Christopher Stoller v. Berkshire Hathaway, Incorporat, et al
Defendant / Appellee: BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY, INCORPORATED, CMH MANUFACTURING WEST, INC., CMH MANUFACTURING, INC., CLAYTON HOMES, INC. and WARREN E. BUFFETT
Plaintiff / Appellant: CHRISTOPHER STOLLER, Director
Case Number: 19-1059
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This appeal is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. (See order for details) Diane S. Sykes, Circuit Judge; Amy C. Barrett, Circuit Judge and Michael B. Brennan, Circuit Judge. [9] [6988342] [19-1059] (VG) [Entered: 03/04/2019 12:16 PM]
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Appellant Mr. Christopher Stoller is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Christopher Stoller, Director by 02/27/2019. JR [8] [6984194] [19-1059] (MM) [Entered: 02/13/2019 12:01 PM]
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 Filed Response by Appellees Berkshire Hathaway, Incorporated, Warren E. Buffett, Clayton Homes, Inc., CMH Manufacturing West, Inc. and CMH Manufacturing, Inc. to Appellant's Jurisdictional Memorandum. [7][6982413] [19-1059] (Roberts, John) [Entered: 02/05/2019 04:34 PM]
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: On consideration of the paper captioned Memorandum on Jurisdiction, Instanter and Combined Docketing Statement filed by appellant on January 28, 2019, IT IS ORDERED that appellees file, on or before February 6, 2019, a response to appellants filing, addressing the jurisdictional issue raised in the courts order of January 11, 2019. DW[6] [6981085] [19-1059] (PS) [Entered: 01/29/2019 04:19 PM]
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER issued GRANTING Motion for an Extension of Time. [ # 3 ] The appellant shall either pay the $505.00 appellate filing fees or file a motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis with the district court by February 25, 2019. CMD [5] [6980896] [19-1059] (AD) [Entered: 01/29/2019 11:30 AM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 Jurisdictional memorandum and combined docketing statement filed by Appellant Mr. Christopher Stoller. [4] [6980805] [19-1059] (PS) [Entered: 01/29/2019 09:18 AM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Mr. Christopher Stoller to extend time to file appeal fee. [3] [6980801] [19-1059] (PS) [Entered: 01/29/2019 09:13 AM]
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Appellant Mr. Christopher Stoller shall file, on or before January 25, 2019, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details) [6977358] DW [2] [6977358] [19-1059] (AG) [Entered: 01/11/2019 02:51 PM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee due. Transcript information sheet due by 01/23/2019. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Christopher Stoller, Director by 01/16/2019. Fee or IFP forms due on 01/23/2019 for Appellant Christopher Stoller, Director [1] [6977182] [19-1059] (FP) [Entered: 01/10/2019 04:54 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christopher Stoller v. Berkshire Hathaway, Incorporat, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY, INCORPORATED
Represented By: John Allen Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CMH MANUFACTURING WEST, INC.
Represented By: John Allen Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CMH MANUFACTURING, INC.
Represented By: John Allen Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLAYTON HOMES, INC.
Represented By: John Allen Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WARREN E. BUFFETT
Represented By: John Allen Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTOPHER STOLLER, Director
Represented By: Christopher Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?