Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP, et al v. NCR Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: GEORGIA-PACIFIC CONSUMER PRODUCTS LP, FORT JAMES CORPORATION and GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC
Defendant: NCR CORPORATION, INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY, INC. and WEYERHAEUSER COMPANY
Case Number: 24-1404
Filed: May 7, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Environmental Acts
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2024 Filing 22 AMENDED BRIEFING LETTER SENT resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 08/01/2024, appellee brief now due 10/01/2024, reply brief due 11/05/2024. [24-1403, 24-1404] (ASM) [Entered: 06/14/2024 02:48 PM]
June 14, 2024 Filing 21 **DEFECTIVE ENTRY**AMENDED BRIEFING LETTER SENT resetting briefing schedule: . [24-1404, 24-1403]--[Edited 06/14/2024 by ASM] (ASM) [Entered: 06/14/2024 01:27 PM]
June 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER filed: Upon review and consideration, the parties joint motion to consolidate is GRANTED, and these appeals will be consolidated for purposes of briefing and submission. The Clerk will enter a separate briefing schedule with the parties proposed dates. [24-1404, 24-1403] (ASM) [Entered: 06/14/2024 01:20 PM]
June 11, 2024 Filing 19 Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 06/11/2024 11:00 AM]
May 29, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION filed by Mr. Michael Robert Huston for Weyerhaeuser Company to consolidate cases 24-1403, 24-1404. Certificate of Service: 05/29/2024. [24-1404] (MRH) [Entered: 05/29/2024 05:12 PM]
May 28, 2024 Filing 17 Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: The Mediation Conference scheduled for 06/10/2024 is hereby canceled. (MLB) [Entered: 05/28/2024 12:56 PM]
May 21, 2024 Filing 16 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Weyerhaeuser Company by Lauren Pardee Ruben. Certificate of Service: 05/21/2024. [24-1404] (LPR) [Entered: 05/21/2024 08:52 PM]
May 21, 2024 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. George Peter Sibley, III for Appellees Fort James Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP and Georgia-Pacific LLC Certificate of Service: 05/21/2024. [24-1404] (GPS) [Entered: 05/21/2024 10:47 AM]
May 20, 2024 Filing 14 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 07/01/2024, appellee brief due 07/31/2024. (ASM) [Entered: 05/20/2024 02:47 PM]
May 9, 2024 Filing 12 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is unnecessary for appeal purposes. Filed by Mr. Michael Robert Huston for Weyerhaeuser Company. Certificate of Service: 05/09/2024. [24-1404] (MRH) [Entered: 05/09/2024 11:22 AM]
May 9, 2024 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Michael Robert Huston for Appellant Weyerhaeuser Company Certificate of Service: 05/09/2024. [24-1404] (MRH) [Entered: 05/09/2024 11:13 AM]
May 9, 2024 Filing 10 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Michael Robert Huston for Appellant Weyerhaeuser Company.. Certificate of Service: 05/09/2024. [24-1404] (MRH) [Entered: 05/09/2024 11:12 AM]
May 8, 2024 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Weyerhaeuser Company by Michael R. Huston. Certificate of Service: 05/08/2024. [24-1404] (MRH) [Entered: 05/08/2024 05:09 PM]
May 8, 2024 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Weyerhaeuser Company by Kathleen M. O'Sullivan. Certificate of Service: 05/08/2024. [24-1404] (KMO) [Entered: 05/08/2024 05:05 PM]
May 8, 2024 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Fort James Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP and Georgia-Pacific LLC by J. Pierce Lamberson. Certificate of Service: 05/08/2024. [24-1404] (JPL) [Entered: 05/08/2024 03:18 PM]
May 8, 2024 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Fort James Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP and Georgia-Pacific LLC by Michael R. Shebelskie. Certificate of Service: 05/08/2024. [24-1404] (MRS) [Entered: 05/08/2024 03:11 PM]
May 8, 2024 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Fort James Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP and Georgia-Pacific LLC by Douglas M. Garrou. Certificate of Service: 05/08/2024. [24-1404] (DMG) [Entered: 05/08/2024 03:06 PM]
May 8, 2024 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Fort James Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP and Georgia-Pacific LLC by George P. Sibley, III. Certificate of Service: 05/08/2024. [24-1404] (GPS) [Entered: 05/08/2024 03:00 PM]
May 8, 2024 Filing 3 MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 06/10/2024 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Catherine Geyer. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [24-1403, 24-1404] (CAW) [Entered: 05/08/2024 12:25 PM]
May 7, 2024 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Antoinette Macon (ASM) [Entered: 05/07/2024 12:29 PM]
May 7, 2024 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Weyerhaeuser Company. Transcript needed: y. (ASM) [Entered: 05/07/2024 12:26 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP, et al v. NCR Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGIA-PACIFIC CONSUMER PRODUCTS LP
Represented By: Douglas M. Garrou
Represented By: Michael R. Shebelskie
Represented By: George Peter Sibley III
Represented By: Jeffrey Pierce Lamberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FORT JAMES CORPORATION
Represented By: Douglas M. Garrou
Represented By: Michael R. Shebelskie
Represented By: George Peter Sibley III
Represented By: Jeffrey Pierce Lamberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC
Represented By: Douglas M. Garrou
Represented By: Michael R. Shebelskie
Represented By: George Peter Sibley III
Represented By: Jeffrey Pierce Lamberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCR CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEYERHAEUSER COMPANY
Represented By: Katherine E. Page
Represented By: Michael Robert Huston
Represented By: Kathleen M. O'Sullivan
Represented By: Lauren Pardee Ruben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?