Rashun Singleton v. Amita Health, et al

Defendant / Appellee: JASON BURRIS, RONALD BRYSON, ANN MARIE CAULFIELD and AMITA HEALTH
Plaintiff / Appellant: RASHUN SINGLETON
Case Number: 19-1060
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 14 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Rashun Singleton. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [14] [6987528] [19-1060] (PS) [Entered: 02/27/2019 03:59 PM]
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Appellant Rashun Singleton is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Rashun Singleton by 02/26/2019. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7018 0680 0002 2683 0632. JR [13] [6984083] [19-1060] (MM) [Entered: 02/12/2019 07:05 PM]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: On consideration of the Defendant-Appellees Jurisdictional Memorandum filed by defendant Amita Health on January 24, 2019, and the Memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction filed by appellant on January 25, 2019, this appeal shall proceed to briefing. Briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 03/18/2019 for Rashun Singleton. Appellee's brief due on or before 04/17/2019 for Amita Health. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 05/08/2019 for Appellant Rashun Singleton. DW [6982026] [19-1060] (CAG) [Entered: 02/04/2019 03:28 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 11 Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellant Rashun Singleton. [11] [6980341] [19-1060] (AP) [Entered: 01/25/2019 03:32 PM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 10 Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellee Amita Health. [10] [6979972] [19-1060] (Goldstein, Jacob) [Entered: 01/24/2019 02:48 PM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jacob Z. Goldstein for Appellee Amita Health. [9] [6979810] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1060]-[Edited 01/24/2019 by VG - to reflect addition of counsel] (Goldstein, Jacob) [Entered: 01/24/2019 10:07 AM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheets by Appellant Rashun Singleton. [8] [6979475] [19-1060] (CAG) [Entered: 01/23/2019 10:01 AM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Rashun Singleton. [7] [6979453] [19-1060] (CAG) [Entered: 01/23/2019 09:32 AM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Rashun Singleton. [6] [6979417] [19-1060] (AP) [Entered: 01/23/2019 08:51 AM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Rashun Singleton. [5] [6979415] [19-1060] (AP) [Entered: 01/23/2019 08:50 AM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Filed District Court order GRANTING Appellant Rashun Singleton leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP granted: 01/10/2019. Motion hearing held on 1/10/2019. Attorney Chiquita HallJackson's oral motion to withdraw as counsel for plaintiff is granted. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff Rashun Singleton's pro se motion requesting Judge Robert W. Gettleman to reconsider the final order decision regarding motion to enforce the following reasons Rule 60(b) [141] is denied. Plaintiff's motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis [144] is granted. Defendant's motion for sanctions [139] is stayed and continued pending resolution of Plaintiff's appeal. Forwarded to DW. [3] [6977163] [19-1060] (AP) [Entered: 01/10/2019 04:19 PM]
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Appellant Rashun Singleton and Appellee Amita Health shall file, on or before January 24, 2019, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details) [6977067] DW [2] [6977067] [19-1060] (AG) [Entered: 01/10/2019 02:01 PM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 No attorney(s) added for Appellees Ronald Bryson, Jason Burris and Ann Marie Caulfield, per District Court docket and information sheet. [4] [6977569] [19-1060] (AP) [Entered: 01/14/2019 10:53 AM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Rashun Singleton by 01/15/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 01/23/2019. [1] [6976924] [19-1060] (AP) [Entered: 01/10/2019 09:25 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rashun Singleton v. Amita Health, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JASON BURRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RONALD BRYSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANN MARIE CAULFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMITA HEALTH
Represented By: April Renee Walkup
Represented By: Jacob Z. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RASHUN SINGLETON
Represented By: Rashun Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?