Curtis Westbrook v. Muncie City Court of Muncie, I

Plaintiff / Appellee: CURTIS LAROY WESTBROOK
Defendant / Appellant: MUNCIE CITY COURT OF MUNCIE, INDIANA
Case Number: 19-1634
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 Pro se motion filed by Appellee Curtis Laroy Westbrook in 19-1634 to extend time to file the Appellee's response to the Appellant City of Muncie's Jurisdictional Memorandum.. [14] [7009463] [19-1634, 19-1470] (Westbrook, Curtis) [Entered: 06/05/2019 08:10 PM]
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re: Appellee's motion for 2nd extension of time to submit it's response to the appellant City of Muncie's jurisdictional memorandum. [ # 12 ] IT IS ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED only to the extent that appellee Curtis Laroy Westbrook shall file his response to the appellant's jurisdictional memorandum by June 7, 2019. If the appellee fails to meet this deadline, the court will proceed without a response from the appellee. CMD [13] [7006790] [19-1634] (VG) [Entered: 05/23/2019 01:52 PM]
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 Pro se motion filed by Appellee Curtis Laroy Westbrook in 19-1634 to extend time to file Extend time to file appellee's response to the appellant City of Muncie's Jurisdictional Statement and memorandum in support.. [12] [7006623] [19-1634, 19-1470] (Westbrook, Curtis) [Entered: 05/22/2019 08:55 PM]
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re: Appellee's motion for 2nd extension of time to submit response to the appellant City of Muncie's jurisdictional memorandum. IT IS ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED only to the extent that appellee Curtis Laroy Westbrook shall file his response to the appellant's jurisdictional memorandum by May 24, 2019. No further extensions of time will be allowed. [ # 10 ] CMD [11] [7002804] [19-1634] (AG) [Entered: 05/06/2019 04:00 PM]
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 Pro se motion filed by Appellee Curtis Laroy Westbrook in 19-1634 to extend time to file Appellee's response to Appellant City of Muncie's jurisdictional memorandum.. [10] [7002650] [19-1634, 19-1470] (Westbrook, Curtis) [Entered: 05/06/2019 10:27 AM]
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re: Appellant/Appellee's motion for extenison of time to respond to all above case proceedings. The motion is GRANTED to the extent that appellee Curtis Laroy Westbrook shall file his response to the appellant's jurisdictional memorandum by May 8, 2019. The appellee is reminded that the filing of a motion for appointment of counsel does not relieve him of the obligation to file the response. [ # 7 ] CMD [9] [7000019] [19-1634] (CMD) [Entered: 04/23/2019 04:37 PM]
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Curtis Laroy Westbrook in 19-1470, Appellee Curtis Laroy Westbrook in 19-1634 for appointment of counsel. [8] [6999866] [19-1470, 19-1634] (CMD) [Entered: 04/23/2019 02:03 PM]
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Curtis Laroy Westbrook in 19-1470, Appellee Curtis Laroy Westbrook in 19-1634 to extend time to file All court ordered pleadings for all of the Appellant/Appellee's cases that are before the 7th Circuit on appeal.. [7] [6999688] [19-1470, 19-1634] (Westbrook, Curtis) [Entered: 04/23/2019 09:02 AM]
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 Filed Statement of Issues on Appeal by Appellant Muncie City Court of Muncie, Indiana. [6] [6999663] [19-1634] (Smith, Joseph) [Entered: 04/22/2019 05:33 PM]
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Muncie City Court of Muncie, Indiana. [5] [6999661] [19-1634] (Smith, Joseph) [Entered: 04/22/2019 05:07 PM]
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re: Jurisdictional memorandum. IS ORDERED that appellee Curtis L. Westbrook file, on or before April 24, 2019, a response to appellants memorandum, addressing the jurisdictional issue raised in the courts order of April 10, 2019. DW [4] [6998391] [19-1634] (AP) [Entered: 04/16/2019 11:16 AM]
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellant Muncie City Court of Muncie, Indiana. [3] [6998085] [19-1634] (Smith, Joseph) [Entered: 04/15/2019 02:01 PM]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Appellant Muncie City Court of Muncie, Indiana shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details) [6996994] DW Jurisdictional memorandum due for Appellant Muncie City Court of Muncie, Indiana by 04/23/2019. [2] [6996994] [19-1634] (AD) [Entered: 04/10/2019 02:16 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 04/22/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 05/20/2019 for Muncie City Court of Muncie, Indiana. [1] [6996590] [19-1634] (FP) [Entered: 04/09/2019 01:10 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis Westbrook v. Muncie City Court of Muncie, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CURTIS LAROY WESTBROOK
Represented By: Curtis Laroy Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MUNCIE CITY COURT OF MUNCIE, INDIANA
Represented By: Joseph William Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?