Grande Voiture D'Ohio La Societe des 40 Hommes v. Charles Simpson, et al
Plaintiff: GRANDE VOITURE D'OHIO LA SOCIETE DES 40 HOMMES ET 8 CHEVAUX
Defendant: CHARLES JOSEPH SIMPSON, JOHN MCMANUS, In his individual capacity (Treasurer of Montgomery County, Ohio), UNKNOW SPOUSE OF CHARLES J. SIMPSON, if any, UNKNOWN TENANTS/CCCUPANTS, FRANK W. KRONEN and KEVIN ARTHUR BOWMAN
Case Number: 24-3802
Filed: September 13, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
March 3, 2025 Grande Voiture d'Ohio v. Charles Joseph Simpson

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2024 Filing 12 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 11 ], filed by Mr. Dwight D. Brannon for Kevin Arthur Bowman, Frank W. Kronen and Grande Voiture D'Ohio La Societe des 40 Hommes et 8 Chevaux is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. Deficiency to be corrected by 11/12/2024. (RGF) [Entered: 11/04/2024 02:42 PM]
November 4, 2024 Filing 11 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Kevin Arthur Bowman, Grande Voiture D'Ohio La Societe des 40 Hommes et 8 Chevaux and Frank W. Kronen by Dwight D. Brannon. Certificate of Service: 11/04/2024. [24-3802] (DDB) [Entered: 11/04/2024 11:52 AM]
November 1, 2024 Filing 10 APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Dwight D. Brannon for Kevin Arthur Bowman, Grande Voiture D'Ohio La Societe des 40 Hommes et 8 Chevaux and Frank W. Kronen. Certificate of Service: 11/01/2024. Argument Request: not requested. [24-3802] (DDB) [Entered: 11/01/2024 03:02 PM]
October 21, 2024 Filing 9 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Charles Joseph Simpson for Charles Joseph Simpson. Certificate of Service: 10/21/2024. Argument Request: not requested. [24-3802] (CJS) [Entered: 10/21/2024 07:10 AM]
October 11, 2024 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Charles Joseph Simpson by Charles J.. Simson. Certificate of Service: 10/11/2024. [24-3802] (CJS) [Entered: 10/11/2024 08:58 PM]
September 24, 2024 Filing 7 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Charles Joseph Simpson for Appellant Charles Joseph Simpson. Is this case a cross-appeal? No ; Has this case or a related one been before this court previously? No ; Parties Against Whom this Appeal is Being Taken: Grande Voiture D'Ohio La Societe des 40 Hommes et 8 Chevaux ; Issues:. [24-3802] (CJS) [Entered: 09/24/2024 01:31 PM]
September 24, 2024 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Name of Counsel: Dwight D. Brannon ; Kevin Arthur Bowman, Grande Voiture D'Ohio La Societe des 40 Hommes et 8 Chevaux and Frank W. Kronen makes the following disclosure: 1. Is said party a subsidiary or affiliate of a publicly owned corporation? No 2. Is there a publicly owned corporation, not a party to the appeal, with a financial interest in the outcome? No Certificate of Service: 09/24/2024. [24-3802] (DDB) [Entered: 09/24/2024 11:35 AM]
September 23, 2024 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Name of Counsel: Charles J. Simpson ; Charles Joseph Simpson makes the following disclosure: 1. Is said party a subsidiary or affiliate of a publicly owned corporation? No nO 2. Is there a publicly owned corporation, not a party to the appeal, with a financial interest in the outcome? No Certificate of Service: 09/23/2024. [24-3802] (CJS) [Entered: 09/23/2024 05:28 PM]
September 23, 2024 Filing 4 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Mr. Charles Joseph Simpson for Charles Joseph Simpson. Certificate of Service: 09/23/2024. [24-3802] (CJS) [Entered: 09/23/2024 04:54 PM]
September 13, 2024 Filing 3 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 10/23/2024;. appellee brief due 11/22/2024; (RGF) [Entered: 09/13/2024 12:01 PM]
September 13, 2024 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Mr. Roy G. Ford (513) 564-7016 (RGF) [Entered: 09/13/2024 11:58 AM]
September 13, 2024 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Charles Joseph Simpson. Transcript needed: n. (RGF) [Entered: 09/13/2024 11:54 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Grande Voiture D'Ohio La Societe des 40 Hommes v. Charles Simpson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES JOSEPH SIMPSON
Represented By: Charles Joseph Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN MCMANUS, In his individual capacity (Treasurer of Montgomery County, Ohio)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOW SPOUSE OF CHARLES J. SIMPSON, if any
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANTS/CCCUPANTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK W. KRONEN
Represented By: Dwight D. Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN ARTHUR BOWMAN
Represented By: Dwight D. Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRANDE VOITURE D'OHIO LA SOCIETE DES 40 HOMMES ET 8 CHEVAUX
Represented By: Dwight D. Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?