Rachel Johnson v. Yahoo! Inc.

Plaintiff / Appellant: RACHEL JOHNSON, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
Defendant / Appellee: YAHOO! INC., now known as OATH HOLDINGS INC
Case Number: 19-1001
Filed: January 2, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 04/12/2019 for Rachel Johnson. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/13/2019 for Yahoo! Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/03/2019 for Appellant Rachel Johnson JNS [6984378] [19-1001] (AP) [Entered: 02/14/2019 08:52 AM]
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 03/13/2019 for Rachel Johnson. Appellee's brief due on or before 04/12/2019 for Yahoo! Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 05/03/2019 for Appellant Rachel Johnson. JNS [6979665] [19-1001] (AG) [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:15 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 13 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Timothy W. Loose for Appellee Yahoo! Inc.. [13] [6979569] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1001] [Edited 01/23/2019 by CAG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Loose, Timothy) [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:07 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 12 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Perlette M. Jura for Appellee Yahoo! Inc.. [12] [6979568] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1001] [Edited 01/23/2019 by CAG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Jura, Perlette) [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:05 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Christopher Chorba for Appellee Yahoo! Inc.. [11] [6979567] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1001] (Chorba, Christopher) [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:03 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr. for Appellee Yahoo! Inc.. [10] [6979566] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1001] [Edited 01/23/2019 by CAG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Boutrous, Theodore) [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:01 PM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Rachel Johnson. [9] [6978104] [19-1001] (Sostrin, Timothy) [Entered: 01/15/2019 04:12 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Rachel Johnson. [8] [6977394] [19-1001] (Sostrin, Timothy) [Entered: 01/11/2019 03:34 PM]
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 02/25/2019 for Rachel Johnson. Appellee's brief due on or before 03/27/2019 for Yahoo! Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 04/17/2019 for Appellant Rachel Johnson. JNS [6976695] [19-1001] (FP) [Entered: 01/09/2019 10:42 AM]
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Thursday, January 24, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS. [6] [6976694] [19-1001] (FP) [Entered: 01/09/2019 10:33 AM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 5 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Keith Keogh for Appellant Rachel Johnson. [5] [6975645] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1001]-[Edited 01/04/2019 by VG - to reflect addition of counsel] (Keogh, Keith) [Entered: 01/04/2019 11:20 AM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of service for Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Keith Keogh for Appellant Rachel Johnson. [4] [6975641] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1001] (Keogh, Keith) [Entered: 01/04/2019 11:06 AM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Rachel Johnson. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 16-8001, 18-8012. [3] [6975633] [19-1001] (Sostrin, Timothy) [Entered: 01/04/2019 10:57 AM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Timothy J. Sostrin for Appellant Rachel Johnson. [2] [6975631] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1001] (Sostrin, Timothy) [Entered: 01/04/2019 10:55 AM]
January 2, 2019 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Rachel Johnson by 01/04/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 01/16/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 02/11/2019 for Rachel Johnson. [1] [6974998] [19-1001] (AG) [Entered: 01/02/2019 11:55 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rachel Johnson v. Yahoo! Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RACHEL JOHNSON, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Keith J. Keogh
Represented By: Timothy J. Sostrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: YAHOO! INC., now known as OATH HOLDINGS INC
Represented By: Timothy Loose
Represented By: Christopher Chorba
Represented By: Perlette M. Jura
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?