Henry Johnson v. Michael Melvin, et al
Defendant / Appellee: JACKIE MELON, House Counselor, MICHAEL MELVIN, Warden, JOHN R. BALDWIN, Director of IDOC and PATRICK TODD, Lieutenant
Plaintiff / Appellant: HENRY JOHNSON
Case Number: 19-1128
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 Filed Appellant Henry Johnson Memorandum In Support of PLRA Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal In Forma Pauperis. [4] [6990008] [19-1128] (CAG) [Entered: 03/11/2019 03:21 PM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Henry Johnson leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 02/14/2019. [3] [6984688] PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 03/18/2019 [19-1128] (CCG) [Entered: 02/14/2019 04:47 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [6979494] (Note: The Office of the IL Attorney General has been notified of the filing of the appeal.) [19-1128] (CAG) [Entered: 01/23/2019 10:35 AM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Henry Johnson by 01/24/2019. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 02/19/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 01/31/2019. [1] [6978638] [19-1128] (CAG) [Entered: 01/17/2019 12:10 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Henry Johnson v. Michael Melvin, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACKIE MELON, House Counselor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL MELVIN, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN R. BALDWIN, Director of IDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATRICK TODD, Lieutenant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HENRY JOHNSON
Represented By: Henry Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?