Huber Heights Veterans Club, Inc. v. Kevin Bowman, et al
Plaintiff: HUBER HEIGHTS VETERANS CLUB, INC.
Defendant: KEVIN ARTHUR BOWMAN, TIMOTHY R. WEBB, VOITURE NATIONALE LA SOCIETE DES QUARANTE HOMMES ET HUIT CHEVAUX, JESSIKA N. WEBB, FRANK W. KRONEN and JOSEPH M. DOLWIG
Case Number: 24-3342
Filed: April 25, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2024 Filing 16 APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Dwight D. Brannon for Kevin Arthur Bowman, Joseph M. Dolwig, Frank W. Kronen, Voiture Nationale La Societe Des Quarante Hommes et Huit Chevaux, Jessika N. Webb and Timothy R. Webb. Certificate of Service: 06/21/2024. Argument Request: not requested. [24-3342] (DDB) [Entered: 06/21/2024 05:42 PM]
June 18, 2024 Filing 15 CORRECTED APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Charles Joseph Simpson for Huber Heights Veterans Club, Inc... Certificate of Service: 06/18/2024. Argument Request: not requested. [24-3342] (CJS) [Entered: 06/18/2024 08:38 PM]
June 18, 2024 Filing 14 BRIEFING LETTER SENT requesting brief corrections from Mr. Charles Joseph Simpson for Huber Heights Veterans Club, Inc. because the Addendum with designation of relevant originating court documents with Page ID # range is missing. Corrected brief due: 06/21/2024. (GSA) [Entered: 06/18/2024 09:21 AM]
June 17, 2024 Filing 13 LOCKED ** REQUESTING BRIEF CORRECTIONS ** PLEASE SEE BRIEFING LETTER AT #14 ** CORRECTED APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Charles Joseph Simpson for Huber Heights Veterans Club, Inc... Certificate of Service: 06/17/2024. Argument Request: not requested. [24-3342]--[Edited 06/18/2024 by GSA] (CJS) [Entered: 06/17/2024 07:16 PM]
June 14, 2024 Filing 12 BRIEFING LETTER SENT requesting brief corrections from Mr. Charles Joseph Simpson for Huber Heights Veterans Club, Inc. The additional attachment is not permitted. If records are not electronically available, an Appendix should be filed. The Page ID#s are not listed in the brief and the Addendum should be at the end of the brief. Corrected brief due: 06/20/2024. (GSA) [Entered: 06/14/2024 12:01 PM]
June 14, 2024 Filing 11 LOCKED ** REQUESTING BRIEF CORRECTIONS ** PLEASE SEE BRIEFING LETTER AT #12 ** APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Charles Joseph Simpson for Huber Heights Veterans Club, Inc.. Certificate of Service: 06/14/2024. Argument Request: not requested. [24-3342]--[Edited 06/14/2024 by GSA] (CJS) [Entered: 06/14/2024 11:05 AM]
May 30, 2024 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Name of Counsel: Attorney Mr. Dwight D. Brannon for Appellees Kevin Arthur Bowman, Joseph M. Dolwig, Frank W. Kronen, Voiture Nationale La Societe Des Quarante Hommes et Huit Chevaux, Jessika N. Webb and Timothy R. Webb; Kevin Arthur Bowman, Joseph M. Dolwig, Frank W. Kronen, Voiture Nationale La Societe Des Quarante Hommes et Huit Chevaux, Jessika N. Webb and Timothy R. Webb , makes the following disclosure: 1. Is said party a subsidiary or affiliate of a publicly owned corporation? No 2. Is there a publicly owned corporation, not a party to the appeal, with a financial interest in the outcome? No Certificate of Service: 05/30/2024. [24-3342] (DDB) [Entered: 05/30/2024 02:44 PM]
May 30, 2024 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Kevin Arthur Bowman, Joseph M. Dolwig, Frank W. Kronen, Voiture Nationale La Societe Des Quarante Hommes et Huit Chevaux, Jessika N. Webb and Timothy R. Webb by Dwight D. Brannon. Certificate of Service: 05/30/2024. [24-3342] (DDB) [Entered: 05/30/2024 02:42 PM]
May 10, 2024 Filing 7 Update fee status change to paid. Appeal Filing fee: $605.00, receipt number 300002161. (srb) (GSA) [Entered: 05/10/2024 02:03 PM]
May 10, 2024 Filing 8 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 06/20/2024; appellee brief due 07/22/2024. (GSA) [Entered: 05/10/2024 02:04 PM]
April 30, 2024 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Huber Heights Veterans Club, Inc. by Charles J. Simpson. Certificate of Service: 04/30/2024. [24-3342] (CJS) [Entered: 04/30/2024 04:05 PM]
April 30, 2024 Filing 5 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Charles Joseph Simpson for Appellant Huber Heights Veterans Club, Inc.. Is this case a cross-appeal? No ; Has this case or a related one been before this court previously? No ; Parties Against Whom this Appeal is Being Taken: Kevin Arthur Bowman, Joseph M. Dolwig, Frank W. Kronen, Voiture Nationale La Societe Des Quarante Hommes et Huit Chevaux, Jessika N. Webb and Timothy R. Webb Issues:. Certificate of Service: 04/30/2024. [24-3342] (CJS) [Entered: 04/30/2024 02:59 PM]
April 30, 2024 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Charles Joseph Simpson for Appellant Huber Heights Veterans Club, Inc. Certificate of Service: 04/30/2024. [24-3342] (CJS) [Entered: 04/30/2024 12:08 PM]
April 30, 2024 Filing 3 LOCKED ** FORM IS IN AN EDITABLE FORMAT ** PLEASE REFILE BY PRINTING TO PDF BEFORE UPLOADING ** APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Huber Heights Veterans Club, Inc. by Charles J. Simpson. Certificate of Service: 04/30/2024. [24-3342]--[Edited 04/30/2024 by GSA] (CJS) [Entered: 04/30/2024 11:37 AM]
April 25, 2024 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Gretchen Abruzzo (GSA) [Entered: 04/25/2024 12:19 PM]
April 25, 2024 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Huber Heights Veterans Club, Inc.. Transcript needed: n. (GSA) [Entered: 04/25/2024 12:16 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Huber Heights Veterans Club, Inc. v. Kevin Bowman, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUBER HEIGHTS VETERANS CLUB, INC.
Represented By: Charles Joseph Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN ARTHUR BOWMAN
Represented By: Dwight D. Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY R. WEBB
Represented By: Dwight D. Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VOITURE NATIONALE LA SOCIETE DES QUARANTE HOMMES ET HUIT CHEVAUX
Represented By: Dwight D. Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESSIKA N. WEBB
Represented By: Dwight D. Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK W. KRONEN
Represented By: Dwight D. Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH M. DOLWIG
Represented By: Dwight D. Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?