Alva Catt v. Richard Brown

Petitioner / Appellant: ALVA E. CATT
Respondent / Appellee: RICHARD BROWN
Case Number: 19-1638
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Alva E. Catt for certificate of appealability. [4] [7001021] [19-1638] (FP) [Entered: 04/29/2019 10:53 AM]
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 Prose motion filed by Appellant Alva E. Catt to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [3] [6998561] [19-1638] (VG) [Entered: 04/16/2019 04:08 PM]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Alva E. Catt leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. The petitioner's motion for a certificate of appealability, dkt. [58], is denied because the petitioner has failed to show that reasonable jurists would find "debatable whether [this court] was correct in its procedural ruling."(USCA #19-01638) Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 4/10/2019. Date IFP denied: 04/10/2019. Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 30 day notice for failure to pay the docketing fee. Fee or IFP forms due on 05/10/2019 for Appellant Alva E. Catt [6996946] [2] [6996946] [19-1638] (CAG) [Entered: 04/10/2019 12:48 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 State prisoner's habeas corpus case docketed. Certificate of Appealability denied 11/01/2017. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 04/22/2019. [1] [6996292] [19-1638] (VG) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:26 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alva Catt v. Richard Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: ALVA E. CATT
Represented By: Alva E. Catt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: RICHARD BROWN
Represented By: Henry A. Flores Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?