John Palmer v. Nancy Berryhill

Defendant / Appellee: NANCY A. BERRYHILL, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOHN N. PALMER
Case Number: 19-1079
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 Appellant's brief filed by Appellant John N. Palmer. Appellee's brief due on or before 03/22/2019 for Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. Paper copies due on 02/27/2019. Electronically Transmitted. [7] [6985888] [19-1079] (CM) [Entered: 02/20/2019 02:49 PM]
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 Submitted appellant brief by David Sutterfield for Appellant John N. Palmer. [6] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [6985833] [19-1079] (Sutterfield, David) [Entered: 02/20/2019 02:00 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 Appearance form filed by Attorney Meghan O'Callaghan for Appellee Nancy A. Berryhill. [5] [6978691] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1079] [Edited 01/17/2019 by CAG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (O'Callaghan, Meghan) [Entered: 01/17/2019 01:54 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant John N. Palmer. [4] [6978393] [19-1079] (Sutterfield, David) [Entered: 01/16/2019 02:24 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant John N. Palmer. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [3] [6978391] [19-1079] (Sutterfield, David) [Entered: 01/16/2019 02:23 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney David Sutterfield for Appellant John N. Palmer. [2] [6978389] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1079] (Sutterfield, David) [Entered: 01/16/2019 02:21 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 U.S. civil case docketed. IFP. Docketing Statement due for Appellant John N. Palmer by 01/17/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 01/25/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 02/20/2019 for John N. Palmer. [1] [6977530] [19-1079] (AG) [Entered: 01/14/2019 09:57 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Palmer v. Nancy Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NANCY A. BERRYHILL, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Greggory R. Walters
Represented By: Meghan L. O'Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN N. PALMER
Represented By: David W. Sutterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?