Martin Baylor v. Gary Public Library, et al Featured Case

Plaintiff - Appellant: MARTIN BAYLOR
Defendant - Appellee: GARY PUBLIC LIBRARY, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE GARY PUBLIC LIBRARY, ANTHONY WALKER, CYNTHIA WATTS and RAYFIELD FISHER
Case Number: 11-2184
Filed: May 25, 2011
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Jobs

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2011 10 Featured Case ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, appellees are directed to make a written status report to the Settlement Conference Office on or before January 10, 2012. The report shall be sent by e-mail directly to the Settlement Conference and not to the Clerk of the Court. RJS [6362682] [11-2184] (FP)
September 19, 2011 9 Order issued vacating the court's order dated 9/19/11 as erroneously issued. [9] [6338452] [11-2184] (RT)
September 19, 2011 8 Featured Case ORDER: This Court has received 1 envelope, document no. 136, under seal from the district court. All documents filed in this Court, except those required to be sealed by statute or rule are considered public. Pursuant to 7th Circuit Operating Procedure 10(b), documents sealed in the district court will be maintained under seal in this Court for 14 days, to afford time to request the approval required by section (a) of this operating procedure. Absent a motion from a party these sealed documents will be placed in the public record on 10/04/2011. Motion shall be filed by 10/03/2011. NOTE: VACATED per the court's 9/19/11 order. [8] [6338445] [11-2184]--[Edited 09/19/2011 by CD to reflect vacated] (RT)
June 30, 2011 7 Featured Case ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. [7] RJS [6319237] [11-2184] (KL)
June 8, 2011 6 Featured Case ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 08/01/2011 for Martin Baylor. Appellees' brief due on or before 08/31/2011 for Board of Trustees of the Gary Public Library, Rayfield Fisher, Gary Public Library, Anthony Walker and Cynthia Watts. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 09/14/2011 for Appellant Martin Baylor. RJS [6313913] [11-2184] (SM)
June 7, 2011 5 Notification of Circuit Rule 33 conference issued. The conference will be conducted by phone, Thursday, June 30, 2011 at 9:30 a.m. RJS [5] [6313911] [11-2184] (SM)
June 7, 2011 4 Docketing statement filed by Appellant Martin Baylor. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [4] [6313724] [11-2184] (Bullock, Bryan)
June 7, 2011 3 Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Bryan K. Bullock for Appellant Martin Baylor. [3] [6313722] [11-2184] (Bullock, Bryan)
June 1, 2011 2 Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Michael E. Tolbert Kevin G. Kerr for Appellees Board of Trustees of the Gary Public Library, Rayfield Fisher, Gary Public Library, Anthony Walker and Cynthia Watts. Additional Parties: Nancy Valentine, Maryann Canty-Reedus and Sadie Sheffield. [2] [6312461] [11-2184] (Kerr, Kevin)
May 25, 2011 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Nancy Valentine; Maryann Canty-Reedus; Shadie Sheffield. [6310854-2] [6310854] [11-2184] (FP)
May 25, 2011 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Transcript information sheet due by 06/08/2011. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Martin Baylor by 05/26/2011. Appellant's brief due on or before 07/05/2011 for Martin Baylor. [1] [6310848] [11-2184] (FP)

Search for this case: Martin Baylor v. Gary Public Library, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: MARTIN BAYLOR
Represented By: Bryan K. Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: GARY PUBLIC LIBRARY
Represented By: Michael E. Tolbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE GARY PUBLIC LIBRARY
Represented By: Michael E. Tolbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: ANTHONY WALKER
Represented By: Michael E. Tolbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: CYNTHIA WATTS
Represented By: Michael E. Tolbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: RAYFIELD FISHER
Represented By: Michael E. Tolbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?