Marc Norfleet v. John Baldwin, et al
Defendant / Appellee: JOHN R. BALDWIN, JACQUELINE LASHBROOK, SAMUEL FURLOW, THOMAS A. SPILLER and SHERRY BENTON
Plaintiff / Appellant: MARC NORFLEET
Case Number: 19-1337
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Before the court are the appellant's motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis and trust fund statement, filed on April 19, 2019. In light of the court's order dated April 9, 2019, which dismissed this appeal, the motion and trust fund statement will be filed without further court action. [10] [6999500] CMD [19-1337] (CAG) [Entered: 04/22/2019 02:04 PM]
April 19, 2019 Filed Affidavit accompanying motion for permission to appeal in forma pauperis by Appellant Marc Norfleet. [6999225-2] [6999225] [19-1337] (VG) [Entered: 04/19/2019 01:55 PM]
April 19, 2019 Filed Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Appellant Marc Norfleet. [6999227-2] [6999227] [19-1337] (VG) [Entered: 04/19/2019 01:57 PM]
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re: 1. Affidavit accompanying motion for permission to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. 2. Memorandum in support of PLRA motion to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of this case indicates that the appellant is not permitted to proceed in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). The district court properly determined that, on three or more prior occasions, the appellant has brought an action that was dismissed on the grounds that it is frivolous or fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Norfleet v. Baldwin, No. 18-cv-01758 (S.D. Ill. dismissed Dec. 4, 2018); Norfleet v. Miller-Pickering, No. 18-cv-00564 (S.D. Ill. dismissed Sept. 20, 2018), affd as frivolous, No. 18-3187 (Jan. 24, 2019). In this case, the appellant has not demonstrated imminent danger of a serious physical injury pursuant to 1915(g). See Taylor v. Watkins, 623 F.3d 483 (7th Cir. 2010). A prisoner who has accumulated three strikes but brings an appeal without prepayment in violation of 1915(g) commits a fraud on the court by seeking permission to proceed in forma pauperis after a judge has held that 1915(g) applies to that person, and this fraud requires the immediate termination of the suit and an order forbidding further litigation. Sloan v. Lesza, 181 F.3d 857, 859 (7th Cir. 1999); Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 43637 (7th Cir. 1997). Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is DENIED and the appeal is DISMISSED. Until Marc Norfleet has paid in full all outstanding fees and any sanctions in all civil actions he has filed, the clerks of all federal courts in this circuit will return unfiled any papers submitted either directly or indirectly by or on behalf of Norfleet. This order does not apply to criminal cases or petitions challenging the terms of his confinement and may be reexamined in two years under the approach of Newlin, 123 F.3d at 43637, and Support Systems Intl Inc. v. Mack, 45 F.3d 185, 18687 (7th Cir. 1995). [ # 6 ]. Diane P. Wood, Chief Circuit Judge; William J. Bauer, Circuit Judge and Frank H. Easterbrook, Circuit Judge. [9] [6996630] [19-1337] (AP) [Entered: 04/09/2019 02:13 PM]
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Marc Norfleet. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [8] [6990935] [19-1337] (MM) [Entered: 03/15/2019 09:17 AM]
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 Filed Appellant Marc Norfleet Memorandum In Support of PLRA Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal In Forma Pauperis. [7] [6990928] [19-1337] (MM) [Entered: 03/15/2019 09:06 AM]
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 Prose motion filed by Appellant Marc Norfleet to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Trust account statement included with motion. [6] [6990927] [19-1337] (MM) [Entered: 03/15/2019 09:04 AM]
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Marc Norfleet leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 03/07/2019. [5] [6989479] PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 04/08/2019 [19-1337] (Greenwood, Cali) [Entered: 03/07/2019 04:20 PM]
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 Filed notice from the District Court that a motion to proceed in forma pauperis is pending. [4] [6988423] [19-1337] (Greenwood, Cali) [Entered: 03/04/2019 02:37 PM]
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [3] [6987093] (Note: The Office of the IL Attorney General has been notified of the filing of the appeal.) [19-1337] (FP) [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:42 AM]
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: John Does; Gaetz; Marcus Myers; Warden Newman; IDOC; [2] [6987089] [19-1337] (FP) [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:41 AM]
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Transcript information sheet due by 03/11/2019. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Marc Norfleet by 03/01/2019. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 03/27/2019. [1] [6987076] [19-1337] (FP) [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:30 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Marc Norfleet v. John Baldwin, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN R. BALDWIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACQUELINE LASHBROOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMUEL FURLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS A. SPILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHERRY BENTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARC NORFLEET
Represented By: Marc Norfleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?