Krista Jones v. Interlake Steamship Company, et al
Plaintiff: KRISTA JONES
Defendant: MARINE ENGINEERS BENEFICIAL ASSOCIATION, DISTRICT 1 - PCD and INTERLAKE STEAMSHIP COMPANY
Case Number: 24-1432
Filed: May 15, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2024 Filing 12 ***LOCKED - Filed on closed case*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Marine Engineers Beneficial Association, District 1 - PCD by James R. Rosenberg. Certificate of Service: 07/08/2024. [24-1432] COUNSEL kindly advised to refile on active case 24-1435--[Edited 07/09/2024 by PJE] (JRR) [Entered: 07/08/2024 06:16 PM]
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER filed GRANTING motion to dismiss case - voluntarily [ # 9 ], [ # 9 ] filed by Mr. Ellis Boal. No mandate to issue.. (PJE) [Entered: 05/23/2024 08:07 AM]
May 22, 2024 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Krista Jones by Mark Louis Dobias. Certificate of Service: 05/22/2024. [24-1432] (MLD) [Entered: 05/22/2024 05:08 PM]
May 20, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION filed by Mr. Ellis Boal for Krista Jones to dismiss voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b), to dismiss Withdrawing 24-1432 in favor of 24-1435 Certificate of Service: 05/20/2024. [24-1432] (EB) [Entered: 05/20/2024 03:30 PM]
May 20, 2024 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Krista Jones by Ellis Boal. Certificate of Service: 05/20/2024. [24-1432] (EB) [Entered: 05/20/2024 03:17 PM]
May 17, 2024 Filing 7 ***LOCKED - Duplicate filing***APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Krista Jones by Ellis Boal. Certificate of Service: 05/17/2024. [24-1432]--[Edited 05/17/2024 by PJE] (EB) [Entered: 05/17/2024 02:31 AM]
May 17, 2024 Filing 6 ****LOCKED - not accepted as filed*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Krista Jones by Ellis Boal. Certificate of Service: 05/17/2024. [24-1432] COUNSEL kindly advised to refile the appearance form and motion separately on the docket.--[Edited 05/17/2024 by PJE] (EB) [Entered: 05/17/2024 02:22 AM]
May 15, 2024 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Paul Starr for Appellee Marine Engineers Beneficial Association, District 1 - PCD Certificate of Service: 05/15/2024. [24-1432] (PS) [Entered: 05/15/2024 11:18 AM]
May 15, 2024 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Marine Engineers Beneficial Association, District 1 - PCD by Paul D. Starr. Certificate of Service: 05/15/2024. [24-1432] (PS) [Entered: 05/15/2024 11:10 AM]
May 15, 2024 Filing 3 BRIEFING LETTER SENT: appellant brief due 06/24/2024; appellee brief due 07/24/2024. (PJE) [Entered: 05/15/2024 09:26 AM]
May 15, 2024 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Patricia Elder (PJE) [Entered: 05/15/2024 09:23 AM]
May 15, 2024 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by. Transcript needed: n. (PJE) [Entered: 05/15/2024 09:19 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Krista Jones v. Interlake Steamship Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTA JONES
Represented By: Mark Louis Dobias
Represented By: Ellis Boal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARINE ENGINEERS BENEFICIAL ASSOCIATION, DISTRICT 1 - PCD
Represented By: James Russell Rosenberg
Represented By: Paul Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERLAKE STEAMSHIP COMPANY
Represented By: James Patrick Verdi
Represented By: Vincent J. Tersigni
Represented By: Timothy J. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?