Kevin Greer v. U.S. Bank National Association, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: KEVIN GREER
Defendant / Appellee: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC, doing business as Mr. Cooper and U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Corporation Mortgage Loan Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-BC5
Case Number: 19-2983
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 01/31/2020 for Kevin Greer. Appellees' brief due on or before 03/03/2020 for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC and U.S. Bank National Association. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 03/24/2020 for Appellant Kevin Greer. JB [7044283] [19-2983] (MM) [Entered: 11/18/2019 08:44 AM]
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 Amended Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Kevin Greer. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [8] [7039341] [19-2983] (Chatt, William) [Entered: 10/25/2019 11:58 AM]
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 Filed Notice Of Filing Of Transcript Information Sheet and Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Kevin Greer. [7] [7039331] [19-2983]--[Edited 10/25/2019 by MM to reflect transcript information sheet filed with notice.] (Chatt, William) [Entered: 10/25/2019 11:44 AM]
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Rosa M. Tumialan for Appellee Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. [6] [7038655] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2983]--[Edited 10/23/2019 by PS - to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Tumialan, Rosa) [Entered: 10/23/2019 11:35 AM]
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Rosa M. Tumialan for Appellee U.S. Bank National Association. [5] [7038653] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2983]--[Edited 10/23/2019 by PS - to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Tumialan, Rosa) [Entered: 10/23/2019 11:34 AM]
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 12/16/2019 for Kevin Greer. Appellee's brief due on or before 01/15/2020 for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC and U.S. Bank National Association. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 02/05/2020 for Appellant Kevin Greer. JB [7038415] [19-2983] (AD) [Entered: 10/22/2019 12:26 PM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted in Room 1120, Friday, November 15, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB [3] [7038414] [19-2983] (AD) [Entered: 10/22/2019 12:25 PM]
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Plaintiff-appellant Kevin Greer shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before 10/17/2019. (See order for further details). DW [2] [2] [7036021] [19-2983] (MM) [Entered: 10/10/2019 12:45 PM]
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 10/23/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 11/18/2019 for Kevin Greer. [1] [7035750] [19-2983] (AD) [Entered: 10/09/2019 01:42 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kevin Greer v. U.S. Bank National Association, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KEVIN GREER
Represented By: William O. Chatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC, doing business as Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Caleb J. Halberg
Represented By: Rosa M. Tumialan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Corporation Mortgage Loan Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-BC5
Represented By: Caleb J. Halberg
Represented By: Rosa M. Tumialan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?