Lisa Marlow v. Mark Hale, et al

Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, WILLIAM G. SHEPHERD and EDWARD MURNANE
Plaintiff / Appellee: LAURIE LOGER, MARK HALE and TODD SHADLE
Appellant: LISA D. MARLOW
Case Number: 19-1080
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Mr. Mark J. Downton for Appellant Lisa D. Marlow has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [23] [6988632] [19-1080] (LJ) [Entered: 03/05/2019 10:16 AM]
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re: 1. Motion for extension of time to file brief. 2. Plaintiffs-appellees' opposition to motion for extension of time. [ # 19 ] The motion is GRANTED. Appellant's brief due on or before 03/22/2019 for Lisa D. Marlow. Appellees' brief due on or before 04/22/2019 for Mark Hale, Laurie Loger and Todd Shadle. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 05/13/2019 for Appellant Lisa D. Marlow CMD [21] [6985637] [19-1080] (AP) [Entered: 02/20/2019 08:47 AM]
February 19, 2019 Filing 22 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted in Room 1120, Tuesday, March 5, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS [22] [6985652] [19-1080] (AD) [Entered: 02/20/2019 09:14 AM]
February 18, 2019 Filing 20 Filed Response in Opposition by Appellees Mark Hale, Laurie Loger and Todd Shadle to Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. [20][6985116] [19-1080] (Nelson, Robert) [Entered: 02/18/2019 06:32 PM]
February 15, 2019 Filing 19 Motion filed by Appellant Lisa D. Marlow to extend time to file appellant brief. [19] [6984885] [19-1080] (Downton, Mark) [Entered: 02/15/2019 12:45 PM]
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: re: 1. Appellant Lisa Marlow's motion to supplement appellate record. 2. Plaintiffs-appellees' motion to dismiss appeal and request to stay merits proceedings. [ # 16 ]; [ # 13 ] The motion to dismiss is DENIED without prejudice. The appellees may raise their arguments in support of dismissal again in their brief(s). The motion to supplement the record is DENIED without prejudice to renewal after presentation to the district court. See Fed. R. App. P. 10(e); Cir. R. 10(b). JPK [18] [6981049] [19-1080] (CAG) [Entered: 01/29/2019 03:32 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 17 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Lisa D. Marlow. [17] [6980749] [19-1080] (Downton, Mark) [Entered: 01/28/2019 04:46 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 16 Motion filed by Appellees Mark Hale, Todd Shadle and Laurie Loger to dismiss case, to suspend briefing. [16] [6980429] [19-1080] (Nelson, Robert) [Entered: 01/25/2019 07:06 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 15 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Erwin Chemerinsky for Appellees Mark Hale, Laurie Loger and Todd Shadle. [15] [6980408] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1080] [15] [6980408] [19-1080]--[Edited 01/28/2019 by CD to reflect addition of counsel.] (Chemerinsky, Erwin) [Entered: 01/25/2019 04:48 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 14 Added Attorney(s) Kevin R. Budner for party(s) Appellee Mark Hale Appellee Todd Shadle Appellee Laurie Loger, in case 19-1080 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Kevin R. Budner for Appellees Mark Hale, Todd Shadle and Laurie Loger. [14] [6980345] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1080]--[Edited 01/25/2019 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Budner, Kevin) [Entered: 01/25/2019 03:38 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 13 Motion filed by Appellant Lisa D. Marlow Supplement Appeallate Record. [13] [6980337] [19-1080] (Downton, Mark) [Entered: 01/25/2019 03:30 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 Added Attorney(s) Robert J. Nelson for party(s) Appellee Mark Hale Appellee Todd Shadle Appellee Laurie Loger, in case 19-1080 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Robert J. Nelson for Appellees Mark Hale, Todd Shadle and Laurie Loger. [12] [6980333] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1080]--[Edited 01/25/2019 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Nelson, Robert) [Entered: 01/25/2019 03:24 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 11 Added Attorney(s) Elizabeth J. Cabraser for party(s) Appellee Mark Hale Appellee Todd Shadle Appellee Laurie Loger, in case 19-1080 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Elizabeth J. Cabraser for Appellees Mark Hale, Todd Shadle and Laurie Loger. [11] [6980324] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1080]--[Edited 01/25/2019 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Cabraser, Elizabeth) [Entered: 01/25/2019 03:16 PM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 10 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Russell K. Scott for William G. Shepherd. [10] [6979812] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1080] (Scott, Russell) [Entered: 01/24/2019 10:11 AM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 Added Attorney(s) Andrew Jacob Chinsky for party(s) Edward Murnane, in case 19-1080 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Andrew J. Chinsky for Edward Murnane. [9] [6979515] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1080]--[Edited 01/23/2019 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Chinsky, Andrew) [Entered: 01/23/2019 11:01 AM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Paul E. Veith for Edward Murnane. [8] [6979512] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1080] (Veith, Paul) [Entered: 01/23/2019 10:59 AM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Brent W. Landau for Appellees Mark Hale, Laurie Loger and Todd Shadle. [7] [6979483] (L-No; E-No; R-No) [19-1080] (Landau, Brent) [Entered: 01/23/2019 10:17 AM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Ronald S. Safer for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. [6] [6979352] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1080] (Safer, Ronald) [Entered: 01/22/2019 04:09 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 Added Attorney(s) Joseph Cancila Jr. for party(s) State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, in case 19-1080 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Joseph A. Cancila for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. [5] [6979271] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1080]--[Edited 01/22/2019 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Cancila, Joseph) [Entered: 01/22/2019 02:18 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Added Attorney(s) Jonathan L. Loew for party(s) Appellee Mark Hale Appellee Todd Shadle Appellee Laurie Loger, in case 19-1080 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jonathan L. Loew for Appellees Mark Hale, Laurie Loger and Todd Shadle. [4] [6979076] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1080]--[Edited 01/18/2019 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Blonder, Steven) [Entered: 01/18/2019 04:05 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 Added Attorney(s) Steven Paul Blonder I for party(s) Appellee Mark Hale Appellee Todd Shadle Appellee Laurie Loger, in case 19-1080 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Steven P. Blonder for Appellees Mark Hale, Laurie Loger and Todd Shadle. [3] [6979071] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1080]--[Edited 01/18/2019 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Blonder, Steven) [Entered: 01/18/2019 04:03 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Lisa D. Marlow. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 13-3813, 16-8020, 17-8005, 18-3626 No. [2] [6978855] [19-1080]--[Edited 01/18/2019 by MM to update docket text to reflect the prior or related proceedings referenced in the filing.] (Downton, Mark) [Entered: 01/18/2019 09:55 AM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Lisa D. Marlow by 01/18/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 01/28/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 02/25/2019 for Lisa D. Marlow. [1] [6977700] [19-1080] (PS) [Entered: 01/14/2019 03:10 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lisa Marlow v. Mark Hale, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LAURIE LOGER
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: Steven Paul Blonder I
Represented By: Jonathan L. Loew
Represented By: Robert A. Clifford
Represented By: Robert J. Nelson
Represented By: Kevin R. Budner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARK HALE
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: Steven Paul Blonder I
Represented By: Jonathan L. Loew
Represented By: Robert A. Clifford
Represented By: Robert J. Nelson
Represented By: Kevin R. Budner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TODD SHADLE
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: Steven Paul Blonder I
Represented By: Jonathan L. Loew
Represented By: Robert A. Clifford
Represented By: Robert J. Nelson
Represented By: Kevin R. Budner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Ronald S. Safer
Represented By: Joseph Cancila Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM G. SHEPHERD
Represented By: Russell Kenneth Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD MURNANE
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Paul E. Veith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: LISA D. MARLOW
Represented By: Mark J. Downton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?