Krista Jones v. Interlake Steamship Company, et al
Plaintiff: KRISTA JONES
Defendant: MARINE ENGINEERS BENEFICIAL ASSOCIATION, DISTRICT 1 - PCD and INTERLAKE STEAMSHIP COMPANY
Case Number: 24-1435
Filed: May 15, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2024 Filing 16 BRIEFING LETTER SENT requesting brief corrections from Mr. Ellis Boal for Krista Jones because 1) pagination is not correct 2) correct table of contents to reflect correct pagination 3) proper electronic signature of Mr. Dobias 4) indicate requesting or waiving oral argument. Corrected brief due: 07/17/2024. (PJE) [Entered: 07/10/2024 01:33 PM]
July 10, 2024 Filing 15 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Marine Engineers Beneficial Association, District 1 - PCD by James R. Rosenberg. Certificate of Service: 07/10/2024. [24-1435] (JRR) [Entered: 07/10/2024 12:22 PM]
July 10, 2024 Filing 14 ***LOCKED - not accepted as filed*** CORRECTED APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Ellis Boal for Krista Jones.. Certificate of Service: 07/10/2024. Argument Request: requested. [24-1435] Counsel kindly advised to refer to the bref correction letter of this date.--[Edited 07/10/2024 by PJE] (EB) [Entered: 07/10/2024 07:59 AM]
July 3, 2024 Filing 13 BRIEFING LETTER SENT requesting brief corrections from Mr. Ellis Boal for Krista Jones and Mr. Mark Louis Dobias for Krista Jones because prior case number listed on cover page is incorrect; record references and case citations are preferred to be in the body of the brief and not footnotes; signatures are not proper electronic signatures; addendum is missing description of document and full Page ID # Range. Corrected brief due: 07/10/2024. (RLB) [Entered: 07/03/2024 07:51 AM]
July 2, 2024 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENT LOCKED - SEE CORRECTION LETTER SENT 7/3/24*** APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Ellis Boal for Krista Jones. Certificate of Service: 07/02/2024. Argument Request: requested. [24-1435]--[Edited 07/03/2024 by RLB] (EB) [Entered: 07/02/2024 09:01 PM]
May 23, 2024 Filing 11 BRIEFING LETTER SENT: appellant brief due 07/02/2024; appellee brief due 08/01/2024.--[Edited 05/23/2024 by PJE] (PJE) [Entered: 05/23/2024 08:17 AM]
May 23, 2024 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Paul Starr for Appellee Marine Engineers Beneficial Association, District 1 - PCD Certificate of Service: 05/23/2024. [24-1435] (PS) [Entered: 05/23/2024 08:06 AM]
May 23, 2024 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Marine Engineers Beneficial Association, District 1 - PCD by Paul D. Starr. Certificate of Service: 05/23/2024. [24-1435] (PS) [Entered: 05/23/2024 08:02 AM]
May 22, 2024 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Krista Jones by Mark Louis Dobias. Certificate of Service: 05/22/2024. [24-1435] (MLD) [Entered: 05/22/2024 05:11 PM]
May 20, 2024 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Ellis Boal for Appellant Krista Jones Certificate of Service: 05/20/2024. [24-1435] (EB) [Entered: 05/20/2024 02:55 PM]
May 20, 2024 Filing 6 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Ellis Boal for Appellant Krista Jones.. Certificate of Service: 05/20/2024. [24-1435] (EB) [Entered: 05/20/2024 02:51 PM]
May 20, 2024 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Krista Jones by Ellis Boal. Certificate of Service: 05/20/2024. [24-1435] (EB) [Entered: 05/20/2024 02:47 PM]
May 17, 2024 Filing 4 Update fee status change to paid 5-17-2024 Receipt No. AMIWDC-7374619 (PJE) [Entered: 05/17/2024 04:29 PM]
May 17, 2024 Filing 3 ***LOCKED - not accepted as filed*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Krista Jones by Ellis Boal. Certificate of Service: 05/17/2024. [24-1435] COUNSEL is kindly advised to refile all case opening forms separately.--[Edited 05/17/2024 by PJE] (EB) [Entered: 05/17/2024 02:18 AM]
May 15, 2024 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Patricia Elder (PJE) [Entered: 05/15/2024 03:39 PM]
May 15, 2024 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Krista Jones. Transcript needed: n. (PJE) [Entered: 05/15/2024 03:37 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Krista Jones v. Interlake Steamship Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARINE ENGINEERS BENEFICIAL ASSOCIATION, DISTRICT 1 - PCD
Represented By: Paul Starr
Represented By: James Russell Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERLAKE STEAMSHIP COMPANY
Represented By: James Patrick Verdi
Represented By: Vincent J. Tersigni
Represented By: Timothy J. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTA JONES
Represented By: Mark Louis Dobias
Represented By: Ellis Boal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?