Robert Lowinger, et al v. Douglas Oberhelman, et al
Defendant / Appellee: CATERPILLAR INC., DOUGLAS R. OBERHELMAN, STEVEN H. WUNNING, EDWARD J. RAPP and LUIS DE LEON
Plaintiff / Appellant: ISSEK FUCHS and ROBERT LOWINGER
Case Number: 18-1863
Filed: April 20, 2018
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Filing 36 Mandate issued. No record to be returned. [36] [7008205] [18-1863] (DRS) [Entered: 05/31/2019 09:16 AM]
May 31, 2019 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 05/09/2019 Final Opinion and Final Judgment, with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7008208-2] [7008208] [18-1863] (DRS) [Entered: 05/31/2019 09:22 AM]
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: Final judgment filed per opinion. With costs: yes. [35] [7003691] [18-1863] (ER) [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:52 PM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 34 Filed opinion of the court by Judge Wood. AFFIRMED. Diane P. Wood, Chief Circuit Judge; Daniel A. Manion, Circuit Judge and Ilana Diamond Rovner, Circuit Judge. [34] [7003686] [18-1863] (ER) [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:48 PM]
February 4, 2019 Filing 33 Filed Response by Appellees Caterpillar Inc., Luis De Leon, Steven H. Wunning, Edward J. Rapp and Douglas R. Oberhelman to Appellants' Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 28(j) Citation of Additional Authority. [33][6981834] [18-1863] (Ducayet, James) [Entered: 02/04/2019 11:03 AM]
January 31, 2019 Filing 32 Filed Appellants Issek Fuchs and Robert Lowinger Citation of Additional Authority, per Circuit Rule 28(e). Argument set for: 11/01/2018. [32] [6981233] [18-1863] (Abraham, Jeffrey) [Entered: 01/31/2019 11:47 AM]
November 1, 2018 Filing 31 Case argued by Mr. Jeffrey S. Abraham for Appellants Robert Lowinger and Issek Fuchs and Mr. James W. Ducayet for Appellees Caterpillar Inc., Douglas R. Oberhelman, Edward J. Rapp, Steven H. Wunning and Luis De Leon. [31] [6962788] [18-1863] (DRS) [Entered: 11/01/2018 01:55 PM]
November 1, 2018 Filing 30 Case heard and taken under advisement by panel: Diane P. Wood, Chief Judge; Daniel A. Manion, Circuit Judge and Ilana Diamond Rovner, Circuit Judge. [30] [6962787] [18-1863] (DRS) [Entered: 11/01/2018 01:54 PM]
October 22, 2018 Filing 29 Received argument confirmation from James W. Ducayet for Appellees Caterpillar Inc., Luis De Leon, Douglas R. Oberhelman, Steven H. Wunning and Edward J. Rapp. [29] [6960045] [18-1863] (Ducayet, James) [Entered: 10/22/2018 12:20 PM]
October 22, 2018 Filing 28 Received argument confirmation from Jeffrey S. Abraham for Appellants Robert Lowinger and Issek Fuchs. [28] [6959983] [18-1863] (Abraham, Jeffrey) [Entered: 10/22/2018 10:25 AM]
September 26, 2018 Filing 27 CORRECTED Appellant's reply brief filed by Appellants Issek Fuchs and Robert Lowinger, per order. Paper copies due on 10/03/2018 Electronically Transmitted. [27] [6954663] [18-1863] (CAH) [Entered: 09/26/2018 03:31 PM]
September 26, 2018 Filing 26 INSTANTER ORDER re: Unopposed Motion of Plaintiffs-Appellants for Leave to File a Corrected Reply Brief, Instanter. [ # 24 ] The motion is GRANTED. The clerk shall file INSTANTER the electronically tendered corrected reply brief of the appellants. This brief replaces the reply brief filed on 09/17/2018. CMD [26] [6954645] [18-1863] (MM) [Entered: 09/26/2018 03:00 PM]
September 25, 2018 Filing 25 Argument set for Thursday, November 1, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. in the Main Courtroom, Room 2721. Each side limited to 15 minutes. [25] [6954194] [18-1863] (RS) [Entered: 09/25/2018 10:49 AM]
September 21, 2018 Filing 24 Instanter motion filed by Appellants Issek Fuchs and Robert Lowinger to correct Reply Brief of Appellants. [24] [6953715] [18-1863] (Abraham, Jeffrey) [Entered: 09/21/2018 04:51 PM]
September 17, 2018 Filing 23 Appellant's reply brief filed by Appellants Issek Fuchs and Robert Lowinger. Paper copies due on 09/24/2018 Electronically Transmitted. [23] [6952371] [18-1863]--[Edited 09/26/2018 by MM--REPLACED per the court's 09/26/2018 order.] (CAH) [Entered: 09/17/2018 03:52 PM]
September 17, 2018 Filing 22 Submitted appellant reply brief by Jeffrey S. Abraham & Todd Kammerman for Appellants Robert Lowinger and Issek Fuchs. [22] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [6952353] [18-1863] (Abraham, Jeffrey) [Entered: 09/17/2018 03:24 PM]
August 29, 2018 Filing 21 Filed Appendix by Appellees Caterpillar Inc., Luis De Leon, Douglas R. Oberhelman, Edward J. Rapp and Steven H. Wunning. [21] [6948404] Paper copies due on 09/06/2018 [18-1863] (CM) [Entered: 08/30/2018 09:30 AM]
August 29, 2018 Filing 20 Appellee's brief filed by Appellees Caterpillar Inc., Luis De Leon, Douglas R. Oberhelman, Edward J. Rapp and Steven H. Wunning. Paper copies due on 09/06/2018 Electronically Transmitted. [20] [6948402] [18-1863] (CM) [Entered: 08/30/2018 09:29 AM]
August 29, 2018 Filing 19 Submitted Supplemental Appendix by Walter C. Carlson for Appellees Caterpillar Inc., Luis De Leon, Douglas R. Oberhelman, Edward J. Rapp and Steven H. Wunning. [19] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [6948361] [18-1863] (Carlson, Walter) [Entered: 08/29/2018 05:29 PM]
August 29, 2018 Filing 18 Submitted appellee brief by Walter C. Carlson for Appellees Caterpillar Inc., Luis De Leon, Douglas R. Oberhelman, Edward J. Rapp and Steven H. Wunning. [18] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [6948360] [18-1863] (Carlson, Walter) [Entered: 08/29/2018 05:25 PM]
July 20, 2018 Filing 17 CORRECTED Appellant's brief filed by Appellants Issek Fuchs and Robert Lowinger. Paper copies due on 07/30/2018. Electronically Transmitted. [17] [6939812] [18-1863] (MAN) [Entered: 07/23/2018 09:18 AM]
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re: Unopposed motion of appellant's to file a corrected brief, instanter, filed on 7/19/18. The motion is GRANTED. The clerk of this court shall file the appellants' corrected brief INSTANTER, replacing the brief filed on July 16, 2018. [ # 15 ]. SCR [16] [6939596] [18-1863] (FP) [Entered: 07/20/2018 11:00 AM]
July 19, 2018 Filing 15 Instanter motion filed by Appellants Issek Fuchs and Robert Lowinger to correct Brief of Appellants. [15] [6939370] [18-1863] (Abraham, Jeffrey) [Entered: 07/19/2018 01:44 PM]
July 16, 2018 Filing 14 Appellant's brief filed by Appellants Issek Fuchs and Robert Lowinger. Paper copies due on 07/23/2018. Electronically Transmitted. [14] [6938595] [18-1863]--[Edited 07/20/2018 by FP to reflect REPLACED per 7/20/18 order. ] (MAN) [Entered: 07/16/2018 04:41 PM]
July 16, 2018 Filing 13 Submitted appellant brief by Jeffrey S. Abraham and Todd Kammerman for Appellants Issek Fuchs and Robert Lowinger. [13] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [6938577] [18-1863] (Abraham, Jeffrey) [Entered: 07/16/2018 04:04 PM]
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 07/16/2018 for Issek Fuchs and Robert Lowinger. Appellees' brief due on or before 08/29/2018 for Caterpillar Inc., Luis De Leon, Douglas R. Oberhelman, Edward J. Rapp and Steven H. Wunning. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 09/17/2018 for Appellants Issek Fuchs and Robert Lowinger. RJS [6928273] [18-1863] (VG) [Entered: 05/30/2018 03:06 PM]
May 30, 2018 Filing 11 Added Attorney(s) Nilofer I. Umar for party(s) Appellee Douglas R. Oberhelman Appellee Edward J. Rapp Appellee Luis De Leon Appellee Steven H. Wunning Appellee Caterpillar Inc., in case 18-1863 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Nilofer Umar for Appellees Caterpillar Inc., Luis De Leon, Douglas R. Oberhelman, Edward J. Rapp and Steven H. Wunning. [11] [6928094] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [18-1863]--[Edited 05/30/2018 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Umar, Nilofer) [Entered: 05/30/2018 10:59 AM]
May 29, 2018 Filing 10 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney James W. Ducayet for Appellees Caterpillar Inc., Luis De Leon, Douglas R. Oberhelman, Edward J. Rapp and Steven H. Wunning. [10] [6927647] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [18-1863] (Ducayet, James) [Entered: 05/29/2018 09:59 AM]
May 16, 2018 Filing 9 Amended Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Wednesday, May 30, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS [9] [6925201] [18-1863] (AD) [Entered: 05/16/2018 11:12 AM]
May 11, 2018 Filing 8 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Robert N. Hochman for Appellees Caterpillar Inc., Luis De Leon, Douglas R. Oberhelman, Edward J. Rapp and Steven H. Wunning. [8] [6924312] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [18-1863]--[Edited 05/11/2018 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Hochman, Robert) [Entered: 05/11/2018 03:10 PM]
May 11, 2018 Filing 7 Attorney James W. Ducayet for Steven H. Wunning, Edward J. Rapp, Douglas R. Oberhelman, Luis De Leon and Caterpillar Inc. in 18-1863 terminated and added Attorney(s) Walter C. Carlson for party(s) Appellee Douglas R. Oberhelman Appellee Edward J. Rapp Appellee Luis De Leon Appellee Steven H. Wunning Appellee Caterpillar Inc., in case 18-1863 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Walter C. Carlson for Appellees Caterpillar Inc., Luis De Leon, Douglas R. Oberhelman, Edward J. Rapp and Steven H. Wunning. [7] [6924302] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [18-1863]--[Edited 05/11/2018 by AD to reflect the termination and addition of counsel.] (Carlson, Walter) [Entered: 05/11/2018 03:04 PM]
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 07/02/2018 for Issek Fuchs and Robert Lowinger. Appellee's brief due on or before 08/01/2018 for Caterpillar Inc., Luis De Leon, Douglas R. Oberhelman, Edward J. Rapp and Steven H. Wunning. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 08/15/2018 for Appellants Issek Fuchs and Robert Lowinger. RJS [6922946] [18-1863] (CG) [Entered: 05/07/2018 02:32 PM]
May 7, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted in Room 1120, Wednesday May 30, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS. [5] [6922939] [18-1863] (CG) [Entered: 05/07/2018 02:23 PM]
May 3, 2018 Filing 4 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants Issek Fuchs and Robert Lowinger. [4] [6922088] [18-1863] (Abraham, Jeffrey) [Entered: 05/03/2018 09:46 AM]
April 26, 2018 Filing 3 Docketing Statement filed by Appellants Issek Fuchs and Robert Lowinger. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [3] [6920648] [18-1863] (Abraham, Jeffrey) [Entered: 04/26/2018 01:23 PM]
April 25, 2018 Filing 2 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jeffrey Abraham and Todd Kammerman for Appellants Issek Fuchs and Robert Lowinger. [2] [6920219] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [18-1863] --[Edited 04/25/2018 by AP- to reflect addition of counsel] (Abraham, Jeffrey) [Entered: 04/25/2018 10:21 AM]
April 20, 2018 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Issek Fuchs and Robert Lowinger by 04/26/2018. Transcript information sheet due by 05/04/2018. Appellant's brief due on or before 05/30/2018 for Issek Fuchs and Robert Lowinger. [1] [6919428] [18-1863] (VG) [Entered: 04/20/2018 02:40 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Robert Lowinger, et al v. Douglas Oberhelman, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CATERPILLAR INC.
Represented By: Nilofer I. Umar
Represented By: Walter C. Carlson
Represented By: James W. Ducayet
Represented By: Robert N. Hochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOUGLAS R. OBERHELMAN
Represented By: Nilofer I. Umar
Represented By: Walter C. Carlson
Represented By: James W. Ducayet
Represented By: Robert N. Hochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVEN H. WUNNING
Represented By: Nilofer I. Umar
Represented By: Walter C. Carlson
Represented By: James W. Ducayet
Represented By: Robert N. Hochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EDWARD J. RAPP
Represented By: Nilofer I. Umar
Represented By: Walter C. Carlson
Represented By: James W. Ducayet
Represented By: Robert N. Hochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LUIS DE LEON
Represented By: Nilofer I. Umar
Represented By: Walter C. Carlson
Represented By: James W. Ducayet
Represented By: Robert N. Hochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ISSEK FUCHS
Represented By: Todd Kammerman
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT LOWINGER
Represented By: Todd Kammerman
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?