Alejandra Aguero v. Board of Trustees of the Unive

Defendant / Appellee: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS
Plaintiff / Appellant: ALEJANDRA AGUERO
Case Number: 19-1068
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 03/15/2019 for Alejandra Aguero. Appellee's brief due on or before 04/15/2019 for Board of Trustees of the University of Illinois. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 05/06/2019 for Appellant Alejandra Aguero. RJS [6982386] [19-1068] (AG) [Entered: 02/05/2019 03:48 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Alejandra Aguero. [4] [6979364] [19-1068] (CMD) [Entered: 01/22/2019 04:24 PM]
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 03/01/2019 for Alejandra Aguero. Appellee's brief due on or before 04/02/2019 for Board of Trustees of the University of Illinois. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 04/23/2019 for Appellant Alejandra Aguero. RJS [6978822] [19-1068] (CAG) [Entered: 01/18/2019 08:55 AM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Friday, February 1, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS [2] [6978820] [19-1068] (CAG) [Entered: 01/18/2019 08:53 AM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 01/24/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 02/19/2019 for Alejandra Aguero [1] [6977247] [19-1068] (AP) [Entered: 01/11/2019 09:56 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alejandra Aguero v. Board of Trustees of the Unive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: William James Brinkmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALEJANDRA AGUERO
Represented By: Jonathan C. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?