Division Six Sports, Inc. v. Finish Line, Incorporated, et al

Plaintiff / Appellant: DIVISION SIX SPORTS, INC.
Defendant / Appellee: FINISH LINE, INC. OF DELAWARE and FINISH LINE, INCORPORATED
Case Number: 19-1070
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Division Six Sports, Inc.. Paper copies due on 03/11/2019 Electronically Transmitted. [11] [6988241] [19-1070] (CCG) [Entered: 03/04/2019 09:23 AM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 Submitted appellant brief by Cathleen M. Shrader for Appellant Division Six Sports, Inc.. [10] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [6988198] [19-1070] (Shrader, Cathleen) [Entered: 03/01/2019 05:12 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Ryan Isenberg for Appellant Division Six Sports, Inc.. [9] [6988058] (L-No; E-No; R-No) [19-1070] (Isenberg, Ryan) [Entered: 03/01/2019 01:42 PM]
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Ryan Isenberg for Appellant Division Six Sports, Inc.. [8] [6987152] (L-No; E-No; R-No) [19-1070] (Isenberg, Ryan) [Entered: 02/26/2019 01:45 PM]
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Ryan Isenberg for Appellant Division Six Sports, Inc.. [7] [6987059] (L-No; E-No; R-No) [19-1070] (Isenberg, Ryan) [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:13 AM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Cathleen M. Shrader for Appellant Division Six Sports, Inc.. [6] [6979280] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1070] (Shrader, Cathleen) [Entered: 01/22/2019 02:31 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Andrew W. Hull for Appellee Finish Line, Incorporated. [5] [6979266] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1070] (Hull, Andrew) [Entered: 01/22/2019 02:07 PM]
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 03/01/2019 for Division Six Sports, Inc. Appellee's brief due on or before 04/01/2019 for Finish Line, Incorporated. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 04/22/2019 for Appellant Division Six Sports, Inc. JB [6978679] [19-1070] (AD) [Entered: 01/17/2019 01:29 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Friday, February 1, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB [3] [6978677] [19-1070] (AD) [Entered: 01/17/2019 01:27 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 No attorney(s) added for Appellee Finish Line, Inc. of Delaware, per District Court docket and information sheet. [2] [6977575] [19-1070] (CAG) [Entered: 01/14/2019 11:27 AM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 01/25/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 02/20/2019 for Division Six Sports, Inc. [1] [6977374] [19-1070] (CAG) [Entered: 01/11/2019 03:17 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Division Six Sports, Inc. v. Finish Line, Incorporated, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DIVISION SIX SPORTS, INC.
Represented By: Cathleen M. Shrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FINISH LINE, INC. OF DELAWARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FINISH LINE, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrew Woodbridge Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?