Steven Lisle, Jr. v. James Diercks, et al
Defendant / Appellee: KEVIN MURRAY, DANIEL DUNN, JACQUELINE LASHBROOK, FRANK EOVALDI and JAMES DIERCKS
Plaintiff / Appellant: STEVEN D. LISLE, JR.
Case Number: 19-2340
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re: Motion to reconsider appellant motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. IT IS ORDERED that the motion to reconsider is DENIED. [ # 12 ] [13] [7029033] JLW [19-2340] (AG) [Entered: 09/09/2019 04:08 PM]
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Steven D. Lisle, Jr. for reconsideration of motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. [12] [7027060] [19-2340] (PS) [Entered: 08/29/2019 04:28 PM]
August 29, 2019 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 08/29/2019 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7026836-2] [7026836] [19-2340] (CM) [Entered: 08/29/2019 10:57 AM]
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is DISMISSED for failure to pay the required docketing fee pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). The appellant shall remit to the clerk of the district court the $505 appellate fees. Mandate issued, no record to be returned. The pro se appellant was DENIED leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis by the appellate court on 08/08/2019 and was given 14 days to pay the $505 filing fee. The pro se appellant has not paid the $505 appellate fee.[11][7026820] [19-2340] (CM) [Entered: 08/29/2019 10:46 AM]
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: re: 1. Affidavit accompanying motion for permission to appeal in forma pauperis. 2. Memorandum un support of PLRA motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. 3. Declaration in support of motion to proceed in forma pauperis. [ # 6 ] The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is DENIED. See Lee v. Clinton, 209 F.3d 1025 (7th Cir. 2000). Appellant has not identified a good faith issue that the district court erred in granting the motion for sanctions and dismissing his complaint with prejudice. Appellant shall pay the required docketing fee within 14 days, or this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 434 (7th Cir. 1997). Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7016 0340 0001 1335 0134. [10] [7022373] JLW [19-2340] (CAG) [Entered: 08/08/2019 09:42 AM]
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 Declaration for Motion for IFP on Appeal filed by Appellant Steven D. Lisle, Jr. (Document forwarded from the District Court). [9] [7021986] [19-2340] (DSL) [Entered: 08/06/2019 02:47 PM]
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re: Motion for appointment of counsel. This appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act and all proceedings are suspended pending the assessment and payment of any necessary fees. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 434 (7th Cir. 1997). A review of the docket indicates that the appellant's motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is currently pending before this court and, therefore, his fee status is unresolved. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the motion is DENIED without court action, pursuant to the court's fee notice and order dated July 15, 2019. [ # 4 ] [8] [7021107] CMD [19-2340] (AG) [Entered: 08/01/2019 03:01 PM]
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 Filed Appellant Steven D. Lisle, Jr. Memorandum In Support of PLRA Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal In Forma Pauperis. [7] [7021074] [19-2340] (PS) [Entered: 08/01/2019 12:43 PM]
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Steven D. Lisle, Jr. to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Trust account statement included. [6] [7021073] [19-2340] (PS) [Entered: 08/01/2019 12:42 PM]
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Steven D. Lisle, Jr.. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [5] [7021071] [19-2340] (PS) [Entered: 08/01/2019 12:40 PM]
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Steven D. Lisle, Jr. for appointment of counsel. [4] [7021067] [19-2340] (PS) [Entered: 08/01/2019 12:37 PM]
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Steven D. Lisle, Jr. leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 07/17/2019. [3] [7019168] PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 08/23/2019. [19-2340] (DSL) [Entered: 07/24/2019 11:53 AM]
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Filed notice of change of address for Steven Lisle to Dixon Correctional Center. [2] [7017922] [19-1339, 19-2340] (AP) [Entered: 07/17/2019 03:10 PM]
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Steven D. Lisle Jr. by 07/22/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 07/29/2019.. [1] [7017342] [19-2340] (CAG) [Entered: 07/15/2019 04:17 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Steven Lisle, Jr. v. James Diercks, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEVIN MURRAY
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANIEL DUNN
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACQUELINE LASHBROOK
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRANK EOVALDI
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES DIERCKS
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEVEN D. LISLE, JR.
Represented By: Steven D. Lisle Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?