Steven Summers v. Victor Calloway
Petitioner / Appellant: STEVEN D. SUMMERS
Respondent / Appellee: VICTOR CALLOWAY
Case Number: 19-2318
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Steven D. Summers leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 08/27/2019. [7026374] [7] [7026374] [19-2318] (VG) [Entered: 08/27/2019 04:12 PM]
August 26, 2019 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 08/26/2019 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7025839-2] [7025839] [19-2318] (AD) [Entered: 08/26/2019 11:14 AM]
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This cause is DISMISSED pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(c). Mandate issued, no record to be returned. [6] [7025823] [19-2318] (AD) [Entered: 08/26/2019 11:04 AM]
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The following is before the court: LETTER, filed on July 22, 2019, by the pro se appellant. A review of the courts docket indicates that this appeal may not proceed without a certificate of appealability. If the appellant would like to file a separate request for a certificate of appealability, he may do so by August 26, 2019. If the appellant does not file a motion by that date, his notice of appeal previously docketed in this court will be deemed to constitute an application for a certificate of appealability. See Fed. R. App. P. 22(b)(2). A further review of the docket indicates that on July 22, 2019, the appellant filed a motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis and on July 23, 2019, the clerk transferred the motion to the district court for ruling in the first instance. The courts docket also indicates that the appellant has not filed the required Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the appellant file the overdue docketing statement by August 9, 2019. Finally, the clerk will send the appellant a copy of this courts public docket. CMD [5] [7019571] [19-2318] (AG) [Entered: 07/25/2019 02:17 PM]
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order issued TRANSFERRING the motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis on appeal to the clerk of the District Court for ruling in the first instance. JR [4] [7018808] [19-2318] (CAG) [Entered: 07/23/2019 09:34 AM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Prose motion filed by Appellant Steven D. Summers to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Trust account statement included. [3] [7018692] [19-2318] (CAG) [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:43 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Filed letter from Appellant Steven D. Summers regarding attempts to meet deadlines. [2] [7018691] [19-2318] (CAG) [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:43 PM]
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 State prisoner's habeas corpus case docketed. Certificate of Appealability denied 06/10/2019. Fee due. Transcript information sheet due by 07/25/2019. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Steven D. Summers by 07/18/2019. Fee or IFP forms due on 07/25/2019 for Appellant Steven D. Summers. [1] [7017002] [19-2318] (AD) [Entered: 07/12/2019 12:06 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steven Summers v. Victor Calloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: STEVEN D. SUMMERS
Represented By: Steven D. Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: VICTOR CALLOWAY
Represented By: Michael M. Glick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?