Google Incorporated, et al v. Leo Stoller Featured Case
Defendant: RICHARD M. FOGEL, SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF TRADEMARK ABUSE, LLC, as successor in interest to Cental Manufacturing, Incorporated and Stealth Industries, Incorporated., CENTRAL MANUFACTURING, INCORPORATED, also known as CENTRAL MFG CO, also known as CENTRAL MFG CO. (INC.), also known as CENTRAL MFG. CO. OF ILLINOIS and STEALTH INDUSTRIES, INCORPORATED, also known as RENTAMARK, also known as RENTAMARK.COM
Plaintiff - Appellee: GOOGLE INCORPORATED
Appellant: LEO D. STOLLER
Case Number: 09-3569
Filed: October 20, 2009
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Civil (Rico)
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2010 Filing 16 Notice from Appellant Leo D. Stoller in 08-4240, 09-3463, 09-3569 of the filing of a Petition for Writ of Certiorari. Notified by mail. [08-4240, 09-3463, 09-3569]
January 8, 2010 Filing 15 Original record returned to the District Court. Entire record returned consisting of 4 vol. loose pleadings; 4 vol. transcript;. [09-3569]
January 8, 2010 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 12/17/2009 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [6188424-2] [09-3569]
January 8, 2010 Filing 14 Mandate issued.. Record to be returned later 4 vol. loose pleadings; 4 vol. transcripts;. [09-3569]
December 17, 2009 Filing 13 Order filed GRANTING motion to dismiss case. The appeal is DISMISSED pursuant to the filing bar imposed on appellant by this court. In re: Leo Stoller, No. 08-4240 (7th Cir. December 4, 2009). [6181645-2]. Frank H. Easterbrook, Chief Judge; Richard A. Posner, Circuit Judge and Diane S. Sykes, Circuit Judge. [6183925-2] [09-3569]
December 8, 2009 Filing 12 Motion filed by Appellee Google Incorporated to dismiss appeal. [6181645-1] [09-3569]
November 20, 2009 Filing 11 Original record on appeal filed. Contents of record : 1 vol. electronic pleadings; 4 vol. paper loose pleadings; 4 vol. paper transcripts; [6177560-1] [09-3569]
November 19, 2009 Filing 10 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief. [6176798-2] Appellant's brief due on or before 01/13/2010 for Leo D. Stoller. Appellee's brief due on or before 02/12/2010 for Google Incorporated. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 02/26/2010 for Appellant Leo D. Stoller. CMD [6176979-1] [09-3569]
November 18, 2009 Filing 9 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Leo D. Stoller to extend time to file appellant's brief. [6176798-1] [09-3569]
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This court received notice from the District Court that the appellant paid the required docketing fee. Appellant's brief due on or before 12/14/2009 for Leo D. Stoller. Appellee's brief due on or before 01/12/2010 for Google Incorporated. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 01/26/2010 for Appellant Leo D. Stoller. [6175512] [09-3569]
November 13, 2009 Filing 7 Filed notice from the District Court that the appeal docketing fee was received. [09-3569]
November 2, 2009 Filing 6 Order re: 1. Notice of granting in forma pauperis petition. 2. Response of Google Inc. to Stoller’s purported “Notice of granting in forma pauperis petition". The appellant attaches a district court order dated March 19, 2007, granting leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the appellant’s prior appeals. However, the appellant has not been granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis with respect to this present appeal. Accordingly, the appellant must pay the required appellate filing fees or a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis with this clerk of the district court by November 10, 2009. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of the appeal pursuant to Cir. R. 3(b). JKL Sent Certified Mail with return receipt requested. Receipt Number: 70081140000194286452. [6172514-1] [09-3569]
October 28, 2009 Filing 5 Filed Response by Google Incorporated to notice of granting in forma pauperis petition, filed by Appellant Leo D. Stoller in 09-3569. [6171151-2] [6171888] [6171888-2] [09-3569]
October 28, 2009 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Mr. Michael T. Zeller for Appellee Google Incorporated. [6171870][6171870-1] [09-3569]
October 23, 2009 Filing 3 Filed notice of granting in forma pauperis petition by Party Leo D. Stoller. [6171151] [09-3569]
October 21, 2009 Filing 2 Docketing statement filed by Appellant Leo D. Stoller. [6170032][6170032-1] [09-3569]
October 20, 2009 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Leo D. Stoller by 10/26/2009. Transcript information sheet due by 11/03/2009. Fee or IFP forms due on 11/03/2009 for Appellant Leo D. Stoller. Record on Appeal from Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division due by 11/10/2009. [6169487-2] [09-3569]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Google Incorporated, et al v. Leo Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: GOOGLE INCORPORATED
Represented By: Michael T. Zeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: LEO D. STOLLER
Represented By: Leo D. Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD M. FOGEL
Represented By: Janice A. Alwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF TRADEMARK ABUSE, LLC, as successor in interest to Cental Manufacturing, Incorporated and Stealth Industries, Incorporated.
Represented By: Lance G. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRAL MANUFACTURING, INCORPORATED, also known as CENTRAL MFG CO, also known as CENTRAL MFG CO. (INC.), also known as CENTRAL MFG. CO. OF ILLINOIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEALTH INDUSTRIES, INCORPORATED, also known as RENTAMARK, also known as RENTAMARK.COM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?