Charles Hart v. James Greer, et al
Defendant / Appellee: KRISTIN VASQUEZ, LON BECHER, LAURA FRAZIER and JAMES GREER
Plaintiff / Appellant: CHARLES HART
Case Number: 19-2883
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 ***PRISON LITIGATION REFORM ACT PARTIAL FILING FEE. Received: $60.44 from Appellant Charles Hart on 11/25/2019. [3] [7046372] [19-2883] (CM) [Entered: 11/26/2019 11:22 AM]
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 Filed District Court order GRANTING Appellant Charles Hart leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP granted: 10/31/2019. District Court has assessed a $60.44 initial partial filing fee. [2] [7040884] PLRA initial partial filing fee due by 11/29/2019. [19-2883] (CM) [Entered: 11/01/2019 08:11 AM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Docketing statement filed. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 10/30/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 10/15/2019. [1] [7033545] [19-2883] (MM) [Entered: 09/30/2019 03:18 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles Hart v. James Greer, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KRISTIN VASQUEZ
Represented By: Samuel T. Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LON BECHER
Represented By: Samuel T. Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAURA FRAZIER
Represented By: Samuel T. Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES GREER
Represented By: Samuel T. Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHARLES HART
Represented By: Charles Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?