Peter Gakuba v. Mark Karner, et al

Defendant / Appellee: SUSAN HANSON, FBI, 06gr1328, Individually and Officially, JAMES COLEMAN, FBI, Individually and Officially, TIMOTHY SIMON, FBI, Individually and Officially, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and MARK KARNER
Plaintiff / Appellant: PETER GAKUBA
Case Number: 19-1641
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: TRANSFERRING the motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis on appeal to the clerk of the District Court for ruling in the first instance. [8] [7004315] JR [19-1641] (CAG) [Entered: 05/13/2019 04:03 PM]
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 Filed Appellant Mr. Peter Gakuba Memorandum In Support of PLRA Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal In Forma Pauperis. [7] [7004260] [19-1641] (CAG) [Entered: 05/13/2019 03:23 PM]
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 Prose motion filed by Appellant Mr. Peter Gakuba to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [6] [7004253] [19-1641] (CAG) [Entered: 05/13/2019 03:19 PM]
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re: Motions to consolidate appeals or alternatively, to dismiss. These appeals are subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act and, therefore, all proceedings are suspended pending the assessment and payment of any necessary fees. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 434 (7th Cir. 1997). Because the appellant's fee status in each of these appeals remains pending, IT IS ORDERED that the motions are DENIED without court action, pursuant to the court's fee notices and orders dated March 25, 2019, April 2, 2019, and April 8, 2019. [ # 6999752-2 ] [ # 6998350-3 ] [ # 6998339-3 ] [ # 4 ] [ # 6998352-3 ] [ # 6998346-3 ] [ # 6999752-3 ] [ # 6998350-2 ] [ # 6998339-2 ] [ # 6998352-2 ] [ # 6998346-2 ] [5] [6999970] CMD [19-1536, 19-1598, 19-1640, 19-1537, 19-1597, 19-1641] (AP) [Entered: 04/23/2019 03:46 PM]
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Mr. Peter Gakuba to consolidate appeals or alternatively dismiss without prejudice as duplicitous. [4] [6999755] [19-1537, 19-1597, 19-1641] (AP) [Entered: 04/23/2019 10:39 AM]
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Mr. Peter Gakuba. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 18-3398 [3] [6999729] [19-1641] (AP) [Entered: 04/23/2019 10:08 AM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Ronnie and John & Jane Does 1 through 25.[2] [6996526] [19-1641] (AP) [Entered: 04/09/2019 11:27 AM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 State prisoner's federal civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Peter Gakuba by 04/15/2019. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 05/08/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 04/22/2019. [1] [6996522] [19-1641] (AP) [Entered: 04/09/2019 11:15 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peter Gakuba v. Mark Karner, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUSAN HANSON, FBI, 06gr1328, Individually and Officially
Represented By: Monica Mallory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES COLEMAN, FBI, Individually and Officially
Represented By: Monica Mallory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIMOTHY SIMON, FBI, Individually and Officially
Represented By: Monica Mallory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Monica Mallory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK KARNER
Represented By: Monica Mallory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PETER GAKUBA
Represented By: Peter Gakuba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?