Miranda Chaudhry v. Amazon.com, Inc., et al
Defendant / Appellee: AMAZON.COM SERVICES INC., MIKE FLANNERY, LATANYA GAINES, AMAZON.COM, INCORPORATED and RYAN BRENNER
Plaintiff / Appellant: MIRANDA D. CHAUDHRY
Case Number: 19-3442
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file only to the extent that the appellant shall either pay the $505.00 appellate fees or file a motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis with the clerk of the district court by January 27, 2020. [ # 6 ] CMD [7] [7051063] [19-3442] (FP) [Entered: 12/18/2019 03:30 PM]
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Mrs. Miranda D. Chaudhry to extend time to pay filing fee. [6] [7050919] [19-3442] (CAH) [Entered: 12/18/2019 11:32 AM]
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Mrs. Miranda D. Chaudhry. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 18-1849 [5] [7050918] [19-3442] (CAH) [Entered: 12/18/2019 11:31 AM]
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Mrs. Miranda D. Chaudhry. [4] [7050915] [19-3442] (CAH) [Entered: 12/18/2019 11:28 AM]
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Appellant Mrs. Miranda D. Chaudhry shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details) [7050286] Jurisdictional memorandum due for Appellant Miranda D. Chaudhry by 12/30/2019. DW [3] [7050286] [19-3442] (AD) [Entered: 12/16/2019 12:03 PM]
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Amazon.com LLC, Amazon.com.dedc.LLC, ReedGroup Management, LLC, and Amazon.com, LLC. Sedgwick. [2] [7050129] [19-3442] (VG) [Entered: 12/13/2019 03:52 PM]
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Miranda D. Chaudhry by 12/19/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 12/27/2019. Fee or IFP forms due on 12/27/2019 for Appellant Miranda D. Chaudhry. [1] [7050115] [19-3442] (VG) [Entered: 12/13/2019 03:42 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miranda Chaudhry v. Amazon.com, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMAZON.COM SERVICES INC.
Represented By: Meredith Riccio
Represented By: Stephanie L. Sweitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIKE FLANNERY
Represented By: Meredith Riccio
Represented By: Stephanie L. Sweitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LATANYA GAINES
Represented By: Meredith Riccio
Represented By: Stephanie L. Sweitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMAZON.COM, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Meredith Riccio
Represented By: Stephanie L. Sweitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RYAN BRENNER
Represented By: Meredith Riccio
Represented By: Stephanie L. Sweitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MIRANDA D. CHAUDHRY
Represented By: Miranda D. Chaudhry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?