Christopher Stoller, et al v. Berkshire Hathaway, Incorporat, et al
Defendant / Appellee: BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY, INCORPORATED, CMH MANUFACTURING WEST, INC., CMH MANUFACTURING, INC., CLAYTON HOME BUILDING GROUP and BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOME BUILDERS
Plaintiff / Appellant: CHRISTOPHER STOLLER, Director and MICHAEL STOLLER
Case Number: 19-1209
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 03/04/2019 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [6993157-2] [6993157] [19-1209] (CM) [Entered: 03/26/2019 09:23 AM]
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 Mandate issued. No record to be returned. [9] [6993154] [19-1209] (CM) [Entered: 03/26/2019 09:20 AM]
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This appeal is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. (See order for further details.) Diane S. Sykes, Circuit Judge; Amy C. Barrett, Circuit Judge and Michael B. Brennan, Circuit Judge. [8] [6988401] [19-1209] (FP) [Entered: 03/04/2019 02:10 PM]
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file jurisdictional memorandum. [ # 6 ] Jurisdictional memorandum due for Appellants Christopher Stoller and Michael Stoller by 03/18/2019. CMD [7] [6986313] [19-1209] (AG) [Entered: 02/22/2019 10:21 AM]
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Mr. Christopher Stoller to extend time to file jurisdictional memorandum. [6] [6986242] [19-1209] (AG) [Entered: 02/21/2019 04:21 PM]
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellees Berkshire Hathaway Home Builders, Berkshire Hathaway, Incorporated, Clayton Home Building Group, CMH Manufacturing West, Inc. and CMH Manufacturing, Inc.. [5] [6984955] [19-1209] (Roberts, John) [Entered: 02/15/2019 03:03 PM]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Appellants Mr. Christopher Stoller and Michael Stoller shall file, on or before February 15, 2019, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details) [6982068] DW [4] [6982068] [19-1209] (CAG) [Entered: 02/04/2019 04:05 PM]
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 No attorney(s) added for Appellees Berkshire Hathaway Home Builders and Clayton Home Building Group, per District Court docket and information sheet. [3] [6982065] [19-1209] (CAG) [Entered: 02/04/2019 04:02 PM]
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEE: John Does 1-10. [2] [6981909] [19-1209] (CAG) [Entered: 02/04/2019 12:43 PM]
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Christopher Stoller, Director and Michael Stoller by 02/08/2019. Fee or IFP forms due on 02/19/2019 for Appellants Christopher Stoller, Director and Michael Stoller. Transcript information sheet due by 02/19/2019. [1] [6981903] [19-1209] (CAG) [Entered: 02/04/2019 12:31 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christopher Stoller, et al v. Berkshire Hathaway, Incorporat, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY, INCORPORATED
Represented By: John Allen Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CMH MANUFACTURING WEST, INC.
Represented By: John Allen Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CMH MANUFACTURING, INC.
Represented By: John Allen Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLAYTON HOME BUILDING GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOME BUILDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTOPHER STOLLER, Director
Represented By: Christopher Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL STOLLER
Represented By: Michael Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?