Thomas Powers v. Travis Smith, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: THOMAS POWERS
Defendant / Appellee: GREGG SCOTT, JOHN & JANE DOES, CURTIS PARSONS and TRAVIS SMITH
Case Number: 19-3007
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 11/21/2019 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7045424-2] [7045424] [19-3007] (PS) [Entered: 11/21/2019 02:08 PM]
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This cause is DISMISSED pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). Mandate issued, no record to be returned. [6][7045417] [19-3007] (PS) [Entered: 11/21/2019 02:01 PM]
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re: Afffidavit accompanying motion for permission to appeal in forma pauperis, filed on October 18, 2019. In light of this courts order issued on October 15, 2019, in Powers v. Wilcoxen, Nos. 19-2178 et al., IT IS ORDERED that Powerss motion to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. Powers has forfeited the privilege of proceeding in forma pauperis in any new or pending case or appeal until he had paid, in full, all outstanding fees and costs for all of his lawsuits. See In re City of Chicago, 500 F.3d 582, 583 (7th Cir. 2007); Campbell v. Clarke, 481 F.3d 967 (7th Cir. 2007). Powers shall pay the required docketing fee within 14 days, or this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). [ # 4 ] Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7016 0340 0001 1334 6878. SCR [5] [7038013] [19-3007] (FP) [Entered: 10/21/2019 11:12 AM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 Prose motion filed by Appellant Thomas Powers to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [4] [7037952] [19-3007] (MM) [Entered: 10/21/2019 09:04 AM]
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Thomas Powers leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 10/16/2019. Pursuant to the Seventh Circuit's order in Powers v. Wilcoxen, et al, Appeal No. 19-2478, Plaintiff is barred from proceeding in forma pauperis until he has paid all outstanding fees and costs in full. Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 30 day notice for failure to pay the docketing fee. Fee or IFP forms due on 11/15/2019 for Appellant Thomas Powers. [7036874] [3] [7036874] [19-3007] (VG) [Entered: 10/16/2019 09:56 AM]
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [7036298] [19-3007] (CG) [Entered: 10/11/2019 12:21 PM]
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 10/25/2019. [1] [7036281] [19-3007] (CG) [Entered: 10/11/2019 11:25 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas Powers v. Travis Smith, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THOMAS POWERS
Represented By: Thomas Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREGG SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN & JANE DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CURTIS PARSONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRAVIS SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?