Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indian, et al v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan
Plaintiff: GRAND TRAVERSE BAND OF OTTAWA AND CHIPPEWA INDIANS and GRAND TRAVERSE BAND OF OTTAWA AND CHIPPEWA INDIANS EMPLOYEE WELFARE FUND
Defendant: BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF MICHIGAN
Case Number: 24-1367
Filed: April 26, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2024 Filing 19 Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 06/06/2024 01:46 PM]
June 6, 2024 Filing 18 BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 07/08/2024. appellee brief now due 08/09/2024. (LMR) [Entered: 06/06/2024 10:47 AM]
June 5, 2024 Filing 17 Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: The Mediation Conference scheduled for 06/06/2024 is hereby canceled. (LMR) [Entered: 06/05/2024 04:23 PM]
May 17, 2024 Filing 16 VIDEO CONFERENCE: The Mediation conference has been rescheduled for 06/06/2024 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 05/17/2024 11:12 AM]
May 10, 2024 Filing 15 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 06/20/2024;. appellee brief due 07/22/2024; (RLB) [Entered: 05/10/2024 10:32 AM]
May 10, 2024 Filing 14 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Mr. Herman Daniel Hofman for Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians and Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians Employee Welfare Fund. Certificate of Service: 05/10/2024. [24-1367] (HDH) [Entered: 05/10/2024 09:16 AM]
May 10, 2024 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Herman Daniel Hofman for Appellant Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians Employee Welfare Fund. Certificate of Service: 05/10/2024. [24-1367]--[Edited 05/10/2024 by RLB] (HDH) [Entered: 05/10/2024 09:14 AM]
May 10, 2024 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Herman Daniel Hofman for Appellant Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians. Certificate of Service: 05/10/2024. [24-1367]--[Edited 05/10/2024 by RLB] (HDH) [Entered: 05/10/2024 09:12 AM]
May 10, 2024 Filing 11 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Herman Daniel Hofman for Appellants Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians and Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians Employee Welfare Fund.. Certificate of Service: 05/10/2024. [24-1367] (HDH) [Entered: 05/10/2024 09:11 AM]
May 10, 2024 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians and Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians Employee Welfare Fund by Perrin Rynders. Certificate of Service: 05/10/2024. [24-1367] (PR) [Entered: 05/10/2024 09:00 AM]
May 9, 2024 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Phillip J. DeRosier for Appellee Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Certificate of Service: 05/09/2024. [24-1367] (PJD) [Entered: 05/09/2024 02:33 PM]
May 8, 2024 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians and Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians Employee Welfare Fund by Neil E. Youngdahl. Certificate of Service: 05/08/2024. [24-1367] (NEY) [Entered: 05/08/2024 09:16 PM]
May 7, 2024 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan by Brandon C. Hubbard. Certificate of Service: 05/07/2024. [24-1367] (BCH) [Entered: 05/07/2024 11:07 AM]
May 7, 2024 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan by Scott R. Knapp. Certificate of Service: 05/07/2024. [24-1367] (SRK) [Entered: 05/07/2024 11:05 AM]
May 6, 2024 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan by Phillip J. DeRosier. Certificate of Service: 05/06/2024. [24-1367] (PJD) [Entered: 05/06/2024 03:42 PM]
May 2, 2024 Filing 4 MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 05/31/2024 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 05/02/2024 08:44 AM]
April 30, 2024 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians Employee Welfare Fund and Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians by Herman D. Hofman. Certificate of Service: 04/30/2024. [24-1367] (HDH) [Entered: 04/30/2024 04:25 PM]
April 26, 2024 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Robin L. Baker (RLB) [Entered: 04/26/2024 03:42 PM]
April 26, 2024 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians and Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians Employee Welfare Fund. Transcript needed: y. (RLB) [Entered: 04/26/2024 03:39 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indian, et al v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRAND TRAVERSE BAND OF OTTAWA AND CHIPPEWA INDIANS
Represented By: Herman Daniel Hofman
Represented By: Perrin Rynders
Represented By: Neil E. Youngdahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRAND TRAVERSE BAND OF OTTAWA AND CHIPPEWA INDIANS EMPLOYEE WELFARE FUND
Represented By: Herman Daniel Hofman
Represented By: Perrin Rynders
Represented By: Neil E. Youngdahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF MICHIGAN
Represented By: Aaron Vaughn Burrell
Represented By: Brandon Clifford Hubbard
Represented By: Phillip J. DeRosier
Represented By: Scott R. Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?