Erich Specht, et al v. Harry Leinenweber Featured Case
Petitioner: ERICH SPECHT, individually and doing business as ANDROID DATA CORPORATION and ANDROID'S DUNGEON INCORPORATED
Respondent: HARRY D. LEINENWEBER
Party-in-Interest: GOOGLE INCORPORATED, a Delaware Corporation
Case Number: 10-2823
Filed: August 3, 2010
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
September 8, 2010 Erich Specht, et al v. Harry Leinenweber

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Final judgment filed per opinion. With costs: no. [11] [6249602] [10-2823]
September 8, 2010 Filing 10 Filed opinion of the court by Judge Easterbrook. The motions to seal are DENIED. The petition for a writ of mandamus is DENIED. Frank H. Easterbrook, Chief Judge; Michael S. Kanne, Circuit Judge and David F. Hamilton, Circuit Judge. [10] [6249598] [10-2823]
August 20, 2010 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Attorney Mr. David W. Carpenter for Party-in-Interest AT&T Mobility, LLC. [9] [6245821] [10-2823]
August 20, 2010 Filing 8 Attorney D. Wayne Watts for AT&T Mobility, LLC in 10-2823 terminated and added Attorney(s) David W. Carpenter for party(s) Party-in-Interest AT&T Mobility, LLC, in case 10-2823 per disclosure statement. Disclosure statement filed by Attorney(s) David W. Carpenter for party(s) Party-in-Interest AT&T Mobility, LLC, in case 10-2823. [8] [6245674] [10-2823]
August 20, 2010 Filing 7 Filed Response by AT&T Mobility, LLC to petition for writ of mandamus. [7][6245669] [10-2823]
August 20, 2010 Filing 6 Motion filed by Party-in-Interest AT&T Mobility, LLC to file exhibits to declaration of Brian Low under seal. 4 sealed envelopes tendered. [6245667] [10-2823]
August 20, 2010 Filing 5 Filed Response by Google Incorporated to petition for writ of mandamus. [5][6245664] [10-2823]
August 20, 2010 Filing 4 Motion filed by Party-in-Interest Google Incorporated for leave to file appendix under seal. [6245572] [10-2823]
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re: PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS. Google, Inc. and AT&T Mobility, LLC shall file responses to the petition by August 20, 2010. Further, District Judge Leinenweber is invited to file a response, if he chooses to do so, by August 20, 2010. [3] [6242060] [10-2823]
August 3, 2010 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement filed by Attorneys P. Andrew Fleming, John F. Shonkwiler, Richard G. Douglass, and Martin Murphy for Petitioners Erich Specht and Android's Dungeon Incorporated . [2] [6241185] [10-2823]
August 3, 2010 Filing 1 Original and 3 copies of Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed. Fee paid. Receipt #3301. [1] [6241157] [10-2823]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Erich Specht, et al v. Harry Leinenweber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ERICH SPECHT, individually and doing business as ANDROID DATA CORPORATION
Represented By: P. Andrew Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ANDROID'S DUNGEON INCORPORATED
Represented By: P. Andrew Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: HARRY D. LEINENWEBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Party-in-interest: GOOGLE INCORPORATED, a Delaware Corporation
Represented By: Herbert H. Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?