Kiel Stone v. Executive Committee of the Uni

Appellant: KIEL R. STONE
Appellee: EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ILLINOIS
Case Number: 19-1636
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This appeal is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. (See order for further details.) Michael S. Kanne, Circuit Judge; Ilana Diamond Rovner, Circuit Judge and Michael B. Brennan, Circuit Judge. [6] [7007237] [19-1636] (FP) [Entered: 05/24/2019 04:29 PM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellant Kiel R. Stone. [5] [7003920] [19-1636] (VG) [Entered: 05/10/2019 02:41 PM]
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Appellant Kiel R. Stone shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details) [7000544] Jurisdictional memorandum due for Appellant Kiel R. Stone by 05/08/2019. DW [4] [7000544] [19-1636] (AD) [Entered: 04/25/2019 12:27 PM]
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Kiel R. Stone. Prior or Related proceedings: No. (Note: Exhibits attached) [3] [6998632] [19-1636] (AG) [Entered: 04/17/2019 08:52 AM]
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 Prose motion filed by Appellant Kiel R. Stone to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [2] [6998628] [19-1636] (AG) [Entered: 04/17/2019 08:50 AM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 U.S. civil case docketed. IFP on appeal denied on 03/13/2019. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Kiel R. Stone by 04/15/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 04/22/2019. Fee or IFP forms due on 04/22/2019 for Appellant Kiel R. Stone. [1] [6996173] [19-1636]--[Text updated 04/10/2019 by JR to reset docketing statement deadline to a future date; given delay in receiving appeal.] (MM) [Entered: 04/08/2019 12:27 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kiel Stone v. Executive Committee of the Uni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: KIEL R. STONE
Represented By: Kiel R. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ILLINOIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?