Rhonda Ezell v. City of Chicago
Plaintiff / Appellant: RHONDA EZELL, JOSEPH I. BROWN, SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INCORPORATED, WILLIAM HESPEN and ACTION TARGET, INCORPORATED
Amicus Curiae: BRETT BENSON, PAUL FINKELMAN, PATRICK J. CHARLES, ROBERT J. SPITZER, DAVID THOMAS KONIG and STANLEY KATZ
Defendant / Appellee: CITY OF CHICAGO
Case Number: 10-3525
Filed: October 29, 2010
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2011 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 07/06/2011 Final Order with Mandate and Bill of Costs sent to the District Court Clerk. [6325854-2] [6325854] [10-3525] (JC)
July 28, 2011 Filing 35 Mandate issued with bill of costs in the amount of $1087.90.. Record to be returned later 2 vol. of exhibits. [35] [6325846] [10-3525] (JC)
July 19, 2011 Filing 34 Filed Bill of Costs by Appellants Action Target, Incorporated, Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated in the amount of $1,241.43. [34] [6323654] [10-3525]--[Edited 07/20/2011 by FI]to reflect correct amount of $1,087.90. (Sigale, David)
July 12, 2011 Filing 33 Filed opinion of the court by Judge Sykes. REVERSED and REMANDED. Michael S. Kanne, Circuit Judge; Ilana Diamond Rovner, Circuit Judge, Concurring; and Diane S. Sykes, Circuit Judge. *This opinion was originally released in typescript. [33] [6321654] [10-3525] (FP)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Final judgment filed per opinion. With costs: yes. [32] [6320302] [10-3525] (CD)
July 6, 2011 Filing 31 Filed opinion of the court by Judge Sykes. The district court's order denying the plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction is REVERSED and the case is REMANDED with instructions to enter a preliminary injunction consistent with this opinion. Michael S. Kanne, Circuit Judge; Ilana Diamond Rovner, Circuit Judge, concurring in the judgment; and Diane S. Sykes, Circuit Judge. This opinion is released in typescript; a printed version will follow. [31] [6320300] [10-3525] (CD)
May 5, 2011 Filing 30 Filed Appellants Action Target, Incorporated, Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated Citation of Additional Authority, per Circuit Rule 28(e). [30] [6306168] [10-3525] (Sigale, David)
May 4, 2011 Filing 29 Filed Appellee City of Chicago Citation of Additional Authority, per Circuit Rule 28(e). [29] [6305750] [10-3525] (Loose, Suzanne)
May 4, 2011 Filing 28 Added Attorney(s) Suzanne M. Loose for party(s) Appellee City of Chicago, in case 10-3525 per appearance form. Appearance form filed by Attorney Suzanne M. Loose for Appellee City of Chicago, in case 10-3525. [28] [6305728] [10-3525]--[Edited 05/04/2011 by AD to reflect the addition of attorney Loose.] (Loose, Suzanne)
April 4, 2011 Filing 27 Case argued by Mr. Alan Gura for Appellants Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated, Rhonda Ezell, Joseph I. Brown, William Hespen and Action Target, Incorporated and James A. Feldman for Appellee City of Chicago. [27] [6298446] [10-3525] (GW)
April 4, 2011 Filing 26 Case heard and taken under advisement by panel: Michael S. Kanne, Circuit Judge; Ilana Diamond Rovner, Circuit Judge and Diane S. Sykes, Circuit Judge. [26] [6298444] [10-3525] (GW)
March 22, 2011 Received argument confirmation per argument email form for Attorney Mr. Alan Gura for Appellants Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated, Rhonda Ezell, Joseph I. Brown, William Hespen and Action Target, Incorporated. [6295257-2] [6295257] [10-3525] (LJ)
March 18, 2011 Received argument confirmation per argument email form for. Alan Gura for Action Target, Incorporated Rhonda Ezell Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated William Hespen Joseph I. Brown, in case 10-3525 [6294736-2] [6294736] [10-3525] (LJ)
March 14, 2011 Filing 25 15 copies Appellant's reply brief filed by Appellants Action Target, Incorporated, Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated. [6293615] [25] Electronically Transmitted. DIST. [25] [6293615] [10-3525] (LB)
March 8, 2011 Received argument confirmation per argument email form for. James A. Feldman for City of Chicago, in case 10-3525 [6292067-2] [6292067] [10-3525] (LJ)
March 2, 2011 Filing 24 15 copies Amicus brief filed by Amici Curiae Patrick J. Charles, Paul Finkelman, Stanley Katz, David Thomas Konig and Robert J. Spitzer per order. Disk Filed. [24] [6290758] [10-3525] (RS)
March 2, 2011 Filing 23 Instanter order issued GRANTING Unopposed Motion of Historians and Legal Scholars Paul Finkelman, Stanley N. Katz, David Thomas Konig, Patrick J. Charles, and Robert J. Spitzer as Amici Curiae in Support of Appellee to File Amicus Brief. The clerk of this court shall file INSTANTER the amicus brief received on February 25, 2011. [ # 21 ] SCR [23] [6290696] [10-3525] (AD)
March 2, 2011 Filing 22 Argument set for Monday, April 4, 2011, at 9:30 a.m in the Main Courtroom, Room 2721. Each side limited to 20 minutes. [22] [6290421] [10-3525] (RS)
February 28, 2011 Filing 21 Filed motion by Non-Party Paul Finkelman, Stanley N. Katz, David Thomas Konig, Patrick J. Charles and Robert J. Spitzer to file amicus brief. 15 copies amicus brief tendered. [21] [6290159] [10-3525] (KH)
February 18, 2011 Filing 20 NOTICE: Attorney Benna Solomon for Appellee City of Chicago will not be available for oral argument April 11-12; May 12-13, 2011. [20] [6288541] [10-3525] (AB)
February 18, 2011 Filing 19 15 copies Appellee's brief filed by Appellee City of Chicago. [6288289] [19] Disk Filed. [19] [6288289] [10-3525]--[Edited 02/22/2011 by RT] (RT)
February 18, 2011 Filing 18 NOTICE: Attorney Mr. David G. Sigale for Appellants Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated, Rhonda Ezell, Joseph I. Brown, William Hespen and Action Target, Incorporated will not be available for oral argument March 30-31; April 5-14, 2011. [18] [6288162] [10-3525] (AB)
February 16, 2011 Filing 17 NOTICE: Attorney Benna Solomon for Appellee City of Chicago will not be available for oral argument April 7-8, 12, 14-15 & 26, 2011. [17] [6287616] [10-3525] (AB)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellee's brief. [ # 15 ] Appellee's brief due on or before 02/18/2011 for City of Chicago. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 03/11/2011 for Appellant Action Target, Incorporated, Appellant Joseph I. Brown, Appellant Rhonda Ezell, Appellant William Hespen and Appellant Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated. CMD [16] [6283998] [10-3525] (AD)
February 1, 2011 Filing 15 Motion filed by Appellee City of Chicago to extend time to file appellee's brief. [6283783] [10-3525] (KL)
January 6, 2011 Filing 14 Supplemental paper record on appeal filed. Contents of record : 2 vol. of exhibits.[14] [6277376] [10-3525] (DW)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellee's brief. [ # 12 ] Appellee's brief due on or before 02/07/2011 for City of Chicago. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 02/22/2011 for Appellant Action Target, Incorporated, Appellant Joseph I. Brown, Appellant Rhonda Ezell, Appellant William Hespen and Appellant Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated. CMD [13] [6276275] [10-3525] (SM)
December 30, 2010 Filing 12 Motion filed by Appellee City of Chicago to extend time to file appellee's brief. [6276251] [10-3525] (CD)
December 15, 2010 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 AMICUS PARTIES. The following are those parties to this cause : KENNETH PACHOLSKI, KATHRYN TYLER, MICHAEL HALL, RICK PERE, AND ILLINOIS ASSOCIATION OF FIREARMS RETAILERS [6272903-2] [6272903] [10-3525] (SP)
December 15, 2010 Filing 11 15 copies Amicus brief filed by Amicus Curiae Brett Benson by consent. Disk Filed. [11] [6272894] [10-3525] (SP)
December 8, 2010 Filing 10 Filed 10 copies Appendix by Appellants Action Target, Incorporated, Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated. [10] [6271637] [10-3525] (SP)
December 8, 2010 Filing 9 15 copies Appellant's brief filed by Appellants Action Target, Incorporated, Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated. Appellee's brief due on or before 01/07/2011 for City of Chicago [6271634] [9] Electronically Transmitted. [9] [6271634] [10-3525]--[Edited 01/19/2011 by SP] (SP)
December 2, 2010 Filing 8 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants Action Target, Incorporated, Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated. [8] [6269910] [10-3525] (SM)
December 1, 2010 Filing 7 Filed electronic transcript of proceedings held on 8/23/10, 8/24/10, 9/15/10, 9/16/10, 10/1/10, 10/4/10. [7] [6269338] THIS TRANSCRIPT IS FOR INTERNAL COURT USE ONLY. Remote electronic access to the transcript is ONLY available through the District Court's PACER system. [10-3525] (SK)
December 1, 2010 Filing 6 Original record on appeal filed electronically. Contents of record : 6 vol. of pleadings. [6] [6269332] [10-3525] (SK)
November 15, 2010 Filing 5 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants Action Target, Incorporated, Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated. [5] [6266049] [10-3525] (SM)
November 15, 2010 Filing 4 Attorney Alan Gura for Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated, William Hespen, Rhonda Ezell, Joseph I. Brown and Action Target, Incorporated in 10-3525 terminated and added Attorney(s) David G. Sigale for party(s) Appellant Joseph I. Brown Appellant Action Target, Incorporated Appellant Rhonda Ezell Appellant Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated Appellant William Hespen, in case 10-3525 per disclosure statement. Disclosure statement filed by Attorney(s) David G. Sigale for party(s) Appellant Joseph I. Brown Appellant Action Target, Incorporated Appellant Rhonda Ezell Appellant Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated Appellant William Hespen Appellant Illinois State Rifle Association, in case 10-3525. [4] [6266037] [10-3525] (SM)
November 8, 2010 Filing 3 Docketing statement filed by Appellants Action Target, Incorporated, Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated. [3] [6264486] [10-3525] (SM)
November 1, 2010 Filing 2 Appearance form filed by Attorneys Mara S. Georges, Myriam Zreczny Kasper and Suzanne M. Loose for Appellee City of Chicago. [2] [6263130] [10-3525] (FP)
October 29, 2010 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLANT: Illinois State Rifle Association. [6262403-2] [6262403] [10-3525] (CD)
October 29, 2010 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Action Target, Incorporated, Appellant Joseph I. Brown, Appellant Rhonda Ezell, Appellant William Hespen and Appellant Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated by 11/04/2010. Transcript information sheet due by 11/12/2010. Appellant's brief due on or before 12/07/2010 for Action Target, Incorporated, Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated. Record on Appeal from Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division due by 11/19/2010. [1] [6262399] [10-3525] (CD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Rhonda Ezell v. City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RHONDA EZELL
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Represented By: Alan Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSEPH I. BROWN
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Represented By: Alan Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INCORPORATED
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Represented By: Alan Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM HESPEN
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Represented By: Alan Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ACTION TARGET, INCORPORATED
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Represented By: Alan Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRETT BENSON
Represented By: Charles J. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PAUL FINKELMAN
Represented By: Clifford M. Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PATRICK J. CHARLES
Represented By: Clifford M. Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ROBERT J. SPITZER
Represented By: Clifford M. Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DAVID THOMAS KONIG
Represented By: Clifford M. Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STANLEY KATZ
Represented By: Clifford M. Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF CHICAGO
Represented By: James A. Feldman
Represented By: Mara S. Georges
Represented By: Suzanne M. Loose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?