Kerry De La Miya v. Branch County Courts, et al
Plaintiff: KERRY SALAS DE LA MIYA, aka Kerry Brooks Galinis
Defendant: BRANCH COUNTY COURTS, BRANCH COUNTY, MI SHERIFF DEPARTMENT, STATE OF MICHIGAN, 14TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT, CALCASIEU PARISH SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, STATE OF LOUISIANA, CALCASIEU PARISH DEPUTY CLERK, [UNKNOWN] ROMERO, Deputy Clerk and STATE OF MICHIGAN, District Attorney
Case Number: 24-1250
Filed: March 26, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Mandamus & Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2024 Filing 7 Financial Affidavit filed by Party Mr. Kerry Salas De La Miya Certificate of Service: 04/25/2024. (ASM) [Entered: 05/06/2024 03:34 PM]
April 30, 2024 Filing 6 Appellant MOTION filed by to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 04/25/2024. (ASM) [Entered: 05/06/2024 03:32 PM]
April 19, 2024 Filing 5 RULING LETTER SENT to extend time to pay fee. (ASM) [Entered: 04/19/2024 10:49 AM]
April 18, 2024 Filing 4 Copy of District Court Order filed 4/18/2024, #16 denying in forma pauperis. (ASM) [Entered: 04/18/2024 05:09 PM]
March 29, 2024 Filing 3 SHOW CAUSE order filed to have Appellant Mr. Kerry Salas De La Miya show cause for possible jurisdictional defect. Response due by 04/19/2024 for Kerry Salas De La Miya. (ASM) [Entered: 03/29/2024 01:43 PM]
March 26, 2024 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Antoinette Macon (ASM) [Entered: 03/26/2024 02:31 PM]
March 26, 2024 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Kerry Salas De La Miya. Transcript needed: n. (ASM) [Entered: 03/26/2024 02:15 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kerry De La Miya v. Branch County Courts, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KERRY SALAS DE LA MIYA, aka Kerry Brooks Galinis
Represented By: Kerry Salas De La Miya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRANCH COUNTY COURTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRANCH COUNTY, MI SHERIFF DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF MICHIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 14TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALCASIEU PARISH SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF LOUISIANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALCASIEU PARISH DEPUTY CLERK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: [UNKNOWN] ROMERO, Deputy Clerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF MICHIGAN, District Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?