Osama Taha v. International Brotherhood of T
Defendant / Appellee: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS, Local 781
Plaintiff / Appellant: OSAMA TAHA
Case Number: 19-1085
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Sally A. Comin for Appellant Osama Taha has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [12] [6988607] [19-1085] (LJ) [Entered: 03/05/2019 10:02 AM]
March 4, 2019 Filing 11 Amended Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Osama Taha. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [11] [6988258] [19-1085]--[Edited 03/04/2019 by FP;to reflect correted PDF document. See entry #10.] (Comin, Sally) [Entered: 03/04/2019 09:38 AM]
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 Amended Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Osama Taha. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [10] [6987576] [19-1085]--[Edited 02/28/2019 by FP to reflect that it is a non-native document, Must be filed in correct PDF format. Have sent an email to atty.] (Comin, Sally) [Entered: 02/27/2019 06:57 PM]
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Attorney Sally A. Comin show cause for her failure to provide in the Circuit Rule 3(c) statement, the correct date that the notice of appeal was filed. Counsels response and an amended Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement is due on or before March 4, 2019. (See order for details). [9] [6987493] [19-1085] (AP) [Entered: 02/27/2019 03:09 PM]
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 Amended Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Osama Taha. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [8] [6987280] [19-1085] (Comin, Sally) [Entered: 02/26/2019 08:15 PM]
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: In the present case, appellants First Amended Docketing Statement, filed on February 20, 2019, fails to set forth the correct date on which appellant filed the notice of appeal. This information must be provided. As appellants statement currently reads, the appeal was filed late. The appellant shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the correct date that the notice of appeal was filed. The statement is due on or before February 27, 2019. DW [7] [6986185] [19-1085] (FP) [Entered: 02/21/2019 03:01 PM]
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 Amended Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Osama Taha. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [6] [6985990] [19-1085] (Comin, Sally) [Entered: 02/20/2019 06:31 PM]
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Circuit Rule 3(c)(1), referencing Circuit Rule 28(a), requires an appellant to file a docketing statement which provides information concerning appellate jurisdiction. In the present case, appellants Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement fails to set forth the date on which appellant filed the notice of appeal. This information must be provided. Accordingly, appellant file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the date that the notice of appeal was filed. The statement is due on or before February 21, 2019. DW [5] [6984859] [19-1085] (AD) [Entered: 02/15/2019 11:49 AM]
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Osama Taha. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [4] [6984337] [19-1085] (MM) [Entered: 02/13/2019 04:48 PM]
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. [3] RJS [6981577] [19-1085] (AD) [Entered: 02/01/2019 03:32 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Thursday, January 31, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS [2] [6978850] [19-1085] (MM) [Entered: 01/18/2019 09:42 AM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Osama Taha by 01/18/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 01/28/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 02/25/2019 for Osama Taha [1] [6977653] [19-1085] (AG) [Entered: 01/14/2019 02:07 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osama Taha v. International Brotherhood of T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS, Local 781
Represented By: Deirdre E. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: OSAMA TAHA
Represented By: Sally A. Comin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?