Jennie Wright, et al v. Louisville Metro Government, et al
Plaintiff: JENNIE V. WRIGHT, on Behalf of Herself and as Guardian and Next Friend of Minor Children J.L. and B.B. and SAUL WRIGHT, on Behalf of Himself and as Guardian and Next Friend of Minor Children J.L. and B.B.
Defendant: ERIC STAFFORD, TIMOTHY LIKSEY, LOUISVILLE METRO GOVERNMENT, STEVEN MACATEE, KYLE SENG, DAVID EADES and TIMOTHY HUBER
Case Number: 24-5965
Filed: October 24, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2024 Filing 14 The case manager for this case is now: Joshua M. Karich. (ACB) [Entered: 11/22/2024 09:29 AM]
November 21, 2024 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Name of Counsel: Joseph R. Abney ; Eric Stafford, Timothy Huber, Timothy Liksey, David Eades, Kyle Seng and Steven Macatee makes the following disclosure: 1. Is said party a subsidiary or affiliate of a publicly owned corporation? NO 2. Is there a publicly owned corporation, not a party to the appeal, with a financial interest in the outcome? NO Certificate of Service: 11/21/2024. [24-5965] (JRA) [Entered: 11/21/2024 02:04 PM]
November 15, 2024 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Name of Counsel: William E. Sharp ; Ms. Jennie V. Wright and Mr. Saul Wright makes the following disclosure: 1. Is said party a subsidiary or affiliate of a publicly owned corporation? No 2. Is there a publicly owned corporation, not a party to the appeal, with a financial interest in the outcome? No Certificate of Service: 11/15/2024. [24-5965] (WES) [Entered: 11/15/2024 05:01 PM]
November 15, 2024 Filing 11 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. William E. Sharp for Appellants Ms. Jennie V. Wright and Mr. Saul Wright. Is this case a cross-appeal? No ; Has this case or a related one been before this court previously? No ; Parties Against Whom this Appeal is Being Taken: Ms. Jennie V. Wright and Mr. Saul Wright ,Louisville Metro Government ; Issues:. Certificate of Service: 11/15/2024. [24-5965] (WES) [Entered: 11/15/2024 04:59 PM]
November 14, 2024 Filing 10 RULING LETTER SENT granting appellant's motion to extend time to file brief by 30 days [ # 8 ], resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 01/17/2025, appellee brief now due 02/18/2025. (ASM) [Entered: 11/14/2024 08:02 AM]
November 13, 2024 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Eric Stafford, Timothy Huber, Timothy Liksey, David Eades, Kyle Seng and Steven Macatee by Joseph Abney. Certificate of Service: 11/13/2024. [24-5965] (JRA) [Entered: 11/13/2024 04:14 PM]
November 13, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION filed by Mr. William E. Sharp for Ms. Jennie V. Wright and Mr. Saul Wright to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 11/13/2024. [24-5965] (WES) [Entered: 11/13/2024 01:15 PM]
November 8, 2024 Filing 7 BRIEFING LETTER SENT resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 12/18/2024, appellee brief now due 01/17/2025. (ASM) [Entered: 11/08/2024 08:22 AM]
November 7, 2024 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Ms. Jennie V. Wright and Mr. Saul Wright by Corey M. Shapiro. Certificate of Service: 11/07/2024. [24-5965] (CMS) [Entered: 11/07/2024 04:02 PM]
November 6, 2024 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Ms. Jennie V. Wright and Mr. Saul Wright by Crystal Mahoney. Certificate of Service: 11/06/2024. [24-5965] (CM) [Entered: 11/06/2024 02:37 PM]
November 6, 2024 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Ms. Jennie V. Wright and Mr. Saul Wright by William E. Sharp. Certificate of Service: 11/06/2024. [24-5965] (WES) [Entered: 11/06/2024 02:14 PM]
October 24, 2024 Filing 3 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 12/06/2024, appellee brief due 01/08/2025. (ASM) [Entered: 10/24/2024 09:14 AM]
October 24, 2024 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Antoinette Macon (ASM) [Entered: 10/24/2024 09:11 AM]
October 24, 2024 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Ms. Jennie V. Wright and Mr. Saul Wright. Transcript needed: n. (ASM) [Entered: 10/24/2024 08:57 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jennie Wright, et al v. Louisville Metro Government, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC STAFFORD
Represented By: Joseph Roberts Abney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY LIKSEY
Represented By: Joseph Roberts Abney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUISVILLE METRO GOVERNMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN MACATEE
Represented By: Joseph Roberts Abney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KYLE SENG
Represented By: Joseph Roberts Abney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID EADES
Represented By: Joseph Roberts Abney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY HUBER
Represented By: Joseph Roberts Abney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIE V. WRIGHT, on Behalf of Herself and as Guardian and Next Friend of Minor Children J.L. and B.B.
Represented By: Jennie V. Wright
Represented By: William E. Sharp
Represented By: Corey M. Shapiro
Represented By: Crystal Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAUL WRIGHT, on Behalf of Himself and as Guardian and Next Friend of Minor Children J.L. and B.B.
Represented By: Saul Wright
Represented By: William E. Sharp
Represented By: Corey M. Shapiro
Represented By: Crystal Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?