Electrical Construction Indust, et al v. Veterans Electric, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: ROBERT RAYBURN, ELECTRICAL CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY PREFUNDING CREDIT REIMBURSEMENT PROGRAM, also known as Electrical Construction Industry Health & Welfare Plan, also known as Electrical Construction Industry Annuity Plan, also known as Electrical Construction Industr and DEAN WARSH
Defendant / Appellee: VETERANS ELECTRIC, LLC
Case Number: 19-1051
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: 1. Plaintiffs shall file their opening brief and required short appendix in the main appeal docketed in 19-1051 on or before 03/08/2019. 2. Defendant shall file its combined responsive brief in the main appeal and opening brief and appendix in the cross-appeal docketed in 18-3703 on or before 04/08/2019. 3. Plaintiffs shall file their combined reply brief, if any, in the main appeal and responsive brief in the cross-appeal on or before 05/08/2019. 4. Defendant shall file its reply brief, if any, in the cross-appeal on or before 05/29/2019. JNS [6983611] [19-1051, 18-3703] (PS) [Entered: 02/11/2019 02:46 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants Electrical Construction Industry Prefunding Credit Reimbursement Program, Robert Rayburn and Dean Warsh. [5] [6979051] [19-1051] (MM) [Entered: 01/18/2019 03:46 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 Docketing Statement filed by Appellants Electrical Construction Industry Prefunding Credit Reimbursement Program, Robert Rayburn and Dean Warsh. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 18-3703 [4] [6977368] [19-1051] (Eskra, Malinda) [Entered: 01/11/2019 03:07 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Malinda J. Eskra, Philip R. O'Brien for Appellees Electrical Construction Industry Prefunding Credit Reimbursement Program, Robert Rayburn and Dean Warsh in 18-3703, Appellants Electrical Construction Industry Prefunding Credit Reimbursement Program, Robert Rayburn and Dean Warsh in 19-1051. [3] [6977354] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [18-3703, 19-1051] (Eskra, Malinda) [Entered: 01/11/2019 02:33 PM]
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: The court, on its own motion, orders that these appeals are CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition. The briefing schedule is as follows: 1. Plaintiffs shall file their opening brief and required short appendix in the main appeal docketed in 191051 on or before 02/22/2019. 2. Defendant shall file its combined responsive brief in the main appeal and opening brief and appendix in the crossappeal docketed in 183703 on or before 03/25/2019. 3. Plaintiffs shall file their combined reply brief, if any, in the main appeal and responsive brief in the crossappeal on or before 04/24/2019. 4. Defendant shall file its reply brief, is any, in the crossappeal on or before 05/15/2019. DW [2] [6976907] [19-1051, 18-3703] (MM) [Entered: 01/10/2019 09:01 AM]
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Transcript information sheet due by 01/22/2019. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Electrical Construction Industry Prefunding Credit Reimbursement Program, Robert Rayburn and Dean Warsh by 01/14/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 02/19/2019 for Electrical Construction Industry Prefunding Credit Reimbursement Program, Robert Rayburn and Dean Warsh [1] [6976388] [19-1051] (AD) [Entered: 01/08/2019 11:23 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Electrical Construction Indust, et al v. Veterans Electric, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT RAYBURN
Represented By: Malinda J. Eskra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ELECTRICAL CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY PREFUNDING CREDIT REIMBURSEMENT PROGRAM, also known as Electrical Construction Industry Health & Welfare Plan, also known as Electrical Construction Industry Annuity Plan, also known as Electrical Construction Industr
Represented By: Malinda J. Eskra
Represented By: Philip R. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DEAN WARSH
Represented By: Malinda J. Eskra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VETERANS ELECTRIC, LLC
Represented By: Andrew R. Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?