Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo v. Tapfin North America Shared Se, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: RICKY KAMDEM-OUAFFO
Defendant / Appellee: CAMPBELLS SOUP COMPANY, TASK MANAGEMENT INC., DENISE M. MORRISON, TAPFIN NORTH AMERICA SHARED SERVICES TEAM and CARY HAYES
Case Number: 19-2125
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
December 19, 2019 Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo v. Tapfin North America Shared Se
December 20, 2019 Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo v. Tapfin North America Shared Se

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 Filed 10 copies of separate Appendix by Appellant Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo. Disk not required. [12] [7021966] [19-2125] (PNR) [Entered: 08/06/2019 02:20 PM]
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 10 copies of appellant's brief filed by Appellant Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo. Appellee's brief due on or before 09/05/2019 for Campbells Soup Company, Cary Hayes, Denise M. Morrison, Tapfin North America Shared Services Team and Task Management Inc. Disk not required. [11] [7021961] [19-2125] (PNR) [Entered: 08/06/2019 02:14 PM]
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Bernard E. Jacques for Appellee Task Management Inc.. for Stefan Mohan, Corie Hess, and Linda Harrison. Additional Parties: Stefan Mohan, Corie Hess, and Linda Harrison. [10] [7016645] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2125]--[Edited 07/12/2019 by FP to reflect that atty. Jacques is added to the docket. ] (Jacques, Bernard) [Entered: 07/11/2019 09:20 AM]
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 Docketing Statement filed by Appellee Task Management Inc.. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 18-2672; 19-2529 [9] [7016537] [19-2125] (Johnson, Dayne) [Entered: 07/10/2019 03:39 PM]
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Dayne R. Johnson for Appellee Task Management Inc.. for Stefan Mohan, Corie Hess, and Linda Harrison. Additional Parties: Stefan Mohan, Corie Hess, and Linda Harrison. [8] [7016156] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2125] --[Edited 07/09/2019 by AP- to reflect the addition of counsel] (Johnson, Dayne) [Entered: 07/09/2019 03:10 PM]
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: On consideration of the paper captioned Plaintiff-Appellants Response to the June 14, 2019 Court Order filed by appellant on June 27, 2019, and in light of the district courts order of June 17, 2019, denying plaintiff-appellants motion for reconsideration, this appeal shall proceed to briefing. Briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 08/05/2019 for Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo. DW [7014261] [19-2125] (AP) [Entered: 06/28/2019 10:26 AM]
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [6] [7014082] [19-2125] (CMD) [Entered: 06/27/2019 02:23 PM]
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 Response to the June 14, 2019 court order filed by Appellant Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo. [5] [7014081] [19-2125] (CMD) [Entered: 06/27/2019 02:22 PM]
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff-appellant Ricky Kamden-Ouaffo shall file, on or before June 28, 2019, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be STAYED pending the entry of the order disposing of the Rule 59 motion. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy this requirement. Briefing shall be suspended pending further court order. (See order for further details) [7011474] DW [4] [7011474] [19-2125] [4] [4] [7011474] [19-2125] (AG) [Entered: 06/14/2019 03:23 PM]
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Carlos Barroso, Scott Keller, Sefan Mohan, Corie Hess, Linda Harrison, Duane Morris, Jonathan Wetchler, Trevor Tanguchi, McElroy Deutsh, Mulvaney & Carpenter LLC, Benard Jacques, Dayne Johnson, John Doe, Jane Doe and ABC Corporation 1-10. [3] [7011305] [19-2125] (AP) [Entered: 06/14/2019 09:41 AM]
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [7011303] [19-2125] (AP) [Entered: 06/14/2019 09:38 AM]
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo by 06/20/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 06/27/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 07/23/2019 for Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo [1] [7011292] [19-2125] (AP) [Entered: 06/14/2019 09:24 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo v. Tapfin North America Shared Se, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICKY KAMDEM-OUAFFO
Represented By: Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAMPBELLS SOUP COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TASK MANAGEMENT INC.
Represented By: Dayne Rashard Johnson
Represented By: Bernard E. Jacques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENISE M. MORRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TAPFIN NORTH AMERICA SHARED SERVICES TEAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARY HAYES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?