daniels, Kevin Daniels, Rita Daniels, Donald Davis, Teresa Davis, Shelby Daylong, Carrol Derry, Michael Dingus, Brian Dotson, Kevin Dotson, Nikki Dotson, Todd Dyes, Drema Elswick, Michael Elswick, Larry Epling, Larry Epling, Leon Epling, Mabel Epling, Rhonda Epling, James Estep, Velvet Estep, Diane Fife, Brandon Fleming, Joshua Fleming, Rebecca Fleming, Burnis Fouts, Gomer Fouts, Patricia Fouts, Randy Fouts, Sara Fouts, Jackie Francis, Joann Francis, Jeffery Fuller, Karen Fuller, Richard Fuller, Ruth Fuller, Brenda Gayheart, Brett Gayheart, Henrietta Gibson, James Gibson, Jimmy Gibson, Judy Gibson, Carlos Gilley, Norma Gilley, Robert Goff, Brandy Good, Carol Good, Christopher Good, Olen Good, Calvin Gregory, Marsha Gregory, Clara Griffey, Kevin Griffey, Anthony Hall, Archie Hall, Belinda Hall, Donnie Hall, Dorothy Hall, Dustin Hall, Eddie Hall, Hillary Hall, Jody Hall, Kim Hall, Patricia Hall, Ronnie Hall, Tonya Hall, Amanda Hamilton, Emily Hamilton, James Hamilton, Jamie Hamilton, Jeanene Hamilton, Justine Hamilton, Stevie Hamilton, Ellen Hampton, Tommy Hampton, Angela Hardin, David Hardin, Randolph Hardin, Anita Harris, Brian Harris, Debra Hatfield, Gregory Hatfield, John Hayes, Richard Henson, Dana Hilton, Kenneth Hilton, Valerie Horn, Loretta Horne, Donny Howard, Franklin Howell, Pamela Hunt, Teddy Hunt, Kevin Hutchinson, Danny Isaac, Shirley Isaac, Arlinda Jarvis, Estill Jarvis, Marvin Jervis, Brian Johnson, Debra Johnson, Jessica Johnson, Roy Johnson, Royal Johnson, Travis Johnson, Amanda Jones, Robert Jones, Claude Jude, Jennifer Jude, Joey Jude, Courtney Justice, Dustin Justice, Stephen Justice, Gary Keene, Shirley Keene, Andra Kendrick, Burbon Kendrick, Helena Kendrick, Roger Kendrick, Harold Kidd, Lisa Kidd, Bobby Kincer, Jacqueline Kincer, Jeffrey Kinder, Irene Kiser, Farris Lawson, Juanita Lawson, Norval Lawson, Sara Elizabeth Lawson, Jacqueline Layne, James Layne, Hattie Lester, Ronald Lester, Angela Little, Anona Little, Herman Little, Herman Little, Jerry Little, Kamela Little, Kenneth Little, Kevin Little, Missy Little, Robert Little, Sharon Little, David Maggard, Regina Maggard, Joshua Mahon, Clinnon Martin, Douglas Martin, James Martin, Jeffrey Martin, Albert Matney, Darlene Matney, Roger Matney, Ruby Matney, Van Mayhorn, Angela Maynard, Christopher Maynard, Clifford Maynard, Kayla Maynard, Sarah Maynard, Timothy Maynard, Charles McClanahan, Brenda McCoy, Willie McCoy, Ava McFarland, William McFarland, Jr., David McGuire, Julie McGuire, Debbie McIntosh, Rodney McIntosh, Sasha McKinney, Stephanie McKinney, Andrea Meade, Daniel Meade, Danny Meade, Danyel Meade, Kenneth Meade, Lisa Meade, Vent Meadows, Jeff Miller, Kathryn Miller, Quillia Miller, Raymond Miller, Ronald Miller, Teresa Miller, Theresa Miller, Linda Minix, Martin Minix, Foster Mitchell, Gladys Mitchell, Sylena Moon, Troy Moon, Edward Moore, Elvie Moore, Ernie Moore, Jerry Moore, Rick Moore, Rita Moore, Stacey Moore, Charles Mounts, Jennifer Mounts, Larry Lee Mounts, Bobby Mullins, Charles Mullins, Donnie Mullins, Hope Mullins, Joseph Mullins, Melissa Mullins, Richard Mullins, Ronnie Mullins, Sammy Mullins, Wilma Mullins, Audie Murphy, Christine Murphy, Stella Music, Frankie Myers, Edgar Scott Newman, Rhonda Newman, Lloyd Newsom, Allard Newsome, Anita Newsome, Barry Newsome, Dale Newsome, Darlene Newsome, Donald Newsome, Gloria Newsome, James Newsome, Jerry Newsome, Jimmy Newsome, Karen Newsome, Larry Newsome, Leroy Newsome, Tabitha Newsome, Teddy Newsome, Terry Newsome, Wayne Newsome, William Newsome, Jr., Carl Norman, Terry Norman, Donna Osbourne, Doris Osbourne, Kimberly Page, Norman Page, Cynthia Patton, Charles Pease, Imogene Pease, Amy Phillips, Brenda Phillips, John Phillips, Jeffrey Pinson, Stacie Pinson, Johnny Pittman, Peggy Pittman, Charlene Potter, Jeffrey Potter, Ransom Prater, Eadie Price, Timmy Price, Celeste Pugh, Dennie Pugh, Mary Pugh, Robert Pugh, Delores Ratliff, Donald Ratliff, Jeff Ratliff, Sr., Melinda Ratliff, Glenda Ray, Jimmy Ray, Larry Ray, David Reed, Susan Reed, Sherrell Reid, Donnie Reynolds, Eugena Reynolds, Linda Reynolds, Stelfon Reynolds, James Rich, Valerie Rich, Chendla Richardson, Markus Richardson, Mary Riley, Terry Riley, Connie Roberts, Fredrick Roberts, Rodney Rose, Stephanie Rose, Deborah Runyon, Kathy Runyon, RIcky Runyon, William Runyon, Mitchell Salyers, Ruby Salyers, Donna Sanders, Moses Sanders, Raymond Sanders, Erica Sandlin, Kurt Sandlin, Charles Scott, Connie Sexton, Daren Sexton, Denny Sexton, Ellen Sexton, Michael Sexton, Peggy Sexton, Robert Sexton, Hershel Shepherd, Darlena Sifers, Nickie Sifers, Ginger Simmons, James Simmons, Jean Slone, Palmer Slone, Christopher Smith, Greg Smith, Harvey Smith, Langley Smith, Rebecca Smith, Sara Smith, Verlin Smith, William Smith, Alvin Spangler, Juanita Spangler, Greta Spears, Johnny Spears, James Spradlin, Lois Spradlin, Earl Spurlock, Jackie Stanley, Paul Stanley, William Stanley, Donna Stewart, Tony Stewart, German Stumbo, Darla Sturgill, Ellis Sturgill, Madge Sturgill, Melony Sturgill, Paul Sturgill, Randy Sturgill, Richard Sturgill, Kermit Swiney, Rhonda Swiney, Ricky Swiney, Donna Tackett, Douglas Tackett, James Tackett, James Tackett, Jeffery Tackett, Johnny Tackett, Jordan Tackett, Juanita Tackett, Mary Tackett, Tracy Tackett, Garrett Taylor, Melana Taylor, Andy Thacker, Anna Thacker, Brian Thacker, Bridget Thacker, Iris Thacker, James Thacker, Kevin Thacker, Kristy Thacker, Leann Thacker, Lora Thacker, Phillip Thacker, Ronald Thacker, Roy Thacker, Tammy Thacker, Thomas Thacker, A. J. Thornsberry, Myra Thornsberry, Tim Totten, Jennifer Tottn, Mary Tyree, Thomas Tyree, Carmella Varney, Inez Varney, Rodie Varney, Herman Wallen, Annette Ward, Steve Ward, Connie Joyce White, Keithal White, James Whitt, Donald Williams, Eugenia Williams, Loretta Williams, Mary Ann Williams, Mason Williams, Ricky Williams, Karen Wolford, Randy Wolford, Sidney Wolford, Betty Wright, Brenda Wright, Jackie Wright, Rebecca Wright, Rickey Wright, Ronnie Wright, Sherry Wright, Thomas Wright, Tommy Wright, Verdie Wright, Betsy Yonts and James Yonts Certificate of Service: 03/28/2023. [23-5232] (MM) [Entered: 03/28/2023 05:31 PM]
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Orientation Acknowledgment filed by Attorney Mr. Michael Martin for Appellees Alice Adams, Andrea Adams, Benjamin Adams, Brian Adams, Edward Adams, James Adams, James R. Adams, Phyllis Adams, Rosetta Adams, Susie Adams, Gregory Addington, Stephanie Addington, Gary Adkins, James Adkins, James Adkins, Julian Adkins, Pheobe Adkins, Ronnie Adkins, Brenda Akers, Clark Akers, Edward Akers, Ellis Akers, Lasheri Akers, James Allen, Kenneth Allen, Shanna Allen, Susan Allen, Betty Anderson, Carl Anderson, Dinah Anderson, Gary Anderson, Inard Anderson, Kathy Anderson, Luther Anderson, Maggie Anderson, Terry Anderson, Michale Arnett, David Ashley, Vickey Ashley, Darcus Austin, Windell Austin, Eddie Back, Marlene Back, Tera Back, William Back, Alice Baker, Darlene Baker, Gary Baker, Lonnie Baker, Rodney Baker, Steven Baker, Francis Balthis, Harold Balthis, Rose Balthis, Tim Balthis, Chris Banks, Peggy Banks, Robert Banks, John Barker, Pauline Barnett, Roger Barnett, Billy Bartley, Rita Bartley, Gary Bennett, Jacklyn Bentley, Kevin Bentley, Nickey Bentley, Patricia Bentley, Steven Bentley, James Bently, Teresa Lynn Bently, Kevin Bevins, Rikka Bevins, Robin Biliter, Roy Biliter, Brandon Blackburn, Jennifer Blackburn, Michael Blackburn, Patricia Blair, Roger Blair, Charles Blankenship, Jason Blankenship, Lora Blankenship, Maggie Blankenship, Melissa Blankenship, Stella Blankenship, Brenda Bowling, Freddie Bowling, Ronnie Bowling, Tammy Bowling, Joey Boyd, Patty Boyd, Raymond Branham, Tracey Branham, Richard Brashear, Tomeka Brashear, Jennifer Browning, Richard Browning, Carol Bryant, Charles Bryant, Artemus Campbell, Sandra Campbell, Cheyenne Cantrell, Thomas Cantrell, Angela Carroll, Lloyd Carroll, Crystal Case, Stephan Case, Angela Casey, Terry Casey, Elmer Castle, Paul Castle, Stella Castle, Kenneth Caudill, Randy Caudill, Retho Caudill, Tina Caudill, Wanda Chafin, William Chafin, Cleo Chapman, Gary Chapman, Margaret Chapman, Neil Chapman, Rodney Chapman, Sabrina Chapman, Teresa Chapman, David Charles, James Cline, Melissa Cline, Balinda Colemam, Barry Coleman, Darrius Coleman, Ervin Coleman, Eugene Coleman, Lola Ann Coleman, Paula Marie Coleman, Dawn Coley, Greg Coley, Billy Collins, Brian Collins, Christy Collins, David Collins, Jodi Collins, Mary Collins, Nila Collins, Oscar Collins, Roy Collins, Tonya Collins, Danny Compton, Rhonda Compton, Amarine Conn, Faye Conn, Gabriel Conn, James Conn, Virgil Conn, Colin Cook, Jamie Cook, Daniel Coots, Heather Coots, Anthony Cornett, Sheila Cornett, Jonathan Crisp, John Cure, Jr., Kim Cure, Michelle Dales, Sonny Dales, Craig Damron, Kennetih Ray Damron, Melinda Damron, Robert Damron, Thomas Damron, Gene Daniels, Kevin Daniels, Rita Daniels, Donald Davis, Teresa Davis, Shelby Daylong, Carrol Derry, Michael Dingus, Brian Dotson, Kevin Dotson, Nikki Dotson, Todd Dyes, Drema Elswick, Michael Elswick, Larry Epling, Larry Epling, Leon Epling, Mabel Epling, Rhonda Epling, James Estep, Velvet Estep, Diane Fife, Brandon Fleming, Joshua Fleming, Rebecca Fleming, Burnis Fouts, Gomer Fouts, Patricia Fouts, Randy Fouts, Sara Fouts, Jackie Francis, Joann Francis, Jeffery Fuller, Karen Fuller, Richard Fuller, Ruth Fuller, Brenda Gayheart, Brett Gayheart, Henrietta Gibson, James Gibson, Jimmy Gibson, Judy Gibson, Carlos Gilley, Norma Gilley, Robert Goff, Brandy Good, Carol Good, Christopher Good, Olen Good, Calvin Gregory, Marsha Gregory, Clara Griffey, Kevin Griffey, Anthony Hall, Archie Hall, Belinda Hall, Donnie Hall, Dorothy Hall, Dustin Hall, Eddie Hall, Hillary Hall, Jody Hall, Kim Hall, Patricia Hall, Ronnie Hall, Tonya Hall, Amanda Hamilton, Emily Hamilton, James Hamilton, Jamie Hamilton, Jeanene Hamilton, Justine Hamilton, Stevie Hamilton, Ellen Hampton, Tommy Hampton, Angela Hardin, David Hardin, Randolph Hardin, Anita Harris, Brian Harris, Debra Hatfield, Gregory Hatfield, John Hayes, Richard Henson, Dana Hilton, Kenneth Hilton, Valerie Horn, Loretta Horne, Donny Howard, Franklin Howell, Pamela Hunt, Teddy Hunt, Kevin Hutchinson, Danny Isaac, Shirley Isaac, Arlinda Jarvis, Estill Jarvis, Marvin Jervis, Brian Johnson, Debra Johnson, Jessica Johnson, Roy Johnson, Royal Johnson, Travis Johnson, Amanda Jones, Robert Jones, Claude Jude, Jennifer Jude, Joey Jude, Courtney Justice, Dustin Justice, Stephen Justice, Gary Keene, Shirley Keene, Andra Kendrick, Burbon Kendrick, Helena Kendrick, Roger Kendrick, Harold Kidd, Lisa Kidd, Bobby Kincer, Jacqueline Kincer, Jeffrey Kinder, Irene Kiser, Farris Lawson, Juanita Lawson, Norval Lawson, Sara Elizabeth Lawson, Jacqueline Layne, James Layne, Hattie Lester, Ronald Lester, Angela Little, Anona Little, Herman Little, Herman Little, Jerry Little, Kamela Little, Kenneth Little, Kevin Little, Missy Little, Robert Little, Sharon Little, David Maggard, Regina Maggard, Joshua Mahon, Clinnon Martin, Douglas Martin, James Martin, Jeffrey Martin, Albert Matney, Darlene Matney, Roger Matney, Ruby Matney, Van Mayhorn, Angela Maynard, Christopher Maynard, Clifford Maynard, Kayla Maynard, Sarah Maynard, Timothy Maynard, Charles McClanahan, Brenda McCoy, Willie McCoy, Ava McFarland, William McFarland, Jr., David McGuire, Julie McGuire, Debbie McIntosh, Rodney McIntosh, Sasha McKinney, Stephanie McKinney, Andrea Meade, Daniel Meade, Danny Meade, Danyel Meade, Kenneth Meade, Lisa Meade, Vent Meadows, Jeff Miller, Kathryn Miller, Quillia Miller, Raymond Miller, Ronald Miller, Teresa Miller, Theresa Miller, Linda Minix, Martin Minix, Foster Mitchell, Gladys Mitchell, Sylena Moon, Troy Moon, Edward Moore, Elvie Moore, Ernie Moore, Jerry Moore, Rick Moore, Rita Moore, Stacey Moore, Charles Mounts, Jennifer Mounts, Larry Lee Mounts, Bobby Mullins, Charles Mullins, Donnie Mullins, Hope Mullins, Joseph Mullins, Melissa Mullins, Richard Mullins, Ronnie Mullins, Sammy Mullins, Wilma Mullins, Audie Murphy, Christine Murphy, Stella Music, Frankie Myers, Edgar Scott Newman, Rhonda Newman, Lloyd Newsom, Allard Newsome, Anita Newsome, Barry Newsome, Dale Newsome, Darlene Newsome, Donald Newsome, Gloria Newsome, James Newsome, Jerry Newsome, Jimmy Newsome, Karen Newsome, Larry Newsome, Leroy Newsome, Tabitha Newsome, Teddy Newsome, Terry Newsome, Wayne Newsome, William Newsome, Jr., Carl Norman, Terry Norman, Donna Osbourne, Doris Osbourne, Kimberly Page, Norman Page, Cynthia Patton, Charles Pease, Imogene Pease, Amy Phillips, Brenda Phillips, John Phillips, Jeffrey Pinson, Stacie Pinson, Johnny Pittman, Peggy Pittman, Charlene Potter, Jeffrey Potter, Ransom Prater, Eadie Price, Timmy Price, Celeste Pugh, Dennie Pugh, Mary Pugh, Robert Pugh, Delores Ratliff, Donald Ratliff, Jeff Ratliff, Sr., Melinda Ratliff, Glenda Ray, Jimmy Ray, Larry Ray, David Reed, Susan Reed, Sherrell Reid, Donnie Reynolds, Eugena Reynolds, Linda Reynolds, Stelfon Reynolds, James Rich, Valerie Rich, Chendla Richardson, Markus Richardson, Mary Riley, Terry Riley, Connie Roberts, Fredrick Roberts, Rodney Rose, Stephanie Rose, Deborah Runyon, Kathy Runyon, RIcky Runyon, William Runyon, Mitchell Salyers, Ruby Salyers, Donna Sanders, Moses Sanders, Raymond Sanders, Erica Sandlin, Kurt Sandlin, Charles Scott, Connie Sexton, Daren Sexton, Denny Sexton, Ellen Sexton, Michael Sexton, Peggy Sexton, Robert Sexton, Hershel Shepherd, Darlena Sifers, Nickie Sifers, Ginger Simmons, James Simmons, Jean Slone, Palmer Slone, Christopher Smith, Greg Smith, Harvey Smith, Langley Smith, Rebecca Smith, Sara Smith, Verlin Smith, William Smith, Alvin Spangler, Juanita Spangler, Greta Spears, Johnny Spears, James Spradlin, Lois Spradlin, Earl Spurlock, Jackie Stanley, Paul Stanley, William Stanley, Donna Stewart, Tony Stewart, German Stumbo, Darla Sturgill, Ellis Sturgill, Madge Sturgill, Melony Sturgill, Paul Sturgill, Randy Sturgill, Richard Sturgill, Kermit Swiney, Rhonda Swiney, Ricky Swiney, Donna Tackett, Douglas Tackett, James Tackett, James Tackett, Jeffery Tackett, Johnny Tackett, Jordan Tackett, Juanita Tackett, Mary Tackett, Tracy Tackett, Garrett Taylor, Melana Taylor, Andy Thacker, Anna Thacker, Brian Thacker, Bridget Thacker, Iris Thacker, James Thacker, Kevin Thacker, Kristy Thacker, Leann Thacker, Lora Thacker, Phillip Thacker, Ronald Thacker, Roy Thacker, Tammy Thacker, Thomas Thacker, A. J. Thornsberry, Myra Thornsberry, Tim Totten, Jennifer Tottn, Mary Tyree, Thomas Tyree, Carmella Varney, Inez Varney, Rodie Varney, Herman Wallen, Annette Ward, Steve Ward, Connie Joyce White, Keithal White, James Whitt, Donald Williams, Eugenia Williams, Loretta Williams, Mary Ann Williams, Mason Williams, Ricky Williams, Karen Wolford, Randy Wolford, Sidney Wolford, Betty Wright, Brenda Wright, Jackie Wright, Rebecca Wright, Rickey Wright, Ronnie Wright, Sherry Wright, Thomas Wright, Tommy Wright, Verdie Wright, Betsy Yonts and James Yonts. Certificate of Service: 03/28/2023. [23-5232] (MM) [Entered: 03/28/2023 05:29 PM]
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Alice Adams, Andrea Adams, Benjamin Adams, Brian Adams, Edward Adams, James Adams, James R. Adams, Phyllis Adams, Rosetta Adams, Susie Adams, Gregory Addington, Stephanie Addington, Gary Adkins, James Adkins, Julian Adkins, Pheobe Adkins, Ronnie Adkins, Brenda Akers, Clark Akers, Edward Akers, Ellis Akers, Lasheri Akers, James Allen, Kenneth Allen, Shanna Allen, Susan Allen, Betty Anderson, Carl Anderson, Dinah Anderson, Gary Anderson, Inard Anderson, Kathy Anderson, Luther Anderson, Maggie Anderson, Terry Anderson, Michale Arnett, David Ashley, Vickey Ashley, Darcus Austin, Windell Austin, Eddie Back, Marlene Back, Tera Back, William Back, Alice Baker, Darlene Baker, Gary Baker, Lonnie Baker, Rodney Baker, Steven Baker, Francis Balthis, Harold Balthis, Rose Balthis, Tim Balthis, Chris Banks, Peggy Banks, Robert Banks, John Barker, Pauline Barnett, Roger Barnett, Billy Bartley, Rita Bartley, Gary Bennett, Jacklyn Bentley, Kevin Bentley, Nickey Bentley, Patricia Bentley, Steven Bentley, James Bently, Teresa Lynn Bently, Kevin Bevins, Rikka Bevins, Robin Biliter, Roy Biliter, Brandon Blackburn, Jennifer Blackburn, Michael Blackburn, Patricia Blair, Roger Blair, Charles Blankenship, Jason Blankenship, Lora Blankenship, Maggie Blankenship, Melissa Blankenship, Stella Blankenship, Brenda Bowling, Freddie Bowling, Ronnie Bowling, Tammy Bowling, Joey Boyd, Patty Boyd, Raymond Branham, Tracey Branham, Richard Brashear, Tomeka Brashear, Jennifer Browning, Richard Browning, Carol Bryant, Charles Bryant, Artemus Campbell, Sandra Campbell, Cheyenne Cantrell, Thomas Cantrell, Angela Carroll, Lloyd Carroll, Crystal Case, Stephan Case, Angela Casey, Terry Casey, Elmer Castle, Paul Castle, Stella Castle, Kenneth Caudill, Randy Caudill, Retho Caudill, Tina Caudill, Wanda Chafin, William Chafin, Cleo Chapman, Gary Chapman, Margaret Chapman, Neil Chapman, Rodney Chapman, Sabrina Chapman, Teresa Chapman, David Charles, James Cline, Melissa Cline, Balinda Colemam, Barry Coleman, Darrius Coleman, Ervin Coleman, Eugene Coleman, Lola Ann Coleman, Paula Marie Coleman, Dawn Coley, Greg Coley, Billy Collins, Brian Collins, Christy Collins, David Collins, Jodi Collins, Mary Collins, Nila Collins, Oscar Collins, Roy Collins, Tonya Collins, Danny Compton, Rhonda Compton, Amarine Conn, Faye Conn, Gabriel Conn, James Conn, Virgil Conn, Colin Cook, Jamie Cook, Daniel Coots, Heather Coots, Anthony Cornett, Sheila Cornett, Jonathan Crisp, John Cure, Jr., Kim Cure, Michelle Dales, Sonny Dales, Craig Damron, Kennetih Ray Damron, Melinda Damron, Robert Damron, Thomas Damron, Gene Daniels, Kevin Daniels, Rita Daniels, Donald Davis, Teresa Davis, Shelby Daylong, Carrol Derry, Michael Dingus, Brian Dotson, Kevin Dotson, Nikki Dotson, Todd Dyes, Drema Elswick, Michael Elswick, Larry Epling, Larry Epling, Leon Epling, Mabel Epling, Rhonda Epling, James Estep, Velvet Estep, Diane Fife, Brandon Fleming, Joshua Fleming, Rebecca Fleming, Burnis Fouts, Gomer Fouts, Patricia Fouts, Randy Fouts, Sara Fouts, Jackie Francis, Joann Francis, Jeffery Fuller, Karen Fuller, Richard Fuller, Ruth Fuller, Brenda Gayheart, Brett Gayheart, Henrietta Gibson, James Gibson, Jimmy Gibson, Judy Gibson, Carlos Gilley, Norma Gilley, Robert Goff, Brandy Good, Carol Good, Christopher Good, Olen Good, Calvin Gregory, Marsha Gregory, Clara Griffey, Kevin Griffey, Anthony Hall, Archie Hall, Belinda Hall, Donnie Hall, Dorothy Hall, Dustin Hall, Eddie Hall, Hillary Hall, Jody Hall, Kim Hall, Patricia Hall, Ronnie Hall, Tonya Hall, Amanda Hamilton, Emily Hamilton, James Hamilton, Jamie Hamilton, Jeanene Hamilton, Justine Hamilton, Stevie Hamilton, Ellen Hampton, Tommy Hampton, Angela Hardin, David Hardin, Randolph Hardin, Anita Harris, Brian Harris, Debra Hatfield, Gregory Hatfield, John Hayes, Richard Henson, Dana Hilton, Kenneth Hilton, Valerie Horn, Loretta Horne, Donny Howard, Franklin Howell, Pamela Hunt, Teddy Hunt, Kevin Hutchinson, Danny Isaac, Shirley Isaac, Arlinda Jarvis, Estill Jarvis, Marvin Jervis, Brian Johnson, Debra Johnson, Jessica Johnson, Roy Johnson, Royal Johnson, Travis Johnson, Amanda Jones, Robert Jones, Claude Jude, Jennifer Jude, Joey Jude, Courtney Justice, Dustin Justice, Stephen Justice, Gary Keene, Shirley Keene, Andra Kendrick, Burbon Kendrick, Helena Kendrick, Roger Kendrick, Harold Kidd, Lisa Kidd, Bobby Kincer, Jacqueline Kincer, Jeffrey Kinder, Irene Kiser, Farris Lawson, Juanita Lawson, Norval Lawson, Sara Elizabeth Lawson, Jacqueline Layne, James Layne, Hattie Lester, Ronald Lester, Angela Little, Anona Little, Herman Little, Herman Little, Jerry Little, Kamela Little, Kenneth Little, Kevin Little, Missy Little, Robert Little, Sharon Little, David Maggard, Regina Maggard, Joshua Mahon, Clinnon Martin, Douglas Martin, James Martin, Jeffrey Martin, Albert Matney, Darlene Matney, Roger Matney, Ruby Matney, Van Mayhorn, Angela Maynard, Christopher Maynard, Clifford Maynard, Kayla Maynard, Sarah Maynard, Timothy Maynard, Charles McClanahan, Brenda McCoy, Willie McCoy, Ava McFarland, William McFarland, Jr., David McGuire, Julie McGuire, Debbie McIntosh, Rodney McIntosh, Sasha McKinney, Stephanie McKinney, Andrea Meade, Daniel Meade, Danny Meade, Danyel Meade, Kenneth Meade, Lisa Meade, Vent Meadows, Jeff Miller, Kathryn Miller, Quillia Miller, Raymond Miller, Ronald Miller, Teresa Miller, Theresa Miller, Linda Minix, Martin Minix, Foster Mitchell, Gladys Mitchell, Sylena Moon, Troy Moon, Edward Moore, Elvie Moore, Ernie Moore, Jerry Moore, Rick Moore, Rita Moore, Stacey Moore, Charles Mounts, Jennifer Mounts, Larry Lee Mounts, Bobby Mullins, Charles Mullins, Donnie Mullins, Hope Mullins, Joseph Mullins, Melissa Mullins, Richard Mullins, Ronnie Mullins, Sammy Mullins, Wilma Mullins, Audie Murphy, Christine Murphy, Stella Music, Frankie Myers, Edgar Scott Newman, Rhonda Newman, Lloyd Newsom, Allard Newsome, Anita Newsome, Barry Newsome, Dale Newsome, Darlene Newsome, Donald Newsome, Gloria Newsome, James Newsome, Jerry Newsome, Jimmy Newsome, Karen Newsome, Larry Newsome, Leroy Newsome, Tabitha Newsome, Teddy Newsome, Terry Newsome, Wayne Newsome, William Newsome, Jr., Carl Norman, Terry Norman, Donna Osbourne, Doris Osbourne, Kimberly Page, Norman Page, Cynthia Patton, Charles Pease, Imogene Pease, Amy Phillips, Brenda Phillips, John Phillips, Jeffrey Pinson, Stacie Pinson, Johnny Pittman, Peggy Pittman, Charlene Potter, Jeffrey Potter, Ransom Prater, Eadie Price, Timmy Price, Celeste Pugh, Dennie Pugh, Mary Pugh, Robert Pugh, Delores Ratliff, Donald Ratliff, Jeff Ratliff, Sr., Melinda Ratliff, Glenda Ray, Jimmy Ray, Larry Ray, David Reed, Susan Reed, Sherrell Reid, Donnie Reynolds, Eugena Reynolds, Linda Reynolds, Stelfon Reynolds, James Rich, Valerie Rich, Chendla Richardson, Markus Richardson, Mary Riley, Terry Riley, Connie Roberts, Fredrick Roberts, Rodney Rose, Stephanie Rose, Deborah Runyon, Kathy Runyon, RIcky Runyon, William Runyon, Mitchell Salyers, Ruby Salyers, Donna Sanders, Moses Sanders, Raymond Sanders, Erica Sandlin, Kurt Sandlin, Charles Scott, Connie Sexton, Daren Sexton, Denny Sexton, Ellen Sexton, Michael Sexton, Peggy Sexton, Robert Sexton, Hershel Shepherd, Darlena Sifers, Nickie Sifers, Ginger Simmons, James Simmons, Jean Slone, Palmer Slone, Christopher Smith, Greg Smith, Harvey Smith, Langley Smith, Rebecca Smith, Sara Smith, Verlin Smith, William Smith, Alvin Spangler, Juanita Spangler, Greta Spears, Johnny Spears, James Spradlin, Lois Spradlin, Earl Spurlock, Jackie Stanley, Paul Stanley, William Stanley, Donna Stewart, Tony Stewart, German Stumbo, Darla Sturgill, Ellis Sturgill, Madge Sturgill, Melony Sturgill, Paul Sturgill, Randy Sturgill, Richard Sturgill, Kermit Swiney, Rhonda Swiney, Ricky Swiney, Donna Tackett, Douglas Tackett, James Tackett, Jeffery Tackett, Johnny Tackett, Jordan Tackett, Juanita Tackett, Mary Tackett, Tracy Tackett, Garrett Taylor, Melana Taylor, Andy Thacker, Anna Thacker, Brian Thacker, Bridget Thacker, Iris Thacker, James Thacker, Kevin Thacker, Kristy Thacker, Leann Thacker, Lora Thacker, Phillip Thacker, Ronald Thacker, Roy Thacker, Tammy Thacker, Thomas Thacker, A. J. Thornsberry, Myra Thornsberry, Tim Totten, Jennifer Tottn, Mary Tyree, Thomas Tyree, Carmella Varney, Inez Varney, Rodie Varney, Herman Wallen, Annette Ward, Steve Ward, Connie Joyce White, Keithal White, James Whitt, Donald Williams, Eugenia Williams, Loretta Williams, Mary Ann Williams, Mason Williams, Ricky Williams, Karen Wolford, Randy Wolford, Sidney Wolford, Betty Wright, Brenda Wright, Jackie Wright, Rebecca Wright, Rickey Wright, Ronnie Wright, Sherry Wright, Thomas Wright, Tommy Wright, Verdie Wright, Betsy Yonts, James Yonts and Mine Safety Appliances by Michael B. Martin. Certificate of Service: 03/28/2023. [23-5232] (MM) [Entered: 03/28/2023 05:28 PM]
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Update fee status change to paid in district court on March 28, 2023, Receipt No. 700000324 (RLB) [Entered: 03/28/2023 03:34 PM]
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTIFICATION regarding mandatory orientation for video arguments in the Sixth Circuit. ** This is a restricted document. If you are unable to open the attachment, contact PACER at 1-800-676-6856 and verify that your account has its "Searching Privileges" activated. ** (JRH) [Entered: 03/28/2023 02:19 PM]
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 VIDEO ARGUMENT SCHEDULED for 10:00 a.m. (Eastern Time) on Tuesday, April 18, 2023. (JRH) [Entered: 03/28/2023 11:25 AM]
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant 3M Company by Scott Burnett Smith. Certificate of Service: 03/27/2023. [23-5232] (SBS) [Entered: 03/27/2023 03:23 PM]
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Margaret Oertling Cupples for Appellant 3M Company Certificate of Service: 03/27/2023. [23-5232] (MOC) [Entered: 03/27/2023 03:19 PM]
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant 3M Company by Timothy Alex Rodriguez. Certificate of Service: 03/27/2023. [23-5232] (TAR) [Entered: 03/27/2023 03:12 PM]
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant 3M Company by James Stephen Fritz, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 03/27/2023. [23-5232] (JSF) [Entered: 03/27/2023 03:07 PM]
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant 3M Company by Margaret Oertling Cupples. Certificate of Service: 03/27/2023. [23-5232] (MOC) [Entered: 03/27/2023 02:48 PM]
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting expedited briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 03/31/2023. appellee brief now due 04/10/2023. reply brief now due 4/17/23 (RLB) [Entered: 03/24/2023 05:13 PM]
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Robin L. Baker (RLB) [Entered: 03/24/2023 05:12 PM]
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant 3M Company. Transcript needed: n. (RLB) [Entered: 03/24/2023 05:09 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Brian Adams, et al v. 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BRIAN ADAMS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALICE ADAMS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EDWARD ADAMS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANDREA ADAMS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES ADAMS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES R. ADAMS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SUSIE ADAMS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PHYLLIS ADAMS, Executrix of the Estate of Rick Adams
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GREGORY ADDINGTON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STEPHANIE ADDINGTON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES ADKINS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EDWARD AKERS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BRENDA AKERS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES ALLEN
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SUSAN ALLEN
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GARY ANDERSON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DINAH ANDERSON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LUTHER ANDERSON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KATHY ANDERSON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVID ASHLEY
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VICKEY ASHLEY
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GARY BAKER
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RODNEY BAKER
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALICE BAKER
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TIM BALTHIS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FRANCIS BALTHIS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHRIS BANKS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROBERT BANKS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PEGGY BANKS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BILLY BARTLEY
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RITA BARTLEY
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GARY BENNETT
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NICKEY BENTLEY
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JACKLYN BENTLEY
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES BENTLY
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TERESA LYNN BENTLY
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROY BILITER
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROBIN BILITER
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BRANDON BLACKBURN
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JENNIFER BLACKBURN
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROGER BLAIR
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PATRICIA BLAIR
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOEY BOYD
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PATTY BOYD
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RAYMOND BRANHAM
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TRACEY BRANHAM
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RICHARD BRASHEAR
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TOMEKA BRASHEAR
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHARLES BRYANT
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CAROL BRYANT
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ARTEMUS CAMPBELL
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SANDRA CAMPBELL
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: THOMAS CANTRELL
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHEYENNE CANTRELL
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ELMER CASTLE
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STELLA CASTLE
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RANDY CAUDILL
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RETHO CAUDILL
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WILLIAM CHAFIN
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WANDA CHAFIN
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CLEO CHAPMAN
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GARY CHAPMAN
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARGARET CHAPMAN
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RODNEY CHAPMAN
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TERESA CHAPMAN
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVID CHARLES
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BARRY COLEMAN
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PAULA MARIE COLEMAN
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ERVIN COLEMAN
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LOLA ANN COLEMAN
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BILLY COLLINS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARY COLLINS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BRIAN COLLINS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TONYA COLLINS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: OSCAR COLLINS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHRISTY COLLINS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GABRIEL CONN
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FAYE CONN
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES CONN
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VIRGIL CONN
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AMARINE CONN
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COLIN COOK
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMIE COOK
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANTHONY CORNETT
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SHEILA CORNETT
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BRENDA PHILLIPS, Executrix of the Estate of Woodrow Crum
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KEVIN DANIELS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RITA DANIELS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DONALD DAVIS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TERESA DAVIS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MICHAEL DINGUS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BRIAN DOTSON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NIKKI DOTSON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KEVIN DOTSON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES ESTEP
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VELVET ESTEP
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DIANE FIFE, Executrix of the Estate of Zack Fife
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BRANDON FLEMING
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOSHUA FLEMING
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: REBECCA FLEMING
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BURNIS FOUTS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GOMER FOUTS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SARA FOUTS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RANDY FOUTS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PATRICIA FOUTS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JIMMY GIBSON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HENRIETTA GIBSON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CARLOS GILLEY
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NORMA GILLEY
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: OLEN GOOD
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CAROL GOOD
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KEVIN GRIFFEY
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CLARA GRIFFEY
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DONNIE HALL
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PATRICIA HALL
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RONNIE HALL
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DOROTHY HALL, Executrix of the Estate of Wayne Hall
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES HAMILTON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JEANENE HAMILTON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TOMMY HAMPTON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ELLEN HAMPTON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVID HARDIN
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANGELA HARDIN
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GREGORY HATFIELD
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DEBRA HATFIELD
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHN HAYES
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KENNETH HILTON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DANA HILTON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DONNY HOWARD
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FRANKLIN HOWELL
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KEVIN HUTCHINSON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DANNY ISAAC
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SHIRLEY ISAAC
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROBERT JONES
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AMANDA JONES
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CLAUDE JUDE
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JENNIFER JUDE
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GARY KEENE
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SHIRLEY KEENE
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HAROLD KIDD
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LISA KIDD
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FARRIS LAWSON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SARA ELIZABETH LAWSON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NORVAL LAWSON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JUANITA LAWSON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HERMAN LITTLE
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANONA LITTLE
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JERRY LITTLE
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SHARON LITTLE
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KENNETH LITTLE
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KEVIN LITTLE
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MISSY LITTLE
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOSHUA MAHON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CLINNON MARTIN
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DOUGLAS MARTIN
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VAN MAYHORN
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CLIFFORD MAYNARD
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SARAH MAYNARD
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TIMOTHY MAYNARD
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KAYLA MAYNARD
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVID MCGUIRE
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JULIE MCGUIRE
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DANNY MEADE
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANDREA MEADE
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KENNETH MEADE
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LISA MEADE
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: QUILLIA MILLER, Executrix of the Estate of Ricky Miller
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RONALD MILLER
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TERESA MILLER
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FOSTER MITCHELL
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GLADYS MITCHELL
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TROY MOON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SYLENA MOON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EDWARD MOORE
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ELVIE MOORE
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ERNIE MOORE
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RITA MOORE
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHARLES MULLINS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALLARD NEWSOME
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DALE NEWSOME
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANITA NEWSOME
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DONALD NEWSOME
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DARLENE NEWSOME
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES NEWSOME
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TABITHA NEWSOME
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JIMMY NEWSOME
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LEROY NEWSOME
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TERRY NORMAN
Represented By: Michael Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CYNTHIA PATTON, Executrix of the Estate of John Patton
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHNNY PITTMAN
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PEGGY PITTMAN
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JEFFREY POTTER
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHARLENE POTTER
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RANSOM PRATER
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DENNIE PUGH
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARY PUGH
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROBERT PUGH
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CELESTE PUGH
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JIMMY RAY
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GLENDA RAY
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LARRY RAY
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVID REED
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SUSAN REED
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SHERRELL REID
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STELFON REYNOLDS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EUGENA REYNOLDS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES RICH
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VALERIE RICH
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARKUS RICHARDSON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHENDLA RICHARDSON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FREDRICK ROBERTS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CONNIE ROBERTS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RODNEY ROSE
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STEPHANIE ROSE
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WILLIAM RUNYON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KATHY RUNYON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DENNY SEXTON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ELLEN SEXTON
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HERSHEL SHEPHERD
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES SIMMONS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GINGER SIMMONS
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HARVEY SMITH
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VERLIN SMITH
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WILLIAM SMITH
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SARA SMITH
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EARL SPURLOCK
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GERMAN STUMBO
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ELLIS STURGILL
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DARLA STURGILL
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PAUL STURGILL
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RANDY STURGILL
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MADGE STURGILL
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RICHARD STURGILL
Represented By: Michael Martin
Represented By: Johnny Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MELONY STURGILL
Represented By: Michael Martin