Modesto Ozuna v. USA
Petitioner / Appellant: MODESTO OZUNA
Respondent / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 19-1639
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 04/24/2019 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7000079-2] [7000079] [19-1639] (AD) [Entered: 04/24/2019 09:52 AM]
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: This cause is DISMISSED pursuant to F.R.A.P. 42(b). Mandate issued, no record to be returned. [4] [7000077] [19-1639] (AD) [Entered: 04/24/2019 09:44 AM]
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Modesto Ozuna for voluntary dismissal [3] [6999861] [19-1639] (AG) [Entered: 04/23/2019 01:50 PM]
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: A preliminary review of the short record indicates that this appeal duplicates an earlier appeal filed on March 29, 2019, and docketed in this court as Appeal No. 19-1574. Only one appeal is necessary, the other should be dismissed. Harris v. Bellin Memorial Hospital, 13 F.3d 1082, 1083 (7th Cir. 1994). Accordingly, appellant Modesto Ozuna shall file, on or before April 23, 2019, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed as unnecessary. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy this requirement. Briefing shall be suspended pending further court order. DW [6996745][2] [2] [6996745] [19-1639] (AD) [Entered: 04/09/2019 03:54 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 Federal prisoner's 2255 case docketed. Certificate of Appealability denied 09/27/2017. IFP. Transcript information sheet due by 04/22/2019. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Modesto Ozuna by 04/15/2019. [1] [6996627] [19-1639] (FP) [Entered: 04/09/2019 02:10 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Modesto Ozuna v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: MODESTO OZUNA
Represented By: Modesto Ozuna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Christopher R. McFadden
Represented By: Matthew Javier Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?