USA v. City of Akron, OH, et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: CITY OF AKRON, OH and STATE OF OHIO
Case Number: 24-3277
Filed: April 2, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2024 Filing 26 EXHIBIT FILED by Mr. Stephen W. Funk for City of Akron, OH consisting of Letter, dated May 22, 2024, cited on Page 18 of Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. Certificate of Service: 05/29/2024. [24-3277] (SWF) [Entered: 05/29/2024 12:43 PM]
May 28, 2024 Filing 25 REPLY filed by Mr. Stephen W. Funk for City of Akron, OH regarding City of Akron's Motion for Stay Pending Appeal Certificate of Service: 05/28/2024. [24-3277] (SWF) [Entered: 05/28/2024 05:56 PM]
May 22, 2024 Filing 24 RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief by 28 days [ # 22 ] filed by Mr. Stephen W. Funk., resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 06/25/2024. appellee brief now due 07/25/2024. (VLP) [Entered: 05/22/2024 09:06 AM]
May 21, 2024 Filing 22 MOTION filed by Mr. Stephen W. Funk for City of Akron, OH to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 05/21/2024. [24-3277] (SWF) [Entered: 05/21/2024 04:21 PM]
May 20, 2024 Filing 21 RESPONSE filed regarding a motion to stay injunction pending appeal, [ # 16 ]; previously filed by Mr. Stephen W. Funk for City of Akron, OH. Response from Attorney Ms. Amber Dawn Wootton Hertlein for Appellee OH. Certificate of Service: 05/20/2024. [24-3277] (ADW) [Entered: 05/20/2024 01:46 PM]
May 20, 2024 Filing 20 RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion, [ # 16 ]; previously filed by Mr. Stephen W. Funk for City of Akron, OH. Response from Attorney Mr. Jacob David Ecker for Appellee USA. Certificate of Service: 05/20/2024. [24-3277] (JDE) [Entered: 05/20/2024 12:08 PM]
May 3, 2024 Filing 19 RULING LETTER SENT granting motions extend time to respond to motion for stay pending appeal [ # 18 ] [ # 17 ]. Response is now due 05/20/2024. (VLP) [Entered: 05/03/2024 10:24 AM]
May 3, 2024 Filing 18 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Ms. Amber Dawn Wootton Hertlein for OH to extend time to respond to Motion for Stay Certificate of Service: 05/03/2024. [24-3277]--[Edited 05/03/2024 by VLP] (ADW) [Entered: 05/03/2024 09:10 AM]
May 2, 2024 Filing 17 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Mr. Jacob David Ecker for USA to extend time to respond to motion for stay pending appeal Certificate of Service: 05/02/2024. [24-3277]--[Edited 05/02/2024 by GSA] (JDE) [Entered: 05/02/2024 02:00 PM]
April 30, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION filed by Mr. Stephen W. Funk for City of Akron, OH to stay injunction pending appeal. Certificate of Service: 04/30/2024. [24-3277] (SWF) [Entered: 04/30/2024 04:25 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 15 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Mr. Stephen W. Funk for City of Akron, OH to exceed page limit. Certificate of Service: 04/24/2024. [24-3277]--[Edited 04/25/2024 by GSA] (SWF) [Entered: 04/24/2024 12:36 PM]
April 17, 2024 Filing 14 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant City of Akron, OH by Terrence S. Finn. Certificate of Service: 04/17/2024. [24-3277] (TSF) [Entered: 04/17/2024 01:18 PM]
April 17, 2024 Filing 13 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee OH by Mark J Navarre. Certificate of Service: 04/17/2024. [24-3277] (MJN) [Entered: 04/17/2024 12:00 PM]
April 17, 2024 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENT LOCKED- COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE AND ENSURE IT IS IN A NON EDITABLE PDF FORMAT*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellee OH by Mark J. Navarre. Certificate of Service: 04/17/2024. [24-3277]--[Edited 04/17/2024 by VLP] (MJN) [Entered: 04/17/2024 11:33 AM]
April 17, 2024 Filing 11 LETTER SENT to Mr. Stephen W. Funk for City of Akron, OH, Mr. Gary Louis Pasheilich for City of Akron, OH, Mr. Jacob David Ecker for USA and Ms. Amber Dawn Wootton Hertlein for OH, regarding amended caption. (VLP) [Entered: 04/17/2024 10:44 AM]
April 17, 2024 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant City of Akron, OH by Gary L. Pasheilich. Certificate of Service: 04/17/2024. [24-3277] (GLP) [Entered: 04/17/2024 08:32 AM]
April 17, 2024 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for OH by Amber Wootton Hertlein. Certificate of Service: 04/17/2024. [24-3277] (ADW) [Entered: 04/17/2024 08:14 AM]
April 16, 2024 Filing 8 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 05/28/2024;. appellee brief due 06/25/2024; (VLP) [Entered: 04/16/2024 02:34 PM]
April 16, 2024 Filing 7 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is unnecessary for appeal purposes. Filed by Mr. Stephen W. Funk for City of Akron, OH. Certificate of Service: 04/16/2024. [24-3277] (SWF) [Entered: 04/16/2024 12:45 PM]
April 16, 2024 Filing 6 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Stephen W. Funk for Appellant City of Akron, OH.. Certificate of Service: 04/16/2024. [24-3277] (SWF) [Entered: 04/16/2024 09:54 AM]
April 16, 2024 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Stephen W. Funk for Appellant City of Akron, OH Certificate of Service: 04/16/2024. [24-3277] (SWF) [Entered: 04/16/2024 09:53 AM]
April 15, 2024 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant City of Akron, OH by Stephen W. Funk. Certificate of Service: 04/15/2024. [24-3277] (SWF) [Entered: 04/15/2024 04:05 PM]
April 15, 2024 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee USA by Jacob D. Ecker. Certificate of Service: 04/15/2024. [24-3277] (JDE) [Entered: 04/15/2024 07:11 AM]
April 2, 2024 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Virginia Padgett (VLP) [Entered: 04/02/2024 10:32 AM]
April 2, 2024 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant City of Akron, OH. Transcript needed: y. (VLP) [Entered: 04/02/2024 10:28 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USA v. City of Akron, OH, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Bonnie A. Cosgrove
Represented By: Arnold S. Rosenthal
Represented By: Jacob David Ecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF AKRON, OH
Represented By: Brian D. Bremer
Represented By: Terrence S. Finn
Represented By: Stephen W. Funk
Represented By: Gary Louis Pasheilich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF OHIO
Represented By: Amber Dawn Wootton Hertlein
Represented By: Mark John Navarre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?